Newport et al v. Burger King Corporation
Plaintiff: Lorraine D. Whitehurst, Allience Inc, Elham Hakimianpour, David Lynwood Hairston, Gate 74 Inc, C&R Foods Inc, Centennial Management Corporation, Mangen Group Inc, Evergreen Restaurant Group California Inc, WDR Restaurants Inc, Richard G. Whitehurst, Violet Hakimianpour, Danabo Group Inc, Shenandoah Valley Enterprises Inc, The Rab LLC, Eureka Fortune Inc, Jose Villaflor, RLE Investment Corporation, Herbert Hakimianpour, Chu Investment Inc, Summit Equity Group Inc, Sacca Corp, Chris G. Bredesen, Tri-City Foods Inc, Puja Restaurant Group Inc, SJ Quickbite Inc, Tallat Batla, Roy D. Newport, Albert Gonzales, III, Masroor A. Batla, Ravind Ent Inc, Ho Yee Restaurant, Gussie Hampton, Brening Enterprises Inc, C&S Foods Inc, Patel Brothers Inc, Larry D. Ralston, Brening Enterprises No. 3 Inc, Midas Enterprises Corporation, 952 Enterprises LLC, Hart Foods Inc, Deep ValleyEnterprises Inc, Carolyn P. Arnold, Brening Enterprises LP, Mancha Development Company, Robert T. Chiu, Beach City Inc, J and A Food Service Inc, Robert Eng, Bayshore Foods Inc, Reddy Holly LP, Metro Management Systems Inc, C&L 28 Inc, Robert Hakimianpour, Dhillon ABS Investment Inc and Charles D. Cobb
Defendant: Burger King Corporation
Counter Defendant: Nasser Aliabadi, Leslie Broadland, Lynn A. Hartje, Joseph C. Kruger, Kyle Redding, Kern Desert Foods, Inc., Reeddy, Inc., Donna Rubin, Shakeb H. Zuberi, Herman Y Li, Jose F. Placencia, Roger Y Li, Vicky Kruger, Catherine A. Kubu, Vetit Piyas, John M. Benedict, Bonita B. Brening, Daniel Y. Chu, SRAC Holdings I, Inc., Jerry M. Comstock, Willie C. Cook, William Sein Chow, Lawrence P. Cimmarusti, Granya, Inc., Asit Vyas, Jae Chung, David L. Hairston, Todd Knox, Diemar E. Schott, Donna B. Agins, Dominic Ho, Harshraj Ghai, Robert K. Swift, Gregory R. Brening, Roland Eddy, Rakesh n. Patel, George J. Gantes, Judy G. Stinnett, Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC, Jayant F. Patel, Ravi Batra, Chung Ching Chang, Herbert Y. Li, Danabo Arcadia Restaurant Ventures LLC, Sanjay Rangan, Piyas Corporation, Howard Mangen, Benjamin Kuo-An Chang, Susan A. Villaflor, Byron Crossen, OC Burger Partners, LLC, Geboy, Inc., Richard H. Agins, Patsy P. Chu, Susan Kubu-Jones, Vinod Sawhney, Angela Chen, Vincent F. Eupierre, William Scarbrough, Siu May Li, Marshall J. Chuang, Balbir S. Dhillon, Hiten Patel, Allan B. Gantes, Francisco Foods, Inc., Vimal Patel, Carol K. McManus, Wai-Mau Szeto, Clifton Shigaki, Antelope Valley Restaurants, Inc., SFO EQUITIES, LLC, Chris Chen, Card Investment, Incorporated, Richard A. Brening, Jr., Desert Restaurant Ventures, LLC, Syed Musavi, Stanley Kubu, Progressive Management Services, Inc., Jagdish R. Amin, Centennial Restaurants LLC, Batla Restaurant Group, Inc., Huei L. Chang, Dean Frank Busch, Sr., Gluba Holdings, LLC, David J. Davis, Rituraj Investments, Inc., Geboy de Tijuana SA de CV, Simmi Gulati, Anthony P. Sacca, Cathy Z. Sacca, Beatrice E. Kubu, Sunil Gulati, Devil Mt. Foods - Pleasant Hill, Dara Dejbakhsh, Peggy E. Yeager, Naranji R. Patel, Nancy Mae Busch, Lynn R. McNeely, David Knox, John D. Mascali, JimRich Restaurant Investment Corporation, Luis Boyance, Paragon Management Services, Inc., B-Y-J Partners, P. A. & B. Investments, Inc., Amarjeet Ghai, Sunil G. Desai, Joseph K. Wong, Hansa V. Chhaddva, Thomas E. Yeager, Chi Wai Low, John Yee, HG Foods LLC, Jorge Finkelberg, Cal Burg, Inc., Gary H. Geiger, Joseph Rubin, Mary Ann Mallis, Martin Quinn, David C. Wurts, Sara Wade Corporation, Pravin F. Patel, Burger InvestCo, LLC, Brening Enterprises No. 4, Inc., John D. Gantes, Terry O. Hartshorn, Andrew J. Cherng, Yvette Fan, James W. Stinnett, Arcadia Restaurant Ventures, LLC, Scott Brening, Abdul R. Khan, HKR Restaurants, Inc. n/k/a WD Restaurant #1937, Ralph J. Cimmarusti, Joseph A. Sacca, Sacca Family Corporation, Ella A. Smothers, Cimm's Incorporated, Hakimianpour Santa Monica Group, L.L.C., Patricia Scarbrough, Charanjit Ghai, Paul L. Mallis, Evergreen Restaurant Group, Wilawan Foo, George Fan, Geoffrey A. Jones, Tina L. Benedict and Union Foods Corp.
