Hunter v. Ohio Indemnity Company et al
Case Number: 3:2006cv03524
Filed: June 1, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER GRANTING 154 Stipulation Dismissing Action. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/19/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
September 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER of Referral. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 18, 2008. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2008)
September 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 133 STIPULATION FOR ONE DAY EXTENSION TO SUBMIT PRE-TRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/16/2008. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter v. Ohio Indemnity Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?