Dotson v. United States Of America et al
Plaintiff: Malinda Dotson
Defendant: United States Of America, Frank Zazueta, Megan E. Hamreus, Christopher Wallace and Alexander Strachan
Case Number: 3:2008cv04291
Filed: September 11, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1402 Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 97 JUDGMENT: Plaintiff settled with defendant United States. The remaining defendants' motion for summary judgment has been granted. Accordingly, judgment is entered in favor of defendant Zazueta, Wallace, Hamreus and Strachan and against plaintiff. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2011) Modified on 5/10/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER DISMISSING CERTAIN DEFTS. (CASE CLOSED IN ERROR) INDIVIDUAL DEFTS MOTION REMAIN ON 5/6/11.
March 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO DISMISS AND REMAND; RESETTING DATE FOR PENDING MOTION (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2011)
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Re 65 Attendance at Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/28/2011. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2011)
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2011)
November 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Vacating Status and Settlement Conferences before Magistrate Judge Vadas. Signed by Judge Vadas on November 5, 2010. (cmw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2010)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO MODIFY THE PRETRIAL AND TRIAL SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/01/10. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
October 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Setting Status Conference re: Plaintiff's Request to Change Location of Settlement Conference. Status Conference set for 11/9/2010 at 02:00 PM at the Eureka Federal Courthouse. Signed by Judge Vadas on October 15, 2010. (cmw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2010)
August 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER extending briefing schedule (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
June 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER continuing cmc to 7/2/10 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2010)
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER extending deadlines (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2009)
October 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER continuing cmc to 11/13/09 @ 3 p.m. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2009)
May 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER continuing cmc to 5/22/09 @ 3:00 p.m.. Signed by Judge Illston on 5/6/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2009)
April 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER continuing cmc to 5/8/09 @ 3 p.m. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2009)
September 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5 JUDICIAL REFERRAL FOR PURPOSE OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP OF CASES. Signed by Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 9/17/2008. (wdblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2008) Modified on 9/19/2008 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
September 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ***ORDER NOT SIGNED, PLEASE REFER TO DOCKET ENTRY #5*** JUDICIAL REFERRAL FOR PURPOSE OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP OF CASES. Signed by Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 9/17/2008. (wdblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2008) Modified on 9/19/2008 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dotson v. United States Of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malinda Dotson
Represented By: James Anthony Zito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Zazueta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan E. Hamreus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Strachan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?