(PC) Rood v. Lockwood et al
Plaintiff: Colton James Rood
Defendant: Isaac Lockwood, Z. Jurkiewicz, Najera, Robert Van Gerwen, McQuillan, Clark, D. Hurte and McCleave
Case Number: 2:2020cv00271
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Reader, L)
March 6, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT to #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by Colton James Rood. (Reader, L)
February 12, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel served on Colton James Rood. (Yin, K)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/12/2020 DENYING without prejudice plaintiff's #3 request for the appointment of counsel. (Yin, K) Modified on 2/12/2020 (Yin, K).
February 6, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Colton James Rood. (Tupolo, A)
February 6, 2020 Filing 5 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 3/12/2020 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Tupolo, A)
February 5, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Colton James Rood. (Tupolo, A)
February 5, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL by Colton James Rood. (Tupolo, A)
February 5, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Colton James Rood. (Tupolo, A)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Colton James Rood.(Tupolo, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Rood v. Lockwood et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isaac Lockwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Z. Jurkiewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Najera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Van Gerwen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McQuillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Hurte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCleave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colton James Rood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?