In re Charles Schwab Corp. Securities Litigation
Plaintiff: Mike Labins, James Coffin, David Mikelonis, John A. Hill, Robert Dickson, Kevin O'Donnell, YieldPlus Investor Group, Dr. Thomas T Chowattukunnel, Lisa Fox-McManus, Gary Holmes, Shiela F. Silver, Martin J. Beckmann, Mark Connolly, Steven Rees, Ray Chezik, Lisa Schaefer, Rodney E. Thompson, Suzanna Thompson, Arthur Froot, Roger Fross, Arthur Whiteway, Paul Willey, Diane Willey, Richard Jones, Zhihua Sui, Timothy L Garcia, Nancy R Long, Aspen Grove Townhome Association and Garfield Peate
Defendant: The Charles Schwab Corporation, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Charles R. Schwab, Evelyn Dilsaver, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Schwab Investments, Mariann Byerwalter, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Robert G. Holmes, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, Michael W. Wilsey, Kimon Daifotis, Matthew Hastings and PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP
Petitioner: Karen Cunningham, Mark Kale, Monte Lewis, Schwartz Group of Investors, Mark Verge, Malkit Singe, Mr. Nils Flanzraich, Ms. Jill Flanzraich, The Union Mission Ministries, Roxanne Okazaki, David Okazaki, Henry Dement, Maurer & Associates Capital Management, Inc., Gregory Peay, Julia Peay, Donna D. Bischoff, The Wynona Dodge Trust, Robert D. Bischoff, April A. Wright, H. Mason Morfit and Donald F Klus
Respondent: TD Ameritrade, Inc.
Interested Party: Robert Levin, Karl Kyzer and Barclays Capital Inc.
Amicus Curiae: Investment Company Institute and U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission
Not Classified By Court: Opt Out Parties, PrimeVest Financial Services Inc., Sterne, Agee & Leach, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Incorporated, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC, Prudential Investment Management, Fiserv, Inc., Morgan Keegan & Co., Inc., Bank of America, N.A., successor in interest to United States Trust Company of New York and Gary S Benson
Case Number: 3:2008cv01510
Filed: March 18, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Securities/Commodities Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1153 ORDER APPROVING #1150 FINAL DISPOSITION OF SETTLEMENT PROCEEDS.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2014).
June 5, 2014 Filing 1152 Declaration of Michael Joaquin in Support of #1150 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Lead Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Approve Final Disposition of Settlement Proceeds Declaration of Michael Joaquin Regarding Status of Distributions filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #1150 ) (Matt, Sean) (Filed on 6/5/2014)
June 5, 2014 Filing 1151 EXHIBITS re #1150 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Lead Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Approve Final Disposition of Settlement Proceeds Exhibit A filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #1150 ) (Matt, Sean) (Filed on 6/5/2014)
June 5, 2014 Filing 1150 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Lead Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Approve Final Disposition of Settlement Proceeds filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. Responses due by 6/19/2014. Replies due by 6/26/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Matt, Sean) (Filed on 6/5/2014)
May 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1149 ORDER APPROVING RE-ISSUANCE OF DISTRIBUTION CHECK TO CLASS MEMBER SCHROEDER [re (1147 in 3:08-cv-01510-WHA) Response ( Non Motion ) filed by YieldPlus Investor Group, (1144 in 3:08-cv-01510-WHA) Letter ]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 5/7/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2012)
May 4, 2012 Filing 1148 AFFIDAVIT Declaration of Michael Joaquin Regarding John W. Schroeder by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/4/2012)
May 4, 2012 Filing 1147 RESPONSE to re #1145 Order Class Counsel's Response to Notice Requesting Submission Relating to John W. Schroeder by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/4/2012)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1146 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR EXCLUSION FROM CLASS AND RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT by Judge William Alsup denying #1135 Motion]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2012)
May 1, 2012 Filing 1145 NOTICE REQUESTING SUBMISSION [re #1144 Letter] BY NOON ON 5/4/2012. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 4/30/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2012)
April 30, 2012 Filing 1144 Letter from John W. Schroeder dated 4/13/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Envelope)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2012)
April 19, 2012 Filing 1143 Statement of Non-Opposition re #1135 MOTION relief from judgment and exclusion from class filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Related document(s) #1135 ) (Roberts, Arthur) (Filed on 4/19/2012)
April 17, 2012 Filing 1142 REPLY (re #1135 MOTION relief from judgment and exclusion from class ) filed byDonald F Klus. (Flaherty, Anne) (Filed on 4/17/2012)
April 13, 2012 Filing 1141 CLERKS NOTICE Rescheduling Motion Hearing Time, Set/Reset Deadlines as to #1135 MOTION relief from judgment and exclusion from class . Motion Hearing set for 5/3/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2012)
April 10, 2012 Filing 1140 Declaration of Greg Scanlon in Support of #1139 Opposition/Response to Motion,, filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #1139 ) (Roberts, Arthur) (Filed on 4/10/2012)
April 10, 2012 Filing 1139 RESPONSE (re #1135 MOTION relief from judgment and exclusion from class ) Schwab's Opposition to Klus Motion for Relief From Judgment filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Roberts, Arthur) (Filed on 4/10/2012)
April 10, 2012 Filing 1138 Declaration of Michael Joaquin in Support of #1136 Opposition/Response to Motion Declaration of Michael Joaquin Regarding Donald Klus filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #1136 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/10/2012)
April 10, 2012 Filing 1137 Declaration of Sean R. Matt in Support of #1136 Opposition/Response to Motion Declaration of Sean R. Matt Regarding Donald Klus filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #1136 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/10/2012)
April 10, 2012 Filing 1136 RESPONSE (re #1135 MOTION relief from judgment and exclusion from class ) filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/10/2012)
March 27, 2012 Filing 1135 MOTION relief from judgment and exclusion from class filed by Donald F Klus. Motion Hearing set for 5/3/2012 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 4/10/2012. Replies due by 4/17/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Flaherty, Anne) (Filed on 3/27/2012)
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1134 ORDER APPROVING (1) DISTRIBUTION OF REMAINING SETTLEMENT FUNDS TO CLASS MEMBERS; (2) PAYMENT OF ADMINISTRATION FEES; AND (3) PAYMENT OF SECOND HALF OF ATTORNEY'S FEE AWARD by Judge Alsup granting #1112 Motion for Disbursement of Funds (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2012)
February 17, 2012 Filing 1133 Declaration of Lara McDermott in Support of #1112 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds, Second Declaration of Lara McDermott Regarding Status of Distributions and Administration Fees and Expenses filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #1112 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 2/17/2012) Modified on 2/21/2012 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
February 17, 2012 Filing 1132 REPLY (re #1112 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Class Counsel's Motion for Order Approving (1) Distribution of Remaining Settlement Funds to Class Members; (2) Payment of Reasonable Claims Administration Fees; and (3) Payment of Second Half of Attorneys' Fees) filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 2/17/2012) Modified on 2/21/2012 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
January 27, 2012 Filing 1131 NOTICE by Morgan Keegan & Co., Inc. Notice to Discontinue Receipt of ECF Notification (Groves, Amanda) (Filed on 1/27/2012)
January 25, 2012 Filing 1130 AFFIDAVIT re #1128 Response ( Non Motion ) Declaration of Michael Joaquin Regarding Distribution Checks Sent to Donald J. Frederickson, Jr. by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/25/2012)
January 25, 2012 Filing 1129 AFFIDAVIT re #1128 Response ( Non Motion ) Declaration of Sean R. Matt Regarding Distribution Checks Sent to Donald J. Frederickson, Jr. by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/25/2012)
January 25, 2012 Filing 1128 RESPONSE to re #1127 Order Class Counsel's Response to Letter from Donald Frederickson by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/25/2012)
January 25, 2012 Filing 1127 REQUEST FOR RESPONSE re #1126 Letter. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 25, 2012. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2012)
January 23, 2012 Filing 1126 Letter from Donald J. Frederickson re settlement checks. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2012)
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1125 ORDER APPROVING NOTICE TO CLASS MEMBERS WHO DID NOT CASH THEIR CHECKS re #1124 Notice (Other) filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 17, 2012. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2012)
January 13, 2012 Filing 1124 NOTICE by YieldPlus Investor Group Notice of Filing of Notice to Class Members Who Did Not Negotiate Their Settlement Checks (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/13/2012)
January 12, 2012 Filing 1123 Minute Entry: Status Conference (Date Filed: 1/12/2012). (Court Reporter Sahar Bartlett.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/12/2012)
January 9, 2012 Filing 1122 CLERKS NOTICE Rescheduling Hearing Time. Status Conference set for 1/12/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1121 ORDER POSTPONING APPROVAL OF CLASS COUNSEL'S MOTION AND SETTING HEARING re #1112 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Class Counsel's Motion for Order Approving (1) Distribution of Remaining Settlement Funds to Class Members; (2) Payment of Reasonable Claims Administration Fees; and (3) Payment of Second Half of Attorneys' filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 15, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2011) Modified on 12/16/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
December 15, 2011 STATUS HEARING ON DISTRIBUTION OF CLASS FUNDS Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 1/12/2012 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2011)
December 8, 2011 Filing 1120 REPLY (re #1112 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Class Counsel's Motion for Order Approving (1) Distribution of Remaining Settlement Funds to Class Members; (2) Payment of Reasonable Claims Administration Fees; and (3) Payment of Second Half of Attorneys' Award) Class Counsel's Third Supplemental Filing Re: Motion for Order Approving (1) Distribution of Remaining Settlement Funds to Class Members; (2) Payment of Reasonable Claims Administration Fees; and (3) Payment of Second Half of Attorneys' Fee Award filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 12/8/2011) Modified on 12/9/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
December 7, 2011 Filing 1119 RESPONSE (re #1112 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Class Counsel's Motion for Order Approving (1) Distribution of Remaining Settlement Funds to Class Members; (2) Payment of Reasonable Claims Administration Fees; and (3) Payment of Second Half of Attorneys' Award) To Plaintiffs' Second Supplemental Report filed by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Kramer, Karin) (Filed on 12/7/2011) Modified on 12/8/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
December 6, 2011 Filing 1118 Declaration of Lara McDermott Regarding Data Submitted By Intermediary Broker Fidelity filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 12/6/2011)
December 6, 2011 Filing 1117 REPLY (re #1112 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Class Counsel's Motion for Order Approving (1) Distribution of Remaining Settlement Funds to Class Members; (2) Payment of Reasonable Claims Administration Fees; and (3) Payment of Second Half of Attorneys' Award) filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 12/6/2011) Modified on 12/7/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
November 29, 2011 Filing 1116 REPLY (re #1112 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Class Counsel's Motion for Order Approving (1) Distribution of Remaining Settlement Funds to Class Members; (2) Payment of Reasonable Claims Administration Fees; and (3) Payment of Second Half of Attorneys' Fee Award) Class Counsel's Supplemental Filing Re: Motion for (1) Distribution of Remaining Settlement Funds to Class Members; (2) Payment of Reasonable Claims Administration Fees; and (3) Payment of Second Half of Attorneys' Fee Award filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 11/29/2011) Modified on 11/30/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
November 29, 2011 Filing 1115 RESPONSE (re #1112 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Class Counsel's Motion for Order Approving (1) Distribution of Remaining Settlement Funds to Class Members; (2) Payment of Reasonable Claims Administration Fees; and (3) Payment of Second Half of Attorneys' Fee Award ) filed by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Greg Scanlon in Support of Schwab's Response and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for (1) Distribution of Remaining Settlement Funds to Class Members; (2) Payment of Reasonable Claims Administration Fees; and (3) Payment of Second Half of Attorneys' Fee Award)(Kramer, Karin) (Filed on 11/29/2011) Modified on 11/30/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
November 23, 2011 Filing 1114 Declaration of Lara McDermott Regarding Status of Distributions and Administration Fees and Expenses filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 11/23/2011)
November 23, 2011 Filing 1113 Declaration of Steve W. Berman in Support of #1112 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Class Counsel's Motion for Order Approving (1) Distribution of Remaining Settlement Funds to Class Members; (2) Payment of Reasonable Claims Administration Fees; and (3) Payment of Second Half of Attorneys' Fee Award filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #1112 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 11/23/2011) Modified on 11/28/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
November 23, 2011 Filing 1112 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Class Counsel's Motion for Order Approving (1) Distribution of Remaining Settlement Funds to Class Members; (2) Payment of Reasonable Claims Administration Fees; and (3) Payment of Second Half of Attorneys' Fee Award filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. Responses due by 12/7/2011. Replies due by 12/14/2011. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 11/23/2011)
June 13, 2011 Filing 1111 REQUEST REGARDING LETTER FROM ROBERT FRIEDLANDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 13, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
April 30, 2011 Filing 1110 Transcript of Proceedings held on 3-10-11, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Wyatt, Telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/29/2011. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2011)
April 29, 2011 Filing 1109 NOTICE by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey #1107 Response re Website Notice (Kramer, Karin) (Filed on 4/29/2011) Modified on 5/2/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1108 ORDER REGARDING WEBSITE NOTICE FOR 701 EXCLUSIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 29, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2011)
April 29, 2011 Filing 1107 RESPONSE to re #1100 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Plaintiffs' Filing Regarding Website Notice for 701 Exclusions by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/29/2011)
April 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1106 ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL RECONSIDERATION by Judge Alsup terminating #1104 Motion for Reconsideration (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2011)
April 26, 2011 Filing 1105 Declaration of Michael Joaquin in Support of #1104 MOTION for Reconsideration re #1101 Order, Terminate Motions, Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Reconsideration of Order Granting Motions for Final Approval of Class Settlement Agreements and Granting In Part Motion for Attorney's Fee filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #1104 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/26/2011) Modified on 4/27/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
April 26, 2011 Filing 1104 MOTION for Reconsideration re #1101 Order, Terminate Motions, Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Reconsideration of Order Granting Motions for Final Approval of Class Settlement Agreements and Granting In Part Motion for Attorney's Fees and Expenses filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/26/2011) Modified on 4/27/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1103 FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF CALIFORNIA CLASS ACTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 19, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2011)
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1102 FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 19, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2011)
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1101 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT AGREEMENTS AND GRANTING IN PART MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND EXPENSES, Motions terminated: #837 Joint MOTION for Settlement Joint Motion for Final Approval of Settlement of Federal Securities Claims filed by YieldPlus Investor Group, #841 MOTION for Settlement Joint Motion for Final Approval of Settlement of California Class Claims filed by YieldPlus Investor Group, #844 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorneys Fees and Expenses filed by YieldPlus Investor Group.. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 19, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2011)
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1100 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION REGARDING 694 EXCLUSIONS by Judge Alsup denying #1044 Motion (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2011)
April 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1099 ORDER REGARDING CLASS MEMBER BENSON'S SUPPLEMENTAL OBJECTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 15, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2011)
April 15, 2011 Filing 1098 REPLY (re #837 Joint MOTION for Settlement Joint Motion for Final Approval of Settlement of Federal Securities Claims ) Supplemental Objection filed byGary S Benson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Pentz, John) (Filed on 4/15/2011)
April 8, 2011 Filing 1097 STATUS REPORT Response to Court's 4-7-11 Order by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 4/8/2011)
April 7, 2011 Filing 1096 REQUEST FOR RESPONSE FROM SCHWAB REGARDING INTERMEDIARY ACCOUNT SETTLEMENT FUNDING AND CASE STATUS. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 7, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2011)
April 6, 2011 Filing 1095 AFFIDAVIT re #1093 Status Report Declaration of Candace L. Preston Regarding Calculations for Accounts of California Intermediary Account Class Members by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/6/2011)
April 6, 2011 Filing 1094 AFFIDAVIT re #1093 Status Report Declaration of Michael Joaquin Regarding Calculations for Account Intermediary Account Class Members by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/6/2011)
April 6, 2011 Filing 1093 STATUS REPORT Plaintiffs' Status Report Regarding Intermediary Account Settlement Funding by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/6/2011)
March 29, 2011 Filing 1092 CLERKS NOTICE of Manual Filing UNDER SEAL re #1091 ORDER GRANTING JOINT ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE CLASS LIST UNDER SEAL. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2011).
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1091 ORDER GRANTING JOINT ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE CLASS LIST UNDER SEAL by Judge Alsup granting #1087 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2011)
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1090 SCHEDULING ORDER REGARDING MOTION ON INTERMEDIARY ACCOUNT SETTLEMENT UNDERFUNDING by Judge Alsup granting #1085 Motion (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2011)
March 28, 2011 Filing 1089 STIPULATION re #1087 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Administrative Motion to File Class List Under Seal Stipulation and [proposed] Order Granting Joint Administrative Motion to File Class List Under Seal by Charles Schwab & Co. Inc.. (Kramer, Karin) (Filed on 3/28/2011)
March 28, 2011 Filing 1088 Declaration of Andrew Caspersen in Support of #1087 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Administrative Motion to File Class List Under Seal filed byCharles Schwab & Co. Inc.. (Related document(s) #1087 ) (Kramer, Karin) (Filed on 3/28/2011)
March 28, 2011 Filing 1087 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Administrative Motion to File Class List Under Seal filed by Charles Schwab & Co. Inc.. (Kramer, Karin) (Filed on 3/28/2011)
March 25, 2011 Filing 1086 RESPONSE (re #1085 MOTION Unopposed Motion by the Schwab Defendants Regarding Briefing Schedule for Intermediary Issue Raised by Plaintiffs ) filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/25/2011)
March 23, 2011 Filing 1085 MOTION Unopposed Motion by the Schwab Defendants Regarding Briefing Schedule for Intermediary Issue Raised by Plaintiffs filed by Charles Schwab & Co. Inc.. (Kramer, Karin) (Filed on 3/23/2011)
March 18, 2011 Filing 1084 Transcript of Proceedings held on 2-11-2011, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Connie McCarthy Kuhl, Telephone number 415-431-2020. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/16/2011. (ck, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2011)
March 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1083 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINES TO SUBMIT CLASS LIST AND MOTION ON INTERMEDIARY ACCOUNT SETTLEMENT UNDERFUNDING. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 18, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2011)
March 17, 2011 Filing 1082 Declaration of Michael Joaquin in Support of #1081 Response ( Non Motion ), Response ( Non Motion ) Declaration of Michael Joaquin Regarding Status of Class Lists and Processing of Intermediary Account Class Member Claims filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #1081 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/17/2011)
March 17, 2011 Filing 1081 RESPONSE to re #1080 Scheduling Order Plaintiffs' Response to Scheduling Order Regarding Submission of Class List and Motion on Unspecified Issue and Motion for Leave to Extend Deadlines by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/17/2011)
March 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1080 SCHEDULING ORDER REGARDING SUBMISSION OF CLASS LIST AND MOTION ON UNSPECIFIED ISSUE. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 14, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2011)
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1079 ORDER ALLOWING TWO CLASS MEMBERS BACK INTO CLASS. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 11, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2011)
March 11, 2011 Filing 1077 STIPULATION Stipulation and proposed Order Allowing Two Class Members Back into Class by Charles Schwab & Co. Inc.. (Kramer, Karin) (Filed on 3/11/2011)
March 10, 2011 Filing 1078 Minute Entry: Fairness Hearing held on 3/10/2011 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 3/10/2011), Motion Hearing held on 3/10/2011 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 3/10/2011). (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/10/2011)
March 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1076 ORDER DENYING THE UNTIMELY REQUEST OF JAMES EDWARDS O/B/O SCIENTIFIC SPINAL PENSION PLAN TO OPT OUT OF THE FEDERAL SECURITIES CLASS. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 9, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/10/2011: #1 Certificate of Service) (wsn, COURT STAFF).
March 9, 2011 Filing 1075 NOTICE by YieldPlus Investor Group re #1073 Brief,, Expert Report of Candace L. Preston Regarding California Unfair Competition Law Damages for Non-California Residents (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/9/2011)
March 9, 2011 Filing 1074 Declaration of Michael Joaquin in Support of #1073 Brief,, Declaration of Michael Joaquin Regarding Notice to Additional Intermediary Account Class Members filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #1073 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/9/2011)
March 9, 2011 Filing 1073 Brief re #841 MOTION for Settlement Joint Motion for Final Approval of Settlement of California Class Claims, #837 Joint MOTION for Settlement Joint Motion for Final Approval of Settlement of Federal Securities Claims, #844 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorneys Fees and Expenses Plaintiffs' Second Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motions for Final Approval of Settlement and for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #841 , #837 , #844 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/9/2011)
March 9, 2011 Filing 1072 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc. re #1069 Declaration in Support,, #1068 Response ( Non Motion ), Response ( Non Motion ) (Kramer, Karin) (Filed on 3/9/2011)
March 9, 2011 Filing 1071 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by YieldPlus Investor Group re #1070 Response ( Non Motion ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/9/2011)
March 9, 2011 Filing 1070 RESPONSE to re #1067 Order Plaintiff's Response to the Court's Order Regarding Correspondence from James Edwards by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/9/2011)
March 9, 2011 Filing 1069 Declaration of Arthur M. Roberts in Support of #1068 Response ( Non Motion ), Response ( Non Motion ) Schwab's Response to Order Regarding James Edwards filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Related document(s) #1068 ) (Kramer, Karin) (Filed on 3/9/2011)
March 9, 2011 Filing 1068 RESPONSE to re #1067 Order Regarding James Edwards by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Kramer, Karin) (Filed on 3/9/2011)
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1067 ORDER REGARDING CORRESPONDENCE FROM JAMES EDWARDS. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 8, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/8/2011: #1 Certificate of Service) (wsn, COURT STAFF).
