Johnson v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Plaintiff: Mark Johnson
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco, Civil Service Commission of San Francisco and San Francisco Fire Department
Case Number: 3:2009cv05503
Filed: November 20, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting 198 Motion Re Threshold Legal Issues. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2017)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 4/12/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2016)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/25/2016. Case Management Conference set for 4/1/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/8/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2016)
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON 157 Motion for Summary Judgment and 164 MOTION to Strike AND VACATING Pretrial and Trial Dates. Motion Hearing set for 2/19/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on November 24, 2015. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2015)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER OF DISCLOSURE. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/7/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2015)
May 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 151 STIPULATION SECOND AMENDED ORDER RE PRETRIAL AND TRIAL SCHEDULE. Expert Discovery due by 9/17/2015. Jury Selection set for 3/16/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Jur y Trial set for 3/21/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Motion Hearing set for 12/4/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Pretrial Conference set for 2/29/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/6/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2015)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENYING PLAINTIFFS; MOTION TO AMEND.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/29/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER RE: MOTION TO LIFT THE PROTECTIVE ORDER AND FOR A FINDING THAT CERTAIN DOCUMENTS ARE NO LONGER COVERED BY THE PROTECTIVE ORDER (Dkt. No. 107). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 1/12/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2012)
October 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER REGARDING SUBMISSION OF GOVERNMENT CLAIM re 105 Stipulation filed by Franco S. Calzolai, Michael R. Bryant, Mark Johnson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Order on 10/17/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2011)
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER VACATING HEARING AND PRETRIAL DATES. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/25/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2011)
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER denying relief requested in Dkt # 74 (jllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2011)
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 67 Stipulation filed by Mark Johnson. Signed by Judge James Larson on 3/1/11. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2011)
January 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER re 60 Letter and REFERRING Discovery to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 12, 2011. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2011)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING 53 STIPULATION TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/2/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
August 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING 37 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/10/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White DENYING 21 Motion for TRO; DENYING 26 Motion Order to Show Cause re Permanent Injunction. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2010)
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE OF TENTATIVE RULING AND QUESTIONS re 21 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 3, 2010. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2010)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Temporary Restraining Order Hearing set for 8/4/2010 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/26/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
June 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/29/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2010)
April 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING 9 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion To Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 6/11/2010. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/18/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/6/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2010)
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting 7 Substitution of Attorney. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 3/24/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Civil Service Commission of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Fire Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?