City of Sacramento et al v. TEVA Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: People of the State of Calfornia and City of Sacramento
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Watson Pharma Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Mallinckrodt PLC, Actavis, Inc., TEVA Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Actavis PLC, TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo International PLC, Actavis LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Walgreen Co., Cephalon, Inc., Thrifty Payless Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bryant Ranch Prepack, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, CVS Health Corporation, SpecGx LLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Allergan Inc. and Allergan USA, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01824
Filed: September 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/6/2020 GRANTING Defendants McKesson Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Walgreen Co., Allergan Finance, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan, Inc., Allergan Limited, CVS Health Corporation, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Thrifty Payless, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, and Bryant Ranch Prepack, Inc. until 1/11/2021 to respond to the complaint. (Coll, A)
November 4, 2020 Filing 45 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to The Complaint by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shafroth, Nathan)
October 22, 2020 Filing 44 REPLY in support of #22 Motion to Stay by Walgreen Co. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles J. Stevens, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Stevens, Charles) Modified on 10/23/2020 (Huang, H).
October 15, 2020 Filing 43 OPPOSITION by City of Sacramento, People of the State of Calfornia to #22 Motion to Stay. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rohit D. Nath, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21)(Nath, Rohit)
October 12, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE of FILING BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to and Automatic Stay of Proceedings by Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGx LLC (Tsai, Rocky)
October 12, 2020 Filing 41 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGx LLC. (Tsai, Rocky)
October 12, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Rocky Chiu-feng Tsai on behalf of Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGx LLC. Attorney Tsai, Rocky Chiu-feng added. (Tsai, Rocky)
October 9, 2020 Filing 39 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020. (Nath, Rohit)
October 8, 2020 Filing 38 REPLY in support of #9 Motion to Remand by City of Sacramento, People of the State of Calfornia. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Nath, Rohit) Modified on 10/9/2020 (Huang, H).
October 8, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Kevin James Minnick on behalf of CVS Health Corporation. Attorney Minnick, Kevin James added. (Minnick, Kevin)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 10/6/2020 ADDING attorney Connor B. O'Croinin, PHV for CVS Health Corporation. (Huang, H)
October 1, 2020 Filing 35 OPPOSITION by Walgreen Co. to #9 Motion to Remand. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles J. Stevens, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Stevens, Charles)
September 30, 2020 Filing 34 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Actavis, Inc. served on 8/31/2020 (Nath, Rohit) Modified on 10/1/2020 (Tupolo, A).
September 30, 2020 Filing 33 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: CVS Health Corporation; Cardinal Health, Inc. both served on 9/4/2020, answer due 9/25/2020. (Nath, Rohit) Modified on 10/1/2020 (Tupolo, A).
September 30, 2020 Filing 32 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Endo Health Solutions Inc. served on 9/1/2020, answer due 9/22/2020. (Nath, Rohit)
September 30, 2020 Filing 31 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Johnson & Johnson served on 8/25/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Nath, Rohit)
September 30, 2020 Filing 30 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation; Mallinckrodt LLC; McKesson Corporation; Rite Aid Corporation; SpecGx LLC; Thrifty Payless Inc. all served on 8/18/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Nath, Rohit) Modified on 10/1/2020 (Tupolo, A).
September 30, 2020 Filing 29 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Actavis LLC; Allergan Inc.; Allergan USA, Inc.; Cephalon, Inc.; Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.; Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.; Walgreen Co.; Watson Laboratories, Inc.; Watson Pharma Inc.; Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. all served on 8/11/2020, answer due 9/1/2020. (Nath, Rohit) Modified on 10/1/2020 (Tupolo, A).
September 30, 2020 Filing 28 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Bryant Ranch Prepack served on 8/6/2020, answer due 8/27/2020. (Nath, Rohit)
September 28, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Michael Kieran Nickolai Gervais on behalf of City of Sacramento, People of the State of Calfornia. Attorney Gervais, Michael Kieran Nickolai added. (Gervais, Michael)
September 28, 2020 Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the 10/29/2020 hearing on the Motion to Stay #22 is vacated and submitted without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the original motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. (Deutsch, S)
September 24, 2020 Filing 25 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by CVS Health Corporation for attorney Conor B. O'Croinin to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-9137958) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Spertus, James)
September 24, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by James Winston Spertus on behalf of CVS Health Corporation. Attorney Spertus, James Winston added. (Spertus, James)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 9/24/0202 GRANTING #18 Ex Parte Application for Reconsideration, and the expedited briefing schedule set forth in this Court's Minute Order [ 17 ] is VACATED. Defendants' Opposition to Motion to Remand is due by 10/1/2020, and Plaintiffs' Reply, if any, due by 10/8/2020. On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the 10/15/2020 hearing on the Motion to Remand is VACATED and SUBMITTED without appearance and argument. #7 (Reader, L)
September 22, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to STAY by Walgreen Co. Motion Hearing SET for 10/29/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Senior Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles J. Stevens, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10)(Stevens, Charles) Modified on 9/23/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
September 21, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY by Walgreen Co. re #18 Motion for Reconsideration,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles J. Stevens, #2 Exhibit 1)(Stevens, Charles)
September 21, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Melissa D. Bickel on behalf of City of Sacramento, People of the State of Calfornia. Attorney Bickel, Melissa D. added. (Bickel, Melissa)
