Center For Biological Diversity et al v. Bureau of Land Management et al

Plaintiff: Center For Biological Diversity, Sierra Club, Public Employees for Environmental Responsibility and Desert Survivors
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management and United States Fish & Wildlife Service
Movant: BlueRibbon Coalition, California Association of 4 Wheel Drive Clubs, San Diego Off Road Coalition, Desert Vipers Motorcycle Club, High Desert Multiple Use Coalition, American Motorcycle Association District 37, Off-Road Business Association, California Off-Road Vehicle Association and American Sand Association
Case Number: 3:2003cv02509
Filed: May 28, 2003
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 15, 2014 246 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
April 3, 2014 243 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 231 232 234 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/3/2014)
October 28, 2013 222 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FEDERAL DEFENDANTS NOTICEOF RESTORATION OF APPROPRIATIONS AND UPDATED SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 10/24/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
August 6, 2013 214 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRATING: 213 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS filed by American Sand Association, Bureau of Land Management, United States Fish & Wildlife Service, California Association of 4 Wheel Drive Cl ubs, Desert Vipers Motorcycle Club, California Off-Road Vehicle Association, Desert Survivors, Sierra Club, Center For Biological Diversity, American Motorcycle Association District 37, San Diego Off Road Coalition, Public Employees f or Environmental Responsibility, Off-Road Business Association, BlueRibbon Coalition, High Desert Multiple Use Coalition. Motion Hearing set for 1/31/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 8/5/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center For Biological Diversity et al v. Bureau of Land Management et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center For Biological Diversity
Represented By: Lisa T. Belenky
Represented By: Brendan R. Cummings
Represented By: Deborah Ann Sivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Brendan R. Cummings
Represented By: Deborah Ann Sivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Public Employees for Environmental Responsibility
Represented By: Brendan R. Cummings
Represented By: Deborah Ann Sivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desert Survivors
Represented By: Brendan R. Cummings
Represented By: Deborah Ann Sivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: Michael Richard Eitel
Represented By: Kevin William McArdle
Represented By: Lisa Lynne Russell
Represented By: Ayako Sato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fish & Wildlife Service
Represented By: Michael Richard Eitel
Represented By: Kevin William McArdle
Represented By: Lisa Lynne Russell
Represented By: Ayako Sato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: BlueRibbon Coalition
Represented By: Paul Andrew Turcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: California Association of 4 Wheel Drive Clubs
Represented By: Paul Andrew Turcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: San Diego Off Road Coalition
Represented By: Paul Andrew Turcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Desert Vipers Motorcycle Club
Represented By: Paul Andrew Turcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: High Desert Multiple Use Coalition
Represented By: Paul Andrew Turcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: American Motorcycle Association District 37
Represented By: David P. Hubbard, Esq.
Represented By: Paul Andrew Turcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Off-Road Business Association
Represented By: Paul Andrew Turcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: California Off-Road Vehicle Association
Represented By: Paul Andrew Turcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: American Sand Association
Represented By: David P. Hubbard, Esq.
Represented By: Paul Andrew Turcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?