March 7, 2011 Filing 1066 Declaration of Lara McDermott in Support of #1064 Reply to Opposition/Response Declaration of Lara McDermott Regarding Settlement Reduction Calculations filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #1064 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
March 7, 2011 Filing 1065 Declaration of Steve W. Berman in Support of #1064 Reply to Opposition/Response filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #1064 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
March 7, 2011 Filing 1064 REPLY (re #1044 MOTION Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion Regarding 694 Exclusions ) filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
March 3, 2011 Filing 1060 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #1055 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Class Counsel's Response to the Court's February 28, 2011 Order by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1055 ORDER REGARDING SEALING OF AMENDMENT SUBMISSIONS by Judge Alsup granting #1053 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
March 2, 2011 Filing 1054 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 3/2/2011)
March 2, 2011 Filing 1053 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Class Counsel's Response to the Court's February 28, 2011 Order filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/2/2011)
March 1, 2011 Filing 1052 DECLARATION of Linda Drucker in Opposition to #1050 Opposition/Response to Motion, Declaration of Linda Drucker in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion Regarding 694 Exclusions filed byCharles Schwab & Co. Inc.. (Related document(s) #1050 ) (Kramer, Karin) (Filed on 3/1/2011)
March 1, 2011 Filing 1051 Declaration of Arthur Roberts in Support of #1050 Opposition/Response to Motion, Declaration of Arthur Roberts in Support of Schwab's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion Regarding 694 Exclusions filed byCharles Schwab & Co. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A through K)(Related document(s) #1050 ) (Kramer, Karin) (Filed on 3/1/2011)
March 1, 2011 Filing 1050 RESPONSE (re #1044 MOTION Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion Regarding 694 Exclusions ) Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion Regarding 694 Exclusions filed byCharles Schwab & Co. Inc.. (Kramer, Karin) (Filed on 3/1/2011)
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1049 ORDER REGARDING CLASS MEMBER BENSON'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION by Judge Alsup terminating #1048 Motion for Reconsideration (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2011)
March 1, 2011 Filing 1048 MOTION for Reconsideration re #1047 Order on Motion for Leave to File filed by Gary S Benson. Motion Hearing set for 3/10/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. William Alsup. (Pentz, John) (Filed on 3/1/2011) Modified on 3/2/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1047 ORDER DENYING CLASS MEMBER BENSON'S MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT RECORD by Judge Alsup denying #1046 Motion for Leave to File (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2011)
March 1, 2011 Filing 1046 MOTION for Leave to File filed by Gary S Benson. Motion Hearing set for 3/10/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. William Alsup. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Pentz, John) (Filed on 3/1/2011) Modified on 3/2/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
February 28, 2011 Filing 1045 Declaration of Steve W. Berman in Support of #1044 MOTION Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion Regarding 694 Exclusions filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #1044 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 2/28/2011)
February 28, 2011 Filing 1044 MOTION Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion Regarding 694 Exclusions filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. Motion Hearing set for 3/10/2011 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 2/28/2011) Modified on 3/1/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1043 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR EXCLUSION OF DAWN PACE FROM FEDERAL CLASS. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 28, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/1/2011: #1 Certificate of Service) (wsn, COURT STAFF).
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1042 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO FILE SUBMISSIONS REGARDING 694 EXCLUSIONS MOTION UNDER SEAL AND REQUEST FOR FURTHER RESPONSES FROM COUNSEL by Judge Alsup denying #1036 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2011)
February 24, 2011 Filing 1041 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey re #1040 Response, to Dawn Pace's Request (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 2/24/2011)
February 24, 2011 Filing 1040 Response Regarding Dawn Pace's Request byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 2/24/2011)
February 23, 2011 Filing 1039 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by YieldPlus Investor Group re #1038 Response ( Non Motion ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
February 23, 2011 Filing 1038 RESPONSE to re #1035 Order Plaintiffs' Response to the Court's Order of February 18, 2011, Regarding Letter From Dawn Pace by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
February 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1037 ORDER SHORTENING TIME RE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION REGARDING 694 EXCLUSIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 18, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2011)
February 22, 2011 Filing 1036 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 2/22/2011)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1035 ORDER REGARDING LETTER FROM DAWN PACE. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 18, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
February 18, 2011 Filing 1034 NOTICE by YieldPlus Investor Group Manual Filing Notification of Declaration of Steve W. Berman in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion Regarding 694 Exclusions (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
February 18, 2011 Filing 1033 NOTICE by YieldPlus Investor Group of Manual Filing Notification of Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion Regarding 694 Exclusions; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
February 18, 2011 Filing 1032 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Shortening Time for the Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion Regarding 694 Exclusions by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
February 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1031 ORDER DENYING FEDERAL SECURITIES CLASS MEMBER GARY BENSON'S MOTION TO INTERVENE by Judge Alsup denying #1015 Motion to Intervene (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
February 11, 2011 Filing 1030 Minute Entry: Fairness Hearing held on 2/11/2011 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 2/11/2011), Motion Hearing held on 2/11/2011 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 2/11/2011). (Court Reporter Connie Kuhl.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/11/2011)
February 10, 2011 Filing 1029 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua D. Hurwit (Hurwit, Joshua) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
February 10, 2011 Filing 1028 Declaration of Michael Joaquin in Support of #1026 Brief filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #1026 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
February 10, 2011 Filing 1027 Declaration of Steve W. Berman in Support of #1026 Brief Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum In Support of Motions for Final Approval of Settlements and for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #1026 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
February 10, 2011 Filing 1026 Brief Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum In Support of Motions for Final Approval of Settlements and for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
January 27, 2011 Filing 1025 Declaration of Steve W. Berman in Support of #1024 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Intervene filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #1024 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/27/2011)
January 27, 2011 Filing 1024 Memorandum in Opposition re #1020 MOTION to Intervene filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/27/2011)
January 27, 2011 Filing 1023 Memorandum in Opposition re #1015 MOTION to Intervene filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Kramer, Karin) (Filed on 1/27/2011)
January 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1022 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF JOHN PENTZ PRO HAC VICE by Judge Alsup granting #1021 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2011)
January 21, 2011 Filing 1021 AMENDED MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - John J. Pentz ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611055168) filed by Gary S Benson. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2011)
January 21, 2011 Filing 1020 MOTION to Intervene filed by Gary S Benson. Motion Hearing set for 2/11/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Alsup. (Moss, Gary) (Filed on 1/21/2011)
January 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1019 SCHEDULING ORDER REGARDING GARY BENSON'S MOTION TO INTERVENE: Motion Hearing set for 2/11/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 20, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2011)
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1017 ORDER RELATING CASE. Cases C08-1510 WHA, C11-0136 EMC and C11-0137 CW are related. The more recently filed cases shall be reaasigned to Judge Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/19/11. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
January 19, 2011 Filing 1016 RESPONSE in Support re #1010 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related, filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
January 19, 2011 Filing 1015 MOTION to Intervene filed by GARY S BENSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Class Action Complaint)(Moss, Gary) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
January 18, 2011 Filing 1018 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - John J. Pentz ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611055168), filed by Gary S Benson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
January 18, 2011 Filing 1014 NOTICE by U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission re #1010 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related, SEC's Notice of Filing of Proposed Order (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Regarding SEC's Administrative Motion to Determine Whether Cases Are Related)(Gottesman, David) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
January 18, 2011 Filing 1013 NOTICE REGARDING LIST OF CLASS MEMBERS. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 18, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
January 14, 2011 Filing 1012 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #1010 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related, filed byKimon Daifotis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #1010 ) (Bayless, David) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
January 14, 2011 Filing 1011 OBJECTIONS to Proposed Class Action Settlement And Notice of Intent to Appear by GARY S BENSON. (Moss, Gary) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
January 13, 2011 Filing 1010 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related, filed by U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission. (Gottesman, David) (Filed on 1/13/2011)
January 12, 2011 Filing 1009 STATUS REPORT Regarding Compliance By Certain Broker-Dealer Intermediaries by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/12/2011)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1007 ORDER APPROVING FORMS OF NOTICE TO INTERMEDIARY ACCOUNT CLASS MEMBERS. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 7, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
January 7, 2011 Filing 1006 NOTICE by YieldPlus Investor Group Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing of Proposed Forms of Notice For Provision to Additional Class Members Identified by Certain Broker-Dealer Intermediaries (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Errata B, #3 Exhibit C)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
January 5, 2011 Filing 1008 Minute Entry: Show Cause Hearing (Date Filed: 1/5/2011). (Court Reporter Debra Pas.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/5/2011)
January 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1005 ORDER REGARDING NOTICE TO INTERMEDIARY ACCOUNT CLASS MEMBERS AND FINAL FAIRNESS HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 5, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2011)
January 5, 2011 Filing 1004 NOTICE OF REQUESTED ATTENDANCE. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 5, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2011)
January 4, 2011 Filing 1002 Declaration of Richard Reardon in Support of #998 Response to Order to Show Cause filed byBank of America, N.A., successor in interest to United States Trust Company of New York. (Related document(s) #998 ) (Hoesterey, Heather) (Filed on 1/4/2011)
January 4, 2011 Filing 1001 Declaration of John Downey in Support of #998 Response to Order to Show Cause filed byBank of America, N.A., successor in interest to United States Trust Company of New York. (Related document(s) #998 ) (Hoesterey, Heather) (Filed on 1/4/2011)
January 4, 2011 Filing 1000 Declaration of Mary Pellegrino in Support of #998 Response to Order to Show Cause filed byBank of America, N.A., successor in interest to United States Trust Company of New York. (Related document(s) #998 ) (Hoesterey, Heather) (Filed on 1/4/2011)
January 4, 2011 Filing 999 Declaration of Deidra Smith in Support of #998 Response to Order to Show Cause filed byBank of America, N.A., successor in interest to United States Trust Company of New York. (Related document(s) #998 ) (Hoesterey, Heather) (Filed on 1/4/2011)
January 4, 2011 Filing 998 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Bank of America, N.A., successor in interest to United States Trust Company of New York. (Hoesterey, Heather) (Filed on 1/4/2011)
January 4, 2011 Filing 997 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by YieldPlus Investor Group re #995 Declaration in Support, #994 Brief, #996 Declaration in Support (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/4/2011)
January 4, 2011 Filing 996 Declaration of Michael Joaquin in Support of #994 Brief, Declaration of Michael Joaquin Regarding Responses From Broker Dealers filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #994 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/4/2011)
January 4, 2011 Filing 995 Declaration of Steve W. Berman in Support of #994 Brief, Declaration of Steve W. Berman In Support of Plaintiffs' Reply Relating to the Court's Order to Show Cause Directed to Certain Broker-Dealer Intermediaries filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #994 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/4/2011)
January 4, 2011 Filing 994 Brief re #964 Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause Plaintiffs' Reply Relating to the Court's Order to Show Cause Directed to Certain Broker-Dealer Intermediaries filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #964 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/4/2011)
January 3, 2011 Filing 1003 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Joshua Fritsch ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611054549) filed by Barclays Capital Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2011)
January 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 993 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF PETER TEPLEY PRO HAC VICE by Judge Alsup granting #988 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2011)
December 30, 2010 Filing 992 REQUEST REGARDING MEMORANDUM RESPONDING TO BROKER-DEALER SUBMISSIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 30, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2010)
December 30, 2010 Filing 991 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by TD Ameritrade, Inc. re #979 Memorandum in Opposition to December 21, 2010 Order to Show Cause (Berger, David) (Filed on 12/30/2010)
December 30, 2010 Filing 990 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sterne, Agee & Leach, Inc. re #970 Response to Order to Show Cause, #971 Declaration in Support (Kinnear, James) (Filed on 12/30/2010)
December 30, 2010 Filing 989 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Barclays Capital Inc. re #982 Response to Order to Show Cause (Paris, Adam) (Filed on 12/30/2010)
December 30, 2010 Filing 988 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Peter J. Tepley (Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611054462) filed by Sterne, Agee & Leach, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2010)
December 30, 2010 Filing 987 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Morgan Keegan & Co., Inc. Re: #981 Morgan Keegan & Co., Inc.'s Response to Order to Show Cause and #985 Declaration of Todd Graddy In Support of Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc.'s Response to Order to Show Cause (Groves, Amanda) (Filed on 12/30/2010) Modified on 1/3/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
December 30, 2010 Filing 986 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fiserv, Inc. re #980 Response to Order to Show Cause (Goldberg, James) (Filed on 12/30/2010)
December 30, 2010 Filing 985 Declaration of Todd Graddy in Support of #981 Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc.'s Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Morgan Keegan & Co., Inc. (Groves, Amanda) (Filed on 12/30/2010) Modified on 1/3/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
December 30, 2010 Filing 984 Declaration of Gary Swain in Support of #979 Memorandum in Opposition to December 21, 2010 Order to Show Cause filed byTD Ameritrade, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #979 ) (Berger, David) (Filed on 12/30/2010)
December 30, 2010 Filing 983 Declaration of Caroline Langner in Support of #979 Memorandum in Opposition to December 21, 2010 Order to Show Cause filed byTD Ameritrade, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) #979 ) (Berger, David) (Filed on 12/30/2010)
December 30, 2010 Filing 982 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Barclays Capital Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua Fritsch, #2 Exhibit A & B to Fritsch Declaration)(Paris, Adam) (Filed on 12/30/2010)
December 30, 2010 Filing 981 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Morgan Keegan & Co., Inc.. (Groves, Amanda) (Filed on 12/30/2010)
December 30, 2010 Filing 980 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Fiserv, Inc. ; Declaration of Charles W. Sprague in Support Thereof. (Goldberg, James) (Filed on 12/30/2010)
December 30, 2010 Filing 979 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Response to December 21, 2010 Order to Show Cause filed byTD Ameritrade, Inc. (Berger, David) (Filed on 12/30/2010) Modified on 1/3/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
December 30, 2010 Filing 978 Declaration of Melissa Wobbe in Support of #974 Response to Order to Show Cause filed byMorgan Stanley & Co. Incorporated, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. (Related document(s) #974 ) (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 12/30/2010)
December 30, 2010 Filing 977 Declaration of Barbara Valente in Support of #974 Response to Order to Show Cause filed byMorgan Stanley & Co. Incorporated, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. (Related document(s) #974 ) (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 12/30/2010)
December 30, 2010 Filing 976 Declaration of Neal A. Potischman in Support of #974 Response to Order to Show Cause filed byMorgan Stanley & Co. Incorporated, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #974 ) (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 12/30/2010)
December 30, 2010 Filing 975 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Prudential Investment Management. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit DECLARATION OF W.H. RAMSAY LEWIS)(Padden, Ryan) (Filed on 12/30/2010)
December 30, 2010 Filing 974 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Morgan Stanley & Co. Incorporated, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 12/30/2010)
December 30, 2010 Filing 973 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan James Padden (Padden, Ryan) (Filed on 12/30/2010)
December 30, 2010 Filing 972 NOTICE of Appearance by Neal Alan Potischman (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 12/30/2010)
December 30, 2010 Filing 971 Declaration of William K. Holbrook in Support of #970 Response to Order to Show Cause filed bySterne, Agee & Leach, Inc.. (Related document(s) #970 ) (Kinnear, James) (Filed on 12/30/2010)
December 30, 2010 Filing 970 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Sterne, Agee & Leach, Inc.. (Kinnear, James) (Filed on 12/30/2010)
December 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 969 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ARTHUR ROBERTS PRO HAC VICE by Judge Alsup granting #967 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2010)
December 29, 2010 Filing 968 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey re #967 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Arthur M. Roberts ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611054421). (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2010)
December 29, 2010 Filing 967 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Arthur M. Roberts ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611054421). filed by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2010)
December 29, 2010 Filing 966 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by PrimeVest Financial Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Angela Handeland)(Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 12/29/2010)
December 21, 2010 Filing 965 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by YieldPlus Investor Group re #964 Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 12/21/2010)
December 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 964 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Alsup granting #960 Motion for Order to Show Cause (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2010)
December 20, 2010 Filing 963 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by YieldPlus Investor Group re #961 Brief, #960 Joint MOTION for Order to Show Cause, #962 Declaration in Support, (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 12/20/2010)
December 20, 2010 Filing 962 Declaration of Michael Joaquin in Support of #960 Joint MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #960 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 12/20/2010)
December 20, 2010 Filing 961 Brief re #960 Joint MOTION for Order to Show Cause Joint Memorandum in Support of Administrative Motion for Order to Show Cause filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #960 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 12/20/2010)
December 20, 2010 Filing 960 Joint MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 12/20/2010)
December 15, 2010 Filing 959 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 12/15/2010 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 12/15/2010). (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/15/2010)
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 958 ORDER APPROVING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 13, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2010)
December 10, 2010 Filing 957 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Patrick C. Doolittle (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 12/10/2010)
December 10, 2010 Filing 956 Declaration of Michael Joaquin in Support of #955 Status Report filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #955 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 12/10/2010)
December 10, 2010 Filing 955 STATUS REPORT Plaintiffs' Status Report Regarding Intermediary Account Notice and Claims by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 12/10/2010)
December 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 954 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT GARY BENSON'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF HIS OPT-OUT REQUEST by Judge Alsup terminating #927 Motion for Reconsideration (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/3/2010: #1 Certificate of Service) (wsn, COURT STAFF).
December 2, 2010 Filing 953 RESPONSE to re #952 Order Class Counsel's Response to the Court's Order Requesting Information Regarding Class Member Gary Benson by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 12/2/2010)
December 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 952 ORDER REQUESTING INFORMATION FROM CLASS COUNSEL REGARDING CLASS MEMBER GARY BENSON. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 2, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2010)
December 1, 2010 Filing 951 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion of Garfield Peate to Intervene Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 24(a)(2) and (b)(2) filed byGarfield Peate. (Punzalan, Mark) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
November 29, 2010 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #945 MOTION to Intervene [Notice of Motion and Motion of Garfield Peate to Intervene Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 24(a)(2) and (b)(2); Memorandum of Points and Authorities]. Opposition briefs due by 12/7/2010, at noon. Replies due by 12/14/2010, at noon. Motion Hearing set for 12/23/2010 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2010)
November 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 950 ORDER RELATING CASES by Judge William Alsup granting (942) Motion to Relate Case in case 3:08-cv-01510-WHA. Case C18-1510 WHA and C10-5267 SBA are related. The more recently filed case shall be reassigned to Judge Alsup. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2010)
November 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 949 SCHEDULING ORDER REGARDING GARFIELD PEATE'S MOTION TO INTERVENE. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 29, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2010)
November 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 948 ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING AMENDMENT NO. 4 TO STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 24, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2010)
November 24, 2010 Filing 947 NOTICE by YieldPlus Investor Group re #946 Order Notice of Filing of Revised Amendment No. 4 to Stipulation of Settlement (Attachments: #1 Amendment No. 4 to Stipulation of Settlement)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 11/24/2010)
November 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 946 ORDER REGARDING AMENDMENT NO. 4 TO STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 23, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2010)
November 23, 2010 Filing 945 MOTION to Intervene [Notice of Motion and Motion of Garfield Peate to Intervene Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 24(a)(2) and (b)(2); Memorandum of Points and Authorities] filed by Garfield Peate. Motion Hearing set for 12/30/2010 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 11/23/2010)
November 23, 2010 Filing 944 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/18/10, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sahar McVickar, CSR, RPR, Telephone number (415) 626-6060/sahar_mcvickar@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/22/2011. (McVickar, Sahar) (Filed on 11/23/2010)
November 22, 2010 Filing 943 STIPULATION re #942 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related and [Proposed] Order by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 11/22/2010)
November 22, 2010 Filing 942 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 11/22/2010)
November 22, 2010 Filing 941 NOTICE re Schwab Defendants' Supplemental Submission Of Data Regarding Claims Asserted By Non-California Residents by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 11/22/2010) Modified on 11/23/2010 (rcs, COURT STAFF).
