(PC) Ramos v. Weiss et al
Plaintiff: Benjamin Ramos
Defendant: Jean Weiss, K. Richardson, Christopher Smith and Richard Weiss
Case Number: 2:2019cv01468
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for EXPEDITED screening order by Benjamin Ramos. (Kastilahn, A)
August 28, 2019 RECEIPT number #CAE200100548 $400.00 fbo Benjamin Ramos by Benjamin Ramos on 8/28/2019. (Huang, H)
August 22, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, and prisoner IFP form served on Benjamin Ramos. (Plummer, M)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 08/22/19 DENYING #5 Motion to expedite screening order. Plaintiff shall submit on the form provided by the Clerk of the Court, within 30 days from the date of this order, a complete application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, with the required certified copy of his trust account statement, or the appropriate filing fee; and the Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new form Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner. (Plummer, M)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to expedite sceening order by Benjamin Ramos. (Kastilahn, A) Modified on 8/21/2019 (Plummer, M).
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Benjamin Ramos. (Kastilahn, A)
August 1, 2019 SERVICE BY EMAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Benjamin Ramos. (Kastilahn, A)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *7/31/2019*; Consent or Decline due by 9/6/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Kastilahn, A)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Benjamin Ramos. (Kastilahn, A)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Benjamin Ramos.(Kastilahn, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Ramos v. Weiss et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?