Alturas Indian Rancheria v. Newsom, et al
Plaintiff: Alturas Indian Rancheria
Defendant: Gavin Newsom and State of California
Case Number: 2:2022cv01486
Filed: August 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/13/2022 GRANTING #17 Stipulation for extension of time. The parties shall file their responsive pleading to the #1 Complaint on or before 11/14/2022. (Perdue, C.)
October 10, 2022 Filing 17 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension Date by Which Answer is Due re #1 Complaint, #16 Stipulation and Proposed Order by Gavin Newsom, State of California. (Crue, Beverly)
October 6, 2022 Filing 16 (DISREGARD; REFER TO CORRECTED FILING AT ECF NO. #17 ) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension Date by Which Answer is Due re #1 Complaint, by Gavin Newsom, State of California. Attorney Crue, Beverly Jane added. (Crue, Beverly) (Docket Text Modified on 10/11/2022 by C. Schultz)
September 20, 2022 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: State of California served on 9/19/2022, answer due 10/11/2022. (Peebles, John)
September 20, 2022 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Gavin Newsom served on 9/19/2022. (Peebles, John) Modified on 9/21/2022 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
September 6, 2022 Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/7/2022 at 10:00 AM in Redding (DMC) before Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota.(Skiles, K)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/2/2022 ORDERING this matter REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota for pretrial scheduling. Accordingly, the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 1/19/2023 before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller is VACATED, and will be reset by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. Plaintiff's shall serve a copy of this Minute Order on Defendants not yet appearing. (Text Only Entry)(Schultz, C)
August 24, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 1:19-cv-00024-AWI-SKO, 1:20-cv-01147-AWI-SKO, 1:20-cv-01318-AWI_SKO, 1:20-cv-01539-AWI-SKO, 1:20-cv-01585-AWI-SKO, 1:20-CV-01630-AWI-SKO, 1:20-cv-01918-AWI-SKO, 1:21-cv-00579-AWI-SKO, 1:21-cv-01166-AWI-SKO, 1:21-cv-01509-AWI-SKO, 2:21-cv-02284-AWI-SKO, 1:22-cv-000804-AWI-SKO by Alturas Indian Rancheria. (Peebles, John)
August 23, 2022 Filing 11 AMENDED CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/19/2023 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Donati, J)
August 23, 2022 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to the 4 Minute Order Reassigning Case, this action is Randomly REASSIGNED to District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller for all further proceedings. District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. is no longer associated with this case. The case number on all future filed documents shall be: 2:22-cv-1486 KJM DMC. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY)(Donati, J)
August 23, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Curtis Vandermolen on behalf of Alturas Indian Rancheria. Attorney Vandermolen, Curtis added. (Vandermolen, Curtis)
August 23, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Michael A. Robinson on behalf of Alturas Indian Rancheria. Attorney Robinson, Michael A. added. (Robinson, Michael)
August 23, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Steven John Bloxham on behalf of Alturas Indian Rancheria. Attorney Bloxham, Steven John added. (Bloxham, Steven)
August 23, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Timothy Joseph Hennessy on behalf of Alturas Indian Rancheria. Attorney Hennessy, Timothy Joseph added. (Hennessy, Timothy)
August 23, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Patrick R. Bergin on behalf of Alturas Indian Rancheria. Attorney Bergin, Patrick R. added. (Bergin, Patrick)
August 23, 2022 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to the senior status of District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., the Clerk's Office is directed to reassign this case to another district judge for all further proceedings. (Deutsch, S)
August 23, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Kaminski, H)
August 23, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Gavin Newsom, State of California* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John M. Peebles* *Peebles Kidder Bergin & Robinson LLP* *2020 L Street, Suite 250* *Sacramento, CA 95811*. (Kaminski, H)
August 22, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Alturas Indian Rancheria. Attorney Peebles, John M. added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10394297) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibits 1-30, #3 Exhibits 31-60, #4 Exhibits 61-109, #5 Exhibits 110-115, #6 Exhibits 116-126)(Peebles, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alturas Indian Rancheria v. Newsom, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alturas Indian Rancheria
Represented By: Curtis Vandermolen
Represented By: Michael A. Robinson
Represented By: Patrick R. Bergin
Represented By: Steven John Bloxham
Represented By: Timothy Joseph Hennessy
Represented By: John M. Peebles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gavin Newsom
Represented By: Beverly Jane Crue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Represented By: Beverly Jane Crue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?