November 22, 2010 Filing 940 NOTICE by YieldPlus Investor Group Notice of Filing Amendment No. 4 to Stipulation of Settlement (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 11/22/2010)
November 22, 2010 Filing 939 RESPONSE to re #938 Order November 22, 2010 Request for Clarification by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 11/22/2010)
November 22, 2010 Filing 938 REQUEST FOR CLARIFICATION. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 22, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2010)
November 19, 2010 Filing 937 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report Regarding the Filing of Proposed Amendment No. 4 to Federal Stipulation of Settlement by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 11/19/2010)
November 19, 2010 Filing 935 NOTICE by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey Defendants' Submission of Data Regarding Claims Asserted by Non-California Residents (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 11/19/2010)
November 19, 2010 Filing 934 RESPONSE to the Court's #933 Question Regarding Denied Late Opt-Out Movants by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 11/19/2010) Modified on 11/22/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
November 18, 2010 Filing 936 Minute Entry: Status Conference (Date Filed: 11/18/2010). (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/18/2010)
November 18, 2010 Filing 933 QUESTION FOR HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 18, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2010)
November 17, 2010 Filing 932 Statement Joint Notice of Signed Memorandum of Understanding to Amend Settlement and Resolve Outstanding Issue re: Scope of Release by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 11/17/2010)
November 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 931 ORDER TO BRING CERTAIN ITEMS TO THE HEARING ON THE VALIDITY OF DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF TERMINATION. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 17, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2010)
November 17, 2010 Filing 930 Joinder re #928 Reply Memorandum,, by Kimon Daifotis. (Bayless, David) (Filed on 11/17/2010)
November 17, 2010 Filing 929 Declaration in Support of #928 Reply Memorandum,, E-Filing Attestation re: Docket No. 928 filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Related document(s) #928 ) (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 11/17/2010)
November 17, 2010 Filing 928 Reply Memorandum re #918 MOTION to Withdraw and Notice of Termination from Joint Motions for Final Approval filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 11/17/2010)
November 15, 2010 Filing 926 RESPONSE to re #918 MOTION to Withdraw by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 11/15/2010)
November 12, 2010 Filing 927 MOTION for Reconsideration re #915 ORDER DENYING GARY BENSONS MOTION TO OPT OUT, by Gary S. Benson. (Attachments: #1 Letters, #2 Envelope)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2010)
November 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 925 ORDER REGARDING SUBMISSIONS ON THE VALIDITY OF DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF TERMINATION. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 10, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2010)
November 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 924 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ROBERT JUMAN PRO HAC VICE by Judge Alsup granting #920 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2010)
November 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 923 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF FAITH GAY PRO HAC VICE by Judge Alsup granting #919 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2010)
November 8, 2010 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #918 MOTION to Withdraw, Notice of Withdrawal from Motion for Final Approval of Settlement. Responses due by 11/15/2010, at noon. Replies due by 11/17/2010, at noon. Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2010 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2010)
November 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 922 ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS NOTICE. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 8, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2010)
November 8, 2010 Filing 921 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey re #919 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Faith E. Gay ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611052610) #920 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Robert C. Juman ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611052611.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2010)
November 8, 2010 Filing 920 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Robert C. Juman ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611052611), filed by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Gary Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2010)
November 8, 2010 Filing 919 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Faith E. Gay ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611052610), filed by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2010)
November 8, 2010 Filing 918 MOTION to Withdraw, NOTICE by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey Notice of Withdrawal from Motion for Final Approval of Settlement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - D)(Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 11/8/2010) Modified on 11/9/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
November 8, 2010 Filing 917 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick C. Doolittle of Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 11/8/2010)
November 2, 2010 Filing 916 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #915 ORDER DENYING GARY BENSONS MOTION TO OPT OUT. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 915 ORDER DENYING GARY BENSONS MOTION TO OPT OUT by Judge Alsup denying #910 Motion (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
October 29, 2010 Filing 914 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey re #912 Memorandum in Opposition,, #913 Declaration in Support,, (Fernandez, Dorothy) (Filed on 10/29/2010)
October 29, 2010 Filing 913 Declaration of Dorothy L. Fernandez in Support of #912 Memorandum in Opposition,, to Gary Benson's Motion for Exclusion from Class [Docket No. 910] filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #912 ) (Fernandez, Dorothy) (Filed on 10/29/2010)
October 29, 2010 Filing 912 Memorandum in Opposition re #910 MOTION Exclude Gary S. Benson from the Class filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Exclusion from Class [Docket No. 910])(Fernandez, Dorothy) (Filed on 10/29/2010)
October 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 911 ORDER REGARDING GARY BENSONS MOTION TO BE EXCLUDED FROM THE CLASS. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 27, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2010)
October 22, 2010 Filing 910 MOTION to Exclude Gary S. Benson from the Class, by Gary S. Benson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gary Benson In Support of Motion, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service, #4 Envelope)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
October 14, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Further Fairness Hearing set for 12/15/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2010)
October 14, 2010 Filing 909 MEMORANDUM OPINION REGARDING DISPUTE OVER RELEASE OF SECTION 17200 CLAIM IN THE FEDERAL SECURITIES CLASS SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 14, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2010)
October 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 908 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO INTERVENE AS PLAINTIFFS [AND] MOTIONS FOR LEAD COUNSEL[]S RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 4, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/4/2010: #1 Certificate of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 907 ORDER REGARDING CORRESPONDENCE FROM JAMES EDWARDS O/B/O SCIENTIFIC SPINAL PENSION PLAN. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 4, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/4/2010: #1 Certificate of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 906 ORDER DENYING THE UNTIMELY REQUEST OF MARLENE DELOUISE TO OPT OUT. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 4, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/4/2010: #1 Certificate of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 905 ORDER DENYING THE UNTIMELY REQUEST OF ROBERT AND MARILYN HICKS TO OPT OUT. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 4, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/4/2010: #1 Certificate of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF).
October 1, 2010 Filing 904 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey re #885 Declaration in Support,, #899 Proposed Order,, #894 Memorandum in Opposition, CORRECTION OF DOCKET #902 . (Fernandez, Dorothy) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
October 1, 2010 Filing 903 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey re #885 Declaration in Support,, #897 Memorandum in Opposition,, (Fernandez, Dorothy) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
October 1, 2010 Filing 902 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #904 . *** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey re #885 Declaration in Support,, #899 Proposed Order,, #894 Memorandum in Opposition, (Fernandez, Dorothy) (Filed on 10/1/2010) Modified on 10/4/2010 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
October 1, 2010 Filing 901 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey re #885 Declaration in Support,, #890 Memorandum in Opposition, #898 Proposed Order,, (Fernandez, Dorothy) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
October 1, 2010 Filing 900 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Opposition; Declaration; [Proposed] Order served on Robert and Marilyn Hicks on 10/01/2010, filed by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey re #882 Memorandum in Opposition, #885 Declaration in Support,, #888 Proposed Order, (Fernandez, Dorothy) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
October 1, 2010 Filing 899 Proposed Order re #894 Memorandum in Opposition, Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Exclusion from Class [Docket No. 877] by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Fernandez, Dorothy) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
October 1, 2010 Filing 898 Proposed Order re #890 Memorandum in Opposition, Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Exclusion from Class [Docket No. 876] by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Fernandez, Dorothy) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
October 1, 2010 Filing 897 Memorandum in Opposition Response to Order re Riches' "Motions to Intervene as Plaintiffs" and for "Recusal of Lead Counsel" [Docket No. 878] filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Fernandez, Dorothy) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
October 1, 2010 Filing 896 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by YieldPlus Investor Group re #895 Response ( Non Motion ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
October 1, 2010 Filing 895 RESPONSE to re #875 Order Plaintiffs' Response to Order Regarding Letter From Robert and Marilyn Hicks by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
October 1, 2010 Filing 894 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Edwars' Motion for Exclusion from Class [Docket No. 877] filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Fernandez, Dorothy) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
October 1, 2010 Filing 893 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by YieldPlus Investor Group re #892 Response ( Non Motion ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
October 1, 2010 Filing 892 RESPONSE to re #877 Order Plaintiffs' Response to Order Regarding Letter From James Edwards O/B/O Scientific Spinal Pension Plan by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
October 1, 2010 Filing 891 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by YieldPlus Investor Group re #889 Response ( Non Motion ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
October 1, 2010 Filing 890 Memorandum in Opposition to Marlene DeLouise's Motion for Exclusion from Class [Docket No. 876] filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Fernandez, Dorothy) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
October 1, 2010 Filing 889 RESPONSE to re #876 Order Plaintiffs Response to Order Regarding Letter From Marlene DeLouise by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
October 1, 2010 Filing 888 Proposed Order re #882 Memorandum in Opposition, Denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Exclusion from Class [Docket No. 875] by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation. (Fernandez, Dorothy) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
October 1, 2010 Filing 887 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by YieldPlus Investor Group re #884 Declaration in Support, #883 Response ( Non Motion ), #886 Declaration in Support (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
October 1, 2010 Filing 886 Declaration of Michael Joaquin Regarding Additional Notice Administrative Issues filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
October 1, 2010 Filing 885 Declaration of Dorothy L. Fernandez In Support of Schwab's Opposition Briefs re Plaintiffs' Motions for Exclusion from Class [Docket Nos. 875, 876, 877, 878] filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Fernandez, Dorothy) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
October 1, 2010 Filing 884 Declaration of Steve W. Berman in Support of #883 Response ( Non Motion ) filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #883 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
October 1, 2010 Filing 883 RESPONSE to re #878 Order Plaintiffs' Response to Order Regarding "Motions to Intervene as Plaintiffs" and for "Recusal of Lead Counsel" by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
October 1, 2010 Filing 882 Memorandum in Opposition to Hinks' Motion for Exclusion from Class [Docket No. 875] filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Fernandez, Dorothy) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
September 29, 2010 Filing 881 Declaration of Steve W. Berman in Support of #880 Brief filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #880 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 9/29/2010)
September 29, 2010 Filing 880 Brief Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Support of the Federal Class's Preservation of the 17200 Claim filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 9/29/2010)
September 29, 2010 Filing 879 Reply Memorandum in Support of Settlement Pursuant to Court Order Dated September 22, 2010 filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 9/29/2010)
September 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 878 ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS TO INTERVENE AS PLAINTIFFS AND FOR RECUSAL OF LEAD COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 27, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
September 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 877 ORDER REGARDING LETTER FROM JAMES EDWARDS O/B/O SCIENTIFIC SPINAL PENSION PLAN. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 27, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
September 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 876 ORDER REGARDING LETTER FROM MARLENE DELOUISE. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 27, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
September 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 875 ORDER REGARDING LETTER FROM ROBERT AND MARILYN HICKS. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 27, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
September 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 874 ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF THE CLASS SETTLEMENT AGREEMENTS AND LETTERS FROM CLASS MEMBERS. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 27, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
September 27, 2010 Filing 873 Declaration of Steve W. Berman in Support of #871 Brief filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) #871 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
September 27, 2010 Filing 872 Declaration in Support of #869 Brief, In Support of Settlement Pursuant to Court Order Dated September 22, 2010 filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #869 ) (Rodriguez, Dana) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
September 27, 2010 Filing 871 Brief Plaintiffs' Brief in Support of the Federal Class's Preservation of the 172000 Claim filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
September 27, 2010 Filing 870 Declaration of Darryl P. Rains in Support of #869 Brief, In Support of Settlement Pursuant to Court Order Dated September 22, 2010 filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Related document(s) #869 ) (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
September 27, 2010 Filing 869 Brief In Support of Settlement Pursuant to Court Order Dated September 22, 2010 filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
September 23, 2010 Filing 867 Transcript of Proceedings held on 9-22-2010, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Connie McCarthy Kuhl, Telephone number 415-431-2020. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/22/2010. (ck, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
September 22, 2010 Filing 868 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 9/22/2010 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 9/22/2010) re #841 MOTION for Settlement Joint Motion for Final Approval of Settlement of California Class Claims filed by YieldPlus Investor Group, #837 Joint MOTION for Settlement Joint Motion for Final Approval of Settlement of Federal Securities Claims filed by YieldPlus Investor Group, #844 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorneys Fees and Expenses filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Court Reporter Connie Kuhl.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/22/2010)
September 22, 2010 Filing 866 Declaration of Steve W. Berman in Support of #865 Brief, filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #865 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 9/22/2010)
September 22, 2010 Filing 865 Brief re #864 Response ( Non Motion ) Plaintiffs' Response to Schwab Reply Brief Re Motion for Final Approval of Settlement filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #864 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 9/22/2010) Modified on 9/23/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
September 21, 2010 Filing 864 RESPONSE to re #859 Reply Memorandum, Schwabs Response To Reply Brief Re Joint Motion For Approval Of Settlement by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 9/21/2010)
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 863 *** FILED IN ERROR -- PLEASE DISREGARD *** ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT EXPERIAN. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 21, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2010) Modified on 9/21/2010 (whalc2, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2010 Filing 862 Declaration of Michael Joaquin in Support of #859 Reply Memorandum, Supplemental Declaration of Michael Joaquin Regarding California Settlement Notice Administration filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #859 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
September 15, 2010 Filing 861 Declaration of Michael Joaquin in Support of #859 Reply Memorandum, Declaration of Michael Joaquin Regarding Federal Settlement Notice Administration filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #859 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
September 15, 2010 Filing 860 Declaration of Steve W. Berman in Support of #859 Reply Memorandum, filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-10, #2 Exhibit 11-16, #3 Exhibit 17-28)(Related document(s) #859 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
September 15, 2010 Filing 859 Reply Memorandum re #841 MOTION for Settlement Joint Motion for Final Approval of Settlement of California Class Claims, #837 Joint MOTION for Settlement Joint Motion for Final Approval of Settlement of Federal Securities Claims, #844 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorneys Fees and Expenses filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
September 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 858 ORDER AMENDING PROPOSED SETTLEMENTS AND DIRECTING THAT SETTLEMENT NOTICE BE PROVIDED TO INTERMEDIARY ACCOUNT CLASS MEMBERS. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 13, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2010)
September 10, 2010 Filing 857 RESPONSE to re #856 Order on Motion for Settlement Joint Response to the Court's September 2, 2010 Order Regarding 1172 Omitted Accounts by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 9/10/2010)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 856 ORDER REGARDING 1172 OMITTED ACCOUNTS by Judge Alsup granting #854 Motion for Settlement (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
August 31, 2010 Filing 855 Declaration of Candace L. Preston in Support of #854 Joint MOTION for Settlement Joint Administrative Motion to Modify Setlement filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #854 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 8/31/2010)
August 31, 2010 Filing 854 Joint MOTION for Settlement Joint Administrative Motion to Modify Setlement filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Proposed Order, #7 Proposed Order)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 8/31/2010)
July 23, 2010 Filing 853 Declaration of Steve W. Berman in Support of #841 MOTION for Settlement Joint Motion for Final Approval of Settlement of California Class Claims, #837 Joint MOTION for Settlement Joint Motion for Final Approval of Settlement of Federal Securities Claims, #844 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorneys Fees and Expenses filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q)(Related document(s) #841 , #837 , #844 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 7/23/2010)
July 23, 2010 Filing 852 Declaration of Michael Labins in Support of #844 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorneys Fees and Expenses filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #844 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 7/23/2010)
July 23, 2010 Filing 851 Declaration of David Mikelonis in Support of #844 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorneys Fees and Expenses filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #844 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 7/23/2010)
July 23, 2010 Filing 850 Declaration of James Coffin in Support of #844 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorneys Fees and Expenses filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #844 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 7/23/2010)
July 23, 2010 Filing 849 Declaration of Robert Dickson in Support of #844 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorneys Fees and Expenses filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #844 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 7/23/2010)
July 23, 2010 Filing 848 Declaration of John Hill in Support of #844 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorneys Fees and Expenses filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #844 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 7/23/2010)
July 23, 2010 Filing 847 Declaration of Kevin O'Donnell in Support of #844 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorneys Fees and Expenses filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #844 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 7/23/2010)
July 23, 2010 Filing 846 Declaration of Robert Levin in Support of #844 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorneys Fees and Expenses filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #844 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 7/23/2010)
July 23, 2010 Filing 845 Brief re #844 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorneys Fees and Expenses filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #844 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 7/23/2010)
July 23, 2010 Filing 844 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorneys Fees and Expenses filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. Motion Hearing set for 9/22/2010 03:30 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 7/23/2010)
July 23, 2010 Filing 843 Declaration of Michael Joaquin in Support of #841 MOTION for Settlement Joint Motion for Final Approval of Settlement of California Class Claims Declaration of Michael Joaquin Regarding Mailing and Emailing of Proposed California Settlement Notice and Publication of Summary Notice filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #841 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 7/23/2010)
July 23, 2010 Filing 842 Brief re #841 MOTION for Settlement Joint Motion for Final Approval of Settlement of California Class Claims filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #841 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 7/23/2010)
July 23, 2010 Filing 841 MOTION for Settlement Joint Motion for Final Approval of Settlement of California Class Claims filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. Motion Hearing set for 9/22/2010 03:30 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 7/23/2010)
July 23, 2010 Filing 840 Declaration of Michael Joaquin in Support of #837 Joint MOTION for Settlement Joint Motion for Final Approval of Settlement of Federal Securities Claims Declaration of Michael Joaquin Regarding Mailing and Emailing of Proposed Federal Settlement Notice and Publication of Summary Notice filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #837 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 7/23/2010)
July 23, 2010 Filing 839 Declaration of Candace L. Preston in Support of #837 Joint MOTION for Settlement Joint Motion for Final Approval of Settlement of Federal Securities Claims filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #837 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 7/23/2010)
July 23, 2010 Filing 838 Brief re #837 Joint MOTION for Settlement Joint Motion for Final Approval of Settlement of Federal Securities Claims filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #837 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 7/23/2010)
July 23, 2010 Filing 837 Joint MOTION for Settlement Joint Motion for Final Approval of Settlement of Federal Securities Claims filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. Motion Hearing set for 9/22/2010 03:30 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 7/23/2010)
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 836 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION OF ROBERT HATCH FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE by Judge Alsup granting #834 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 835 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION OF MARGERY BRONSTER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE by Judge Alsup granting #833 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
June 10, 2010 Filing 834 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Robert M. Hatch ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611046873.) filed by Henry Dement, David Okazaki, Roxanne Okazaki. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2010)
June 10, 2010 Filing 833 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Margery S. Bronster ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611046873.) filed by Henry Dement, David Okazaki, Roxanne Okazaki. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2010)
May 27, 2010 Filing 831 Letter from Stuart Zykorie and Andrea Zykorie re request to opt out of the class. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2010)
May 27, 2010 Filing 830 Letter from Samuel W. Doolittle re request to opt out of the class. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2010)
May 27, 2010 Filing 829 Letter from Lars K. Soreide re request to opt Beulah E. Hippele out of the class. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2010)
May 27, 2010 Filing 828 Letter from Darlene Lewis-Chinn re request to opt out of class action lawsuit. #820 (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2010) Modified on 5/28/2010 (sis, COURT STAFF).
May 27, 2010 Filing 827 Letter from James MacLeod re request to opt out of class action lawsuit. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2010)
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 826 ORDER DENYING STUART AND ANDREA ZYKORIE'S UNTIMELY REQUEST TO OPT OUT OF THE CLASS. #831 Signed by Judge Alsup on May 27, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/1/2010: #1 certificate of service) (sis, COURT STAFF).
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 825 ORDER DENYING DR. SAMUEL W. DOOLITTLE'S UNTIMELY REQUEST TO OPT OUT OF THE CLASS. #830 Signed by Judge Alsup on May 27, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/1/2010: #1 certificate of service) (sis, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/1/2010 (sis, COURT STAFF).
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 824 ORDER DENYING PROFESSOR JACK GARVEY'S REQUEST TO OPT OUT AFTER THE DEADLINE. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 26, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/1/2010: #1 Certificate of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF).
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 823 ORDER DENYING ROBERT WESTERVELT'S REQUEST TO OPT OUT OF THE CLASS. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 26, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/1/2010: #1 Certificate of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF).
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 822 SECOND ORDER DENYING THE UNION MISSION'S REQUEST TO OPT OUT AFTER THE DEADLINE. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 26, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2010)
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 821 ORDER DENYING BEULAH E. HIPPELE'S UNTIMELY REQUEST TO OPT OUT OF THE CLASS. #829 Signed by Judge Alsup on May 27, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2010) Modified on 6/1/2010 (sis, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/1/2010: #1 certificate of service) (sis, COURT STAFF).
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 820 SECOND ORDER DENYING DARLENE LEWIS-CHINN AND DAVID W. CHINN'S UNTIMELY REQUEST TO OPT OUT. #828 Signed by Judge Alsup on May 26, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2010) Modified on 5/28/2010 (sis, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/28/2010: #1 certificate of service) (sis, COURT STAFF).
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 819 ORDER DENYING JAMES MCLEOD'S UNTIMELY REQUEST TO OPT OUT OF THE CLASS. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 26, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/1/2010: #1 Certificate of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF).
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 818 ORDER DENYING H. MASON MORFIT'S UNTIMELY REQUEST TO OPT OUT OF THE CLASS by Judge Alsup denying #777 Motion for Late Exclusion from the Class (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2010)
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 817 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LATE EXCLUSION BY CLASS MEMBERS OATHOUT, BURDICK, AND ARMSTRONG by Judge Alsup granting #772 Motion for Late Exclusion from the Class (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2010)
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 816 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST BY DAVID AND JOAN SHANNON TO OPT OUT OF THE CLASS by Judge Alsup granting #753 Motion for Late Exclusion from the Class (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/28/2010: #1 certificate of service) (sis, COURT STAFF).
