United States of America v. Leopold-Cobb et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Herbert Leopold, Diana Bass, Walker, Wausau Mortgage Corporation, Dorothy J. Leopold-Cobb, Alameda County Tax Collecter, EMC Mortgage Corporation, Successor in Interest to Defendant WAUSAU Mortgage Corporation and Paulette E. Bass
Cross-claimant: EMC Mortgage Corporation, Successor in Interest to Defendant WAUSAU Mortgage Corporation
Cross-defendant: Alameda County Tax Collecter, Dorothy J. Leopold-Cobb, Paulette E. Bass, Herbert Leopold and Diana Bass
Counter-claimant: EMC Mortgage Corporation, Successor in Interest to Defendant WAUSAU Mortgage Corporation
Counter-defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2007cv00210
Filed: January 11, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7403 Suit to Enforce Federal Tax Lien
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 2, 2009 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE 62 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/2/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2009)
February 4, 2009 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 57 Stipulation Continuing Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 4, 2009. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2009)
December 10, 2008 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 54 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 10, 2008. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2008)
September 24, 2008 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Settlement Settlement Conference set for 11/4/2008 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 9/24/08. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Leopold-Cobb et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herbert Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana Bass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wausau Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy J. Leopold-Cobb
Represented By: Glen Lee Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alameda County Tax Collecter
Represented By: Claude Franklin Kolm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMC Mortgage Corporation, Successor in Interest to Defendant WAUSAU Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey Howard Lowenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paulette E. Bass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: David L. Denier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-claimant: EMC Mortgage Corporation, Successor in Interest to Defendant WAUSAU Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey Howard Lowenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: Alameda County Tax Collecter
Represented By: Claude Franklin Kolm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: Dorothy J. Leopold-Cobb
Represented By: Glen Lee Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: Paulette E. Bass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: Herbert Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: Diana Bass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: EMC Mortgage Corporation, Successor in Interest to Defendant WAUSAU Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey Howard Lowenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: United States of America
Represented By: David L. Denier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?