September 21, 2020 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities by Plaintiffs to #18 Ex Parte Application for Reconsideration filed by Walgreen Co. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven G. Sklaver, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Nath, Rohit) Modified on 9/22/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
September 18, 2020 Filing 18 EX PARTE APPLICATION for RECONSIDERATION (#17) Order by Walgreen Co. for Reconsideration. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles J. Stevens, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Proposed Order)(Stevens, Charles)
September 17, 2020 Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for Expedited Briefing Schedule on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand #13 is GRANTED. Defendants' Opposition to the Motion to Remand shall be filed no later than Thursday, September 24, 2020, and Plaintiffs' Reply, if any, shall be filed no later than Monday, September 28, 2020. If necessary, a hearing to be conducted by videoconference will be set for Thursday, October 1, 2020, at 11:00 AM. After briefing is complete, a further order will issue advising the parties whether a hearing will be set. Given the hearing will be conducted by videoconference if needed, not later than seven (7) days prior to the hearing (or any continued hearing date where remote appearances will be necessary) the parties are directed to file with the Court: (1) a waiver of the appearing party's personal appearance signed by the party; and (2) a proposed order addressing the same. If the parties fail to timely comply with this order, the matter may be continued on the Court's own motion without further notice. (Deutsch, S)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 9/17/2020 ORDERING that Defendants McKesson Corporation; AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation; Cardinal Health, Inc.; Walgreen Co.; Allergan Finance, LLC; Allergan USA, Inc.; Allergan, Inc.; Allergan Limited; CVS Health Corporation; Endo Health Solutions Inc.; Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.; Johnson & Johnson; Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.; Mallinckrodt LLC; SpecGx LLC; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.; Cephalon, Inc.; Watson Laboratories, Inc.; Actavis LLC; Actavis Pharma, Inc.; Thrifty Payless, Inc.; Rite Aid Corporation; and Bryant Ranch Prepack, Inc. shall have until and including 11/16/2020 to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint. (Huang, H)
September 17, 2020 Filing 15 PROPOSED ORDER re #13 Ex Parte Application by City of Sacramento, People of the State of Calfornia. (Nath, Rohit) Modified on 9/17/2020 (Huang, H).
September 16, 2020 Filing 14 [DISREGARD, DUPLICATE FILING - See #13 Ex Parte Application] EX PARTE APPLICATION for an Expedited Briefing Schedule and Hearing on #9 Motion to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rohit D. Nath, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Nath, Rohit) Modified on 9/17/2020 (Huang, H).
September 16, 2020 Filing 13 EX PARTE APPLICATION for an Expedited Briefing Schedule and Hearing on #9 Motion to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rohit D. Nath, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Nath, Rohit) Modified on 9/17/2020 (Huang, H).
September 16, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Joel K. Liberson on behalf of City of Sacramento, People of the State of Calfornia. Attorney Liberson, Joel K. added. (Liberson, Joel)
September 16, 2020 Filing 11 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE in support of #9 Motion to Remand by City of Sacramento, People of the State of Calfornia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Nath, Rohit) Modified on 9/17/2020 (Huang, H).
September 15, 2020 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER re #9 Motion to Remand by City of Sacramento, People of the State of Calfornia. (Nath, Rohit) Modified on 9/16/2020 (Benson, A.).
September 15, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to REMAND by City of Sacramento, People of the State of Calfornia. Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Senior Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Nath, Rohit) Modified on 9/16/2020 (Huang, H).
September 15, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by McKesson, Cardinal Health, Inc. and AmerisourceBergen Drug Corp. Attorney Shafroth, Nathan added. (Shafroth, Nathan) Modified on 9/16/2020 (Benson, A.).
September 15, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Nathan Shafroth on behalf of McKesson Corporation. Attorney Shafroth, Nathan added. (Shafroth, Nathan)
September 15, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Rohit Dwarka Nath on behalf of City of Sacramento, People of the State of Calfornia. Attorney Nath, Rohit Dwarka added. (Nath, Rohit)
September 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Steven Gerald Sklaver on behalf of City of Sacramento, People of the State of Calfornia. (Sklaver, Steven)
September 10, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Walgreen Co. (Stevens, Charles)
September 10, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Walgreen Co. re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Civil New Case Documents for MCE. (Stevens, Charles)
September 10, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
September 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 34-2020-00279705-CU-FR-GDS by Walgreen Co. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9106468) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A (State Court Docket), #3 Exhibit B (Summons & Complaint))(Stevens, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Sacramento et al v. TEVA Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Rocky Chiu-feng Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Nathan Shafroth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo International PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Teresa Carey Chow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Charles J. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thrifty Payless Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryant Ranch Prepack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Steven James Boranian
Represented By: Eric John Buhr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Connor B. O'Croinin, PHV
Represented By: James Winston Spertus
Represented By: Kevin James Minnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGx LLC
Represented By: Rocky Chiu-feng Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: People of the State of Calfornia
Represented By: Susana Alcala Wood
Represented By: Steven Gerald Sklaver
Represented By: Melissa D. Bickel
Represented By: Michael Kieran Nickolai Gervais
Represented By: Joel K. Liberson
Represented By: Rohit Dwarka Nath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Sacramento
Represented By: Susana Alcala Wood
Represented By: Steven Gerald Sklaver
Represented By: Melissa D. Bickel
Represented By: Michael Kieran Nickolai Gervais
Represented By: Joel K. Liberson
Represented By: Rohit Dwarka Nath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?