Duggan v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Christine A. Duggan
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 1:2009cv04514
Filed: March 11, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Eureka Office
Presiding Judge: Nandor J. Vadas
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Nandor J. Vadas Granting 15 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; Denying 18 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; and Finding as Moot 27 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2010)
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Requiring Defendant To File Exhibits Supporting 15 MOTION to Dismiss by April 5, 2010, and Requiring Plaintiff To File Opposition by April 12, 2010. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on March 31, 2010. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2010)
March 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Plaintiff to Respond to Defendant's 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction within 14 days. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 3/11/2010. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2010)
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Directing parties to confer regarding reassignment to Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on or before 01/15/10. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 1/4/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2010) Modified on 1/5/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duggan v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine A. Duggan
Represented By: Ian Michael Sammis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Represented By: Kathryn Reeves Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?