Madrid, et al v. Dept Of Corrections, et al
Plaintiff: Alejandro Madrid, Ronnie Dewberry, Carlos Lutz, Moses Johnson, Steven Villa and Bruce Vorse
Defendant: James Rowland, Charles D. Marshall, T. K. Boyll, Terry Peetz, Alex M. Astorga, Mark Bray, James Tilton, Robert Horel, Maureen McLean, Matthew Cate and Francisco Jacquez
Intervenor: Gregory Eugene Shock and California Correctional Peace Officers Association
Amicus: Amici Curiae
Special_master: John Hagar
3rd_party_defendant: Paul M. Starkey
Miscellaneous: Office of the Inspector General
Case Number: 3:1990cv03094
Filed: March 3, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2205 ORDER re: 2202 Notice of Related Case filed by Office of the Inspector General. The request to relate cases is denied. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/27/16. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2016)
August 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2201 ORDER re: pro se inmate filings. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/29/11. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2200 ORDER terminating force-related orders and dismissing case. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/21/11. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2199 ORDER Approving Corrected Billing Summary for the Court Expert Fees from January 28, 2011 - March 3, 2011 in the amount of $2135.06. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/16/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2011)
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2198 ORDER Approving Billing Summary for the Court's Expert for January 2011 - March 2011 in the amount of $2135.06. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/08/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2011)
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2193 ORDER setting hearing for 3/3/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/14/11. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2011)
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2190 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of the Court's Expert for November 2010 to January 2011 in the amount of $2994.39. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/01/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2011)
January 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2187 ORDER re: termination and dismissal. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/25/11. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2011)
December 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2185 ORDER to show cause. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/20/10. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2010)
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2184 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of Special Master for Sept. 1, 2010 to Oct. 31, 2010 in the amound of $5707.77. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/15/10. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2010)
October 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2183 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of Special Master for August 2010 in the amount of $1026.66. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/19/10. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2010) Modified on 10/20/2010 (tmi, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2180 STIPULATION AND ORDER Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 6/2/2010 Confirming Attorneys' Fees for First Quarter of 2010. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2010)
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2179 ORDER Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 4/21/2010 APPROVING Billings for the Special Master & the Court's Experts for November 2009 - March 2010.(tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2010)
March 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2178 STIPULATION AND ORDER Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 3/2/2010 Confirming Attorneys' Fees for Fourth Quarter of 2009. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2010)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2177 ORDER Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 1/14/2010 APPROVING Special Master & the Court's Experts for November 2009 in the amount of $3,318.68.(tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2010)
November 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2176 STIPULATION AND ORDER Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/6/2009 Confirming Attorney's Fees for Third Quarter of 2009. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2009)
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2174 ORDER Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 9/29/2009 APPROVING billings for the Special Master & the Court's Experts for July 2009 in the amount of $3,136.45. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2009)
August 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2173 STIPULATION AND ORDER Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 8/13/2009 Confirming Attorneys' Fees for Second Quarter of 2009. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2009)
May 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2171 STIPULATION AND ORDER confirming attorneys' fees for first quarter of 2009. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/18/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2009)
October 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2163 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to file objections to special master's report. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/29/08. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Madrid, et al v. Dept Of Corrections, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandro Madrid
Represented By: Steven Fama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Dewberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Lutz
Represented By: Steven Fama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moses Johnson
Represented By: Steven Fama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Villa
Represented By: Steven Fama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Vorse
Represented By: Steven Fama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles D. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. K. Boyll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Peetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Astorga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Bray
Represented By: Mike Jorgenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Tilton
Represented By: Emily L. Brinkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Horel
Represented By: Emily L. Brinkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maureen McLean
Represented By: Emily L. Brinkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Cate
Represented By: Emily L. Brinkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francisco Jacquez
Represented By: Emily L. Brinkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Gregory Eugene Shock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: California Correctional Peace Officers Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Amici Curiae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special_master: John Hagar
Represented By: John Hagar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Paul M. Starkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Office of the Inspector General
Represented By: Tamara Michelle Colson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?