Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc. et al v. Bush et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Wendell Belew, Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc. and Asim Ghafoor
Defendant: Robert W. Werner, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Keith B. Alexander, National Security Agency, George W. Bush, Federal Bureau of Investigation and Robert S. Mueller, III
Case Number: 3:2007cv00109
Filed: January 9, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Vaughn R. Walker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 22, 2010 135 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees and Costs in favor of Asim Ghafoor, Wendell Belew against Adam J Szubin, Barack Obama, Keith B. Alexander, Robert S. Mueller, III. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED AS FOLLOWS: 1.Plaintiffs Ghafoor and Belew shall each recover a total sum of $20,400 in liquidated damages from defendants in their official capacities Barack H Obama, President of the United States; Keith B Alexander, the Director of the National Security Agency; Adam J Szubin, the Director of the Office of Foreign Assets Control; and Robert S Mueller III, the Director of the Federal Bureau of Investigation; and, 2.Plaintiffs Ghafoor and Belew and their counsel shall recover a total sum of $2,515,387.09 in attorney fees and $22,012.36 in expenses from defendants in their official capacities Barack H Obama, President of the United States; Keith B Alexander, the Director of the National Security Agency; Adam J Szubin, the Director of the Office of Foreign Assets Control; and Robert S Mueller III, the Director of the Federal Bureau of Investigation. Dated: December 22, 2010. Cora Klein, Deputy ClerkChief Judge Vaughn R Walker. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2010)
December 21, 2010 134 Featured Case ORDER granting 116 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 128 Motion for Attorney Fees. The clerk is directed to enter judgment, terminate any remaining motions and close the file. (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2010)
November 23, 2010 133 NOTICE by Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc., Wendell Belew, Asim Ghafoor (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit No. 1 to Notice of Submission to U.S. Supreme court)(Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 11/23/2010)
August 12, 2010 132 Reply to Opposition filed byAl-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc., Wendell Belew, Asim Ghafoor. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Supplemental Declaration of Thomas H. Nelson in Support of Motion for Attorney's Fees)(Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 8/12/2010)
August 5, 2010 131 Memorandum in Opposition re 128 MOTION for Attorney Fees Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorney's Fees filed byKeith B. Alexander, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert S. Mueller, III, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Adam J Szubin. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Appendix, # 3 Appendix, # 4 Appendix, # 5 Appendix, # 6 Appendix, # 7 Appendix)(Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 8/5/2010)
August 2, 2010 130 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 129 . Pursuant to the foregoing stipulation, it is hereby ORDERED that the due date for Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorney Fees (Dkts 738/128) shall be extended from August 4, 2010 to August 5, 2010. No further extensions should be sought as none will be granted, filed by Office of Foreign Assets Control, Robert S. Mueller, III, Barack Obama, Keith B. Alexander, Adam J Szubin, Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Security Agency. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 8/2/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
July 30, 2010 129 STIPULATION for One Day Extension of Time for Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorney Fees by Keith B. Alexander, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert S. Mueller, III, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Adam J Szubin. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 7/30/2010)
July 7, 2010 128 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc., Wendell Belew, Asim Ghafoor. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of William N. Hancock, # 2 Declaration of J. Ashlee Albies, # 3 Declaration of Jon B. Eisenberg, # 4 Declaration of Kenneth A. Kreucher, # 5 Declaration of Lisa Jaskol, # 6 Declaration of Steven Goldberg, # 7 Declaration of Thomas H. Nelson, # 8 Declaration of Zaha S. Hassan, # 9 Certificate of Service)(Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 7/7/2010)
June 15, 2010 127 Featured Case ORDER on Stipulation. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 6/15/2010. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2010)
June 14, 2010 126 STIPULATION and REQUEST for Extension of Schedule for Briefing Attorney Fees and Proposed Order re 124 by Keith B. Alexander, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert S. Mueller, III, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Adam J Szubin. (Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 6/14/2010) Modified on 6/15/2010 (far, COURT STAFF).
