Edge Electronics, Inc. v. Hynix Semiconductor, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Edge Electronics, Inc., Sun Microsystems, Inc., Jaco Electronics, Inc., All American Semiconductor, Inc. and Unisys Corporation
Defendant: Elpida Memory (USA), Inc., ELPIDA Memory, Inc., Winbond Electronics Corporation America, Nanya Technology Corporation, USA, Winbond Electronics Corporation, Nanya Technology Corporation, Mosel Vitelic Corporation, Mosel Vitelic, Inc., Hynix Semiconductor, Inc., Hynix Semiconductor America, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric and Electronics USA, Inc., Infineon Technologies North America Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd, Samsung Semiconductor, Inc. and Infineon Technologies AG
3rd Party Plaintiff: Dram Claims Liquidation Trust
Case Number: 3:2007cv01207
Filed: February 28, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Anti-trust
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 6, 2010 339 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG AND INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES NORTH AMERICA CORP. re 338 Stipulation, filed by Edge Electronics, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/5/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2010)
August 11, 2009 335 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT HYNIX SEMICONDUCTOR INC. AND HYNIX SEMINCONDUCTOR AMERICA, INC. re 333 Stipulation filed by Edge Electronics, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/11/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2009)
August 4, 2009 334 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO NANYA TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION AND NANYA TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION USA re 332 Stipulation filed by Edge Electronics, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/4/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
March 24, 2009 330 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANTS ELPIDA MEMORY, INC. AND ELPIDA MEMORY (USA) re 329 Stipulation, filed by Elpida Memory (USA), Inc., ELPIDA Memory, Inc., ELPIDA Memory, Inc. and Elpida Memory (USA), Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/24/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2009)
December 18, 2008 314 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton Granting 252 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. (pjhlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2008)
December 11, 2008 308 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANTS SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD AND SAMSUNG SEMICONDUCTOR, INC. re 302 Stipulation, filed by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd, Samsung Semiconductor, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/11/08. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edge Electronics, Inc. v. Hynix Semiconductor, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elpida Memory (USA), Inc.
Represented By: Isabelle Anne Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELPIDA Memory, Inc.
Represented By: Jason Matthew Bussey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winbond Electronics Corporation America
Represented By: William S Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nanya Technology Corporation, USA
Represented By: E. Anne Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winbond Electronics Corporation
Represented By: Steven H. Morrissett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nanya Technology Corporation
Represented By: Na'il Benjamin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mosel Vitelic Corporation
Represented By: David C. Brownstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mosel Vitelic, Inc.
Represented By: Andrea P. DeShazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hynix Semiconductor, Inc.
Represented By: Michael F\rederick Tubach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hynix Semiconductor America, Inc.
Represented By: Michael F\rederick Tubach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
Represented By: Terrence Joseph Truax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsubishi Electric and Electronics USA, Inc.
Represented By: Terrence Joseph Truax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infineon Technologies North America Corporation
Represented By: Joshua Stewart Stambaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd
Represented By: Mona Solouki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.
Represented By: Mona Solouki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infineon Technologies AG
Represented By: Joshua Stewart Stambaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edge Electronics, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sun Microsystems, Inc.
Represented By: David Daniel Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaco Electronics, Inc.
Represented By: David Daniel Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: All American Semiconductor, Inc.
Represented By: David Daniel Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unisys Corporation
Represented By: David Daniel Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Dram Claims Liquidation Trust
Represented By: James J. Ficenec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?