(PC) Thomas v. Ali et al
Plaintiff: Jason Latrell Thomas
Defendant: J. Munoz, D. Yang, C. Ajah, A. McCullough, K. Saetern, A. Green, F. Moreno, G. Metcalf, J. Saecato, M. Ali, M. Gonzalez, A. Cruz, L. Eldridge and M. Gauchan
Case Number: 2:2020cv00864
Filed: April 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Mail Returned by Jason Latrell Thomas. (York, M)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF ELECTION by Jason Latrell Thomas: to proceed only with the (a) 8th Amendment excessive force claims against defendants Moreno, Yang, Gonzalez, Saeturn, Saechao, Ali, and Metcalf based on 11/4/2019 incident; (b) 8th Amendment excessive force claims against defendants Saechao, Cruz, and McCullough based on 12/13/2019 incident; (c) 1st Amendment retaliation claim against defendant Saechao based on 12/13/2019 incident; and (d) 1st Amendment retaliation claim against defendant Saechao and Saeturn based on January 2020 incident. (York, M)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Jason Latrell Thomas.(Huang, H)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for ORDER Directing Service of Defendants by Jason Latrell Thomas. (Huang, H)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DOCUMENT SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #5 Motion to Proceed IFP served on CDCR. (Henshaw, R)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/19/2020 DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Jason Latrell Thomas. The custodial agency shall collect an initial partial filing fee and monthly payments in accordance with this order until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. (cc: CDCR and Financial Department) (Henshaw, R)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/19/2020 GRANTING #5 Motion to Proceed IFP and ORDERING Plaintiff to return the attached notice advising the court whether he elects to proceed on the cognizable claims, as detailed in this order, or file an amended complaint, within 30 days. Plaintiff to pay the statutory filing fee of $350. All payments to be collected in accordance with the notice to the CDCR filed concurrently herewith. (Henshaw, R)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order and #7 Order Directing Prisoner Payment served on Jason Latrell Thomas. (Henshaw, R)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Jason Latrell Thomas. (Kastilahn, A)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Kastilahn, A)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/4/2020 ORDERING if Plaintiff wished to proceed, he must submit either the filing fee or the application required by 1915(a) within 30 days from the date of service of this order. (Henshaw, R)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order and IFP application served on Jason Latrell Thomas. (Henshaw, R)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 6/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Kastilahn, A)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Jason Latrell Thomas. (Kastilahn, A)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Jason Latrell Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kastilahn, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Thomas v. Ali et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Ajah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. McCullough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Saetern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Metcalf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Saecato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Ali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Eldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Gauchan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Latrell Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?