Sanchez v. City of Ukiah et al

Plaintiff: Daniel Sanchez
Defendant: City of Ukiah, City of Ukiah Police Department and Tyler James Schapmire
Case Number: 1:2015cv02921
Filed: June 23, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Mendocino
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 13, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING PENDING PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES AND DEADLINES. In the event a dismissal is not filed by November 18, 2016, the parties shall file, no later than that date, a joint status report to apprise the Court of the status of the settlement. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/13/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2016)
April 12, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 12, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2016)
September 28, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 9/28/15. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez v. City of Ukiah et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Ukiah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Ukiah Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler James Schapmire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Sanchez
Represented By: W. Christian Krankemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?