June 11, 2010 125 CLERKS NOTICE Advising Counsel of Change in MDL Master Case Number Format (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2010)
June 4, 2010 124 Featured Case ORDER setting briefing on plaintiffs' fee application. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 6/4/2010. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
May 21, 2010 123 Memorandum in Opposition Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Request for Punitive Damages filed byKeith B. Alexander, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert S. Mueller, III, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Adam J Szubin. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 5/21/2010)
May 7, 2010 122 Brief Correction of Docket # 121 filed byAl-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc., Wendell Belew, Asim Ghafoor. (Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 5/7/2010)
May 7, 2010 121 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT 122 . *** Brief Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points Authorities in Support of Claim for Punitive Damages filed byAl-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc., Wendell Belew, Asim Ghafoor. (Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 5/7/2010) Modified on 5/7/2010 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2010 120 Letter from Jon B. Eisenberg, Esq.. (Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 5/7/2010)
April 30, 2010 119 Memorandum in Opposition Government Defendants' Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Proposed Judgment and Re: Alternative Form of Judgment; Accompanying Alternative Form of Judgment filed byKeith B. Alexander, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert S. Mueller, III, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Adam J Szubin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 4/30/2010)
April 19, 2010 118 Featured Case ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Vaughn R. Walker on 4/19/2010. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 16, 2010 117 Proposed Order Plaintiffs' Proposed Judgment by Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc., Wendell Belew, Asim Ghafoor. (Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 4/16/2010)
April 16, 2010 116 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Request for Dismissal of Second, Third, Fourth, Fifth, and Sixth Claims for Relief filed by Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc., Wendell Belew, Asim Ghafoor. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Proof Of Service)(Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 4/16/2010)
March 31, 2010 115 Featured Case ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker granting (657) Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (668) Defendants' Fourth Motion to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment in MDL Docket M:06-cv-01791-VRW; granting (99) Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (103) Defendants' Fourth Motion to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment in case 3:07-cv-00109-VRW (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2010)
February 22, 2010 114 Amended Transcript of Proceedings held on 09/23/09, before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber James Yeomans, Telephone number (415) 863-5179. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/24/2010. (jjy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
December 11, 2009 113 Featured Case ORDER of USCA (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
November 23, 2009 112 NOTICE by Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc., Wendell Belew, Asim Ghafoor Plaintiffs' Notice of Submission to United States District Court for the District of Columbia (Reply Memorandum) (Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 11/23/2009)
November 23, 2009 111 NOTICE by Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc., Wendell Belew, Asim Ghafoor Plaintiffs' Notice of Order by Court of Appeals (Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 11/23/2009)
November 11, 2009 110 NOTICE by Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc., Wendell Belew, Asim Ghafoor Plaintiffs' Notice of Submission to the United States District Court for the District of Columbia (Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 11/11/2009)
November 11, 2009 109 NOTICE by Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc., Wendell Belew, Asim Ghafoor Plaintiffs' Notice of Submission to Court of Appeals (Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 11/11/2009)
November 10, 2009 108 NOTICE by Keith B. Alexander, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert S. Mueller, III, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Adam J Szubin Government Defendants' Notice of Submission to Court of Appeals (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 11/10/2009)
October 6, 2009 107 Transcript of Proceedings held on 092309, before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber James Yeomans, Telephone number (415) 863-5179. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/4/2010. (jjy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2009)
September 23, 2009 106 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 9/23/2009 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker (Date Filed: 9/23/2009) re 103 Fourth MOTION for Summary Judgment by Government Defendants, the court submitted the matter. (Court Reporter Jim Yeomans.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/23/2009)
September 14, 2009 105 Reply Memorandum re 103 Fourth MOTION for Summary Judgment Government Defendants Notice of Motion and Fourth Motion to Dismiss and For Summary Judgment; Memorandum in Support Thereof and in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byKeith B. Alexander, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert S. Mueller, III, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Adam J Szubin. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Berman, Marcia) (Filed on 9/14/2009)
September 8, 2009 104 Reply to Opposition Plaintiffs' Reply to Government Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Plaintiffs' Opposition to 103 Government Defendants' Fourth Motion to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment filed byAl-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Supplemental Declaration, # 2 Exhibit CC, # 3 Exhibit DD, # 4 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 9/8/2009) Modified on 9/10/2009 (ys, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2009 103 Fourth MOTION for Summary Judgment Government Defendants Notice of Motion and Fourth Motion to Dismiss and For Summary Judgment; Memorandum in Support Thereof and in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Keith B. Alexander, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert S. Mueller, III, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Adam J Szubin. Motion Hearing set for 9/23/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 8/20/2009)
August 3, 2009 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing reset for 9/23/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2009)
August 3, 2009 101 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER (as modified) re doc 100 . The Government Defendants response to the partial motion for summary judgment is due on 8/20/2009. Reply due 9/8/2009. The matter will be heard on Wednesday, 9/23/2009 at 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 8/3/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2009) .