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 815 ORDER DENYING CLASS MEMBER CHOWATTUKUNNEL'S REQUEST TO OPT OUT OF THE CLASS by Judge Alsup denying #718 Motion for Leave to File (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2010)
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 814 ORDER DENYING TIMOTHY GARCIA AND NANCY LONG'S UNTIMELY REQUEST TO OPT OUT OF THE CLASS by Judge Alsup denying #775 Motion for Leave to File (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2010)
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 813 ORDER DENYING HARDEEP LUTHRA'S UNTIMELY REQUEST TO OPT OUT OF THE CLASS by Judge Alsup denying #758 Motion for Late Exclusion from the Class (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/28/2010: #1 certificate of service) (sis, COURT STAFF).
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 812 ORDER DENYING THE OKAZAKI FAMILY'S UNTIMELY REQUEST TO OPT OUT OF THE CLASS by Judge Alsup denying #760 Motion for Late Exclusion from the Class (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2010)
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 811 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION FOR LATE EXCLUSION BY CLASS MEMBERS CONNOLLY, ET AL. by Judge Alsup granting in part and denying in part #767 Motion for Late Exclusion from the Class (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2010)
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 810 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LATE EXCLUSION BY CLASS MEMBERS BECKMANN, FOX-MCMANUS, HOLMES, AND SILVER by Judge Alsup granting #764 Motion for Late Exclusion from the Class (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2010)
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 809 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MAUER & ASSOCIATES' MOTION FOR LATE EXCLUSION FROM THE CLASS by Judge Alsup granting in part and denying in part #776 Motion for Late Exclusion from the Class (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2010)
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 808 ORDER DENYING THE COPPERSMITHS' UNTIMELY REQUEST TO OPT OUT OF THE CLASS by Judge Alsup denying #785 Motion for Late Exclusion from Class (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/28/2010: #1 certificate of service) (sis, COURT STAFF).
May 26, 2010 Filing 807 RESPONSE to re #803 Order Class Counsel's Response to the Court's May 26, 2010 Questions Regarding Untimely Opt Out Requests by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/26/2010)
May 26, 2010 Filing 806 RESPONSE to re #803 Order re Questions to Counsel Regarding Untimely Opt Out Responses by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 5/26/2010)
May 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 805 ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND PROVIDING FOR NOTICE by Judge Alsup granting #687 Motion for Settlement (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2010)
May 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 804 ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING CALIFORNIA CLASS SETTLEMENT AND PROVIDING FOR NOTICE by Judge Alsup granting #778 Motion for Settlement (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2010)
May 26, 2010 Filing 803 QUESTIONS TO COUNSEL REGARDING UNTIMELY OUT-OUT REQUESTS. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 26, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2010)
May 25, 2010 Filing 832 Minute Entry: Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Hearing held on 5/25/2010 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 5/25/2010). Motion Hearing set for 9/22/2010 03:30 PM. (Court Reporter Joan Columbini.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/25/2010)
May 25, 2010 Filing 802 Proposed Order Preliminarily Approving Settlement and Providing Notice by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/25/2010)
May 25, 2010 Filing 801 Proposed Order Preliminary Approving California Class Settlement and Providing for Notice by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/25/2010)
May 20, 2010 Filing 800 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #798 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit D to the Stipulation of Settlement in support of the parties' settlement of the state claim by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 5/20/2010)
May 20, 2010 Filing 799 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #798 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit D to the Stipulation of Settlement in support of the parties' settlement of the federal claims by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 5/20/2010)
May 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 798 ORDER GRANTING SCHWAB'S MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Alsup granting #795 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2010)
May 19, 2010 Filing 797 Proposed Order re #793 Exhibits Granting Schwab's Motion to File Under Seal by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 5/19/2010)
May 19, 2010 Filing 796 Declaration of Dorothy L. Fernandez in Support of #793 Exhibits Schwab's May 19, 2010, Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Related document(s) #793 ) (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 5/19/2010)
May 19, 2010 Filing 795 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in Connection with Filing Exhibit D to the Stipulations of Settlement [related to document 793] filed by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 5/19/2010)
May 19, 2010 Filing 794 EXHIBITS re #784 Exhibits, Exhibit D to the Stipulation of Settlement for the California Class filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #784 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/19/2010)
May 19, 2010 Filing 793 EXHIBITS re #693 Brief, #788 Amended Document Exhibit D to the Stipulation of Settlement For the Federal Classes filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #693 , #788 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/19/2010)
May 18, 2010 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #778 Joint MOTION for Settlement Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of California Class Settlement filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. Motion Hearing set for 5/25/2010 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2010)
May 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 792 ORDER REGARDING EXHIBIT A TO PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF JOINT MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT OF CALIFORNIA CLASS CLAIMS by Judge Alsup granting #786 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2010)
May 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 791 ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING RE SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 18, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2010)
May 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 790 ORDER VACATING HEARING DATES FOR PENDING OPT-OUT REQUESTS. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 18, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2010)
May 18, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated. #777 MOTION Extension of Time to Request Exclusion and for Exclusion from Class Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 6 and 60 filed by H. Mason Morfit, #776 MOTION Exclusion from Class filed by Aspen Grove Townhome Association, Julia Peay, Gregory Peay, Maurer & Associates Capital Management, Inc., April A. Wright, The Wynona Dodge Trust, Donna D. Bischoff, Robert D. Bischoff, #775 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to be Allowed to Opt Out Late Due to Excusable Neglect filed by Timothy L Garcia, Nancy R Long. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2010)
May 17, 2010 Filing 1063 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL; Amendment No. 2 to Stipulation Settlement re #1055 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by YieldPlus Investor Group. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2010)
May 17, 2010 Filing 1062 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL; Joint Submission Regarding Amendment No. 2 to Class Action Settlement re #1055 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by YieldPlus Investor Group. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2010)
May 17, 2010 Filing 789 Brief re #788 Amended Document Joint Submission Regarding Amendment No. 3 to Class Action Settlement filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #788 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/17/2010)
May 17, 2010 Filing 788 AMENDED DOCUMENT by YieldPlus Investor Group. Amendment No. 3 to Stipulation of Settlement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/17/2010)
May 17, 2010 Filing 787 STIPULATION re #786 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document Administrative Motion of Plaintiff Concerning Exhibit A to Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement of California Class Claims by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/17/2010)
May 17, 2010 Filing 786 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document Administrative Motion of Plaintiff Concerning Exhibit A to Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement of California Class Claims filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/17/2010)
May 17, 2010 Filing 785 MOTION to Opt Out of Class Action; Declaration of Linda Coppersmith filed by Alvin and Linda Coppersmith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2010)
May 17, 2010 Filing 784 EXHIBITS re #779 Brief, Exhibit A to Plaintiff's Memorandum In Support of Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement of California Class Claims - REDACTED VERSION filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #779 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/17/2010)
May 17, 2010 Filing 783 RESPONSE to re #765 Order UNDER SEAL Amendment No. 2 to Stipulation of Settlement by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/17/2010)
May 17, 2010 Filing 782 RESPONSE to re #765 Order UNDER SEAL Joint Submission Regarding Amendment No. 2 to Class Action Settlement by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/17/2010)
May 14, 2010 Filing 781 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Shortening Time for the Hearing on the Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement of California Class Claims by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/14/2010)
May 14, 2010 Filing 780 Declaration of Steve W. Berman in Support of #778 Joint MOTION for Settlement Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of California Class Settlement filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) #778 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/14/2010)
May 14, 2010 Filing 779 Brief re #778 Joint MOTION for Settlement Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of California Class Settlement filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: *** # 1 Exhibit A FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT REMOVED PER COURT ORDER. SEE DOCUMENT NO. 784 FOR REDACTED VERSION. *** )(Related document(s) #778 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/14/2010) Modified on 5/17/2010 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2010 Filing 778 Joint MOTION for Settlement Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of California Class Settlement filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. Motion Hearing set for 6/24/2010 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/14/2010)
May 14, 2010 Filing 777 MOTION Extension of Time to Request Exclusion and for Exclusion from Class Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 6 and 60 filed by H. Mason Morfit. Motion Hearing set for 6/3/2010 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Motion of H. Mason Morfit, Trustee, for Extension of Time to Request Exclusion and for Exclusion from Class Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 6 and 60)(Friedberg, Alan) (Filed on 5/14/2010)
May 14, 2010 Filing 776 MOTION Exclusion from Class filed by Maurer & Associates Capital Management, Inc., Gregory Peay, Julia Peay, Donna D. Bischoff, The Wynona Dodge Trust, Robert D. Bischoff, April A. Wright, Aspen Grove Townhome Association. Motion Hearing set for 6/3/2010 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Motion of Maurer & Associates Capital Management, Inc.; Gregory Peay, Julie Peay; Donna D. Bischoff, Individually and on Behalf of The Wynona Dodge Trust and Robert D. Bischoff (Deceased); April A. Wright; and Aspen Grove Townhome Association for Exclusion from Class)(Friedberg, Alan) (Filed on 5/14/2010)
May 14, 2010 Filing 775 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to be Allowed to Opt Out Late Due to Excusable Neglect filed by Timothy L Garcia, Nancy R Long. Motion Hearing set for 6/24/2010 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Long, Nancy) (Filed on 5/14/2010)
May 13, 2010 Filing 774 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joan L. Burdick and Peggy A. Armstrong re #772 MOTION Accept Late-Filed Opt-Out From Class Action, #773 Affidavit (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
May 13, 2010 Filing 773 AFFIDAVIT of Joan L. Burdick re #772 MOTION Accept Late-Filed Opt-Out From Class Action, filed by Joan L. Burdick and Peggy A. Armstrong. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
May 13, 2010 Filing 772 MOTION to Accept Late-Filed Opt-Out From Class Action filed by Joan L. Burdick and Peggy A. Armstrong. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
May 13, 2010 Filing 771 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey re #753 MOTION Extend Opt-Out Period (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
May 13, 2010 Filing 770 Proposed Order re #753 MOTION Extend Opt-Out Period Denying Shannons' Motion to OPT Out of Class by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
May 13, 2010 Filing 769 Declaration of Dorothy L. Fernandez in Support of #753 MOTION Extend Opt-Out Period Schwab's Opposition Brief re Shannons' Motion to OPT Out of Class filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) #753 ) (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
May 13, 2010 Filing 768 Memorandum in Opposition re #753 MOTION Extend Opt-Out Period Opposition Brief re Shannons' Motion to OPT Out of Class filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
May 13, 2010 Filing 767 MOTION To Exclude From Class Settlement filed by Mark Connolly, Steven Rees, Ray Chezik, Lisa Schaefer, Rodney E. Thompson, Suzanna Thompson, Arthur Froot, Roger Fross, Arthur Whiteway, Paul Willey, Diane Willey, Richard Jones, Zhihua Sui. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit)(Edwards, Samuel) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
May 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 766 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF ALAN C. FRIEDBERG by Judge Alsup granting #761 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
May 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 765 FURTHER ORDER RE STATUS OF SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 13, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
May 13, 2010 Filing 764 MOTION To Opt-Out of Class Action filed by Lisa Fox-McManus, Gary Holmes, Shiela F. Silver, Martin J. Beckmann. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - F)(Edwards, Samuel) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
May 13, 2010 Filing 763 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by YieldPlus Investor Group re #762 Response ( Non Motion ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
May 13, 2010 Filing 762 RESPONSE to re #753 MOTION Extend Opt-Out Period Declaration of Carole K. Sylvester Re Motion for Extension of Opt Out Period by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
May 12, 2010 Filing 761 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Alan Friedberg ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611045783). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
May 12, 2010 Filing 760 MOTION Motion for Exclusion From Class filed by Henry Dement, David Okazaki, Roxanne Okazaki. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Roxanne Okazaki, #2 Declaration of David Okazaki, #3 Declaration of Henry Dement, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Proposed Order)(Nico, Leah) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
May 12, 2010 Filing 759 NOTICE of Appearance by Leah B Nico (Nico, Leah) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
May 12, 2010 Filing 758 MOTION Opt Out of Class filed by Hardeep Luthra. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 757 ORDER REGARDING MOTION TO OPT OUT BY CLASS MEMBERS D. SHANNON AND J. SHANNON. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 10, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2010)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 756 ORDER EXCLUDING CLASS MEMBERS WITH NOTICES RETURNED "UNDELIVERABLE". Signed by Judge Alsup on May 7, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2010)
May 7, 2010 Filing 755 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #754 Declaration in Support, #753 MOTION Extend Opt-Out Period, by David Shannon. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2010)
May 7, 2010 Filing 754 Declaration of David Shannon in Support of #753 MOTION Extend Opt-Out Period filed by David Shannon. (Related document(s) #753 ) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2010)
May 7, 2010 Filing 753 MOTION to Extend Opt-Out Period filed by David Shannon and Joan Shannon. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2010)
May 7, 2010 Filing 752 NOTICE by YieldPlus Investor Group Plaintiffs' Notice of Status of California Stipulation of Settlement and Motion for Preliminary Approval (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/7/2010)
May 7, 2010 Filing 751 RESPONSE to re #748 Order dated May 6, 2010 by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/7/2010)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 750 ORDER GRANTING INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE SECTION 17200 CLAIM by Judge Alsup granting #740 Motion for Summary Judgment (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2010)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 749 ORDER DENYING CLASS MEMBERS LEWIS-CHINN AND CHINN'S REQUEST TO OPT OUT. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 6, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/7/2010: #1 Certificate of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 748 ORDER REQUESTING LIST OF CERTAIN CLASS MEMBERS. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 6, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2010)
May 5, 2010 Filing 1061 Response re #742 ORDER RE STATUS SETTLEMENT byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Gary Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. Filed in Public Docket per #1055 ORDER REGARDING SEALING OF AMENDMENT SUBMISSIONS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2010)
May 5, 2010 Filing 747 Minute Entry: Status Conference (Date Filed: 5/5/2010). Trial and motion for summary judgment set for 5/10/10 are vacated. (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/5/2010)
May 5, 2010 Filing 746 RESPONSE FILED UNDER SEAL to re #742 Order re Status Settlement by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2010)
May 5, 2010 Filing 745 RESPONSE to re #742 Order re Status of Settlement by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 5/5/2010)
May 4, 2010 Filing 744 CLERKS NOTICE Scheduling Hearing. Status Conference set for 5/5/2010 03:00 PM. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2010)
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 743 ORDER FOR EXPEDITED BRIEFING AND HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 4, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2010)
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 742 ORDER RE STATUS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 4, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2010)
May 4, 2010 Filing 741 Reply Memorandum to Respondents' Opposition Brief re Chowattukunnel's Motion to Opt Out of Class filed byThomas T Chowattukunnel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Edwards, Samuel) (Filed on 5/4/2010)
May 3, 2010 Filing 740 MOTION for Summary Judgment Individual Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Summary Judgment re Section 17200 Claim filed by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2010 07:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Individual Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Summary Judgment re Section 17200 Claim)(Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
May 3, 2010 Filing 739 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order for Expedited Briefing and Hearing by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
April 30, 2010 Filing 738 Proposed Order re #736 Memorandum in Opposition, re Chowattukunnel's Motion to Opt Out of Class by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 4/30/2010)
April 30, 2010 Filing 737 Declaration of Dorothy L. Fernandez in Support of #736 Memorandum in Opposition, re Chowattukunnel's Motion to Opt Out of Class filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) #736 ) (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 4/30/2010)
April 30, 2010 Filing 736 Memorandum in Opposition re #718 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Opt-Out of Class Action filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 4/30/2010)
April 29, 2010 Filing 734 RESPONSE to re #733 Order dated April 28, 2010 by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/29/2010)
April 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 733 ORDER REGARDING CLASS MEMBER ROBERT WESTERVELT. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 28, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2010)
April 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 724 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING EXHIBITS A AND C TO SUPPLEMENTAL O'HARA DECLARATION ON NOTICE by Judge Alsup granting #721 Motion (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2010)
April 27, 2010 Filing 723 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4/26/2010, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, Telephone number (415) 431-1477. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/26/2010. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 4/27/2010)
April 27, 2010 Filing 722 STIPULATION re #721 MOTION Administrative Motion of Plaintiffs Concerning Exhibits A and C to the Supplemental Declaration of Christopher A. O'Hara On Notice by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/27/2010)
April 27, 2010 Filing 721 MOTION Administrative Motion of Plaintiffs Concerning Exhibits A and C to the Supplemental Declaration of Christopher A. O'Hara On Notice filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/27/2010)
April 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 720 ORDER REGARDING UNTIMELY OPT OUTS. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 27, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2010)
April 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 719 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE MOTION AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR CLASS MEMBER CHOWATTUKUNNEL. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 27, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2010)
April 26, 2010 Filing 735 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 4/26/2010 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 4/26/2010) re #687 Joint MOTION for Settlement Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement of Federal Securities Claims filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. Evidentiary Hearing Held. Court heard comments on issue of opt-outs. (Court Reporter Debra Pas.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/26/2010)
April 26, 2010 Filing 718 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Opt-Out of Class Action filed by Thomas T Chowattukunnel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Edwards, Samuel) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
April 26, 2010 Filing 717 MOTION for Leave to File Class Action Opt-Out Notice filed by Thomas T Chowattukunnel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter to Schwab Class Action Attys)(Edwards, Samuel) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
April 26, 2010 Filing 716 DECLARATION of Lonnie Broussard IN OPPOSITION TO INCLUSION OF THE UNION MISSION MINISTRIES IN YIELDPLUS SETTLEMENT CLASS filed byThe Union Mission Ministries. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sparer, Alan) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
April 26, 2010 Filing 715 EXHIBITS re #696 Response ( Non Motion ), Exhibits A and C to the Supplemental Declaration of Christopher A. O'Hara on Notice filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #696 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/26/2010) Modified on 4/27/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
April 26, 2010 Filing 714 EXHIBITS re #550 Declaration in Support,, Exhibits A-C and E-J to the Declaration of Steve W. Berman In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Schwab's Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Identification of Misstatements and to Exclude Evidence filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #550 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
April 26, 2010 Filing 713 Memorandum in Opposition re #487 MOTION to Strike Schwab's Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Identification of Misstatements and Exclude Evidence Unredacted Version Pursuant to Court Order dated 4/9/10, Dkt. No. 593 filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
April 26, 2010 Filing 712 EXHIBITS re #452 Declaration in Support,, Exhibits P, X-Y and WW to the Declaration of Steve W. Berman In Support of Plaintiffs' Memorandum In Opposition to Schwab's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P, #2 Exhibit X, #3 Exhibit Y, #4 Exhibit WW Part 1, #5 Exhibit WW Part 2)(Related document(s) #452 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
