(PC) Wilkins v. Gipson et al
Plaintiff: Keenan Wilkins and Nerrah Brown
Defendant: Connie Gipson, Ralph Diaz, L. Shadrick, Laura Eldridge, Miller and Smith
Case Number: 2:2019cv01469
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ADOPTING #15 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in full signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 09/24/19 ; DENYING #7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction without prejudice. (Benson, A.)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #18 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations served on Keenan Wilkins. (Benson, A.)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Keenan Wilkins.(Benson, A.)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION by Keenan Wilkins regarding #15 Findings and Recommendations. (Benson, A.) Modified on 9/5/2019 (Plummer, M).
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 08/22/19 GRANTING #2 , #6 Motions to Proceed IFP. Plaintiff is obligated to pay the statutory filing fee of $350.00 for this action. All fees shall be collected in accordance with the court's CDC order filed concurrently herewith. Within 21 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall complete and return the attached Notice of Election form notifying the court whether he wants to proceed on the screened complaint or whether he wants time to file a first amended complaint. The Clerk of Court shall randomly assign this matter to a district court judge. Also, RECOMMENDING that plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction #7 be denied without prejudice. Motion #7 Assigned and referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to the order and findings and recommendations, this case has been assigned to District Judge John A. Mendez and Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. The new case number is: 2:19-cv-1469 JAM CKD (PC). (Plummer, M)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #15 Order, Findings and Recommendations served on Keenan Wilkins. (Plummer, M)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: IFP served on Director of CDCR pursuant to #12 Order Directing Prisoner Payment. (Yin, K)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Keenan Wilkins (aka Nerrah Brown) signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/21/2019. CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial) (Yin, K)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 [DISREGARD-ENTERED DUE TO CLERICAL ERROR]CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to Order and Findings and Recommendations, this case has been assigned to District Judge John A. Mendez and Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. The new case number is: 2:19-cv-1469 JAM CKD (PC). (Henshaw, R) Modified on 8/22/2019 (Plummer, M).
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #12 Order Directing Prisoner Payment served on Keenan Wilkins. (Yin, K)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DECLARATION of Keenan Wilkins is SUPPORT OF #7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Coll, A)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DECLARATION in Support of Emergency Injunctive Relief by Keenan Wilkins. (York, M)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DECLARATION in Support of Injunctive Relief by Keenan Wilkins. (Zignago, K.)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Keenan Wilkins. (Zignago, K.)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Keenan Wilkins. (Zignago, K.)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Keenan Wilkins. (Zignago, K.)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Keenan Wilkins aka Nerrah Brown, CDC AN-2387 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (TEXT ONLY) (Plummer, M)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order RE-SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Keenan Wilkins with aka of Nerrah Brown included. (Plummer, M)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *7/31/2019*; Consent or Decline due by 9/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Coll, A)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Keenan Wilkins. (Coll, A)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Keenan Wilkins. (Coll, A)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Keenan Wilkins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Coll, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Wilkins v. Gipson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keenan Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nerrah Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Shadrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Eldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?