July 31, 2009 102 ERRONEOUS DOCKET ENTRY - Please ignoreNOTICE OF APPEAL. Filing fee $ 455. (Attachments: # 1 2nd part of Notice of Appeal)(gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2009) Modified on 8/7/2009 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2009 100 STIPULATION re 99 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Stipulation and Proposed Order to Modify and Extend the Current Schedule by Keith B. Alexander, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert S. Mueller, III, National Security Agency, Barack Obama, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Adam J Szubin. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 7/31/2009)
July 9, 2009 99 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc., Wendell Belew, Asim Ghafoor. Motion Hearing set for 9/1/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Eisenberg Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits A-I, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits J-S, # 4 Exhibit Exhibits T-Z, # 5 Exhibit Exhibits AA-BB, # 6 Affidavit Ghafoor Declaration, # 7 Affidavit Belew Declaration, # 8 Affidavit Proof of Service)(Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 7/9/2009)
July 2, 2009 98 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re doc 97 in C07-0109 filed by Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc. as follows: 7/10 - plaintiff file motion. 8/5 - file opposition. 8/19 - file reply. Page limit for the motion and opposition has been enlarged to 35 pages. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 7/2/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2009)
June 16, 2009 97 STIPULATION and Request for Briefing Schedule and Extended Page Limits on Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc.. (Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 6/16/2009)
June 5, 2009 96 Featured Case ORDER. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 6-5-2009. (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2009)
June 3, 2009 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 9/1/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2009)
June 3, 2009 95 Minute Entry: Show Cause Hearing. The Court heard argument from counsel. Plaintiff shall file a motion for summary judgment.Hearing is set for 9/1/09 at 10:00 am. (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/3/2009)
June 1, 2009 94 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 92 Motion to Appear by Telephone (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2009)
May 29, 2009 93 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Adam J Szubin, Barack Obama, National Security Agency, Keith B. Alexander, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert S. Mueller, III Government Defendants' Response to Court's Order to Show Cause of May 22, 2009 (Dkts. 620/90). (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
May 29, 2009 92 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/3/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
May 29, 2009 91 Brief Plaintiffs Memorandum Addressing Appropriateness and Feasibility of Motion by Plaintiffs for Summary Judgment of Liability Under 50 U.S.C. 1810 filed byAl-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc.. (Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
May 22, 2009 90 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 6/3/2009 02:00 PM. Show Cause Response due by 5/29/2009. Plaintiffs' memorandum due 5/29/2009. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 5/22/2009. (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2009)
May 15, 2009 89 RESPONSE to Plaintiffs and Government Defendants Joint Submission in Response to 84 Court's April 17, 2009 Order by Adam J Szubin, Barack Obama, National Security Agency, Keith B. Alexander, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert S. Mueller, III. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 5/15/2009) Modified on 5/18/2009 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2009 88 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER approving 87 Stipulation, filed by Office of Foreign Assets Control, Robert S. Mueller, III, Barack Obama, Keith B. Alexander, Adam J Szubin, Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Security Agency. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 5/1/2009. (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2009)
April 30, 2009 87 STIPULATION to Extend Time in Response to April 17 Order by Adam J Szubin, Barack Obama, National Security Agency, Keith B. Alexander, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert S. Mueller, III. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 4/30/2009)
April 24, 2009 86 CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2009)
April 23, 2009 85 USCA Mandate re 59 Notice of Appeal. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2009)
April 20, 2009 84 Featured Case ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO SUBMIT A STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER ON OR BEFORE MAY 8, 2009. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 4/17/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2009)
March 3, 2009 83 USCA ORDER re 59 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. The government's appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2009)
February 27, 2009 82 NOTICE by Adam J Szubin, Barack Obama, National Security Agency, Keith B. Alexander, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert S. Mueller, III Government Defendants' Notice of Lodging of In Camera, Ex Parte Classified Declaration of Andrea M. Gacki, Department of the Treasury (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 2/27/2009)
February 27, 2009 81 NOTICE by Adam J Szubin, Barack Obama, National Security Agency, Keith B. Alexander, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert S. Mueller, III Government Defendants' Notice of Lodging of In Camera, Ex Parte Classified Declaration of Anthony J. Coppolino, Department of Justice (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 2/27/2009)
February 27, 2009 80 NOTICE by Adam J Szubin, Barack Obama, National Security Agency, Keith B. Alexander, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert S. Mueller, III Government Defendants' Notice of Lodging of In Camera, Ex Parte Classified Declaration of John F. Hackett, Office of the Director of National Intelligence (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 2/27/2009)
February 27, 2009 79 NOTICE by Adam J Szubin, Barack Obama, National Security Agency, Keith B. Alexander, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert S. Mueller, III Government Defendants' Notice of Lodging of In Camera, Ex Parte Classified Declaration of Joseph J. Brand, National Security Agency (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 2/27/2009)
February 27, 2009 78 Brief Government Defendants' Report on Declassification Review filed byAdam J Szubin, Barack Obama, National Security Agency, Keith B. Alexander, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert S. Mueller, III. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Joseph J. Brand, National Security Agency, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of John F. Hackett, Office of the Director of National Intelligence)(Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 2/27/2009)
February 27, 2009 77 Brief Government Defendants' Response to Court Orders Concerning Compliance with the January 5 Order (Dkt. 71) and Response to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Case Management Report (Dkt. 75) filed byAdam J Szubin, Barack Obama, National Security Agency, Keith B. Alexander, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert S. Mueller, III. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 2/27/2009)
February 20, 2009 76 Featured Case ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 74 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Government Defendants' unopposed motion for an extension of time to submit a report on the declassification review previously ordered by the Court, Order dated 1/5/2009, shall be and hereby is GRANTED, and the required report shall be due by no later than 2/27/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2009)
