Givens et al v. Newsom et al
Plaintiff: Ron Givens and Christine Bish
Defendant: Xavier Becerra, Sonia Y. Angell, Gavin Newsom and Warren Stanley
Case Number: 2:2020cv00852
Filed: April 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/17/2020 ADVANCING HEARING as to #28 Motion for Reconsideration to 7/14/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. Defendants' response to the Motion shall be filed no later than 6/30/2020, and Plaintiffs' reply, if any, shall be filed no later than 7/7/2020.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 16, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION to DISMISS by Sonia Y. Angell et al. Motion Hearing set for 7/14/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Declaration of Douglas Lyons, #3 Proposed Order)(Medley, Amie) Modified on 6/17/2020 (Coll, A).
June 16, 2020 Filing 32 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Advancing Hearing on #28 Motion for Reconsideration to 7/14/2020 by Christine Bish, Ron Givens. (Dhillon, Harmeet) Modified on 6/17/2020 (Coll, A).
June 15, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of LODGING by Christine Bish, Ron Givens: EXHIBIT 5 (Video File ) to #28 Declaration of Gregory R. Michael . (Dhillon, Harmeet) Modified on 6/15/2020 (Donati, J).
June 15, 2020 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT of #31 Notice of Lodging by Christine Bish, Ron Givens: Exhibit 5 (video file). (Text only entry) (Donati, J)
June 10, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE to RESCHEDULE HEARING re #28 Motion Hearing set for 8/11/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Dhillon, Harmeet)
June 10, 2020 Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiffs motion for reconsideration #28 has been noticed for hearing on a date not available for the Court and as a consequence will not be heard on July 7, 2020. Counsel may contact Harry Vine @ hvine@caed.uscourts.gov to obtain an available date to re-notice the motion for hearing. (Vine, H)
June 9, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION for RECONSIDERATION re #18 Order on Motion for TRO by Christine Bish, Ron Givens. Motion Hearing set for 7/7/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gregory R. Michael, #2 Declaration of Ron Givens, #3 Declaration of Christine Bish, #4 Proposed Order)(Dhillon, Harmeet) Modified on 6/10/2020 (Kaminski, H).
May 26, 2020 Filing 27 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/7/2020, before District Judge John A. Mendez, filed by Court Reporter Kimberly Bennett, Phone number 916-741-3475 E-mail reporter.bennett@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 6/18/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/26/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/24/2020. (Bennett, K)
May 22, 2020 Filing 26 AMENDED TRANSCRIPT REQUEST re #25 by Sonia Y. Angell, Xavier Becerra, Gavin Newsom, Warren Stanley for proceedings held on 5/7/2020 before Judge John A. Mendez. Court Reporter Kimberly Bennett. (Walter, James)
May 21, 2020 Filing 25 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Sonia Y. Angell, Xavier Becerra, Gavin Newsom, Warren Stanley for proceedings held on 05/07/2020 before Judge John A. Mendez. Court Reporter Kimberly Bennett. (Walter, James)
May 20, 2020 Filing 24 USCA CASE NUMBER 20-15949 for #21 Notice of Appeal filed by Christine Bish, Ron Givens. (York, M)
May 19, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Gregory Richard Michael on behalf of Christine Bish, Ron Givens. Attorney Michael, Gregory Richard added. (Michael, Gregory)
May 18, 2020 Filing 22 APPEAL PROCESSED to Ninth Circuit re #21 Notice of Appeal filed by Christine Bish, Ron Givens. Notice of Appeal filed *5/17/2020*, Complaint filed *4/27/2020* and Appealed Order / Judgment filed *5/8/2020*. Court Reporter: *Kimberly Bennett*. *Fee Status: Paid on 5/17/2020 in the amount of $505.00* (Attachments: #1 Appeal Information) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 17, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL by Christine Bish, Ron Givens as to #18 Order on Motion for TRO. (Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0972-8893647) (Dhillon, Harmeet)
May 14, 2020 Filing 20 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Christine Bish, Ron Givens for proceedings held on 05/07/2020 before Judge John Mendez. Court Reporter Kimberly Bennett. (Dhillon, Harmeet)
May 14, 2020 Filing 19 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant Warren Stanley to Respond to Initial Complaint by Warren Stanley. (Medley, Amie) Modified on 5/14/2020 (Kaminski, H).
