SPPI-Somersville, Inc. et al v. TRC Companies, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: SPPI-Somersville, Inc., Somersville-Gentry Inc. and West Coast Home Builders, Inc.
Defendant: TRC Companies, Inc., GBF Holdings LLC, Contra Costa Waste Service, Inc., Estate of Silvio Garaventa, Sr., Mary C. Garaventa, Silvio Garaventa, Jr., Pittsburg Disposal & Debris Box Service, Inc., Harold William Prewett, Mary Grace Prewett Bertsch, Ashland Inc., Aventis Cropscience USA Inc., Beazer East, Inc., Boeing Satellite Systems, Inc., Caterpillar Inc., Colgate-Palmolive Company, Cooper Industries, Inc., Crompton Corporation, Crown Beverage Packaging, Inc., The Dow Chemical Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Gaylord Container Corporation, Great Western Chemical Comapny, Hewlett Packard Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Nestle USA Inc., Occidental Chemical Corporation, Ocean View Capital, Inc., Paccar, Inc., Pro Tec Chemical Co., Inc., Quebecor Printing San Jose, Inc., Raychem International Corporation, Shell Oil Company, Shuller International, Inc., Henry Simonsen, Union Oil Company of California, Union Pacific Railroad Company, USX Corporation, Witco Corporation, United States Department of the Army, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of the Navy, City of Pittsburg and J&G Disposal
3rd_party_plaintiff: Chevron U.S.A., Inc.
3rd_party_defendant: City of Antioch
Case Number: 3:2004cv02648
Filed: October 7, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:9607 Real Property Tort to Land

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2010 734 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2010)
October 7, 2009 718 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing claim between plaintiff and Chevron (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2009)
September 29, 2009 713 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: dismissal of Antioch (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2009)
September 28, 2009 711 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER
September 24, 2009 707 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Continuing Nuisance & Trespass Claims (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2009)
September 22, 2009 699 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: ANTIOCH SETTLEMENT. (should be document #624) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2009)
September 17, 2009 629 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Settlement (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2009)
August 21, 2009 517 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS re 348 , 351 , 353 , 355 , 357 , 359 , 378 , 381 , 386 , 394 . (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2009)
August 19, 2009 506 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: FURTHER BRIEFING/QUESTIONS ON RCRA CLAIM (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2009)
July 2, 2009 321 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2009)
May 12, 2009 264 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Regarding Authenticity Discovery. Signed by Judge Illston on 5/11/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2009)
April 15, 2009 261 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: DISCOVERY MOTIONS (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2009)
April 13, 2009 259 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT CITY OF ANTIOCH'S MOTION TO COMPEL re 253 (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2009)
April 1, 2009 249 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: pleadings. Signed by Judge Illston on 3/31/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2009)
February 3, 2009 227 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adjusting litigation schedule. See order for details. Signed by Judge Illston on 2/2/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2009)
February 5, 2008 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 128 . Signed by Judge Illston on 2/4/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SPPI-Somersville, Inc. et al v. TRC Companies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SPPI-Somersville, Inc.
Represented By: Lee A. Archer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Somersville-Gentry Inc.
Represented By: Lee A. Archer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Coast Home Builders, Inc.
Represented By: James H. Colopy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRC Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Thomas Broderick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GBF Holdings LLC
Represented By: Gregory Thomas Broderick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contra Costa Waste Service, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Blaise Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Silvio Garaventa, Sr.
Represented By: Joseph Blaise Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary C. Garaventa
Represented By: Joseph Blaise Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silvio Garaventa, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph Blaise Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pittsburg Disposal & Debris Box Service, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Blaise Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold William Prewett
Represented By: Gregory Thomas Broderick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Grace Prewett Bertsch
Represented By: Gregory Thomas Broderick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashland Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Thomas Broderick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aventis Cropscience USA Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Thomas Broderick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beazer East, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Thomas Broderick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boeing Satellite Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Thomas Broderick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Thomas Broderick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colgate-Palmolive Company
Represented By: Gregory Thomas Broderick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Thomas Broderick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crompton Corporation
Represented By: Gregory Thomas Broderick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Beverage Packaging, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Thomas Broderick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dow Chemical Company
Represented By: Gregory Thomas Broderick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company
Represented By: Gregory Thomas Broderick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxon Mobil Corporation
Represented By: Gregory Thomas Broderick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation
Represented By: Gregory Thomas Broderick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaylord Container Corporation
Represented By: Gregory Thomas Broderick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Western Chemical Comapny
Represented By: Gregory Thomas Broderick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hewlett Packard Company
Represented By: Gregory Thomas Broderick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation
Represented By: Gregory Thomas Broderick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nestle USA Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Thomas Broderick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Occidental Chemical Corporation
Represented By: Gregory Thomas Broderick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean View Capital, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Thomas Broderick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paccar, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Thomas Broderick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pro Tec Chemical Co., Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Thomas Broderick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quebecor Printing San Jose, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Thomas Broderick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raychem International Corporation
Represented By: Gregory Thomas Broderick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Company
Represented By: Gregory Thomas Broderick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shuller International, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Thomas Broderick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Simonsen
Represented By: Gregory Thomas Broderick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Oil Company of California
Represented By: Gregory Thomas Broderick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Gregory Thomas Broderick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USX Corporation
Represented By: Gregory Thomas Broderick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Witco Corporation
Represented By: Gregory Thomas Broderick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Army
Represented By: Gregory Thomas Broderick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Defense
Represented By: Gregory Thomas Broderick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Navy
Represented By: Leslie M. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Pittsburg
Represented By: Joseph Blaise Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J&G Disposal
Represented By: Andrew L. Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_plaintiff: Chevron U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Blaine I. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: City of Antioch
Represented By: Gregory Thomas Broderick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?