(PC) Powell v. Andrus
Plaintiff: Darian Manuel Powell
Defendant: Andrus
Case Number: 2:2023cv00333
Filed: February 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REQUEST for conformed copy of the attached complaint, by Darian Manuel Powell. (Kastilahn, A) [Response Sent: As a one-time courtesy, a copy of #1 Complaint is enclosed.] Modified on 3/29/2023 (Huang, H).
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Darian Manuel Powell. (Spichka, K.)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a certified prison trust account statement for Darian Manuel Powell, CDCR No. G-63743 to the Clerk's Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The prison trust account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in.pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Text Only Entry) (Donati, J)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Alvarez, R.)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a certified prison trust account statement for Darian Manuel Powell, CDCR No. G-63743, to the Clerk's Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The prison trust account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Text Only Entry) (Huang, H)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *2/23/2023*. Consent or Decline due by 3/30/2023. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Alvarez, R.)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY EMAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Darian Manuel Powell. (Alvarez, R.)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Darian Manuel Powell. (Alvarez, R.)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Andrus by Darian Manuel Powell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Alvarez, R.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Powell v. Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darian Manuel Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?