(PC) Van Huisen v. Chief of Staff et al
Plaintiff: Gregory Scott Van Huisen
Defendant: Chief of Staff, Deputy Chief of Staff and Joseph R. Biden
Case Number: 2:2023cv02815
Filed: December 4, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SECOND AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Joseph R. Biden, Chief of Staff, Deputy Chief of Staff by Gregory Scott Van Huisen.(Lopez, K)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to STATE a Claim and REQUEST for RELIEF by Gregory Scott Van Huisen. (Lopez, K)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Dale A. Drozd and Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson. The new case number is: 2:23-cv-2815 DAD JDP (PC). (Lopez, K)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 10 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Gregory Scott Van Huisen. (Lopez, K)
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Lopez, K)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REQUEST FOR COPY of Local Rules by Gregory Scott Van Huisen. (Woodson, A) [Response sent w/ one-time courtesy copy of Local Rules.] Modified on 1/17/2024 (Spichka, K.).
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Allow Discrepancy Amended Complaint re #6 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint by Gregory Scott Van Huisen. (Murphy, J)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Joseph R. Biden, Chief of Staff, Deputy Chief of Staff by Gregory Scott Van Huisen.(Murphy, J)
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Allow Discrepancies to #1 Complaint, and REQUEST for jury trial by Gregory Scott Van Huisen. (Woodson, A) Modified on 12/19/2023 (Yin, K).
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Woodson, A)
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Gregory Scott Van Huisen. (Woodson, A)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *12/4/2023*. Consent or Decline due by 1/8/2024. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Nair, C)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY EMAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Gregory Scott Van Huisen. (Nair, C)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Joseph R. Biden, Chief of Staff, Deputy Chief of Staff by Gregory Scott Van Huisen.(Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Nair, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Van Huisen v. Chief of Staff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Scott Van Huisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief of Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Chief of Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph R. Biden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?