Delgado v. Barnes et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Delgado
Defendant: A. Barnes, T. Woolf, B. Johnson and Eloy Medina
Case Number: 3:2008cv02556
Filed: May 20, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/12/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
August 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER AND WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM TO TRANSPORT PLAINTIFF KENNETH DELGADO, CDCR NO. C-62219 TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT on 8/29/2013 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 8/23/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
August 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER AND WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM TO TRANSPORT PLAINTIFF KENNETH DELGADO, CDCR NO. C-62219 TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT re 77 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 8/8/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2013)
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 74 Case Management Conference - Initial. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/10/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2013)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/11/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/18/2013 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/13/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2013)
June 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER requiring parties to meet and confer re settlement. Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/12/2012 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 205, 2nd Floor, Eureka before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 06/06/12. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2012)
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 WRIT of habeas corpus ad testificandum issued for presence of Plaintiff at settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 5/10/12. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delgado v. Barnes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Woolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eloy Medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?