Souza v. United States Of America
Plaintiff: Billie Y. Souza
Defendant: United States Of America
Case Number: 3:2010cv02651
Filed: June 16, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422 IRS: Refund Taxes
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Thelton Henderson on 7/5/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2011)
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference for 7/11/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/22/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 21 MOTION to Vacate Order of Dismissal. Case Management Conference set for 6/27/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/25/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
March 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/02/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2011)
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Initial Case Management Conference to 3/7/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/07/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2011) Modified on 2/7/2011 (tmi, COURT STAFF).
December 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Initial Case Management Conference. Initial Case Management Conference rescheduled to 2/14/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/14/10. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2010)
November 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/20/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/8/10. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2010)
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing the Initial Case Management Conference to 11/15/2010 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/14/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Souza v. United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billie Y. Souza
Represented By: Neil Jon Bloomfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America
Represented By: Blake D. Stamm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?