February 19, 2009 75 Featured Case ORDER. In its submission to the court re 71 Order on Motion to Stay, the United States is directed to address points made in plaintiffs supplemental case management statement filed on February 18, 2009 (Doc #72). Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 2/19/09. (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2009)
February 19, 2009 74 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Government Defendants' Unopposed Administrative Motion to Extend Time to Submit Report on Declassification Review filed by Adam J Szubin, Barack Obama, National Security Agency, Keith B. Alexander, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert S. Mueller, III. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 2/19/2009)
February 18, 2009 72 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Plaintiffs' Supplemental Case Management Statement filed by Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc.. (Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 2/18/2009)
February 13, 2009 73 USCA Case Number 09-15266 (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2009)
February 13, 2009 71 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker denying 60 motion to certify interlocutory appeal pursuant to 29 USC § 1292(b) and motion to stay proceedings. (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2009)
February 11, 2009 70 Reply to Opposition re 60 MOTION to Stay re 59 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Notice of Motion and Motion for a Stay Pending Appeal and for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal MOTION to Stay re 59 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Notice of Motion and Motion for a Stay Pending Appeal and for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal Government Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal and for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) filed byAdam J Szubin, Barack Obama, National Security Agency, Keith B. Alexander, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert S. Mueller, III. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 2/11/2009)
February 6, 2009 69 MEMORANDUM in Opposition Plaintiffs' Opposition to 60 Defendants' Motion for Stay Pending Appeal and for Certification of an Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b) filed byAl-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc.. (Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 2/6/2009) Modified on 2/9/2009 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2009 67 Transcript of Proceedings held on 01/23/2009, before Judge Vaughn R, Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia R. Zinn, Telephone number 415 531 6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/22/2009. (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 1/25/2009)
January 23, 2009 68 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference and setting of briefing on govts request for certification re Section 1292(b) interlocutory appeal held on 1/23/2009 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker (Date Filed: 1/23/2009). (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/23/2009)
January 22, 2009 66 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Corrected) filed by Barack Obama, Adam J Szubin, National Security Agency, Keith B. Alexander, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert S. Mueller, III. (Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 1/22/2009)
January 22, 2009 65 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Adam J Szubin, George W. Bush, National Security Agency, Keith B. Alexander, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert S. Mueller, III. (Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 1/22/2009)
January 20, 2009 64 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc.. (Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 1/20/2009)
January 20, 2009 63 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 64 . *** CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc.. (Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 1/20/2009) Modified on 1/21/2009 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
January 20, 2009 62 **** ERRONEOUS DOCKET ENTRY **** Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 59 (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2009) (gsa, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/20/2009 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
January 20, 2009 **** ERRONEOUS DOCKET ENTRY ****Copy of Notice of Appeal and Docket sheet mailed to all counsel (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2009) Modified on 1/20/2009 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
January 19, 2009 61 NOTICE by Adam J Szubin, George W. Bush, National Security Agency, Keith B. Alexander, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert S. Mueller, III re 57 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Dismiss Government Defendants' Notice of Filing Correspondence (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 1/19/2009)
January 19, 2009 60 MOTION to Stay re 59 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Notice of Motion and Motion for a Stay Pending Appeal and for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Adam J Szubin, George W. Bush, National Security Agency, Keith B. Alexander, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert S. Mueller, III. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Stay Pending Appeal)(Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 1/19/2009)
January 16, 2009 59 NOTICE by Adam J Szubin, George W. Bush, National Security Agency, Keith B. Alexander, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert S. Mueller, III Notice of Appeal by Government Defendants (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 1/16/2009)
January 6, 2009 Set/Reset Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 1/23/2009 10:30 AM. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2009)
January 6, 2009 58 CLERKS NOTICE setting Case Management Conference. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2009)
January 5, 2009 57 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 46 Motion discover or obtain material relating to electronic surveillance -- 50 USC § 1806(f); denying 49 Motion to Dismiss (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
December 2, 2008 56 Minute Entry: Hearing Pertaining to Govt's Motion to Dismiss and/or Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiffs' Motion to Discover or Obtain Materials Relating to Electronic Surveillance under FISA Section 1806(f) in the Al-Haramain case held on 12/2/2008 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker. The court heard argument from counsel.The matter has been submitted.The court to issue written order. (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/2/2008)
November 24, 2008 55 CLERKS NOTICE : TO ALL PARTIES AND COUNSEL OF RECORD;YOU ARE NOTIFIED THAT the Court has set the following schedule:December 2, 2008 - Hearing at 10:00 A.M. MDL Telecom Carrier Cases (including Hepting v AT&T (06-0672 VRW) - Govt's motion to dismiss or for Summary Judgment. December 2, 2008 - Hearing at 2:00 P.M. Al-Haramain et al v George Bush (07-0109 VRW) - Govt's motion to dismiss or for Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs' Motion for Discovery under FISA Section 1806(f). Please report to Courtroom No.6, on the 17th floor at 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, California. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2008)
November 14, 2008 54 Reply to Opposition re 49 Third MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, for Summary Judgment Government Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Government Defendants' Third Motion to Dismiss or For Summary Judgment filed byAdam J Szubin, George W. Bush, National Security Agency, Keith B. Alexander, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert S. Mueller, III. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 11/14/2008)
November 14, 2008 53 Reply to Opposition Plaintiffs Reply to Defendants Opposition to 46 Motion Pursuant to 50 U.S.C. § 1806(f) to Discover or Obtain Material Relating to Electronic Surveillance filed by Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc.. (Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 11/14/2008) Modified on 11/20/2008 (slh, COURT STAFF).
