(PC) Lamon v. Mey et al
Plaintiff: Barry Louis Lamon
Defendant: A.E. Spearman, Grether, Roderick, Smith and S. Mey
Case Number: 2:2020cv01474
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Barry Louis Lamon. (Zignago, K.)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against all Defendants by Barry Louis Lamon. (Zignago, K.)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 OBJECTIONS by Plaintiff Barry Louis Lamon to #7 Order. (Coll, A)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Barry Louis Lamon. (Coll, A) Modified on 8/10/2020 (Plummer, M).
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DOCUMENT SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #2 Motion to Proceed IFP served on CDCR. (Henshaw, R)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/3/2020 DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Barry Louis Lamon. The custodial agency shall collect an initial partial filing fee and monthly payments in accordance with this order until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. (cc: CDCR and Financial Department) (Henshaw, R)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/3/2020 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP; ORDERING Plaintiff may file an amended complaint within 30 days of service of this order to attempt to cure the pleading defects as discussed in this order; and ORDERING if Plaintiff opts to proceed on his original complaint as to defendants Mey, Spearman, Grether, Roderick and Smith, he is to return the attached notice within 30 days of service of this order. Plaintiff to pay the statutory filing fee of $350.00. All fees to be collected and paid in accordance with this court's order to the CDCR filed concurrently herewith. (Henshaw, R)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order Directing Prisoner Payment and #7 Order served on Barry Louis Lamon. (Henshaw, R)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Coll, A)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Barry Louis Lamon. (Kaminski, H)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Barry Louis Lamon, CDC E-08345 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Henshaw, R)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 8/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Zignago, K.)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents served on Barry Louis Lamon. (Zignago, K.)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Barry Louis Lamon. (Zignago, K.)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against all Defendants by Barry Louis Lamon. (Zignago, K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Lamon v. Mey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.E. Spearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grether
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roderick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Mey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Louis Lamon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?