Cooper v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Michael C. Cooper
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 3:2010cv04299
Filed: September 23, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Adopting 45 Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendations Re 37 Plaintiff's Counsel's Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Motion for Attorneys' Fees Without Prejudice. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2015)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: Supplemental Briefing. Show Cause Response due by 5/19/2015. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 5/28/2015 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/12/2015. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2015)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER for Supplemental Briefing re Motion for Attorneys Fee. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/13/2015. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2015)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER re 31 MOTION for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/17/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2014)
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 29 Stipulation, filed by Michael C. Cooper, Motions terminated: 27 MOTION for Attorney Fees AND EXPENSES UNDER THE EQUAL ACCESS TO JUSTICE ACT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND DECLARATION OF STEVEN G. ROSALES filed by Michael C. Cooper.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/3/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2012)
December 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 21 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Denying 22 Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2011)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CIVIL STANDING ORDER for U.S. District Judge Edward M. Chen. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND RESETTING CMC re 17 Stipulation filed by Michael C. Cooper. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/3/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael C. Cooper
Represented By: Steven Gilberto Rosales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?