(PC) Hesse v. County of Sacramento et al
Plaintiff: Michael Hesse
Defendant: County of Sacramento, Phoebe Foo, Lynn Billett, Stephenye Burnett, Andrew Ho and Sonia Sanga
Case Number: 2:2021cv01931
Filed: October 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Lynn Billett, Stephenye Burnett, County of Sacramento, Phoebe Foo, Andrew Ho, Sonia Sanga. Attorney Longyear, Dayton Van Vranken added.(Longyear, Dayton)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/3/2021. Consent or Decline due by 12/6/2021 (Henshaw, R)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 [DISREGARD - CLERICAL ERROR] ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/3/2021. Consent or Decline due by 12/6/2021. (Henshaw, R) Modified on 11/3/2021 (Henshaw, R).
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Lynn Billett, Stephenye Burnett, County of Sacramento, Phoebe Foo, Andrew Ho, Sonia Sanga* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Kellan Steven Patterson* *Law Office of Kellan Patterson* *770 L Street; Suite 950* *Sacramento, CA 95814*. (Henshaw, R)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 [DISREGARD - CLERICAL ERROR] ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/3/2021 ORDERING Clerk to issue and send plaintiff 6 summons for defendants County of Sacramento, Phoebe Foo, Lynn Billett, Stephenye Burnett, Andrew Ho and Sonia Sanga along with 7 copies of the form Consent to Proceed Before United States Magistrate Judge with this order; ORDERING plaintiff to complete service of process on the defendants within 60 days from the date of this order; ORDERING defendants to reply to complaint within time frame provided in Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(a); and ORDERING plaintiff's status report to be filed within 90 days from the date of this order. (Henshaw, R) Modified on 11/3/2021 (Henshaw, R).
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/3/2021 ORDERING Clerk to issue and send plaintiff 6 summons for defendants County of Sacramento, Phoebe Foo, Lynn Billett, Stephenye Burnett, Andrew Ho and Sonia Sanga along with 7 copies of the form Consent to Proceed Before United States Magistrate Judge with this order; ORDERING plaintiff to complete service of process on the defendants within 60 days from the date of this order; ORDERING defendants to reply to complaint within time frame provided in Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(a); and ORDERING plaintiff's status report to be filed within 90 days from the date of this order. (Henshaw, R)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 11/22/2021 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Huang, H)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order [DISREGARD - Filed in Error] PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; (Huang, H) Modified on 10/18/2021 (Huang, H).
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Michael Hesse. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9875961) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Patterson, Kellan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Hesse v. County of Sacramento et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hesse
Represented By: Kellan Steven Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sacramento
Represented By: Dayton Van Vranken Longyear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoebe Foo
Represented By: Dayton Van Vranken Longyear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Billett
Represented By: Dayton Van Vranken Longyear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephenye Burnett
Represented By: Dayton Van Vranken Longyear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Ho
Represented By: Dayton Van Vranken Longyear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonia Sanga
Represented By: Dayton Van Vranken Longyear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?