(PC) Rodriguez v. Ralph Diaz et al
Plaintiff: Johnathan C. Rodriguez
Defendant: C. Rascon, Ralph Diaz, S. Moore, Sr, L. Samayoa, Sandra Smith, R. Balius, B. Banks, R. W. Smith, P. Birdsong and S. Moore, Sr.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01650
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #16 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, #14 Order, served on Johnathan C. Rodriguez. (Marrujo, C)
August 17, 2020 Filing 16 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 9/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Marrujo, C)
August 17, 2020 Filing 15 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Central; Case Number 5:20-cv-00451.
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO TRANSFER THIS ACTION TO THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA AND DIRECTING THE CLERK TO EFFECT SUCH TRANSFER [DOCKET NO. 11] by Judge John F. Walter. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that plaintiff's Request to Transfer is granted and this action is transferred back to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of California, plaintiff's chosen forum. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of this Court shall effect such transfer and shall serve a copy of this Order upon the plaintiff. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (es) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
June 5, 2020 Filing 13 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $3.02 subsequent payment from plaintiff Johnathan C Rodriguez on 06/05/2020, receipt number LA207111, re: Order on Request for Leave to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fees (CV60P), #7 . THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (fr) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
May 8, 2020 Filing 12 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $1.16 subsequent payment from plaintiff Johnathan C Rodriguez on 05/08/2020, receipt number LA206025, re: Order on Request for Leave to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fees (CV60P), #7 . THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (Fe) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
April 29, 2020 Filing 11 OBJECTION to Venue Under FED.R.Cv.P 60(b) filed by Petitioner Johnathan C Rodriguez. (es) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND AND DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND TO ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. *See order for details.* (Attachments: #1 Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Notice of Dismissal) (es) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
April 8, 2020 Filing 9 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $0.57 initial partial filing fee from plaintiff Johnathan C Rodriguez on 04/08/2020, receipt number LA204737, re: Order on Request for Leave to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fees (CV60P), #7 . THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (Fe) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER RE: PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS CASES by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (See order for details.) (es) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: granting #2 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee.. It is further ORDERED that the prisoner-plaintiff owes the Court the initial filing fee of $350.00. An initial partial filing fee of $1.73 must be paid within 30 days of the date of this order. Thereafter, monthly payments shall be forwarded to the Court in accordance with this order. (es) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
March 9, 2020 Filing 5 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Eastern [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Clerk of Court and referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (ghap) [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
March 5, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order served on Johnathan C. Rodriguez. (Henshaw, R) [Transferred from California Eastern on 3/9/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/5/2020 ORDERING CASE TRANSFERRED to the Eastern Division of the U.S. District Court for the Central District of California. (Henshaw, R) [Transferred from California Eastern on 3/9/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
February 27, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Johnathan C. Rodriguez. (Reader, L) [Transferred from California Eastern on 3/9/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
February 27, 2020 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 4/2/2020 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Reader, L) [Transferred from California Eastern on 3/9/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Johnathan C. Rodriguez. (Reader, L) [Transferred from California Eastern on 3/9/2020.] Modified on 3/11/2020 (es). [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against R. Balius, B. Banks, P. Birdsong, Ralph Diaz, S. Moore, Sr, C. Rascon, L. Samayoa, R. W. Smith, Sandra Smith by Johnathan C. Rodriguez.(Reader, L) [Transferred from California Eastern on 3/9/2020.] [Transferred from cacd on 8/17/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Rodriguez v. Ralph Diaz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Rascon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Moore, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Samayoa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Balius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. W. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Birdsong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Moore, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnathan C. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?