(PC) Rojo v. Amador Jail et al
Plaintiff: Luis Alberto Meza Rojo
Defendant: Amador Jail, Martin and Jeremy Martin
Case Number: 2:2022cv02137
Filed: November 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Spichka, K.)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Luis Alberto Meza Rojo. (Perdue, C.)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order RE-SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Luis Alberto Meza Rojo. (Huang, H)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, NIC: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider sent to Luis Alberto Meza Rojo. Notice of Change of Address due by 2/20/2023. (Coll, A)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 12/7/2022 ORDERING that Plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, a completed affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided by the Clerk of Court. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to send plaintiff a new Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner. Plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, a certified copy of his inmate trust account statement for the 6-month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint. (Huang, H)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order and IFP Application served on Luis Alberto Meza Rojo. (Huang, H)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 1/5/2023. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Coll, A)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Luis Alberto Meza Rojo. (Coll, A)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Luis Alberto Meza Rojo. (Coll, A)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Luis Alberto Meza Rojo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Coll, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Rojo v. Amador Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Alberto Meza Rojo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amador Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?