November 6, 2008 52 Transcript of Proceedings held on 9-12-2008, before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, Telephone number (415) 431-1477. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/2/2009. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 11/6/2008)
October 23, 2008 51 Memorandum in Opposition re 46 MOTION Pursuant to 50 USC §1806(f) to Discover or Obtain Material Relating to Electronic Surveillance MOTION Pursuant to 50 USC §1806(f) to Discover or Obtain Material Relating to Electronic Surveillance MOTION Pursuant to 50 USC §1806(f) to Discover or Obtain Material Relating to Electronic Surveillance Government Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion Pursuant to 50 U.S.C. 1806(f) to Discover or Obtain Material Relating to Electronic Surveillance filed byAdam J Szubin, George W. Bush, National Security Agency, Keith B. Alexander, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert S. Mueller, III. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 10/23/2008)
October 23, 2008 50 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Third Motion to Dismiss, or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment filed byAl-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc.. (Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 10/23/2008)
September 30, 2008 49 Third MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, for Summary Judgment filed by Adam J Szubin, George W. Bush, National Security Agency, Keith B. Alexander, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert S. Mueller, III. Motion Hearing set for 12/2/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits 1-12, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits 13-19)(Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 30, 2008 48 AMENDED MINUTE ORDER re (468 in M:06-cv-01791-VRW): SCHEDULE: Al-Haramain v Bush (07-0109 VRW): 9/30/08 - Govt Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment (30 pages)9/30/08 - Plaintiffs' Motion for Discovery under FISA Section 1806(f) (30 pages)10/23/08 - Govt Defendants' Opposition (30 pages)10/23/08 - Plaintiffs' Opposition (30 pages)11/14/08 - Govt Defendants' and Plaintiffs' Reply Briefs (15 pages)12/2/08 - Hearing at 10:00 A.M. SCHEDULE: MDL Telecom Carrier Cases (MDL06-1791 ) (including Hepting v ATT (06-0672 VRW): 9/19/08 - Govt's Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment(filed 9/9/08) (25 pages)10/16/08 - Plaintiffs' Opposition (50 pages per stipulation)11/5/08 - Govt's Reply (35 pages per stipulation)11/5/08 - Brief of Telecom Carrier Defendants (30 pages)11/20/08 - Plaintiffs' Reply to Telecom Carriers (35 pages per stipulation)12/2/08 - Hearing at 10:00 A.M. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 30, 2008 47 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER RE BRIEF LENGTH re (471 in M:06-cv-01791-VRW) filed by All Plaintiffs. Based upon the stipulation, the following shall be the page limits for the remaining briefs: Plaintiffs' Opposition: 50 pages. Government Reply: 35 pages. Carrier Brief: 30 pages. Plaintiffs' response to Carrier brief: 35 pages. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 9/30/2008. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 30, 2008 46 MOTION Pursuant to 50 USC §1806(f) to Discover or Obtain Material Relating to Electronic Surveillance filed by Wendell Belew, Asim Ghafoor, Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/2/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jon B. Eisenberg, # 2 Exhibit Eisenberg Exhibits A-H, # 3 Exhibit Eisenberg Exhibits I-P, # 4 Exhibit Eisenberg Exhibits Q-V, # 5 Exhibit Eisenberg Exhibits W-CC, # 6 Affidavit Declaration of Wendell Belew, # 7 Affidavit Declaration of Asim Ghafoor, # 8 Affidavit Declaration of Shayana Kadidal, # 9 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 18, 2008 45 Appeal Record Returned: (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2008)
September 12, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 12/2/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2008)
September 12, 2008 44 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 9/12/2008 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker. SCHEDULE:Al-Haramain and Telecomm Cases:Defs file motion to dismiss or for summary judgment - 9/30/08. Plas file motion for discovery under 1806 (f) - 9/30/08. Plas file opposition to defs motion to dismiss/sj - 10/23/08. Defs file opposition to plas motion for discovery (1806(f)) - 10/23/08. File reply memorandum - 11/14/08. Hearing: 12/2/2008 at 10:00 A.M. Page limits:Government - 25,30,30 = total 85 pages.Plaintiffs - 40, 45 = total 85 pages. (Court Reporter Debra Pas.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/12/2008)
August 19, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2008 11:00 AM., courtroom no. 6, 17th floor, San Francisco, California. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2008)
August 18, 2008 42 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement in Al-Haramain v. Bush filed by Adam J Szubin, George W. Bush, National Security Agency, Keith B. Alexander, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert S. Mueller, III. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 8/18/2008)
August 12, 2008 43 Order of USCA - John Hummastis motion to intervene is denied. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2008)
July 31, 2008 41 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed -Acceptance of Service of Summons and First Amended Complaint to defendant Robert S. Mueller, III Acknowledgement filed by Wendell Belew, Asim Ghafoor, Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Summons)(Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 7/31/2008)