Case Number: 3:2010cv04511
Filed: October 5, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Referring Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2012 Filing 504 STIPULATION Voluntary Stipulation for Dismissal of Action with Prejudice by Burger King Corp., Willie C. Cook, Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC, SRAC Holdings I, Inc., and Jeffrey Comstock, Arcadia Restaurant Ventures, LLC, Danabo Arcadia Restaurant Ventures LLC, Dara Dejbakhsh, and Desert Restaurant Ventures, LLC, John D. Mascali, Summit Equity Group, Inc., and Clifton Shigaki, Plaintiffs Roy D. Newport, et al. and certain Counter-Defendants on Ex. A filed by Burger King Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 12/27/2012)
May 11, 2012 Filing 503 Minute Entry: Further Settlement Conference held on 5/10/12 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Final settlement agreements shall be signed on or before June 1, 2012, and a Motion for Preliminary Approval shall be filed on or before June 15, 2012.(Court Reporter Not Reported.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/11/2012)
May 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 502 ORDER CLARIFYING ATTENDANCE AT THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON MAY 10, 2012. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/9/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2012)
May 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 501 Notice and Order ADVANCING Time for Further Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Further Settlement Conference set for 5/10/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom D, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/8/12. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2012) Modified on 5/9/2012 (mjj2S, COURT STAFF).
April 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 500 ORDER ENLARGING TIME TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Hon. William Alsup granting #499 Stipulation.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2012)
April 24, 2012 Filing 499 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #469 Order Enlarging Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Jagdish R. Amin, Antelope Valley Restaurants, Inc., Arcadia Restaurant Ventures, LLC, Carolyn P. Arnold, B-Y-J Partners, Masroor A. Batla, Tallat Batla, Batla Restaurant Group, Inc., Ravi Batra, Bayshore Foods Inc, Beach City Inc, John M. Benedict, Tina L. Benedict, Luis Boyance, Chris G. Bredesen, Bonita B. Brening, Brening Enterprises No. 3 Inc, Brening Enterprises No. 4, Inc., Richard A. Brening, Jr., Leslie Broadland, Burger InvestCo, LLC, Gregory R. Brening, Scott Brening, Brening Enterprises Inc, Brening Enterprises LP, Burger King Corporation, Dean Frank Busch, Sr, Nancy Mae Busch, C&L 28 Inc, C&R Foods Inc, C&S Foods Inc, Cal Burg, Inc., Card Investment, Incorporated, Centennial Management Corporation, Centennial Restaurants LLC, Benjamin Kuo-An Chang, Chung Ching Chang, Huei L. Chang, Angela Chen, Chris Chen, Andrew J. Cherng, Hansa V. Chhaddva, Robert T. Chiu, William Sein Chow, Daniel Y. Chu, Patsy P. Chu, Chu Investment Inc, Marshall J. Chuang, Jae Chung, Cimm's Incorporated, Lawrence P. Cimmarusti, Ralph J. Cimmarusti, Charles D. Cobb, Jerry M. Comstock, Willie C. Cook, Byron Crossen, Danabo Arcadia Restaurant Ventures LLC, Danabo Group Inc, David J. Davis, Deep ValleyEnterprises Inc, Dara Dejbakhsh, Sunil G. Desai, Desert Restaurant Ventures, LLC, Devil Mt. Foods - Pleasant Hill, Balbir S. Dhillon, Dhillon ABS Investment Inc, Roland Eddy, Robert Eng, Vincent F. Eupierre, Eureka Fortune Inc, Evergreen Restaurant Group California Inc, 952 Enterprises LLC, Donna B. Agins, Richard H. Agins, Nasser Aliabadi, George Fan, Yvette Fan, Jorge Finkelberg, Wilawan Foo, Francisco Foods, Inc., Allan B. Gantes, George J. Gantes, John D. Gantes, Gate 74 Inc, Geboy de Tijuana SA de CV, Geboy, Inc., Gary H. Geiger, Amarjeet Ghai, Charanjit Ghai, Harshraj Ghai, Gluba Holdings, LLC, Albert Gonzales, III, Granya, Inc., Simmi Gulati, Sunil Gulati, HG Foods LLC, HKR Restaurants, Inc. n/k/a WD Restaurant #1937, David Lynwood Hairston, Elham