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/8/2020 DENYING #5 Motion for TRO. (Zignago, K.)
May 7, 2020 Filing 17 MINUTES for proceedings held via video conference before District Judge John A. Mendez: MOTION HEARING held on 5/7/2020. D. Gill Sperlein and Harmeet Dhillon appeared via video for the plaintiffs. Amie Medley and Jim Walter appeared via video for the defendants. The Court and counsel discussed the plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (ECF No. #5 ). After arguments, for the reasons stated on the record, the Court SUBMITTED the motion. Order to issue. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) Court Reporter/CD Number: Kimberly Bennett. (Michel, G.)
May 5, 2020 Filing 16 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Christine Bish, Ron Givens in re #5 Motion for TRO,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Dhillon, Harmeet)
May 5, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY by Christine Bish, Ron Givens re #5 Motion for TRO. (Attachments: #1 Declaration D. Gill Sperlein)(Dhillon, Harmeet)
May 4, 2020 Filing 14 DECLARATION of CHP Captain Douglas Lyons in support of #10 Opposition. Attorney Walter, James Wayne added. (Walter, James)
May 1, 2020 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Dr. James Watt in support of #10 Opposition. (Medley, Amie) Modified on 5/4/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
May 1, 2020 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Capt. Douglas Lyons in support of #10 Opposition. (Medley, Amie) Modified on 5/4/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
May 1, 2020 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Amie L. Medley in support of #10 Opposition. (Medley, Amie) Modified on 5/4/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
May 1, 2020 Filing 10 OPPOSITION by Defendants to #5 Motion for TRO,. Attorney Medley, Amie Leann added. (Medley, Amie) Modified on 5/4/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
May 1, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER issued by Relief Courtroom Deputy G. Michel for District Judge John A. Mendez: On the Court's own motion, a Motion Hearing re Plaintiffs' #5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is SET for 5/7/2020 at 1:00 PM before District Judge John A. Mendez via video conference. The parties are DIRECTED that no more than two attorneys may appear for each party and that each party shall designate one attorney as the primary person for oral argument. Login instructions to be served on counsel via e-mail. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Michel, G.)
April 29, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Mark Philip Meuser on behalf of Christine Bish, Ron Givens. Attorney Meuser, Mark Philip added. (Meuser, Mark)
April 28, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Warren Stanley served on 4/28/2020, answer due 5/19/2020. (Dhillon, Harmeet)
April 28, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiffs filed a Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and for Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue, ECF No. 5. Defendants opposition briefs are due by Friday, May 1, 2010. Plaintiffs reply is due by Tuesday, May 5, 2020. (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) (Vine, H)
April 27, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Christine Bish, Ron Givens. Attorney Dhillon, Harmeet Kaur added. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark P. Meuser, #2 Declaration of Ron Givens, #3 Declaration of Christine Bish, #4 Proposed Order granting Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #5 Exhibit TRO Checklist)(Dhillon, Harmeet)
April 27, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
April 27, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Sonia Y. Angell, Xavier Becerra, Gavin Newsom, Warren Stanley* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Dennis Gill Sperlein* *The Law Office of D. Gill Sperlein* *345 Grove Street* *San Francisco, CA 94102*. (Benson, A.)
April 27, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Ron Givens (Sperlein, Dennis)
April 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Christine Bish, Ron Givens. Attorney Sperlein, Dennis Gill added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8863505)(Attachment #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Interested Parties.) (Sperlein, Dennis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Givens et al v. Newsom et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Amie Leann Medley
Represented By: James Wayne Walter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonia Y. Angell
Represented By: Amie Leann Medley
Represented By: James Wayne Walter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gavin Newsom
Represented By: Amie Leann Medley
Represented By: James Wayne Walter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Stanley
Represented By: Amie Leann Medley
Represented By: James Wayne Walter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Givens
Represented By: Dennis Gill Sperlein
Represented By: Harmeet Kaur Dhillon
Represented By: Gregory Richard Michael
Represented By: Mark Philip Meuser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Bish
Represented By: Dennis Gill Sperlein
Represented By: Harmeet Kaur Dhillon
Represented By: Gregory Richard Michael
Represented By: Mark Philip Meuser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?