(PC) Adams v. Wong et al
Plaintiff: Rineson Curtis Adams
Defendant: Wong, California Medical Facility, Smith and - Rector
Case Number: 2:2021cv01921
Filed: October 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2021 Filing 6 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 11/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Marrujo, C)
October 15, 2021 Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:21-cv-07602.
October 15, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Rineson Curtis Adams. (Marrujo, C)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE.. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/13/2021. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 10/15/2021.]
October 1, 2021 Corrected typo in plaintiff's address (from P.O. Box 32050 to P.O. Box 2000).(ljf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2021) [Transferred from cand on 10/15/2021.]
September 29, 2021 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 11/8/2021. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 10/15/2021.]
September 29, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Rineson Curtis Adams. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2021) [Transferred from cand on 10/15/2021.]
September 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against California Medical Facility, Rector, Smith, Wong filed byRineson Curtis Adams. (IFPP) (Attachments: #1 Letter from Clerk Returning Attempted Fee Payment)(bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2021) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/1/2021: #2 Envelope) (jmlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 10/15/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Adams v. Wong et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rineson Curtis Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Medical Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Rector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?