(PS) Bledsoe v. City of Stockton Police Dept.
Plaintiff: Donnell Bledsoe
Defendant: City of Stockton Police Dept., David Ambrose, Walt Vancil, Matthew Thurlow and Marshall Cole
Case Number: 2:2020cv01654
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Referring Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 10 USCA CASE NUMBER 20-16972 for #8 Notice of Appeal filed by Donnell Bledsoe. (Coll, A)
October 9, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Appeal Processed to USCA, served on Donnell Bledsoe. (Huang, H)
October 9, 2020 Filing 9 APPEAL PROCESSED to Ninth Circuit re #8 Notice of Appeal filed by Donnell Bledsoe. Notice of Appeal filed *10/8/2020*, Complaint filed *8/17/2020* and Appealed Order / Judgment filed *10/1/2020*. Court Reporter: *N/A*. *Fee Status: IFP Granted on 9/1/2020* (Attachments: #1 Appeal Information) (Huang, H)
October 8, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of APPEAL by Donnell Bledsoe as to #6 Order and #7 Judgment. (Huang, H)
October 1, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order, #7 Judgment served on Donnell Bledsoe. (Tupolo, A)
October 1, 2020 Filing 7 JUDGMENT dated *10/1/2020* pursuant to order signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/30/2020. (Tupolo, A)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/30/2020 ADOPTING IN FULL #3 Findings and Recommendations; DISMISSING WITH PREJUDICE #1 Complaint; and DENYING AS MOOT #5 Motion to Appoint Counsel. CASE CLOSED. (Tupolo, A)
September 10, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL by Donnell Bledsoe. (Coll, A)
September 10, 2020 Filing 4 OBJECTIONS to #3 Findings and Recommendations by Plaintiff Donnell Bledsoe. (Coll, A)
September 1, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order and Findings and Recommendations served on Donnell Bledsoe. (York, M)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/1/2020 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and RECOMMENDING that Plaintiff's #1 Complaint be dismissed with Prejudice and the Clerk of the Court be directed to close this case. Referred to Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (York, M)
August 18, 2020 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Zignago, K.)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Donnell Bledsoe. (Zignago, K.)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all Defendants by Donnell Bledsoe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Zignago, K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) Bledsoe v. City of Stockton Police Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Stockton Police Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Ambrose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walt Vancil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Thurlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donnell Bledsoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?