Frost v. Aurora Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: James William Frost
Defendant: Aurora Loan Servicing, LLC and Aurora Bank FSB
Case Number: 3:2010cv02476
Filed: June 4, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF THAT HE MUST STILL RESPOND TO THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 22, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 8, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
February 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 8, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2011)
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge Alsup granting 42 Motion to Set Aside Default (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/7/2011: # 1 Certificate of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF).
January 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 28, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/28/2011: # 1 Certificate of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF).
January 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER REGARDING DEADLINE TO FILE MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT, Motions terminated: 39 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default and Required Showing of Right to Foreclose filed by Aurora Bank FSB, Aurora Loan Servicing, LLC.. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 3, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/3/2011: # 1 Certificate of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frost v. Aurora Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James William Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Philip Howard Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Bank FSB
Represented By: Philip Howard Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?