July 31, 2008 40 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Government Defendants to Respond to Amended Complaint by Adam J Szubin, George W. Bush, National Security Agency, Keith B. Alexander, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert S. Mueller, III. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 7/31/2008)
July 31, 2008 39 STIPULATION Regarding Acceptance of Service and Response Deadline for Defendant Robert S. Mueller, III in his Individual Capacity by Wendell Belew, Asim Ghafoor, Robert S. Mueller, III, Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc.. (Meeks, J.) (Filed on 7/31/2008)
July 30, 2008 37 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Marcus Meeks and Mary H. Mason on behalf of Defendant Robert S. Mueller, III in his individual capacity (Meeks, J.) (Filed on 7/30/2008)
July 29, 2008 38 Summons Issued as to Robert S. Mueller, III (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2008)
July 29, 2008 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wendell Belew, Asim Ghafoor, Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc. re 35 Amended Complaint, (Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 7/29/2008)
July 29, 2008 35 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Adam J Szubin, George W. Bush, National Security Agency, Keith B. Alexander, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert S. Mueller, III. Filed byWendell Belew, Asim Ghafoor, Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc.. (Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 7/29/2008)
July 8, 2008 34 Featured Case ORDER correcting error in 33 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 7/8/2008. See document # 33. (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2008)
July 2, 2008 33 Featured Case SEE #34 FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATIONORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting in part and denying in part 17 motion to dismiss; granting 30 motion for an extension of time to serve defendants individually (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2008) Modified on 7/8/2008 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2008 32 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 4/23/2008 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker, the court submitted the matter, court to issue order re 30 MOTION Extend Time for Service Pursuant to F.R.Civ.P. 4(m); 17 Second MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment filed by Office of Foreign Assets Control, Robert S. Mueller, III, Keith B. Alexander, Robert W. Werner, Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Security Agency, George W. Bush. (Court Reporter Kathy Powell.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/23/2008)
April 22, 2008 31 Memorandum in Opposition re 30 MOTION Extend Time for Service Pursuant to F.R.Civ.P. 4(m) MOTION Extend Time for Service Pursuant to F.R.Civ.P. 4(m) filed byGeorge W. Bush, National Security Agency, Keith B. Alexander, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Robert W. Werner, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert S. Mueller, III. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh A -- Gov't Stay Motion, # 2 Exhibit Exh B -- AHF Opp to Stay, # 3 Exhibit Exh C -- Pages from AHF CA9 Brief, # 4 Exhibit Exh D -- Pages from Gov't Reply CA9)(Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 4/22/2008)
April 17, 2008 30 MOTION Extend Time for Service Pursuant to F.R.Civ.P. 4(m) filed by Wendell Belew, Asim Ghafoor, Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 2 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Declaration of Steven Goldberg, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 4/17/2008)
April 14, 2008 29 Reply Memorandum re 17 Second MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Notice of Motion and Second Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support thereof filed byGeorge W. Bush, National Security Agency, Keith B. Alexander, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Robert W. Werner, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert S. Mueller, III. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1--Excerpts from House Rep No 95-1283, # 2 Errata Exhibit 2--Excerpts from House Conf. Rep 95-1720, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3--Excerpts from Senate Rep 95-701, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4--Excerpts from Senate Rep 95-604)(Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 4/14/2008)
April 14, 2008 28 Answer to Amicus Curiae Brief of Telecommunications Carriers filed byWendell Belew, Asim Ghafoor, Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc.. (Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 4/14/2008) Modified on 4/15/2008 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
April 10, 2008 27 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 26 . Pursuant to the parties stipulation, the page limitation for Defendants' reply in support of second motion to dismiss or for summary judgment is hereby extended to 25 pages. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 4/10/2008. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2008)
April 9, 2008 26 STIPULATION to extend page limits for Defendants' Reply by George W. Bush, National Security Agency, Keith B. Alexander, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Robert W. Werner, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert S. Mueller, III. (Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 4/9/2008)
April 7, 2008 25 Brief Amicus Curiae of Telecommunications Carrier Defendants Regarding Whether The Foreign Intelligence Surveillance Act Preempts The State Secrets Privilege filed byAT&T Corp, Verizon Communications Inc., Verizon Florida, Inc., Verizon Northwest, Inc., Verizon Maryland, Inc., Verizon Global Networks, Inc., MCI Communications Services, Inc.. (Rogovin, John) (Filed on 4/7/2008)
