Natural Resources Defense Council Inc. et al v. Evans

Plaintiff: Natural Resources Defense Council Inc. and Pacific Marine Conservation Council, Inc.
Defendant: Donald Evans, National Marine Fisheries Service and National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration
Amicus: James P. Walsh
Intervenor: West Coast Seafood Processors Association and Makah Indian Tribe
Case Number: 3:2001cv00421
Filed: January 6, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4321 Review of Agency Action-Environment

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 5, 2011 370 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 342 Order, 340 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, 260 Amended Complaint filed by Natural Resources Defense Council Inc., JUDGMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge JAMES LARSON on 5/4/11. (bjtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2011)
November 5, 2010 359 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 355 Related Case. Signed by Judge James Larson on 11/2/10. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2010) Modified on 11/5/2010 (ga, COURT STAFF).
September 20, 2010 351 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR BRIEFING re 350 Stipulation, filed by Natural Resources Defense Council Inc. Signed by Judge James Larson on 9/20/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
May 5, 2010 344 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SPECIFYING TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO APPLY FOR ATTORNEY FEES re 343 Stipulation, filed by Natural Resources Defense Council Inc., Donald Evans, National Marine Fisheries Service, National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration. Signed by Judge James Larson on 5/5/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2010)
April 29, 2010 342 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON REMEDY re 341 Proposed Order filed by Natural Resources Defense Council Inc. Signed by Judge James Larson on 4/29/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2010)
January 6, 2010 336 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO TAKE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE OFF CALENDAR re 334 Notice (Other) filed by Donald Evans, National Marine Fisheries Service, National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/6/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2010)
October 1, 2009 324 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 320 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed by Donald Evans, National Marine Fisheries Service, National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 10/1/09. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2009)
April 20, 2009 273 Opinion or Order of the Court BRIEFING SCHEDULING ORDER re 270 Stipulation, filed by Natural Resources Defense Council Inc., Donald Evans, National Marine Fisheries Service, National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration. Signed by Judge James Larson on 4/20/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2009)
April 9, 2009 268 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE SETTLEMENT REFERRAL re 267 Order,. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/9/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2009)
April 8, 2009 267 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE re 266 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed by Natural Resources Defense Council Inc., Donald Evans, National Marine Fisheries Service, National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration. Signed by Judge James Larson on 4/8/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2009)
March 17, 2009 251 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON STIPULATED REQUEST TO SHORTEN TIME. Signed by Judge James Larson on 3/17/09. (wh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2009)
November 26, 2008 249 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 248 Stipulation, filed by Natural Resources Defense Council Inc., Donald Evans, National Marine Fisheries Service, National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration. Signed by Judge James Larson on 11/26/08. (wh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Natural Resources Defense Council Inc. et al v. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natural Resources Defense Council Inc.
Represented By: Eric A. Bilsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific Marine Conservation Council, Inc.
Represented By: Eric A. Bilsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Evans
Represented By: Kristen Byrnes Floom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Marine Fisheries Service
Represented By: Kristen Byrnes Floom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration
Represented By: Kristen Byrnes Floom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: James P. Walsh
Represented By: James Patrick Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: West Coast Seafood Processors Association
Represented By: Gwendolyn L. Fanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Makah Indian Tribe
Represented By: John Briscoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?