Williams v. Kernan et al
Plaintiff: Michael Paul Williams
Defendant: Scott Kernan, Robert Horel, C. Scavetta, J. Flowers, Sue Risenhoover, Michael Sayre, Joseph Kravitz, Maureen McLean, N. Grannis and R. Pimental
Case Number: 3:2007cv05574
Filed: November 1, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Del Norte
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER REQUESTING PRISON OFFICIALS ALLOW ACCESS TO LAW LIBRARY; DIRECTIONS TO CLERK. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 20, 2012. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2012)
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER DIRECTING DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL TO ADDRESS OUTSTANDING SERVICE MATTERS; VACATING PRIOR SCHEDULE FOR FILING OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION BY DEFENDANTS PIMENTAL AND GRANNIS; DENYING 51 PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR LAW LIBRARY ACCESS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 3, 2011. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2011)
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER DENYING 41 , 42 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS; DENYING 46 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DISCOVERY; DIRECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 1, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2010)
April 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR FILING OF DISPOSITIVE MOTION; ADDRESSING PLAINTIFF'S PENDING 22 ; 25 ; 27 ; 30 MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 14, 2009. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2009)
November 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding; not settled. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 11/19/08. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Kernan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Paul Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Kernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Horel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Scavetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue Risenhoover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Sayre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Kravitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maureen McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Grannis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Pimental
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?