April 26, 2010 Filing 711 EXHIBITS re #439 Declaration in Opposition,,, Exhibits 5, 8-9, 16, 19-21 and 27 to the Declaration of Steve W. Berman In Oppositon to Independent Trustees' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5, #2 Exhibit 8, #3 Exhibit 9, #4 Exhibit 16, #5 Exhibit 19, #6 Exhibit 20, #7 Exhibit 21, #8 Exhibit 27)(Related document(s) #439 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
April 26, 2010 Filing 710 REDACTION Plaintiffs' Memorandum In Opposition to Independent Trustees' Motion for Summary Judgment - Redacted Version Pursuant to Court Order dated 2/2/10, Dkt. No. 554 by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
April 26, 2010 Filing 709 EXHIBITS re #445 Declaration in Opposition,,, Exhibits 4, 5, 8-9, 22-23, 26-28, 31, 33 and 38 to the Declaration of Steve W. Berman In Opposition to Kimon P. Daifotis's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4, #2 Exhibit 5, #3 Exhibit 8, #4 Exhibit 9, #5 Exhibit 22, #6 Exhibit 23, #7 Exhibit 26, #8 Exhibit 27, #9 Exhibit 28, #10 Exhibit 31, #11 Exhibit 33, #12 Exhibit 38)(Related document(s) #445 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
April 26, 2010 Filing 708 REDACTION Plaintiffs' Memorandum In Opposition to Kimon P. Daifotis's Motion For Summary Judgment - Redacted Version Pursuant to Order Dated 2/2/10 Dkt. No. 555 by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
April 23, 2010 Filing 700 DECLARATION of Steven Choi in Opposition to Being Deemed a Class Member for Failure to Timely Opt Out of the Class, filed by Steven Choi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2010)
April 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 699 ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR CONSIDERATION OF JOINT MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT by Judge Alsup granting #689 Motion to Shorten Time (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2010)
April 23, 2010 Filing 698 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by YieldPlus Investor Group re #696 Response ( Non Motion ), Response ( Non Motion ), #697 Response ( Non Motion ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/23/2010)
April 23, 2010 Filing 697 RESPONSE to re #609 Order, Declaration of Reed R. Kathrein by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/23/2010)
April 23, 2010 Filing 696 RESPONSE to re #609 Order, Supplemental Declaration of Christopher A. O'Hara on Notice by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: *** # 1 Exhibit A FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT LOCKED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** , #2 Exhibit B, *** # 3 Exhibit C FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT LOCKED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** , #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/23/2010) Modified on 4/26/2010 (ewn, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/28/2010: #11 Exhibits A and C) (wsn, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2010 Filing 695 Statement Schwab's Statement in Support of Settlement by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 4/23/2010)
April 23, 2010 Filing 694 Declaration of David Mikelonis in Support of #687 Joint MOTION for Settlement Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement of Federal Securities Claims filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #687 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/23/2010)
April 23, 2010 Filing 693 Brief re #687 Joint MOTION for Settlement Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement of Federal Securities Claims Plaintiffs' Memorandum In Support of Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement of Federal Securities Claims filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #687 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/23/2010)
April 23, 2010 Filing 692 RESPONSE to re #609 Order, Declaration of Cameron G. Stout Concerning Notice of Hearing to Certain YieldPlus Investors by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 4/23/2010)
April 23, 2010 Filing 691 RESPONSE to re #609 Order, Declaration of Dorothy L. Fernandez in Response to Directions at April 19, 2010 Status Conference by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8 (part 1 of 3), #9 Exhibit 8 (part 2 of 3), #10 Exhibit 8 (part 3 of 3))(Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 4/23/2010)
April 23, 2010 Filing 690 Declaration of Steve W. Berman in Support of #689 MOTION to Shorten Time Plaintiffs' Motion to Shorten Time for the Consideration of Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement of Federal Securities Claims filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #689 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/23/2010)
April 23, 2010 Filing 689 MOTION to Shorten Time Plaintiffs' Motion to Shorten Time for the Consideration of Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement of Federal Securities Claims filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/23/2010)
April 23, 2010 Filing 688 Declaration of Steve W. Berman in Support of #687 Joint MOTION for Settlement Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement of Federal Securities Claims filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) #687 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/23/2010)
April 23, 2010 Filing 687 Joint MOTION for Settlement Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement of Federal Securities Claims filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/23/2010)
April 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 686 ORDER GRANTING SCHWAB'S MOTION TO SEAL by Judge Alsup granting #670 Motion to Seal Document (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2010)
April 22, 2010 Filing 685 Brief re #684 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief In Support of Schwab Defendants' Motion for Certification for Interlocutory Appeal -AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed byInvestment Company Institute. (Related document(s) #684 ) (Larrabee, Matthew) (Filed on 4/22/2010)
April 22, 2010 Filing 684 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief In Support of Schwab Defendants' Motion for Certification for Interlocutory Appeal filed by Investment Company Institute. Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2010 02:00 PM. (Larrabee, Matthew) (Filed on 4/22/2010)
April 22, 2010 Filing 683 Reply Memorandum in Support of Certification for Interlocutory Appeal and Stay filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 4/22/2010)
April 21, 2010 Filing 682 Minute Entry: Status Conference (Date Filed: 4/21/2010). (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/21/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 707 MOTION in Limine No. 6 FILED UNDER SEAL re Evidence of Alleged Mismanagement filed by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 706 MEMORANDUM in Opposition FILED UNDER SEAL re #668 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Evidence of Statements to the General Public and Pre-Investment Contact with Moneta Financial and TCI filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #668 ) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 705 MEMORANDUM in Opposition FILED UNDER SEAL re #657 MOTION in Limine Schwab's Daubert Motion to Exclude Portions of the Testimony of H. Gifford Fong filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #657 ) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 704 MEMORANDUM in Opposition FILED UNDER SEAL re #655 MOTION in Limine No. 6 re Evidence of Alleged Mismanagement filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #655 ) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 703 MEMORANDUM in Opposition FILED UNDER SEAL re #651 MOTION in Limine No. 4 to Exclude Evidence of Falsity Based on Concentration in Corporate Financial Bonds filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #651 ) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 702 EXHIBITS 1 and 3-5 FILED UNDER SEAL re #647 Declaration in Opposition, filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #647 ) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 701 EXHIBIT G FILED UNDER SEAL re #645 Declaration in Support, filed by Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Matthew Hastings, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, The Charles Schwab Corporation. (Related document(s) #645 ) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 681 NOTICE by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey Schwab Defendants' Federal Rule of Civil Procedure Rule 26(A)(3) Disclosures (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 680 Brief re #673 Pretrial Conference Statement, Schwab's Memorandum of Law in Support of Disputed Jury Instructions filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Related document(s) #673 ) (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 679 TRIAL BRIEF by Kimon Daifotis. (Albarran, Tammy) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 678 NOTICE by Kimon Daifotis Rule 26(A)(3) Pretrial Disclosures (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Albarran, Tammy) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 677 Brief Defendant Kimon P. Daifotis' Memorandum of Law in Support of Disputed Jury Instructions on Section 12(A)(2) filed byKimon Daifotis. (Albarran, Tammy) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 676 TRIAL BRIEF Plaintiffs' Trial Brief Regarding California UCL Relief by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 675 NOTICE by YieldPlus Investor Group Plaintiffs' Pretrial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(3) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 674 Brief Plaintiffs' Memorandum In Support of Disputed Jury Instructions filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 673 Pretrial Conference Statement by YieldPlus Investor Group Joint Proposed Final Pretrial Order. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Appendix C, #4 Appendix D, #5 Appendix E, #6 Appendix F, #7 Appendix G, #8 Appendix H)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 672 Declaration of Dorothy L. Fernandez in Support of #670 MOTION to Seal Document #660 Memorandum in Opposition,, #655 MOTION in Limine No. 6 re Evidence of Alleged Mismanagement, #644 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Statements Outside the Fund's Prospectuses, #652 Memorandum in Opp MOTION to Seal Document #660 Memorandum in Opposition,, #655 MOTION in Limine No. 6 re Evidence of Alleged Mismanagement, #644 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Statements Outside the Fund's Prospectuses, #652 Memorandum in Opp MOTION to Seal Document #660 Memorandum in Opposition,, #655 MOTION in Limine No. 6 re Evidence of Alleged Mismanagement, #644 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Statements Outside the Fund's Prospectuses, #652 Memorandum in Opp MOTION to Seal Document #660 Memorandum in Opposition,, #655 MOTION in Limine No. 6 re Evidence of Alleged Mismanagement, #644 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Statements Outside the Fund's Prospectuses, #652 Memorandum in Opp filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Related document(s) #670 ) (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 671 *** FILED IN ERROR. DUPLICATE OF DOCKET #670 . *** Proposed Order re #670 MOTION to Seal Document #660 Memorandum in Opposition,, #655 MOTION in Limine No. 6 re Evidence of Alleged Mismanagement, #644 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Statements Outside the Fund's Prospectuses, #652 Memorandum in Opp MOTION to Seal Document #660 Memorandum in Opposition,, #655 MOTION in Limine No. 6 re Evidence of Alleged Mismanagement, #644 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Statements Outside the Fund's Prospectuses, #652 Memorandum in Opp MOTION to Seal Document #660 Memorandum in Opposition,, #655 MOTION in Limine No. 6 re Evidence of Alleged Mismanagement, #644 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Statements Outside the Fund's Prospectuses, #652 Memorandum in Opp MOTION to Seal Document #660 Memorandum in Opposition,, #655 MOTION in Limine No. 6 re Evidence of Alleged Mismanagement, #644 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Statements Outside the Fund's Prospectuses, #652 Memorandum in Opp by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 4/19/2010) Modified on 4/20/2010 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
April 19, 2010 Filing 670 MOTION to Seal Document #660 Memorandum in Opposition,, #655 MOTION in Limine No. 6 re Evidence of Alleged Mismanagement, #644 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Statements Outside the Fund's Prospectuses, #652 Memorandum in Opposition,, #645 Declaration in Support,, #656 Memorandum in Opposition,, #647 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 669 Memorandum in Opposition re #668 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Evidence of Statements to the General Public and Pre-Investment Contact with Moneta Financial and TCI (REDACTED) filed byKimon Daifotis. (Albarran, Tammy) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 668 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Evidence of Statements to the General Public and Pre-Investment Contact with Moneta Financial and TCI filed by Kimon Daifotis. Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Albarran, Tammy) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 667 MOTION in Limine Schwab's List of Additional Evidence Objections filed by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 666 Memorandum in Opposition re #665 MOTION in Limine Schwab's Motion for a Separate Trial on Plaintiffs' Section 17200 Claim filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 665 MOTION in Limine Schwab's Motion for a Separate Trial on Plaintiffs' Section 17200 Claim filed by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 664 Memorandum in Opposition re #663 MOTION in Limine Schwab's Daubert Motion to Exclude Portions of the Testimony of Candace L. Preston filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 663 MOTION in Limine Schwab's Daubert Motion to Exclude Portions of the Testimony of Candace L. Preston filed by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 662 Memorandum in Opposition re #661 MOTION in Limine Schwab's Daubert Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Paul F. Meyer filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 661 MOTION in Limine Schwab's Daubert Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Paul F. Meyer filed by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 660 Memorandum in Opposition re #657 MOTION in Limine Schwab's Daubert Motion to Exclude Portions of the Testimony of H. Gifford Fong (redacted) filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 659 Declaration of Frank Allen Ferrell in Support of #657 MOTION in Limine Schwab's Daubert Motion to Exclude Portions of the Testimony of H. Gifford Fong filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Related document(s) #657 ) (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 658 Declaration of Dorothy L. Fernandez in Support of #657 MOTION in Limine Schwab's Daubert Motion to Exclude Portions of the Testimony of H. Gifford Fong filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Related document(s) #657 ) (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 657 MOTION in Limine Schwab's Daubert Motion to Exclude Portions of the Testimony of H. Gifford Fong filed by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 656 Memorandum in Opposition re #655 MOTION in Limine No. 6 re Evidence of Alleged Mismanagement (redacted) filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 655 MOTION in Limine No. 6 re Evidence of Alleged Mismanagement filed by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 654 Memorandum in Opposition re #653 MOTION in Limine No. 5 to Exclude Evidence re Section 13(a) and No Shareholder Vote MOTION in Limine No. 5 to Exclude Evidence re Section 13(a) and No Shareholder Vote MOTION in Limine No. 5 to Exclude Evidence re Section 13(a) and No Shareholder Vote filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 653 MOTION in Limine No. 5 to Exclude Evidence re Section 13(a) and No Shareholder Vote filed by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 652 Memorandum in Opposition re #651 MOTION in Limine No. 4 to Exclude Evidence of Falsity Based on Concentration in Corporate Financial Bonds (redacted) filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 651 MOTION in Limine No. 4 to Exclude Evidence of Falsity Based on Concentration in Corporate Financial Bonds filed by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 650 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Granting Schwab's Motion in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Evidence of Settlements, Settlement Discussions and Arbitration by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 649 Memorandum in Opposition to #648 Motion in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Evidence of Oral Statements to Class Members filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 4/19/2010) Modified on 4/20/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
April 19, 2010 Filing 648 MOTION in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Evidence of Oral Statements to Class Members filed by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 647 DECLARATION of Steve W. Berman In Opposition to Defendants' Motions in Limine and Daubert Motions with Exhibits 1, 3, 4, 5 (redacted) and 2, 6, and 7 (unredacted) filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 646 Memorandum in Opposition re #644 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Statements Outside the Fund's Prospectuses filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 645 Declaration of Kimberly L. Taylor in Support of Motions in Limine No. 1-6 and Motion for a Separate Trial on Plaintiffs' Section 17200 Claim filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G - redacted, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 644 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Statements Outside the Fund's Prospectuses filed by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 643 Proposed Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motions In Limine Nos. 1-5 by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 642 Joinder re #629 Memorandum in Opposition, #639 Memorandum in Opposition, #632 Memorandum in Opposition, #641 Memorandum in Opposition Defendant Kimon P. Daifotis' Joinder in Schwab's Oppositions to Plaintiffs' Motions In Limine Nos. 1, 2, 4, & 5 by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 641 Memorandum in Opposition re #640 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine #5 filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 640 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine #5 filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 639 Memorandum in Opposition re #637 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine #4 filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 638 Declaration of Steve W. Berman in Support of #637 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine #4 filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Part 1, #2 Exhibit A Part 2, #3 Exhibit A Part 3, #4 Exhibit A Part 4, #5 Exhibit A Part 5)(Related document(s) #637 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 637 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine #4 filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 636 Memorandum in Opposition re #634 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine #3 Defendant Kimon P. Daifotis' Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion In Limine #3 filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 635 Memorandum in Opposition re #634 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine #3 filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 634 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine #3 filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 633 Declaration of Kimberly L. Taylor in Support of #632 Memorandum in Opposition filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #632 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 632 Memorandum in Opposition re #630 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine #2 filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 631 Declaration of Steve W. Berman in Support of #630 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine #2 filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #630 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 630 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine #2 filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 629 Memorandum in Opposition re #627 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine #1 filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 628 Declaration of Steve W. Berman in Support of #627 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine #1 filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) #627 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 627 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine #1 filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 16, 2010 Filing 626 Minute Entry: FurtherSettlement Conference held on 4/15/10 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (Court Reporter Not reported.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/16/2010)
April 16, 2010 Filing 625 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey re #623 Declaration in Support,, #622 Response ( Non Motion ), Response ( Non Motion ) CORRECTION OF DOCKET #624 (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 4/16/2010)
April 16, 2010 Filing 624 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT #625 . *** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey re #623 Declaration in Support,, #622 Response ( Non Motion ), Response ( Non Motion ) (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 4/16/2010) Modified on 4/16/2010 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
April 16, 2010 Filing 623 Declaration of Dorothy L. Fernandez in Support of Schwab's Response to April 13, 2010 Order re Class Notice filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 4/16/2010)
April 16, 2010 Filing 622 RESPONSE to re #610 Order re Class Notice dated 4/13/2010 by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 4/16/2010)
April 16, 2010 Filing 620 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by YieldPlus Investor Group re #618 Declaration in Support, #619 Declaration in Support, #617 Declaration in Support, #616 Response ( Non Motion ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/16/2010)
April 16, 2010 Filing 619 Declaration of Reed R. Kathrein in Support of #616 Response ( Non Motion ) filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #616 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/16/2010)
April 16, 2010 Filing 618 Declaration of Carole K. Sylvester in Support of #616 Response ( Non Motion ) filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #616 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/16/2010)
April 16, 2010 Filing 617 Declaration of Christopher A. O'Hara in Support of #616 Response ( Non Motion ) filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #616 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/16/2010)
April 16, 2010 Filing 616 RESPONSE to re #609 Order, dated April 13, 2010 by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/16/2010)
April 15, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 4/19/2010 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2010)
April 15, 2010 Filing 615 Memorandum in Opposition to Schwab Defendants' Motion for Certification for Interlocutory Appeal and Stay filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/15/2010)
April 15, 2010 Filing 614 NOTICE SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE for 8:00 a.m. on Monday, 4/19/2010 in Courtroom 9. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 4/15/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2010)
April 15, 2010 Filing 613 Brief Amicus Curiae on Defendants' Motion for Certification Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) filed byU.S. Securities and Exchange Commission. (Berger, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/15/2010)
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 612 ORDER RE ATTORNEY-CLIENT PRIVILEGE WITH RESPECT TO DEFENDANT KIMON DAIFOTIS. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 14, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2010)
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 611 ORDER REGARDING SECTION 12 DAMAGES UNDER THE 1933 ACT [re (390 in 3:08-cv-01510-WHA) MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Schwab Investments, Evelyn Dilsaver, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Matthew Hastings, George Pereira, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Charles R. Schwab, Randall W. Merk]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 4/14/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2010)
April 13, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Further Case Management Conference re #609 ORDER VACATING PRIOR ORDERS RE EMAILED NOTICE, REQUESTING RESPONSES, AND SETTING HEARING set for 4/29/2010 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2010)
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 610 ORDER REGARDING HEARING ON CLASS MEMBER NOTICE. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 13, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/14/2010: #1 Certificate of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF).
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 609 ORDER VACATING PRIOR ORDERS RE EMAILED NOTICE, REQUESTING RESPONSES, AND SETTING HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 13, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/13/2010: #1 Certficate of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF).
