ABOA, LLC v. Thomas
Plaintiff: ABOA, LLC
Defendant: Paul Thomas, Bill Harris, Kevin Strait, Anzen Legal Group, Mark Jenkins, Stacy Smith, Billy J. Harris and Bill Joe Harris
Case Number: 2:2022cv01381
Filed: August 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 REPLY by Anzen Legal Group, Kevin Strait re #10 Motion to Dismiss,. (Schweikert, Karl)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 REPLY BRIEF by Paul Thomas in SUPPORT of #14 Motion for Writ of Possession. (Schweikert, Karl) Modified on 9/26/2022 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/21/2022: In the interest of judicial economy and on the court's own motion, the Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2022 as to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. #10 , and the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 12/15/2022 are VACATED and RESET for 11/4/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. The parties shall submit, no later than 10/21/2022, a Joint Status Report that includes the Rule 26(f) discovery plan, with all names parties participating in the preparation and completion of the report. It is FURTHER ORDERED that a Motion Hearing as to Plaintiff's Motion, filed at ECF No. #15 , is SET for 11/4/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/21/2022: Defendants Mark Jenkins, Stacy Smith and Bill Harris are DISMISSED, without prejudice, as provided by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) and Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, ECF No. #13 . (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SUPPLEMENT by ABOA, LLC re #17 Reply. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Klein, Henry) Modified on 9/22/2022 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 REPLY by ABOA, LLC re #16 Opposition to Motion. (Klein, Henry)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 OPPOSITION by Anzen Legal Group, Kevin Strait, Paul Thomas to #15 Motion for Leave. (Schweikert, Karl) Modified on 9/12/2022 (Reader, L).
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to file pleadings without local counsel re #8 Order on Application for Pro Hac Vice, by ABOA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading)(Klein, Henry) Modified on 9/12/2022 (Reader, L).
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for WRIT of POSSESSION by Paul Thomas. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration)(Schweikert, Karl) Modified on 9/8/2022 (Coll, A).
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by ABOA, LLC. (Klein, Henry)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Klein, Henry)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Schweikert, Karl)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to DISMISS by Anzen Legal Group, Kevin Strait. Attorney Schweikert, Karl A. added. Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of K. Schweikert)(Schweikert, Karl) Modified on 9/6/2022 (Coll, A).
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ANSWER, COUNTERCLAIM against ABOA, LLC by Paul Thomas. Attorney Schweikert, Karl A. added. by Paul Thomas. Attorney Schweikert, Karl A. added.(Schweikert, Karl)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/18/2022 GRANTING #5 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Henry L. Klein, to appear for ABOA, LLC. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Reader, L)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Anzen Legal Group, Bill Harris, Mark Jenkins, Stacy Smith, Kevin Strait* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Daniel Sanders Linhardt* *Law Office of Daniel Linhardt* *791 W. View Ct.* *Diamond Springs, CA 95619*. (Rodriguez, E)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kevin Strait, Anzen Legal Group, Mark Jenkins, Stacy Smith, Billie Harris by ABOA, LLC.(Linhardt, Daniel)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order PAYMENT for #5 Pro Hac Vice Application in the amount of $ 225, receipt number ACAEDC-10376405. (Linhardt, Daniel)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by ABOA, LLC for attorney Hendry L. Klein to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Curriculum Vitae, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing)(Linhardt, Daniel) (Counsel notified to pay $225 fee) Modified on 8/9/2022 (Benson, A.).
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/15/2022 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Reader, L)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Paul Thomas* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Daniel S. Linhardt* *Attorney at Law* *791 W. View Court* *Diamond Springs, California 95619*. (Reader, L)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by ABOA, LLC (Linhardt, Daniel)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order RECEIPT number #CAE200122242 $402.00 fbo ABOA, LLC by Daniel Sanders Linhardt on 8/4/2022. (Kaminski, H)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Paul Thomas by ABOA, LLC. Attorney Linhardt, Daniel Sanders added. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E-mail Notice not to Commandeer Aircraft, #2 Exhibit B- Fraudulent Notice of Default)(Linhardt, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ABOA, LLC v. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABOA, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Sanders Linhardt
Represented By: Henry L. Klein, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Thomas
Represented By: Karl A. Schweikert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Strait
Represented By: Karl A. Schweikert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anzen Legal Group
Represented By: Karl A. Schweikert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacy Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy J. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Joe Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?