Everette v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Ersie Everette
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 3:2007cv03013
Filed: June 11, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AWARD re 28 Stipulation filed by Ersie Everette. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/26/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2009)
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ENTRY OF JUDGMENT, ORDER CLOSING FILE re 25 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/9/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2009)
June 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Judge Maxine M. Chesney granting 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall issue summons. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the U.S. Marshal for the Northern District of California serve, without prepayment of fees, a copy of the complaint, any amendments, scheduling orders, attachments, plaintiff's affidavit and this order upon the defendant. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2007) Modified on 6/14/2007 (aaa, Court Staff).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Everette v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ersie Everette
Represented By: Harvey Peter Sackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?