Center for Biological Diversity v. Whitman et al

Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Defendant: Christie Whitman and Wayne Nastri
Amicus: Oregonians for Food and Shelter, American Forest and Paper Association, Croplife America, California Plant Health Association, Western Plant Health Association, et al., Syngenta Crop Protection, Inc. and Western Plant Health Association
Intervenor_dft: Syngenta Crop Protection, Inc., American Forest & Paper Association, CropLife America, Oregonians for Food and Shelter and Western Plant Health Association
Case Number: 3:2002cv01580
Filed: April 2, 2002
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Referring Judge: Maria-Elena James
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16:1538
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 4, 2013 273 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED SETTLEMENT AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/4/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2013)
July 10, 2013 267 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 265 MOTION to Appear by Telephone; GRANTING Motion for Andrea Morgan to personally appear.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/10/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2013)
December 8, 2011 254 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER GRANTING (11 in 3:11-cv-05108-JSW) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/8/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2011)
December 7, 2011 253 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/7/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2011)
November 2, 2011 252 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RELATING CASE NO.: C-11-5108 NC and NOT RELATING Case No.: C-07-2794 JCS and Case No.: C-11-293 JCS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/2/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2011) Modified on 11/2/2011 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Biological Diversity v. Whitman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Justin Augustine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christie Whitman
Represented By: James A. Coda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Nastri
Represented By: James A. Coda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Oregonians for Food and Shelter
Represented By: J. Michael Klise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: American Forest and Paper Association
Represented By: J. Michael Klise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Croplife America
Represented By: J. Michael Klise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: California Plant Health Association
Represented By: J. Michael Klise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Western Plant Health Association, et al.
Represented By: J. Michael Klise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Syngenta Crop Protection, Inc.
Represented By: Janice M. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Western Plant Health Association
Represented By: J. Michael Klise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Syngenta Crop Protection, Inc.
Represented By: Louis Golden Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: American Forest & Paper Association
Represented By: J. Michael Klise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: CropLife America
Represented By: J. Michael Klise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Oregonians for Food and Shelter
Represented By: J. Michael Klise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Western Plant Health Association
Represented By: J. Michael Klise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?