April 7, 2008 24 Declaration of JENNIFER L. KELLY in Support of 23 Brief, Amici Curiae, of MDL Plaintiffs Addressing the Application of the Protocol of Section 1806(f), Title 50 U.S.C., to Civil Actions for Unlawful Electronic Surveillance filed byAmici Curiae MDL Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1. 116 CR 2227-31 (91st, 1970), # 2 Exhibit 2. 116 Cong. Rec. 26329 (1970), # 3 Exhibit 3. 01.03.1975 James A. Wilderotter Memo, # 4 Exhibit 4. Hersh NYT Article, # 5 Exhibit 5. Book II S. Rep. No. 94-755 (1976), # 6 Exhibit 6. Book III, S. Rep. 94-755 (1976), # 7 Exhibit 7. S. Rep. No. 95-604, # 8 Exhibit 8. PFAW Amicus Brief, # 9 Exhibit 9. S. Rep. No. 94-1035, # 10 Exhibit 10. P. Swire, 72 Geo. Wash. L. Rev. 1306, # 11 Exhibit 11. 1974 S. Judiciary Hearings, # 12 Exhibit 12. H. Rep. 95-1283, # 13 Exhibit 13. FISA of 1977 Hearings, # 14 Exhibit 14. H. Conference Rep. 95-1720, # 15 Exhibit 15. S. Rep. No. 95-701, # 16 Exhibit 16. S. 1566 3.14.78, # 17 Exhibit 17. House Bill from 124 Cong Rec. (1978), # 18 Exhibit 18. 10.26.2007 Senate Intel Report 110-209, # 19 Exhibit 19. 3.10.2008 NSA's Domestic Spying Grows)(Related document(s) 23 ) (Kelly, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/7/2008)
April 7, 2008 23 Brief Amici Curiae Memorandum of MDL Plaintiffs' Addressing the Application of the Protocol of Section 1806(f), Title 50 U.S.C., To Civil Actions for Unlawful Electronic Surveillance filed byAmici Curiae MDL Plaintiffs. (Cohn, Cindy) (Filed on 4/7/2008)
March 28, 2008 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wendell Belew, Asim Ghafoor, Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc. Opposition to Defendants' Second Motion to Dismiss or, in the alternative, for Summary Judgment (Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 3/28/2008)
March 28, 2008 21 DECLARATION of Jon B. Eisenberg in Support of 20 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Second Motion to Dismiss or, in the alternative, for Summary Judgment filed byWendell Belew, Asim Ghafoor, Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-H, # 2 Exhibit I-J, # 3 Exhibit K)(Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 3/28/2008) Modified on 3/31/2008 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2008 20 Memorandum in Opposition to 17 Defendants' Second Motion to Dismiss or, in the alternative, for Summary Judgment filed byWendell Belew, Asim Ghafoor, Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc.. (Eisenberg, Jon) (Filed on 3/28/2008) Modified on 3/31/2008 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2008 19 Featured Case REVISED PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER re (370 in M:06-cv-01791-VRW) Order filed September 10, 2007 signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 3-24-08. (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2008)
March 14, 2008 18 NOTICE by George W. Bush, National Security Agency, Keith B. Alexander, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Robert W. Werner, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert S. Mueller, III re 17 Second MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Notice of Motion and Second Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support thereof Notice of Loding of In Camera, Ex Parte Submission (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 3/14/2008)
March 14, 2008 17 Second MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Notice of Motion and Second Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support thereof filed by George W. Bush, National Security Agency, Keith B. Alexander, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Robert W. Werner, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert S. Mueller, III. Motion Hearing set for 4/23/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 3/14/2008)
February 11, 2008 16 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jessica Ashlee Albies (Albies, Jessica) (Filed on 2/11/2008)
February 7, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 4/23/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2008)
February 7, 2008 15 Minute Entry: Case Management and Status Conference held on 2/7/2008 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker. RESULTS:Further briefing re 1806(f) in Al-Haramain case only.Amici were permitted to file their briefs.Schedule: File brief : 3/14/08. Opposition: 3/28/08. Reply: 4/14/08. Hearing: 4/23/2008 at 10:00 AM.Filing of the briefs limited to the master MDL case and the individual case only.Page limitation has been set by the court to up to 40page limit. (Court Reporter Connie Kuhl.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/7/2008)
February 6, 2008 14 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Defendants' Case Management Statement filed by George W. Bush, National Security Agency, Keith B. Alexander, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Robert W. Werner, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert S. Mueller, III. (Coppolino, Anthony) (Filed on 2/6/2008)
February 5, 2008 13 NOTICE by George W. Bush, National Security Agency, Keith B. Alexander, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Robert W. Werner, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert S. Mueller, III of Withdrawal of Counsel (Tannenbaum, Andrew) (Filed on 2/5/2008)
January 25, 2008 12 CLERK'S NOTICE : Case Management Conference set for 2/7/2008 10:00 AM. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2008)
December 14, 2007 11 NOTICE by George W. Bush, National Security Agency, Keith B. Alexander, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Robert W. Werner, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert S. Mueller, III of Manual Filing (Haas, Alexander) (Filed on 12/14/2007)
June 23, 2007 10 Appendix re Opposition, Verizon's Motion to Dismiss Master Complaint.