April 13, 2010 Filing 608 CLERKS NOTICE Rescheduling Motion Hearing. Motion to Strike Hearing set for 4/26/2010 02:00 PM. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2010)
April 12, 2010 Filing 621 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 4/12/2010 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 4/12/2010). (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/12/2010)
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 607 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER REGARDING CLASS NOTICE. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 12, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 606 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CLASS NOTICE by Judge Alsup granting #523 Joint Unopposed Motion Re Class Notice (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 605 ORDER REGARDING LIMITS APPLICABLE TO PRETRIAL MOTIONS by Judge Alsup granting in part and denying in part #596 Administrative Motion (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
April 12, 2010 Filing 604 Declaration of Peter L. Crudo in Support of #589 Order Declaration of Peter L. Crudo on Notice of Pendency filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #589 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
April 12, 2010 Filing 603 Declaration of Christopher A. O'Hara in Support of #589 Order Declaration of Christopher A. O'Hara on Notice of Pendency filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #589 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
April 11, 2010 Filing 602 Response re #596 MOTION Aministrative Motion of Plaintiffs Concerning Limits Applicable to Pretrial Motions in Limine Response to Administrative Motion Concerning Pretrial Motions byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 4/11/2010)
April 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 601 ORDER DENYING THE UNION MISSION'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR EXCLUSION FROM THE CLASS by Judge Alsup denying #476 Motion (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2010)
April 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 600 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE CONFERENCE FOR 9:00 A.M. ON MONDAY, APRIL 12, 1010. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 4/9/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2010)
April 9, 2010 Filing 597 Declaration of Steve W. Berman in Support of #596 MOTION Aministrative Motion of Plaintiffs Concerning Limits Applicable to Pretrial Motions in Limine filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #596 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/9/2010)
April 9, 2010 Filing 596 MOTION Aministrative Motion of Plaintiffs Concerning Limits Applicable to Pretrial Motions in Limine filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/9/2010)
April 9, 2010 Filing 594 RESPONSE to re #587 Order Dated April 8, 2010 - Request for Guidance re Voluminous Motions by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/9/2010)
April 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 593 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO SEAL by Judge Alsup granting in part and denying in part #551 Motion to Seal (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2010)
April 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 592 ORDER GRANTING THE UNION MISSION'S MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Alsup granting #541 Motion to Seal (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2010)
April 8, 2010 Filing 591 Reply Memorandum Schwab's Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Identification of Misstatements and Exclude Evidence filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 4/8/2010)
April 8, 2010 Filing 590 Declaration of Dorothy L. Fernandez in Support of Plaintiffs' April 1, 2010, Administrative Motion to File Under Seal [Dkt. No. 551] filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Kimberly) (Filed on 4/8/2010)
April 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 589 ORDER REGARDING CLASS NOTICE. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 8, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2010)
April 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 588 ORDER REGARDING RESPONSES TO RECENT QUESTIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 8, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2010)
April 8, 2010 Filing 587 REQUEST FOR GUIDANCE RE VOLUMINOUS MOTIONS. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 4/8/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2010)
April 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 586 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE PART OF PROFESSOR JAMES' TESTIMONY [re (379 in 3:08-cv-01510-WHA) MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Defendants' Expert, Christopher M. James; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed by YieldPlus Investor Group]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 4/8/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2010)
April 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 585 ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING SECTION 12 AND SECTION 17200 CLAIMS [denying re (372 in 3:08-cv-01510-WHA) MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Kimon Daifotis, and denying in part and granting in part re (377 in 3:08-cv-01510-WHA) MOTION for Summary Judgment of Individual Trustees, filed by Donald R. Stephens, Mariann Byerwalter, Michael W. Wilsey, Gerald B. Smith, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Robert G. Holmes]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 4/8/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2010)
April 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 584 ORDER RE DISCLOSURE AND LOSS-CAUSATION MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [denying (384 in 3:08-cv-01510-WHA) MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment Re: Negative Causation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by YieldPlus Investor Group], and denying(390 in 3:08-cv-01510-WHA) MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Schwab Investments, Evelyn Dilsaver, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Matthew Hastings, George Pereira, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Charles R. Schwab, Randall W. Merk]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 4/8/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2010)
April 8, 2010 Filing 583 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 4/8/2010)
April 8, 2010 Filing 582 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/8/2010)
April 8, 2010 Filing 581 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Taking Settlement Conference Off Calendar by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 4/8/2010)
April 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 580 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 4/8/2010.. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 8, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2010)
April 7, 2010 Filing 579 Proposed Order re #578 Statement of Recent Decision,, [Proposed] Order Granting Schwab's Request for Leave to File Statement of Recent Decision by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 4/7/2010)
April 7, 2010 Filing 578 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d Schwab's Request for Leave to File Statement of Recent Decision filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 4/7/2010)
April 7, 2010 Filing 577 Declaration of Kimberly L. Taylor in Support of #576 Response ( Non Motion ), Response ( Non Motion ) to the Court's April 7, 2010 Order, filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P)(Related document(s) #576 ) (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 4/7/2010)
April 7, 2010 Filing 576 RESPONSE to re #573 Order dated April 7, 2010 by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 4/7/2010)
April 7, 2010 Filing 575 RESPONSE to re #573 Order Dated April 7, 2010 by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/7/2010)
April 7, 2010 Filing 574 RESPONSE to re #572 Notice (Other) Response of Defendant Kimon P. Daifotis to Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority Filed on April 6, 2010 by Kimon Daifotis. (Bayless, David) (Filed on 4/7/2010)
April 7, 2010 Filing 573 MORE QUESTIONS REGARDING PENDING SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 7, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2010)
April 6, 2010 Filing 572 NOTICE by YieldPlus Investor Group Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/6/2010)
April 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 571 ORDER RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION ON INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL AND STAY by Judge Alsup granting #567 Motion for Certificate of Appealability (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2010)
April 5, 2010 Filing 570 RESPONSE to re #560 Order dated April 5, 2010 by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/5/2010)
April 5, 2010 Filing 569 RESPONSE to re #560 Order dated April 5, 2010 by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 4/5/2010)
April 5, 2010 Filing 568 STIPULATION re #567 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability and Stay : Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for Expedited Briefing and Hearing by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 4/5/2010)
April 5, 2010 Filing 567 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability and Stay filed by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Schwab's Motion for Certification for Interlocutory Appeal and Stay)(Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 4/5/2010)
April 5, 2010 Filing 560 QUESTIONS ON PENDING MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 5, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2010)
April 2, 2010 Filing 725 EXHIBIT K FILED UNDER SEAL re #550 Declaration of Steve W. Berman in Support, filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #550 ) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2010) Modified on 2/23/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
April 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 559 ORDER GRANTING SCHWAB'S MOTION TO SEAL (DKT. NO. 528) by Judge Alsup granting #528 Motion to Seal (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2010)
April 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 558 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO SEAL (DKT. NO. 472) by Judge Alsup granting #472 Motion to Seal (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2010)
April 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 557 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL (DKT. NO. 468) by Judge Alsup granting #468 Motion to Seal (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2010)
April 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 556 ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL (DKT. NO. 458) by Judge Alsup granting #458 Motion to Seal (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2010)
April 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 555 ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO SEAL (DKT. NO. 446) by Judge Alsup granting #446 Motion to Seal (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2010)
April 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 554 ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO SEAL (DKT. NO. 440) by Judge Alsup granting #440 Motion to Seal (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2010)
April 1, 2010 Filing 599 Declaration of Paula Utegg FILED UNDER SEAL in Support of #476 MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR EXCLUSION FROM THE CLASS MEMBERSHIP UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 6 filed by The Union Mission Ministries. (Related document(s) #476 ) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2010)
April 1, 2010 Filing 598 Supplemental Declaration of Philip Farthing FILED UNDER SEAL in Support of #476 MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR EXCLUSION FROM THE CLASS MEMBERSHIP UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 6 filed by The Union Mission Ministries. (Related document(s) #476 ) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2010)
April 1, 2010 Filing 595 Reply Memorandum FILED UNDER SEAL; The Union Mission's Brief in Reply to Schwab's Opposition re #476 MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR EXCLUSION FROM THE CLASS MEMBERSHIP UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 6 filed by The Union Mission Ministries. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2010)
April 1, 2010 Filing 553 Appendix re #549 Memorandum in Opposition Appendix of Selected Authorities filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Related document(s) #549 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/1/2010)
April 1, 2010 Filing 552 NOTICE by YieldPlus Investor Group re #549 Memorandum in Opposition, #550 Declaration in Support,, Manual Filing Notification (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/1/2010)
April 1, 2010 Filing 551 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/1/2010)
April 1, 2010 Filing 550 Declaration of Steve W. Berman in Support of #549 Memorandum in Opposition to Schwab's Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Identification of Misstatements and to Exclude Evidence filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Related document(s) #549 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/1/2010)
April 1, 2010 Filing 549 Memorandum in Opposition re #487 MOTION to Strike Schwab's Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Identification of Misstatements and Exclude Evidence filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/1/2010)
April 1, 2010 Filing 548 NOTICE by The Union Mission Ministries CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY OVERNIGHT DELIVERY (Haber, Marc) (Filed on 4/1/2010) Modified on 4/2/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
April 1, 2010 Filing 547 Declaration of PAULA UTEGG IN SUPPORT OF THE UNION MISSION MINISTRIES MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR EXCLUSION FROM THE CLASS MEMBERSHIP filed byThe Union Mission Ministries. (Haber, Marc) (Filed on 4/1/2010)
April 1, 2010 Filing 546 NOTICE by The Union Mission Ministries MANUAL FILING NOTIFICATION (SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF PHILIP FARTHING IN SUPPORT OF IN SUPPORT OF THE UNION MISSION MINISTRIES MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR EXCLUSION FROM THE CLASS MEMBERSHIP AND EXHIBITS 1-8 THERETO) (Haber, Marc) (Filed on 4/1/2010)
April 1, 2010 Filing 545 Declaration SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF JAMES HERNDON IN SUPPORT OF THE UNION MISSION MINISTRIES MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR EXCLUSION FROM THE CLASS MEMBERSHIP filed byThe Union Mission Ministries. (Haber, Marc) (Filed on 4/1/2010)
April 1, 2010 Filing 544 Reply Memorandum THE UNION MISSIONS BRIEF IN REPLY TO SCHWABS OPPOSITION TO THE UNION MISSIONS MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR EXCLUSION FROM THE CLASS MEMBERSHIP UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 6 filed byThe Union Mission Ministries. (Haber, Marc) (Filed on 4/1/2010)
April 1, 2010 Filing 543 Proposed Order GRANTING THE UNION MISSIONS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL IN CONNECTION WITH THE UNION MISSIONS BRIEF IN REPLY TO SCHWABS OPPOSITION TO THE UNION MISSIONS MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR EXCLUSION FROM THE CLASS MEMBERSHIP by The Union Mission Ministries. (Haber, Marc) (Filed on 4/1/2010)
April 1, 2010 Filing 542 Declaration of Marc Haber IN SUPPORT OF THE UNION MISSIONS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL IN CONNECTION WITH THE UNION MISSIONS BRIEF IN REPLY TO SCHWABS OPPOSITION TO THE UNION MISSIONS MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR EXCLUSION FROM THE CLASS MEMBERSHIP filed byThe Union Mission Ministries. (Haber, Marc) (Filed on 4/1/2010)
April 1, 2010 Filing 541 MOTION to Seal THE UNION MISSIONS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL IN CONNECTION WITH THE UNION MISSIONS BRIEF IN REPLY TO SCHWABS OPPOSITION TO THE UNION MISSIONS MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR EXCLUSION FROM THE CLASS MEMBERSHIP filed by The Union Mission Ministries. (Haber, Marc) (Filed on 4/1/2010)
April 1, 2010 Filing 540 Transcript of Proceedings held on 3/25/10, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kelly Bryce, E-mail courtreporter232@aol.com Telephone number (510)828-9404. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/30/2010. (Bryce, Kelly) (Filed on 4/1/2010)
March 30, 2010 Filing 539 REQUEST FOR CALCULATIONS FOR TRIAL. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/30/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2010)
March 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 538 ORDER RE 1940 ACT SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS by Judge William Alsup [granting in part and denying in part (372) Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part (377) Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part (379) Motion to Strike ; granting in part and denying in part (382) Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part (384) Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part (390) Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part (416) Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part (418) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:08-cv-01510-WHA]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2010)
March 29, 2010 Filing 537 Joinder re #487 MOTION to Strike Schwab's Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Identification of Misstatements and Exclude Evidence by Kimon Daifotis. (Bayless, David) (Filed on 3/29/2010)
March 26, 2010 Filing 536 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 3/26/2010)
March 25, 2010 Filing 566 Declaration of Doroty L. Fernandez and Exhibits 4-15 FILED UNDER SEAL in Support of 563 Memorandum in Opposition to the Union Mission's Motion to Extend Time for Exclusion from Class Membership, filed by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Related document(s) 563 ) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
March 25, 2010 Filing 565 Declaration of Laura Carnero FILED UNDER SEAL in Support of 563 Memorandum in Opposition to the Union Mission's Motion to Extend Time for Exclusion from Class Membership, filed by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Related document(s) 563 ) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
March 25, 2010 Filing 564 Declaration of Mila Dunn FILED UNDER SEAL in Support of 563 Memorandum in Opposition to the Union Mission's Motion to Extend Time for Exclusion from Class Membership, filed by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Related document(s) 563 ) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
March 25, 2010 Filing 563 Memorandum in Opposition FILED UNDER SEAL re #476 MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR EXCLUSION FROM THE CLASS MEMBERSHIP UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 6 filed by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
March 25, 2010 Filing 535 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/25/2010 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 3/25/2010) re #382 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by YieldPlus Investor Group, #372 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Kimon Daifotis, #384 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by YieldPlus Investor Group, #377 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Donald R. Stephens, Mariann Byerwalter, Michael W. Wilsey, Gerald B. Smith, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Robert G. Holmes, #390 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Schwab Investments, Evelyn Dilsaver, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Matthew Hastings, George Pereira, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Charles R. Schwab, Randall W. Merk, #379 MOTION to Strike filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Court Reporter Kelly Bryce.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/25/2010)
March 25, 2010 Filing 534 Declaration of Kimberly L. Taylor in Support of #528 MOTION to Seal Opposition to the Union Mission's Motion to Extend Time for Exclusion From Class Membership filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Related document(s) #528 ) (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
March 25, 2010 Filing 533 Declaration of Dorothy L. Fernandez in Support of #527 Memorandum in Opposition,, to the Union Mission's Motion to Extend Time for Exclusion from Class Membership filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18)(Related document(s) #527 ) (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
March 25, 2010 Filing 532 Declaration of Mila Dunn in Support of #527 Memorandum in Opposition,, to the Union Mission's Motion to Extend Time for Exclusion from Class Membership filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Related document(s) #527 ) (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
March 25, 2010 Filing 531 Declaration of Laura Carnero in Support of #527 Memorandum in Opposition,, to the Union Mission's Motion to Extend Time for Exclusion from Class Membership filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Related document(s) #527 ) (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
March 25, 2010 Filing 530 Declaration of Kathren Hernan in Support of #527 Memorandum in Opposition,, to the Union Mission's Motion to Extend Time for Exclusion from Class Membership filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Related document(s) #527 ) (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
March 25, 2010 Filing 529 Proposed Order re #527 Memorandum in Opposition,, to the Union Mission's Motion to Extend Time for Exclusion From Class Membership by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
March 25, 2010 Filing 528 MOTION to Seal Opposition to the Union Mission's Motion to Extend Time for Exclusion From Class Membership filed by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. Motion Hearing set for 4/15/2010 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal)(Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
March 25, 2010 Filing 527 Memorandum in Opposition re #476 MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR EXCLUSION FROM THE CLASS MEMBERSHIP UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 6 filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
March 25, 2010 Filing 526 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Class Notice by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Matt, Sean) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
March 25, 2010 Filing 525 Declaration of Carole K. Sylvester re Mailing of the Notice of Pendency of Class Action filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Matt, Sean) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
March 25, 2010 Filing 524 Declaration of Sean R. Matt In Support of Joint Declaration on Notice of Pendency filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Matt, Sean) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
March 25, 2010 Filing 523 MOTION Unopposed Administrative Motion Regarding Class Notice filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Matt, Sean) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
March 25, 2010 Filing 522 NOTICE by YieldPlus Investor Group Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
March 25, 2010 Filing 521 FURTHER QUESTION FOR ORAL ARGUMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 25, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 520 ORDER RE TRIAL DATE. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/24/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2010)
March 24, 2010 Filing 519 FURTHER QUESTIONS FOR ORAL ARGUMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 24, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2010)
March 23, 2010 Filing 518 RESPONSE to re #505 Order Plaintiffs' Response to the Court's Notice of Potential Trial Date Change to April 26, 2010 by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/23/2010)
March 23, 2010 Filing 517 Letter from Defendant Kimon P. Daifotis Re #505 Change in Trial Date. (Bayless, David) (Filed on 3/23/2010) Modified on 3/24/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
March 23, 2010 Filing 516 Reply Memorandum re Notice Re Trial Date #505 , (filed 3/19/10) filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 3/23/2010)
March 23, 2010 Filing 515 QUESTIONS FOR ORAL ARGUMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 23, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2010)
March 22, 2010 Filing 514 RESPONSE to re #506 MOTION for Leave to File a Brief Amicus Curiae Defendant Kimon P. Daifotis' Response to the SEC's Amicus Curiae Brief by Kimon Daifotis. (Bayless, David) (Filed on 3/22/2010)
March 22, 2010 Filing 513 Declaration of Steve W. Berman in Support of #512 Response ( Non Motion ) filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #512 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/22/2010)
March 22, 2010 Filing 512 RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' Response to Brief of the Investment Company Institute, as Amicus Curie by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/22/2010)
March 22, 2010 Filing 511 Declaration of DOROTHY L. FERNANDEZ in Support of #510 Response in Support, OF SCHWAB'S RESPONSE TO THE SEC'S AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed byCharles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Matthew Hastings, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, The Charles Schwab Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #510 ) (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 3/22/2010)
March 22, 2010 Filing 510 RESPONSE in Support SCHWAB'S RESPONSE TO THE SEC'S AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed byCharles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Matthew Hastings, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 3/22/2010)
March 19, 2010 Received Document - Unredacted Version, re #503 Reply to Opposition, by YieldPlus Investor Group. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2010)
March 19, 2010 Filing 509 CLERKS NOTICE Rescheduling Motion Hearing Time. Motion Hearing set for 3/25/2010 02:00 PM. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2010)
March 19, 2010 Filing 508 Appendix re #495 Reply Memorandum, CORRECTION OF DOCKET #495-1, 495-2, 495-3, 495-4, 495-5, 495-6, 495-7 filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Tab 1, #2 Appendix Tab 2, #3 Appendix Tab 3, #4 Appendix Tab 4, #5 Appendix Tab 5, #6 Appendix Tab 6)(Related document(s) #495 ) (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 3/19/2010)
March 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 507 ORDER RE RESPONSES TO AMICUS BRIEFS. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 19, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2010)
March 19, 2010 Filing 506 MOTION for Leave to File a Brief Amicus Curiae filed by U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A: Proposed Amicus Brief, #2 Proposed Order)(Berger, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/19/2010)
March 19, 2010 Filing 505 NOTICE RE TRIAL DATE. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/19/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2010)
March 18, 2010 Filing 504 Declaration of Steve W. Berman in Support of #503 Reply to Opposition, filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #503 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/18/2010)
March 18, 2010 Filing 503 Reply to Opposition re #382 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Re: UCL Liability; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof - REDACTED REDACTED filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/18/2010)
March 18, 2010 Filing 502 Declaration of Steve W. Berman in Support of #501 Reply to Opposition filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) #501 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/18/2010)
March 18, 2010 Filing 501 Reply to Opposition re #416 MOTION for Summary Judgment Re: UCL Liability - Redacted Pursuant to 2/19/10 Order, Dkt. No. 414 filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/18/2010)
March 18, 2010 Filing 500 Declaration of Steve W. Berman in Support of #499 Reply to Opposition, filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #499 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/18/2010)
March 18, 2010 Filing 499 Reply to Opposition re #379 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Defendants' Expert, Christopher M. James; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/18/2010)
March 18, 2010 Filing 498 Brief re #497 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF OF AMICUS CURIAE INVESTMENT COMPANY INSTITUTE; [PROPOSED] ORDER; BRIEF OF THE INVESTMENT COMPANY INSTITUTE, AS AMICUS CURIAE filed by Investment Company Institute. (Related document(s) #497 ) (Larrabee, Matthew) (Filed on 3/18/2010) Modified on 3/19/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
March 18, 2010 Filing 497 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF OF AMICUS CURIAE INVESTMENT COMPANY INSTITUTE; [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Investment Company Institute. Motion Hearing set for 3/25/2010 08:00 AM. (Larrabee, Matthew) (Filed on 3/18/2010)
March 18, 2010 Filing 496 Declaration of Dorothy L. Fernandez in Support of #495 Reply Memorandum, filed byCharles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Matthew Hastings, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, The Charles Schwab Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #495 ) (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 3/18/2010)
March 18, 2010 Filing 495 *** FOR APPENDIX AND APPENDIX TAB 1 - 6. PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT #508 . *** Reply Memorandum re #390 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byCharles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Matthew Hastings, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, The Charles Schwab Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Appendix Tab 1, #3 Appendix Tab 2, #4 Appendix Tab 3, #5 Appendix Tab 4, #6 Appendix Tab 5, #7 Appendix Tab 6)(Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 3/18/2010) Modified on 3/22/2010 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
March 18, 2010 Filing 494 Reply Memorandum re #377 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Individual Trustees, filed byMariann Byerwalter, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Robert G. Holmes, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, Michael W. Wilsey. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 3/18/2010)
March 18, 2010 Filing 493 Reply Memorandum re #372 MOTION for Summary Judgment REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT KIMON P. DAIFOTIS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed byKimon Daifotis. (Bayless, David) (Filed on 3/18/2010)
March 16, 2010 Filing 492 ERRATA re #452 Declaration in Support,, Notice of Errata Re: Exhibit B To The Declaration of Steve W. Berman In Support of Plaintiffs' Memorandum In Opposition To Schwab's Motion For Summary Judgment by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Errata Part 1, #2 Errata Part 2)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/16/2010)
March 12, 2010 Filing 489 Proposed Order re #487 MOTION to Strike Schwab's Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Identification of Misstatements and Exclude Evidence [Proposed] Order Granting Schwab's Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Identification of Misstatements and Exclude Evidence by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 3/12/2010)
March 12, 2010 Filing 488 Declaration of Dorothy L. Fernandez in Support of #487 MOTION to Strike Schwab's Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' March 5 Identification of Misstatements and Exclude Evidence filed by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26)(Related document(s) #487 ) (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 3/12/2010) Modified on 3/15/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
