Peterson v. Islamic Republic of Iran
Plaintiff: Deborah D. Peterson
Defendant: Islamic Republic of Iran
Case Number: 3:2008mc80030
Filed: March 11, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER GRANTING re 253 Ex Parte MOTION for process server to levy execution filed by Deborah D. Peterson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 5/13/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER REFERRING 253 Ex Parte MOTION for process server to levy execution to Magistrate Judge Zimmerman.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/7/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2010)
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting 230 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2009)
January 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting 228 Motion to Continue (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2009)
December 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/18/2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2008)
December 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER Referring Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 17, 2008. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2008)
December 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER of Referral re Discovery. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 9, 2008. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2008)
December 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER ON HEARING SET FOR DECEMBER 17, 2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/1/2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2008)
November 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White denying 95 Motion to Enforce Judgment; rejecting 178 Report and Recommendations.; denying 184 Motion ; granting 186 Motion ; denying 191 Motion to Amend/Correct ; (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2008)
November 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 200 RULINGS ON THE OBJECTIONS TO THE COOK DECLARATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 11/21/2008 nunc pro tunc October 14, 2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2008)
November 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER VACATING THE POST-JUDGMENT HEARING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 11/20/2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2008)
November 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER by Judge Bernard Zimmerman vacating hearing 83 Ex Parte Application ; vacating hearing 95 Motion to Enforce Judgment; vacating hearing 97 Motion to Enforce Judgment; vacating hearing 98 Motion to Enforce Judgment; vacating hearing 99 Motion to Enforce Judgment; vacating hearing 100 Motion to Enforce Judgment; vacating hearing 101 Motion to Enforce Judgment; vacating hearing 102 Motion to Enforce Judgment; vacating hearing 103 Motion to Enforce Judgment; vacating hearing [ 104] Motion to Enforce Judgment; vacating hearing 105 Motion to Enforce Judgment; vacating hearing 106 Motion to Enforce Judgment; vacating hearing 107 Motion to Enforce Judgment; vacating hearing 108 Motion to Enforce Judgment; vacating hear ing 109 Motion to Enforce Judgment; vacating hearing 110 Motion to Enforce Judgment; vacating hearing 18 Motion to Enforce Judgment; vacating hearing 19 Motion to Amend/Correct ; ; vacating hearing 20 Motion to Enforce Judgment; vacating hearing 26 Motion to Enforce Judgment (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
October 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER CONTINUING POST-JUDGMENT HEARINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 10/15/2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2008)
September 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman denying 164 Motion to Continue (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2008)
September 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 130 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 9/4/2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peterson v. Islamic Republic of Iran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah D. Peterson
Represented By: Robert Joseph Perkiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Islamic Republic of Iran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?