June 23, 2007 9 Memorandum in Opposition re (273 in M:06-cv-01791-VRW) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Master Consolidated Complaint filed byElaine Spielfogel-Landis(on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated). (Himmelstein, Barry) (Filed on 6/23/2007)
June 22, 2007 8 Declaration of Candace J. Morey in Support of (315 in M:06-cv-01791-VRW) Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss or In the Alternative for Summary Judgment by the United States filed byDennis P. Riordan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Z# 2 Exhibit AA-II# 3 Exhibit JJ-KK)(Morey, Candace) (Filed on 6/22/2007)
June 22, 2007 7 Memorandum in Opposition re (253 in M:06-cv-01791-VRW) MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment on State Secrets Grounds filed byDennis P. Riordan. (Pulgram, Laurence) (Filed on 6/22/2007)
April 30, 2007 6 Featured Case ORDER of USCA - The court has reviewed the motion for reconsideration and responses thereto, includng the opposition to consolidation filed by the non-party plaintiff's appellees in Hepting v. AT&T. appeals No, 06-17132. 06-17137. The motion for reconsideration seeking to lift the stay of appellate proceedings is granted. Appellants' April 20, 2007 motion for leave to file an opposition to appellees' proposed briefing scheduled in appeal No. 06-36083 is granted. Appellants' opposition has been filed. The Clerk shall consolidate and calendar this appeal with the appeals Hepting v. AT&T Corp. appeal No. 06-17132, and Hepting v. United States appeal No. 06-17137. The briefing schedule in appeal Nos. 06-17132 and 06-17137 remains as previously established. The following briefing schedule shall be set for appeal No. 06-36083; the opening brief and excerpts or record are due June 6, 2007, the answering brief is due July 6, 2007; and the optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. The provisions of Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(a) shall not be applicable to appeal No. 06-36083; any Rule 31-2.2(b) request is strongly disfavored. The Clerk shall calendar these consolidated appeals during the week of August 13-17. 2007, in San Francisco, California. No motions for reconsideration, modification or clarification of this order shall be filed or entertained. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2007)
April 4, 2007 5 NOTICE by George W. Bush, National Security Agency, Keith B. Alexander, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Robert W. Werner, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert S. Mueller, III of Order by Court of Appeals Granting the Government's Motion for a Stay Pending Appeal (Attachments: # 1 April 4, 2007 Order of the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit)(Tannenbaum, Andrew) (Filed on 4/4/2007)
March 26, 2007 4 MOTION Administrative Motion for an Interim Stay of Briefing Pending the Court of Appeals' Consideration of Defendants' Stay Motion filed by George W. Bush, National Security Agency, Keith B. Alexander, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Robert W. Werner, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert S. Mueller, III. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Government's Motion to the Ninth Circuit for a Stay Pending Appeal)# 2 Declaration of Andrew H. Tannenbaum in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion for an Interim Stay# 3 Proposed Order)(Tannenbaum, Andrew) (Filed on 3/26/2007)
March 14, 2007 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 5/3/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco; opposition due 4/12/2007; reply due 4/19/2007. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2007)
March 13, 2007 3 Featured Case ORDER setting briefing schedule for plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Walker on 3/13/07. (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2007)
January 22, 2007 2 NOTICE by George W. Bush, National Security Agency, Keith B. Alexander, Office of Foreign Assets Control, Robert W. Werner, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert S. Mueller, III Regarding Transcript Orders (Tannenbaum, Andrew) (Filed on 1/22/2007)
January 9, 2007 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2007)
January 9, 2007 1 Case transferred in from District of Oregon, Portland; Case Number 3:06-cv-00274-KI. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.. Filed byWendell Belew, Asim Ghafoor, Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Doc#02 Motion to File Under Seal# 2 Doc#03 Assignment Order# 3 Doc#04 Notice of Manual Filing# 4 Doc#05 Notice of Reassignment# 5 Doc#07 Notice of Manual Filing# 6 Doc#08 Notice of Manual Filing# 7 Doc#12 Notice of Appearance# 8 Doc#13 Notice of Appearance# 9 Doc#14 Notice of Appearance# 10 Doc#15 Notice of Appearance# 11 Doc#16 Notice of Manual Filing# 12 Doc#17 Motion for Extension of Time# 13 Doc#20 Order Granting PHV App# 14 Doc#21 Order Granting PHV App# 15 Doc#24 Notice of Lodging# 16 Doc#24-2 Attachment A# 17 Doc#24-3 Attachment B# 18 Doc#24-4 Attachment C# 19 Doc#27 Notice of Manual Filing# 20 Doc#28 Notice of Manual Filing)(gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF). Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF). Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF). Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc. et al v. Bush et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert W. Werner
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Coppolino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Foreign Assets Control
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Coppolino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith B. Alexander
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Coppolino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Security Agency
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Coppolino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George W. Bush
Represented By: Andrew H Tannenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Represented By: Andrew H Tannenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert S. Mueller, III
Represented By: Andrew H Tannenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendell Belew
Represented By: Thomas Howard Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Al-Haramain Islamic Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asim Ghafoor
Represented By: Jon B. Eisenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?