March 12, 2010 Filing 487 MOTION to Strike Schwab's Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Identification of Misstatements and Exclude Evidence filed by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. Motion Hearing set for 4/22/2010 08:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 3/12/2010)
March 12, 2010 Filing 486 Declaration of Dorothy Fernandez in Support of #472 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byCharles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #472 ) (Fernandez, Dorothy) (Filed on 3/12/2010)
March 12, 2010 Filing 485 Declaration of Dorothy Fernandez in Support of #468 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #468 ) (Fernandez, Dorothy) (Filed on 3/12/2010)
March 11, 2010 Filing 484 Declaration of Dorothy Fernandez in Support of #458 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #458 ) (Fernandez, Dorothy) (Filed on 3/11/2010)
March 11, 2010 Filing 483 Declaration of Dorothy Fernandez in Support of #446 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #446 ) (Fernandez, Dorothy) (Filed on 3/11/2010)
March 11, 2010 Filing 482 Declaration of Dorothy Fernandez in Support of #440 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #440 ) (Fernandez, Dorothy) (Filed on 3/11/2010)
March 11, 2010 Filing 481 Certificate of Interested Entities by The Union Mission Ministries (Sparer, Alan) (Filed on 3/11/2010)
March 11, 2010 Filing 480 Proposed Order GRANTING THE UNION MISSION MINISTRIES' #476 MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR EXCLUSION FROM THE CLASS MEMBERSHIP UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 6 by The Union Mission Ministries. (Sparer, Alan) (Filed on 3/11/2010) Modified on 3/12/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2010 Filing 479 Declaration of James Herndon IN SUPPORT OF #476 MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR EXCLUSION FROM THE CLASS MEMBERSHIP UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 6 filed by The Union Mission Ministries. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sparer, Alan) (Filed on 3/11/2010) Modified on 3/12/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2010 Filing 478 Declaration of Philip R. Farthing IN SUPPORT OF #476 MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR EXCLUSION FROM THE CLASS MEMBERSHIP UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 6 filed by The Union Mission Ministries. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Sparer, Alan) (Filed on 3/11/2010) Modified on 3/12/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2010 Filing 477 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan William Sparer (Sparer, Alan) (Filed on 3/11/2010)
March 11, 2010 Filing 476 MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR EXCLUSION FROM THE CLASS MEMBERSHIP UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 6 filed by The Union Mission Ministries. Motion Hearing set for 4/15/2010 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Sparer, Alan) (Filed on 3/11/2010)
March 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 475 FURTHER ORDER RE PRIVILEGE [re (49 in 3:08-cv-01936-WHA, 49 in 3:08-cv-01936-WHA, 23 in 3:08-cv-02878-WHA, 23 in 3:08-cv-02878-WHA, 50 in 3:08-cv-02058-WHA, 50 in 3:08-cv-02058-WHA, 424 in 3:08-cv-01510-WHA, 424 in 3:08-cv-01510-WHA, 42 in 3:08-cv-01733-WHA, 42 in 3:08-cv-01733-WHA, 20 in 3:08-cv-02984-WHA, 20 in 3:08-cv-02984-WHA, 31 in 3:08-cv-02487-WHA, 31 in 3:08-cv-02487-WHA, 21 in 3:08-cv-02983-WHA, 21 in 3:08-cv-02983-WHA) Order on Motion to Compel]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/11/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2010)
March 10, 2010 Filing 474 RESPONSE to re #427 Order , re: Supplemental Briefing Pursuant to Court Order Entered February 25, 2010 by Kimon Daifotis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bayless, David) (Filed on 3/10/2010)
March 10, 2010 Filing 473 Appendix re #448 Memorandum in Opposition Appendix of Selected Authorities Cited in Support of Plaintiffs' Memorandum In Opposition to Schwab's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14)(Related document(s) #448 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/10/2010)
March 9, 2010 Filing 562 NOTICE of Errata FILED UNDER SEAL Re: Exhibit T to the Declaration of Steve W. Berman, by YieldPlus Investor Group re #452 Declaration in Support, (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2010)
March 9, 2010 Filing 472 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/9/2010)
March 9, 2010 Filing 471 NOTICE by YieldPlus Investor Group Manual Filing Notification of Notice of Errata (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/9/2010)
March 8, 2010 Filing 470 Declaration of Dorothy L. Fernandez in Support of #427 Order Declaration of Dorothy L. Fernandez In Response To Order Following February 24 Hearing filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, Michael W. Wilsey. (Related document(s) #427 ) (Fernandez, Dorothy) (Filed on 3/8/2010)
March 5, 2010 Filing 732 MEMORANDUM in Opposition FILED UNDER SEAL re #377 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2010)
March 5, 2010 Filing 731 MEMORANDUM in Opposition FILED UNDER SEAL re #372 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2010)
March 5, 2010 Filing 730 Declaration FILED UNDER SEAL of Steve W. Berman in Support of #448 Memorandum in Opposition filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #448 ) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2010)
March 5, 2010 Filing 729 Memorandum in Opposition FILED UNDER SEAL re #390 MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2010)
March 5, 2010 Filing 728 EXHIBITS E, G, J-K, P, Q-S, W, AA, DD-EE, GG-II, LL-OO, QQ, TT, VV and CCC, FILED UNDER SEAL re #452 Declaration of Steve W. Berman in Support, filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #452 ) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2010)
March 5, 2010 Filing 727 EXHIBITS 1, 4, 6-7, 10, 13-15, portion of 16, 17-18, 22, 24-26 and 28-33, FILED UNDER SEAL re #439 Declaration of Steve W. Berman in Opposition, filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #439 ) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2010)
March 5, 2010 Filing 726 EXHIBITS 4 (First Three Pages), 6, 10-18 and 35, FILED UNDER SEAL re #445 Declaration of Steve W. Berman in Opposition, filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #445 ) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2010)
March 5, 2010 Filing 561 Response, FILED UNDER SEAL re #427 Order; Plaintiffs' Informational Filing Concerning the Misrepresentations and Omissions Plaintiffs Will Prove at Trial Filed In Response to the Court's Order of February 25, 2010; by YieldPlus Investor Group. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2010)
March 5, 2010 Filing 469 NOTICE by YieldPlus Investor Group re #467 Response ( Non Motion ), Response ( Non Motion ) Manual Filing Notification (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/5/2010)
March 5, 2010 Filing 468 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/5/2010)
March 5, 2010 Filing 467 RESPONSE to re #427 Order Plaintiffs' Informational Filing Concerning The Misrepresentations and Omissions Plaintiffs Will Prove at Trial Filed In Response to the Court's Order of February 25, 2010 - REDACTED by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/5/2010)
March 5, 2010 Filing 466 RESPONSE to re #427 Order Plaintiffs' Identification of Which Misstatements are at Issue Filed In Response to the Court's Order of February 25, 2010 by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/5/2010)
March 5, 2010 Filing 465 ERRATA re #452 Declaration in Support,, Notice of Errata by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/5/2010)
March 5, 2010 Filing 464 Declaration of Robert F. Lopez in Support of #463 Response ( Non Motion ), Response ( Non Motion ) filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #463 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/5/2010)
March 5, 2010 Filing 463 RESPONSE to re #430 Response ( Non Motion ) Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Response to Supplemental Briefing of Defendant Kimon P. Daifotis Re: Issues Pertaining to Assertion of Affirmative Defense by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/5/2010)
March 4, 2010 Filing 462 Appendix re #449 Memorandum in Opposition,,, #460 Memorandum in Opposition,, #442 Memorandum in Opposition,, Appendix of Selected Authorities Cited in Support of Schwab's Oppositions to Plaintiffs' Motions for Summary Judgment filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Attachments: #1 Tab 1, #2 Tab 2, #3 Tab 3, #4 Tab 4, #5 Tab 5, #6 Tab 6, #7 Tab 7, #8 Tab 8, #9 Tab 9, #10 Tab 10, #11 Tab 11, #12 Tab 12, #13 Tab 13, #14 Tab 14, #15 Tab 15, #16 Tab 16, #17 Tab 17, #18 Tab 18, #19 Tab 19, #20 Tab 20, #21 Tab 21, #22 Tab 22, #23 Tab 23, #24 Tab 24, #25 Tab 25, #26 Tab 26, #27 Tab 27, #28 Tab 28, #29 Tab 29, #30 Tab 30)(Related document(s) #449 , #460 , #442 ) (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
March 4, 2010 Filing 461 Declaration of Dorothy L. Fernandez in Support of #460 Memorandum in Opposition,, to Motion for Summary Judgment re: Negative Causation filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Related document(s) #460 ) (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
March 4, 2010 Filing 460 Memorandum in Opposition re #384 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment Re: Negative Causation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
March 4, 2010 Filing 459 NOTICE of Manual Filing by YieldPlus Investor Group re #448 Memorandum in Opposition, #452 Declaration in Support,, Manual Filing Notification (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/4/2010) Modified on 3/5/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2010 Filing 458 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
March 4, 2010 Filing 457 DECLARATION of Kevin O'Donnell in Opposition to #390 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #390 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
March 4, 2010 Filing 456 DECLARATION of David Mikelonis in Opposition to #390 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #390 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
March 4, 2010 Filing 455 DECLARATION of Robert Levin in Opposition to #390 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #390 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
March 4, 2010 Filing 454 DECLARATION of Robert Dickson in Opposition to #390 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #390 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
March 4, 2010 Filing 453 DECLARATION of James Coffin in Opposition to #390 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #390 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
March 4, 2010 Filing 452 Declaration of Steve W. Berman in Support of #448 Memorandum in Opposition To Schwab's Motion for Summary Judgment - REDACTED filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Part 1, #2 Exhibit A Part 2, #3 Exhibit A Part 3, #4 Exhibit B Part 3, #5 Exhibit B Part 4, #6 Exhibit B Part 5, #7 Exhibit C-Y, #8 Exhibit Z Part 1, #9 Exhibit Z Part 2, #10 Exhibit AA-TT, #11 Exhibit UU, #12 Exhibit VV, #13 Exhibit WW, #14 Exhibit XX, #15 Exhibit YY, #16 Exhibit ZZ, #17 Exhibit AAA, #18 Exhibit BBB, #19 Exhibit CCC, #20 Exhibit DDD)(Related document(s) #448 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
March 4, 2010 Filing 451 Request for Judicial Notice re #449 Memorandum in Opposition,,, Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Schwab's Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment re Section 17200 and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment re Section 17200 filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Related document(s) #449 ) (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
March 4, 2010 Filing 450 Declaration of Kimberly L. Taylor in Support of #449 Memorandum in Opposition,,, to Motion for Summary Judgment re Section 17200 and Schwab's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment re Section 17200 filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) #449 ) (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
March 4, 2010 Filing 449 Memorandum in Opposition re #382 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Re: UCL Liability; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof - REDACTED and Schwab's Notice of Motion and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment re Section 17200 filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
March 4, 2010 Filing 448 Memorandum in Opposition re #390 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Memorandum In Opposition to Schwab's Motion for Summary Judgment - REDACTED filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
March 4, 2010 Filing 447 NOTICE by YieldPlus Investor Group re #444 Memorandum in Opposition, #445 Declaration in Opposition,,, Manual Filing Notice (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
March 4, 2010 Filing 446 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
March 4, 2010 Filing 445 DECLARATION of Steve W. Berman in Opposition to #372 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20 Part 1, #21 Exhibit 20 Part 2, #22 Exhibit 20 Part 3, #23 Exhibit 20 Part 4, #24 Exhibit 21, #25 Exhibit 22, #26 Exhibit 23, #27 Exhibit 24, #28 Exhibit 25, #29 Exhibit 26, #30 Exhibit 27, #31 Exhibit 28, #32 Exhibit 29, #33 Exhibit 30, #34 Exhibit 31, #35 Exhibit 32, #36 Exhibit 33, #37 Exhibit 34, #38 Exhibit 35, #39 Exhibit 36, #40 Exhibit 37, #41 Exhibit 38, #42 Exhibit 39)(Related document(s) #372 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
March 4, 2010 Filing 444 Memorandum in Opposition re #372 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Memorandum In Opposition to Kimon P. Daifotis's Motion for Summary Judgment - REDACTED filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B Part 1, #3 Appendix B Part 2)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
March 4, 2010 Filing 443 Declaration of Dorothy L. Fernandez in Support of #442 Memorandum in Opposition,, filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #442 ) (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
March 4, 2010 Filing 442 Memorandum in Opposition re #379 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Defendants' Expert, Christopher M. James; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
March 4, 2010 Filing 441 NOTICE by YieldPlus Investor Group re #439 Declaration in Opposition,,, #438 Memorandum in Opposition Manual Filing Notification (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
March 4, 2010 Filing 440 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
March 4, 2010 Filing 439 DECLARATION of Steve W. Berman in Opposition to Independent Trustees' #377 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/4/2010) Modified on 3/5/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2010 Filing 438 Memorandum in Opposition re #377 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Individual Trustees, REDACTED filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
March 4, 2010 Filing 437 DECLARATION of Tammy Albarran in Opposition to #384 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment Re: Negative Causation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Kimon Daifotis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #384 ) (Bayless, David) (Filed on 3/4/2010) Modified on 3/5/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2010 Filing 436 Memorandum in Opposition re #384 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment Re: Negative Causation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byKimon Daifotis. (Bayless, David) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
March 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 435 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO EXCEED APPLICABLE PAGE LIMIT by Judge Alsup denying #432 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; granting #433 Motion to Shorten Time (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2010)
March 2, 2010 Filing 434 Declaration of Steve W. Berman in Support of #433 MOTION to Shorten Time Plaintiffs' Motion to Shorten Time for the Consideration of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion for an Order Exceeding Applicable Page Limits, #432 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion for an Order Exceeding Applicable Page Limitation filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #433 , #432 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/2/2010)
March 2, 2010 Filing 433 MOTION to Shorten Time Plaintiffs' Motion to Shorten Time for the Consideration of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion for an Order Exceeding Applicable Page Limits filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/2/2010)
March 2, 2010 Filing 432 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion for an Order Exceeding Applicable Page Limitation filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/2/2010)
March 1, 2010 Filing 430 RESPONSE to re #427 Order by Kimon Daifotis. (Bayless, David) (Filed on 3/1/2010)
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 429 ORDER RE WELLS SUBMISSION. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 1, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2010)
February 26, 2010 Filing 428 Transcript of Proceedings held on February 24, 2010, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, Telephone number 415-255-6842. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/27/2010. (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 2/26/2010)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 427 ORDER FOLLOWING FEBRUARY 24 HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 25, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2010)
February 24, 2010 Filing 431 Minute Entry: Status Conference re Privileged Documents held before Judge Alsup (Date Filed: 2/24/2010). (Court Reporter Joan Columbini.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/24/2010)
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 426 ORDER RE LETTER FROM ITA ABER. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 24, 2010. (Attachments: #1 Appendix letter from Ita Aber)(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2010)
February 23, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 2/24/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2010)
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 425 ORDER CONFIRMING FEBRUARY 24 HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 23, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2010)
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 424 ORDER RE WAIVER OF ATTORNEY-CLIENT AND WORK-PRODUCT PRIVILEGES by Judge William Alsup [granting in part and denying in part (352) Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part (407) Motion to Compel in case 3:08-cv-01510-WHA]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2010)
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 423 ORDER RE COUNSELS' AVAILABILITY FOR HEARING RE PRIVILEGED DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 23, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2010)
February 22, 2010 Filing 422 Declaration of David B. Bayless Pursuant to Court Order Dated February 11, 2010 filed byKimon Daifotis. (Bayless, David) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
February 22, 2010 Filing 421 Declaration of Dorothy L. Fernandez Re: Privileged Documents for In Camera Review filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
February 22, 2010 Filing 420 Declaration of Darryl P. Rains Pursuant to Court Order Entered February 11, 2010 filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
February 22, 2010 Filing 419 EXHIBITS re #385 Declaration in Support,, Exhibits O-Q to the Declaration of Steve W. Berman In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment re: Negative Causation filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #385 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
February 22, 2010 Filing 418 MOTION for Summary Judgment re: Negative Causation - Redacted Pursuant to 2/19/10 Order, Dkt. No. 415 filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
February 22, 2010 Filing 417 EXHIBITS re #383 Declaration in Support,,, Exhibits G-H, S, Y and AA to the Declaration of Steve W. Berman in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment Re: UCL Liability filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #383 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
February 22, 2010 Filing 416 MOTION for Summary Judgment Re: UCL Liability - Redacted Pursuant to 2/19/10 Order, Dkt. No. 414 filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
February 19, 2010 Filing 1059 FILED UNDER SEAL - EXHIBITS E-I, K-N, and R-S to the Declaration of Steve W. Berman in Support re 1058 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) 1058 ) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2010)
February 19, 2010 Filing 1058 FILED UNDER SEAL - MOTION for Summary Judgment; Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment re: Negative Causation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support, filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2010)
February 19, 2010 Filing 1057 FILED UNDER SEAL - EXHIBITS K-O, R, and U-W, to the Declaration of Steve W. Berman in Support re 1056 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) 1056 ) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2010)
February 19, 2010 Filing 1056 FILED UNDER SEAL - MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment; Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Re: UCL Liability; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2010)
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 415 ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTION TO SEAL (DKT. NO. 388) by Judge Alsup granting #388 Motion to Seal (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2010)
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 414 ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTION TO SEAL (DKT. NO. 386) by Judge Alsup granting #386 Motion to Seal (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2010)
February 18, 2010 Filing 413 Declaration of Dorothy L. Fernandez in Support of #388 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #388 ) (Fernandez, Dorothy) (Filed on 2/18/2010)
February 18, 2010 Filing 412 Proposed Order re #386 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Fernandez, Dorothy) (Filed on 2/18/2010)
February 18, 2010 Filing 411 Declaration of Dorothy L. Fernandez in Support of #386 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Related document(s) #386 ) (Fernandez, Dorothy) (Filed on 2/18/2010)
February 17, 2010 Filing 491 FILED UNDER SEAL - Declaration of Steve W. Berman in Support of 490 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) 490 ) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2010)
February 17, 2010 Filing 490 FILED UNDER SEAL - MOTION to Amend/Correct Case Schedule and/or for Sanctions filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2010)
February 16, 2010 Filing 409 Reply Memorandum #407 In Support of Motion to Compel Production of Material Improperly Withheld on the Basis of Attorney-Client Privilege - UNREDACTED filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 2/16/2010) Modified on 2/17/2010 (sis, COURT STAFF).
February 16, 2010 Filing 408 EXHIBITS E and F to the Declaration of Robert F. Lopez in Support of Motion to Compel Production of Material Improperly Withheld on the Basis of Attorney-Client Privilege filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 2/16/2010)
February 16, 2010 Filing 407 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Production of Material Impropoerly Withheld on the Basis of Attorney-Client Privilege - UNREDACTED filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 2/16/2010)
February 16, 2010 Filing 406 EXHIBITS re #405 Declaration in Support, Exhibits H and J-L to the Declaration of Steve W. Berman In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Case Schedule and/or for Sanctions filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #405 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 2/16/2010)
February 16, 2010 Filing 405 Declaration of Steve W. Berman in Support of #404 MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Case Schedule and/or for Sanctions - REDACTED VERSION PURSUANT TO 2/16/10 ORDER (DKT. No. 403) filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #404 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 2/16/2010)
February 16, 2010 Filing 404 MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Case Schedule and/or for Sanctions - REDACTED VERSION PURSUANT TO 2/16/10 ORDER (DKT. No. 403) filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 2/16/2010)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 403 AMENDED ORDER RE ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 12, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2010)
February 12, 2010 Filing 401 Transcript of Proceedings held on February 11, 2010, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, Telephone number 415-255-6842. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/13/2010. (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 2/12/2010)
February 11, 2010 Filing 402 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 2/11/2010 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 2/11/2010) re #352 MOTION to Compel Production of Material Improperly Withheld on the Basis of Attorney Client Privilege filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Court Reporter Joan Columbini.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/11/2010)
February 11, 2010 Filing 400 EXHIBITS U to #392 Declaration of Dorothy L. Fernandez in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Matthew Hastings, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, The Charles Schwab Corporation. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 2/11/2010) Modified on 2/12/2010 (sis, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2010 Filing 399 Appendix #390 of Selected Authorities Cited in Support of Schwab's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Matthew Hastings, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, The Charles Schwab Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31)(Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 2/11/2010) Modified on 2/12/2010 (sis, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2010 Filing 398 EXHIBITS V - Z to #392 Declaration of Dorothy L. Fernandez in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Matthew Hastings, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, The Charles Schwab Corporation. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 2/11/2010) Modified on 2/12/2010 (sis, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2010 Filing 397 *** FILED IN ERROR. DUPLICATE OF #396 ,PLEASE DISREGARD. *** EXHIBITS R - U to #392 Declaration of Dorothy L. Fernandez in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Matthew Hastings, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, The Charles Schwab Corporation. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 2/11/2010) Modified on 2/12/2010 (sis, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/12/2010 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2010 Filing 396 EXHIBITS P - T to #392 Declaration of Dorothy L. Fernandez in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Matthew Hastings, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, The Charles Schwab Corporation. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 2/11/2010) Modified on 2/12/2010 (sis, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2010 Filing 395 EXHIBITS L - O to #392 Declaration of Dorothy L. Fernandez in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Matthew Hastings, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, The Charles Schwab Corporation. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 2/11/2010) Modified on 2/12/2010 (sis, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2010 Filing 394 EXHIBITS H - K to #392 Declaration of Dorothy L. Fernandez filed by Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Matthew Hastings, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, The Charles Schwab Corporation. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 2/11/2010) Modified on 2/12/2010 (sis, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2010 Filing 393 EXHIBITS A - G #392 to Declaration of Dorothy L. Fernandez in Support of Schwab's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Matthew Hastings, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, The Charles Schwab Corporation. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 2/11/2010) Modified on 2/12/2010 (sis, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2010 Filing 392 Declaration #390 of Dorothy L. Fernandez in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Matthew Hastings, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, The Charles Schwab Corporation. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 2/11/2010) Modified on 2/12/2010 (sis, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2010 Filing 391 Request for Judicial Notice re #390 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byCharles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Matthew Hastings, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, The Charles Schwab Corporation. (Related document(s) #390 ) (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 2/11/2010)
February 11, 2010 Filing 390 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Matthew Hastings, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, The Charles Schwab Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 3/25/2010 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Schwab's Motion for Summary Judgment)(Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 2/11/2010)
February 11, 2010 Filing 389 NOTICE by YieldPlus Investor Group Manual Filing Notification of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Re: Negative Causation and Exhibits E-I and K-S to the Declaration of Steve W. Berman in Support Thereof (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 2/11/2010)
February 11, 2010 Filing 388 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 2/11/2010)
February 11, 2010 Filing 387 NOTICE by YieldPlus Investor Group Manual Filing Notification of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Re: UCL Liability and Exhibits G-I; K-O; R-S; U-W; Y and AA to the Declaration of Steve W. Berman in Support Thereof (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 2/11/2010)
February 11, 2010 Filing 386 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 2/11/2010)
February 11, 2010 Filing 385 Declaration of Steve W. Berman in Support of #384 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment Re: Negative Causation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S)(Related document(s) #384 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 2/11/2010)
February 11, 2010 Filing 384 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment Re: Negative Causation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. Motion Hearing set for 3/25/2010 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 2/11/2010)
February 11, 2010 Filing 383 Declaration of Steve W. Berman in Support of #382 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Re: UCL Liability; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof - REDACTED filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA)(Related document(s) #382 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 2/11/2010)
February 11, 2010 Filing 382 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Re: UCL Liability; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof - REDACTED filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. Motion Hearing set for 3/25/2010 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 2/11/2010)
