Russell v. United States Of America
Plaintiff: Taylor Russell
Defendant: United States Of America
Case Number: 3:2009cv03239
Filed: July 16, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER GRANTING 235 MOTION TO SEAL.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2016)
October 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 229 REQUEST RE POSSIBLY RELATED ACTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 3, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2013)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 227 JUDGMENT in favor of plaintiffs and against defendant. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 8/2/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2013)
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER REQUESTING SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION re 220 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval filed by Taylor Russell. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 22, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER SETTING DATE FOR FAIRNESS HEARING Motion Hearing set for 8/1/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 11, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER CERTIFYING SETTLEMENT CLASS, SETTING FINAL FAIRNESS HEARING DATE, AUTHORIZING DISTRIBUTION OF NOTICE, AND VACATING TRIAL DATES by Judge Alsup granting 187 Motion for Settlement; granting 204 Stipulation (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2013)
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER REQUESTING INFORMATION (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2013)
June 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER CERTIFYING CLASS AND APPOINTING CLASS COUNSEL by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 158 Motion to Certify Class.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER REQUIRING DISCOVERY AND DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION re 138 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Renewed filed by United States Of America, 139 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Taylor Russell. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 22, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2012)
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 106 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 21, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2010)
April 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER ON MOTION TO INTERVENE AND RELATED MOTIONS by Judge Alsup denying 62 Motion to Intervene; denying 63 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 64 Motion to Certify Class; denying 65 Motion to Shorten Time (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2010)
March 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Judge William Alsup [denying 35 Motion to Certify Class; granting 32 Motion to Dismiss]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2010)
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER REGARDING DELAYED START TIME OF TODAY'S HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 24, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2010)
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER SHORTENING TIME ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge Alsup granting 41 Motion to Shorten Time (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2010)
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER TO SUBMIT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENTS IN.PDF FORMAT. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/8/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2010)
September 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 8 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/20/08. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russell v. United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor Russell
Represented By: S. Chandler Visher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America
Represented By: Alicia M. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?