Cahuilla Band of Indians v. State of CA, et al.,
Plaintiff: Cahuilla Band of Indians
Defendant: State of California and Gavin Newsom
Case Number: 2:2020cv01630
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 25:640
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION Regarding Responsive Pleading Deadline by Gavin Newsom, State of California. (Muscat, Timothy) Modified on 9/21/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
September 18, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER by Gavin Newsom, State of California. Attorney Muscat, Timothy M. added.(Muscat, Timothy)
September 1, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Gavin Newsom served on 8/24/2020. (Forman, George) Modified on 9/2/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
August 27, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: State of California and Gavin Newsom on 08/19/20. (Forman, George) Modified on 8/27/2020 (Benson, A.).
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 1:20-cv-01147-DAD-SKO, 2:20-cv-01585-KJM-AC, 1:19-cv-00024-AWI-SKO by Soboba Band of Luiseno Indians. (Forman, George)
August 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 2:20-cv-01585-KJM-AC, 1:19-cv-00024-AWI-SKO by Cahuilla Band of Indians. (Forman, George)
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Gavin Newsom, State of California* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *George Forman* *Forman & Associates* *4340 Redwood Highway, Suite* *San Rafael, CA 94903*. (Benson, A.)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against State of California by Cahuilla Band of Indians. Attorney Forman, George added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9053557) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Forman, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cahuilla Band of Indians v. State of CA, et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cahuilla Band of Indians
Represented By: George Forman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Represented By: Timothy M. Muscat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gavin Newsom
Represented By: Timothy M. Muscat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?