February 11, 2010 Filing 381 Declaration of Steve W. Berman in Support of #379 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Defendants' Expert, Christopher M. James; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #379 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 2/11/2010)
February 11, 2010 Filing 380 Declaration of Kimberly L. Taylor in Support of #377 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Independent Trustees, filed byMariann Byerwalter, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Robert G. Holmes, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, Michael W. Wilsey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) #377 ) (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 2/11/2010) Modified on 2/12/2010 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2010 Filing 379 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Defendants' Expert, Christopher M. James; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. Motion Hearing set for 3/25/2010 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 2/11/2010)
February 11, 2010 Filing 378 Proposed Order re #377 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Independent Trustees, by Mariann Byerwalter, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Robert G. Holmes, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, Michael W. Wilsey. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 2/11/2010) Modified on 2/12/2010 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2010 Filing 377 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Independent Trustees, filed by Mariann Byerwalter, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Robert G. Holmes, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, Michael W. Wilsey. Motion Hearing set for 3/25/2010 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 2/11/2010) Modified on 2/12/2010 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2010 Filing 376 Request for Judicial Notice re #372 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #373 Declaration in Support, filed byKimon Daifotis. (Related document(s) #372 , #373 ) (Bayless, David) (Filed on 2/11/2010)
February 11, 2010 Filing 375 Appendix re #372 MOTION for Summary Judgment Non-Published Authorities filed byKimon Daifotis. (Attachments: #1 Tab 1, #2 Tab 2, #3 Tab 3, #4 Tab 4, #5 Tab 5)(Related document(s) #372 ) (Albarran, Tammy) (Filed on 2/11/2010)
February 11, 2010 Filing 374 Declaration of Kimon P. Daifotis in Support of #372 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byKimon Daifotis. (Related document(s) #372 ) (Albarran, Tammy) (Filed on 2/11/2010)
February 11, 2010 Filing 373 Declaration of Tammy Albarran in Support of #372 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byKimon Daifotis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Related document(s) #372 ) (Albarran, Tammy) (Filed on 2/11/2010)
February 11, 2010 Filing 372 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Kimon Daifotis. Motion Hearing set for 3/25/2010 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bayless, David) (Filed on 2/11/2010)
February 10, 2010 Filing 371 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeff D Friedman (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 2/10/2010)
February 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 370 ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Alsup granting in part and denying in part #354 Motion to Seal; granting in part and denying in part #365 Motion to Seal; granting in part and denying in part #299 Motion to Seal Document (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2010)
February 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 369 ORDER RE IN CAMERA REVIEW. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 10, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2010)
February 9, 2010 Filing 368 NOTICE FOR ORAL ARGUMENT (FEBRUARY 11, 2010, AT 8:00 AM). Signed by Judge William Alsup on 2/9/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2010)
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER TO SUBMIT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENTS IN.PDF FORMAT. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/8/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2010)
February 5, 2010 Filing 366 NOTICE by YieldPlus Investor Group Manual Filing Notification of Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Production of Material Improperly Withheld on the Basis of Attorney-Client Privilege (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 2/5/2010)
February 5, 2010 Filing 365 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 2/5/2010)
February 5, 2010 Filing 364 Reply Memorandum re #352 MOTION to Compel Production of Material Improperly Withheld on the Basis of Attorney Client Privilege REDACTED filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 2/5/2010)
February 1, 2010 Filing 363 Appendix re #361 Memorandum in Opposition,, to Motion to Compel Production of Privileged Documents filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1, #2 Appendix 2, #3 Appendix 3, #4 Appendix 4, #5 Appendix 5, #6 Appendix 6, #7 Appendix 7, #8 Appendix 8, #9 Appendix 9, #10 Appendix 10)(Related document(s) #361 ) (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 2/1/2010)
February 1, 2010 Filing 362 Declaration of Dorothy L. Fernandez in Support of #361 Memorandum in Opposition,, to Motion to Compel Production of Privileged Documents filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #361 ) (Fernandez, Dorothy) (Filed on 2/1/2010)
February 1, 2010 Filing 361 Memorandum in Opposition re #352 MOTION to Compel Production of Material Improperly Withheld on the Basis of Attorney Client Privilege filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Motion to Compel Production of Privileged Documents)(Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 2/1/2010)
January 27, 2010 Filing 360 Transcript of Proceedings held on January 21, 2010, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, Telephone number 415-255-6842. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/27/2010. (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 1/27/2010)
January 27, 2010 Filing 359 RESPONSE to re #350 Order Plaintiffs' Filing re: Order Granting Conditional Discovery and Trial Postponement by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/27/2010)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 358 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO SEAL by Judge Alsup granting #329 Motion to Seal; granting #334 Motion to Seal (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2010)
January 26, 2010 Filing 355 NOTICE by YieldPlus Investor Group Manual Filing Notification of Plaintiffs' Memorandum In Support of Motion To Compel Production of Material Improperly Withheld on the Basis of Attorney-Client Privilege and Exhibits E and F To The Declaration of Robert F. Lopez In Support of Motion To Compel Production of Material Improperly Withheld on The Basis of Attorney-Client Privilege (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/26/2010)
January 26, 2010 Filing 354 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/26/2010)
January 25, 2010 Filing 353 Declaration of Robert F. Lopez in Support of #352 MOTION to Compel Production of Material Improperly Withheld on the Basis of Attorney Client Privilege filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) #352 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/25/2010)
January 25, 2010 Filing 352 MOTION to Compel Production of Material Improperly Withheld on the Basis of Attorney Client Privilege filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. Motion Hearing set for 2/11/2010 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/25/2010)
January 25, 2010 Filing 351 NOTICE of Change of Address by Steve W. Berman (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/25/2010)
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER GRANTING CONDITIONAL DISCOVERY AND TRIAL POSTPONEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 22, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2010)
January 21, 2010 Filing 357 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 1/21/2010 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 1/21/2010) re #294 MOTION to Amend/Correct Case Schedule and/or For Sanctions - REDACTED filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Court Reporter Joan Columbini.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/21/2010)
January 21, 2010 Filing 349 FILED UNDER SEAL -EXHIBIT 3 re #344 Declaration in Support filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #344 ) (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2010)
January 21, 2010 Filing 348 Transcript of Proceedings held on 01/20/10, before Judge Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sarah Goekler, Telephone number (530)941-2621; email: sgoekler25@yahoo.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/21/2010. (slg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2010)
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 347 NOTICE AND Order Setting Further Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Further Settlement Conference set for 4/15/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Updated confidential settlement conference statements to be lodged by 4/8/10. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/20/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2010)
January 20, 2010 Filing 356 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 1/20/2010 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 1/20/2010). (Court Reporter Sarah Goekler.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/20/2010)
January 20, 2010 Filing 346 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' January 18, 2010 Motion to Compel the Production of Privileged Material and for in camera Inspection filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
January 20, 2010 Filing 345 Minute Entry: FurtherSettlement Conference held on 1/20/10 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Case did not settle. Further settlement conference set for 4/15/10 at 9:30 AM. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/20/2010)
January 20, 2010 Filing 344 Declaration of Steve W. Berman in Support of #343 Reply Memorandum filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) #343 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
January 20, 2010 Filing 343 Reply Memorandum re #294 MOTION to Amend/Correct Case Schedule and/or For Sanctions - REDACTED filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
January 20, 2010 Filing 342 Letter from David B. Bayless to the Hon. William Alsup. (Bayless, David) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER SETTING HEARING RE PLAINTIFF'S JANUARY 18 DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 20, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO INTERROGATORIES. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 19, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2010)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL (DKT. NO. 321) by Judge Alsup granting #321 Motion to Seal (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2010)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER RE HEARING FOR PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 19, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2010)
January 19, 2010 Filing 337 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' letter brief dated January 15, 2010 filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 1/19/2010)
January 19, 2010 Filing 336 Letter from Steve W. Berman to Hon. William H. Alsup Responding to Mr. Rains' Jan. 18 Letter. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/19/2010)
January 19, 2010 Filing 335 NOTICE by YieldPlus Investor Group Manual Filing Notification of Exhibit C To The January 18, 2010 Letter From Steve W. Berman To The Hon. William H. Alsup (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/19/2010)
January 19, 2010 Filing 334 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/19/2010)
January 18, 2010 Filing 333 Letter from Darryl P. Rains Regarding Scheduling Conflict (Relates to Dkt. No. 331). (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 1/18/2010)
January 18, 2010 Filing 332 Letter from Steve W. Berman to the Hon. William H. Alsup. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/18/2010)
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER SETTING HEARING RE PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 15, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
January 15, 2010 Filing 330 NOTICE by YieldPlus Investor Group Manual Filing Notification of Plaintiffs' Janaury 15, 2010 Letter to the Honorable William H. Alsup (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
January 15, 2010 Filing 329 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
January 15, 2010 Filing 328 Letter from Steve W. Berman to the Hon. William H. Alsup. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2-7)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
January 15, 2010 Filing 327 Letter from Craig D. Martin to the Honorable William H. Alsup. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Martin, Craig) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
January 14, 2010 Filing 326 Proposed Order re #325 Declaration in Support,, of Plaintiffs' January 7, 2010, Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Fernandez, Dorothy) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
January 14, 2010 Filing 325 Declaration in Support of #321 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Related document(s) #321 ) (Fernandez, Dorothy) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
January 8, 2010 Filing 323 Transcript of Proceedings held on January 7, 2010, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, Telephone number 415-255-6842. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/8/2010. (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
January 7, 2010 Filing 324 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 1/7/2010 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 1/7/2010). (Court Reporter Joan Columbini.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/7/2010)
January 7, 2010 Filing 322 NOTICE by YieldPlus Investor Group Manual Filing Notification of Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Amend Case Schedule and for Sanctions and Exhibits 1-3 to the Reply Declaration of Steve W. Berman (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/7/2010)
January 7, 2010 Filing 321 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/7/2010)
January 7, 2010 Filing 320 Declaration of Steve W. Berman in Support of #319 Reply Memorandum filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) #319 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/7/2010)
January 7, 2010 Filing 319 Reply Memorandum re #294 MOTION to Amend/Correct Case Schedule and/or For Sanctions - REDACTED REDACTED filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/7/2010)
January 6, 2010 Filing 318 Letter from Steve W. Berman to Judge Alsup in Response to Defendants' January 4, 2010 Letter. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/6/2010)
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER SETTING HEARING RE DEFENDANT'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE re: #316 Letter filed by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., George Pereira, William A. Hasler, Charles R. Schwab, Donald F. Doward, Randall W. Merk, Donald R. Stephens, Schwab Investments, Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Gerald B. Smith, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Michael W. Wilsey]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/5/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2010) Modified on 1/6/2010 (sis, COURT STAFF).
January 4, 2010 Filing 316 Letter from Darryl P. Rains to the Honorable William H. Alsup. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 1/4/2010)
December 31, 2009 Filing 315 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/23/09, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sahar McVickar, Telephone number (415) 626-6060/sahar_mcvickar@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/31/2010. (McVickar, Sahar) (Filed on 12/31/2009)
December 23, 2009 Filing 314 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 12/23/2009 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 12/23/2009). (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/23/2009)
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER FOLLOWING DECEMBER 23 DISCOVERY DISPUTE HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 23, 2009. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2009)
December 22, 2009 Filing 312 Letter from Sean R. Matt to Judge Alsup in Response to Defendants' December 14, 2009 Letter. (Matt, Sean) (Filed on 12/22/2009)
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF ROBERT F. LOPEZ by Judge Alsup granting #307 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2009)
December 21, 2009 Filing 310 Proposed Order re #294 MOTION to Amend/Correct Case Schedule and/or For Sanctions - REDACTED [Proposed] Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Case Schedule and Request for Sanctions by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 12/21/2009)
December 21, 2009 Filing 309 Declaration of Dorothy L. Fernandez in Support of #308 Memorandum in Opposition, to Motion to Amend Case Schedule and for Sanctions filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) #308 ) (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 12/21/2009)
December 21, 2009 Filing 308 Memorandum in Opposition re #294 MOTION to Amend/Correct Case Schedule and/or For Sanctions - REDACTED filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 12/21/2009)
December 18, 2009 Filing 307 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, Robert F. Lopez, Esq., ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611040268.) filed by James Coffin, Robert Dickson, John A. Hill, Mike Labins, David Mikelonis, Kevin O'Donnell, YieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2009)
December 18, 2009 Filing 306 Declaration of Dorothy L. Fernandez in Support of #299 MOTION to Seal Document #294 MOTION to Amend/Correct Case Schedule and/or For Sanctions - REDACTED, #296 Declaration in Support, filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #299 ) (Fernandez, Dorothy) (Filed on 12/18/2009)
December 18, 2009 Filing 305 Declaration of Robert F. Lopez in Support of #304 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Protective Order filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #304 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 12/18/2009)
December 18, 2009 Filing 304 Memorandum in Opposition re #293 MOTION for Protective Order RE PRIVILEGE LOGS filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 12/18/2009)
December 18, 2009 Filing 303 Letter from Defendant Kimon Daifotis re Motion to Amend Case Schedule. (Bayless, David) (Filed on 12/18/2009)
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER SETTING HEARING RE DEFENDANT'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re (301 in 3:08-cv-01510-WHA) Letter filed by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., George Pereira, William A. Hasler, Charles R. Schwab, Donald F. Doward, Randall W. Merk, Donald R. Stephens, Schwab Investments, Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Gerald B. Smith, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Michael W. Wilsey]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 12/17/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2009)
December 14, 2009 Filing 301 Letter from Darryl P. Rains to Judge Alsup Requesting Order to Compel Production. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 12/14/2009)
December 11, 2009 Filing 410 FILED UNDER SEAL- EXHIBIT I re #405 Declaration in Support, filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #405 ) (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
December 11, 2009 Filing 300 NOTICE by YieldPlus Investor Group Manual Filing Notification (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
December 11, 2009 Filing 299 MOTION to Seal Document #294 MOTION to Amend/Correct Case Schedule and/or For Sanctions - REDACTED, #296 Declaration in Support, filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
December 11, 2009 Filing 298 Declaration of Steve W. Berman in Support of #297 MOTION to Shorten Time for the Hearing for Motion to Amend Case Schedule and/or for Sactions filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #297 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
December 11, 2009 Filing 297 MOTION to Shorten Time for the Hearing for Motion to Amend Case Schedule and/or for Sactions filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
December 11, 2009 Filing 296 Declaration of Steve W. Berman in Support of #294 MOTION to Amend/Correct Case Schedule and/or For Sanctions - REDACTED filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Related document(s) #294 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
December 11, 2009 Filing 295 Declaration of DOROTHY L. FERNANDEZ in Support of #293 MOTION for Protective Order RE PRIVILEGE LOGS filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #293 ) (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
December 11, 2009 Filing 294 MOTION to Amend/Correct Case Schedule and/or For Sanctions - REDACTED filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. Motion Hearing set for 1/21/2010 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
December 11, 2009 Filing 293 MOTION for Protective Order RE PRIVILEGE LOGS filed by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. Motion Hearing set for 12/23/2009 01:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
December 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF LISA M. HASSELMAN PRO HAC VICE by Judge Alsup granting #291 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2009)
December 4, 2009 Filing 291 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, Lisa M. Hasselman, Esq., ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611039715.) filed by James Coffin, Robert Dickson, John A. Hill, David Mikelonis, Kevin O'Donnell, YieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2009)
December 4, 2009 Filing 289 Letter from Reed R. Kathrein to the Honorable William H. Alsup. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Tab A)(Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 12/4/2009)
December 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER FOLLOWING NOVEMBER 30 DISCOVERY DISPUTE HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 1, 2009. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2009)
December 1, 2009 Filing 287 Letter from Reed R. Kathrein UNREDACTED 11/18/09 LETTER TO HONORABLE WILLIAM H. ALSUP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 12/1/2009)
December 1, 2009 Filing 286 Letter from Reed R. Kathrein UNREDACTED 11/17/09 LETTER TO HONORABLE WILLIAM H. ALSUP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 12/1/2009)
December 1, 2009 Filing 285 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/30/2009, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/26/2010. (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 12/1/2009)
November 30, 2009 Filing 290 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 11/30/2009 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 11/30/2009). Motion for Protective Order shall be filed by 12/11/09; response by 12/18/09. Motion Hearing set for 12/23/2009 01:00 PM. (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/30/2009)
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Alsup denying #267 Motion ; denying #271 Motion (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2009)
November 27, 2009 Filing 283 Letter from Steve W. Berman in Response to Defendants' Letter Brief, Docket No. 275. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 11/27/2009)
November 25, 2009 Filing 282 Reply Memorandum re #271 MOTION Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Fernandez, Dorothy) (Filed on 11/25/2009)
November 25, 2009 Filing 281 Letter from Darryl P. Rains in Response to Plaintiffs' Letter Brief, Docket #273. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 11/25/2009)
November 25, 2009 Filing 280 Letter from Darryl P. Rains in Response to Plaintiffs' Letter Brief, Docket 270. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 11/25/2009)
November 25, 2009 Filing 279 Letter from David Bayless to Honorable William H. Alsup. (Bayless, David) (Filed on 11/25/2009)
November 25, 2009 Filing 278 Letter from Darryl P. Rains in Response to Plaintiffs' Letter Brief, Docket #266. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Errata C)(Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 11/25/2009)
November 24, 2009 Filing 277 Memorandum in Opposition re #271 MOTION Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Fernandez, Dorothy) (Filed on 11/24/2009)
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S 11/24/2009 LETTER [re (275 in 3:08-cv-01510-WHA) Letter filed by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., George Pereira, William A. Hasler, Charles R. Schwab, Donald F. Doward, Randall W. Merk, Donald R. Stephens, Schwab Investments, Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Gerald B. Smith, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Michael W. Wilsey ]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/24/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2009)
November 24, 2009 Filing 275 Letter from Darryl P. Rains requesting protective order to block the deposition of Mr. Charles Schwab from proceeding on January 7, 2010, and any date after discovery cut-off (January 11, 2010). (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 11/24/2009)
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTES. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 23, 2009. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2009)
November 23, 2009 Filing 273 Letter from Steve W. Berman to Honorable William H. Alsup. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 11/23/2009)
November 18, 2009 Filing 272 NOTICE by YieldPlus Investor Group Manual Filing Notification (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 11/18/2009)
November 18, 2009 Filing 271 MOTION Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 11/18/2009)
November 18, 2009 Filing 270 Letter from Reed R. Kathrein to Honorable William H. Alsup. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 11/18/2009)
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER SETTING HEARING RE PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re (266 in 3:08-cv-01510-WHA) Letter filed by YieldPlus Investor Group]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/17/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2009)
November 17, 2009 Filing 268 NOTICE by YieldPlus Investor Group Manual Filing Notification (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 11/17/2009)
November 17, 2009 Filing 267 MOTION Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 11/17/2009)
November 17, 2009 Filing 266 Letter from Reed R. Kathrein to Honorable William H. Alsup - REDACTED VERSION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 11/17/2009)
November 12, 2009 Filing 265 Defendant Kimon P. Daifotis' Answer to Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Amended Complainti ANSWER to Amended Complaint byKimon Daifotis. (Bayless, David) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
November 12, 2009 Filing 264 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (2nd Amended Complaint) byMariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
November 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 263 Stipulation and Order Regarding Second Settlement Conference. Further Settlement Conference prev. set for 11/24/9 at 9:30 AM has been re-set for 1/20/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/10/9. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2009)
November 9, 2009 Filing 262 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Second Settlement Conference by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 11/9/2009)
November 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER RE DISCOVERY DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 9, 2009. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2009)
November 6, 2009 Filing 260 Proposed Order re #259 Transcript,, Regarding Discovery Deadlines by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 11/6/2009)
November 5, 2009 Filing 259 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/30/09, before Judge WILLIAM H. ALSUP. Court Reporter/Transcriber Margaret "Margo" Gurule, Telephone number 415-504-4204 or margolargo@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/1/2010. (mng, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2009)
October 30, 2009 Filing 258 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 10/30/2009 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 10/30/2009). (Court Reporter Margo Gurule.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/30/2009)
October 29, 2009 Filing 257 Letter from Steve W. Berman to Hon. William H. Alsup re Discovery Dispute. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 10/29/2009)
October 29, 2009 Filing 256 Letter from Reed R. Kathrein to Hon. William Alsup. (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 10/29/2009)
October 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST TO AMEND CASE SCHEDULE by Judge Alsup denying (252) Motion to Amend/Correct ; in case 3:08-cv-01510-WHA (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2009)
October 27, 2009 Filing 254 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Shortening Time for Consideration of the Motion to Amend Case Schedule by YieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
October 26, 2009 Filing 253 Declaration of Sean R. Matt in Support of #252 MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Case Schedule filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Related document(s) #252 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 10/26/2009)
October 26, 2009 Filing 252 MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Case Schedule filed by YieldPlus Investor Group. Motion Hearing set for 12/3/2009 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 10/26/2009)
October 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re (248 in 3:08-cv-01510-WHA) Letter filed by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., George Pereira, William A. Hasler, Charles R. Schwab, Donald F. Doward, Randall W. Merk, Donald R. Stephens, Schwab Investments, Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Evelyn Dilsaver, Gerald B. Smith, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Michael W. Wilsey, (249 in 3:08-cv-01510-WHA) Letter filed by Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., George Pereira, William A. Hasler, Charles R. Schwab, Donald F. Doward, Randall W. Merk, Donald R. Stephens, Schwab Investments, Evelyn Dilsaver, Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Matthew Hastings, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Gerald B. Smith, Robert G. Holmes, Michael W. Wilsey]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/26/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2009)
October 26, 2009 Filing 250 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Consolidated Amended Complaint against Mariann Byerwalter, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Charles Schwab Investment Management Inc., Kimon Daifotis, Evelyn Dilsaver, Donald F. Doward, William A. Hasler, Matthew Hastings, Robert G. Holmes, Randall W. Merk, George Pereira, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Charles R. Schwab, Schwab Investments, Gerald B. Smith, Donald R. Stephens, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Michael W. Wilsey. Filed byYieldPlus Investor Group. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 10/26/2009)
October 23, 2009 Filing 249 Letter from Darryl P. Rains to Judge Alsup re: discovery cutoff dates. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 10/23/2009)
October 23, 2009 Filing 248 Letter from Darryl P. Rains to Judge Alsup Requesting Order to Compel Response. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 10/23/2009)
October 22, 2009