Hakimianpour, Herbert Hakimianpour, Robert Hakimianpour, Violet Hakimianpour, Hakimianpour Santa Monica Group, L.L.C., Gussie Hampton, Hart Foods Inc, Lynn A. Hartje, Terry O. Hartshorn, Dominic Ho, Ho Yee Restaurant, J and A Food Service Inc, JimRich Restaurant Investment Corporation, Geoffrey A. Jones, Kern Desert Foods, Inc., Abdul R. Khan, David Knox, Todd Knox, Joseph C. Kruger, Vicky Kruger, Beatrice E. Kubu, Catherine A. Kubu, Susan Kubu-Jones, Herbert Y. Li, Herman Y Li, Roger Y Li, Siu May Li, Chi Wai Low, Mary Ann Mallis, Paul L. Mallis, Mancha Development Company, Howard Mangen, Mangen Group Inc, John D. Mascali, Carol K. McManus, Lynn R. McNeely, Metro Management Systems Inc, Midas Enterprises Corporation, Syed Musavi, Roy D. Newport, OC Burger Partners, LLC, P. A. & B. Investments, Inc., Paragon Management Services, Inc., Hiten Patel, Jayant F. Patel, Naranji R. Patel, Pravin F. Patel, Rakesh n. Patel, Vimal Patel, Patel Brothers Inc, Vetit Piyas, Piyas Corporation, Jose F. Placencia, Progressive Management Services, Inc., Puja Restaurant Group Inc, RLE Investment Corporation, Larry D. Ralston, Sanjay Rangan, Ravind Ent Inc, Kyle Redding, Reddy Holly LP, Reeddy, Inc., Rituraj Investments, Inc., Donna Rubin, Joseph Rubin, SFO EQUITIES, LLC, SJ Quickbite Inc, SRAC Holdings I, Inc., Anthony P. Sacca, Cathy Z. Sacca, Joseph A. Sacca, Sacca Corp, Sacca Family Corporation, Sara Wade Corporation, Vinod Sawhney, Patricia Scarbrough, William Scarbrough, Diemar E. Schott, Shenandoah Valley Enterprises Inc, Clifton Shigaki, Ella A. Smothers, James W. Stinnett, Judy G. Stinnett, Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC, Summit Equity Group Inc, Robert K. Swift, Wai-Mau Szeto, The Rab LLC, Tri-City Foods Inc, Union Foods Corp., Jose Villaflor, Susan A. Villaflor, Asit Vyas, WDR Restaurants Inc, Lorraine D. Whitehurst, Richard G. Whitehurst, Joseph K. Wong, David C. Wurts, Peggy E. Yeager, Thomas E. Yeager, John Yee, Shakeb H. Zuberi. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 4/24/2012)
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 498 Notice and Order Setting Further Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Further Settlement Conference set for 5/10/2012 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/16/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2012)
April 16, 2012 Filing 497 Minute Entry: Further Settlement Conference held on 4/13/12 before Judge Spero. Further settlement conf. set for 5/10/12 at Noon. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/16/2012)
April 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 496 ORDER ENLARGING TIME TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part #495 Stipulation.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2012)
April 10, 2012 Filing 495 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #469 Order Enlarging Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Burger King Corporation, Willie C. Cook. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 4/10/2012)
April 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 494 Notice and Order Setting Further Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Further Settlement Conference set for 4/13/2012 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/5/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2012)
April 5, 2012 Filing 493 Minute Entry: Further Settlement Conference held on 4/4/12 before Magistrate Judge Spero. Further settlement conference set for 4/13/12 at 9:30 AM. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/5/2012)
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 492 ORDER ENLARGING TIME TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Hon. William Alsup granting #491 Stipulation.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
February 28, 2012 Filing 491 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #469 Order filed by Allience Inc, Jagdish R. Amin, Antelope Valley Restaurants, Inc., Arcadia Restaurant Ventures, LLC, Carolyn P. Arnold, B-Y-J Partners, Masroor A. Batla, Tallat Batla, Batla Restaurant Group, Inc., Ravi Batra, Bayshore Foods Inc, Beach City Inc, John M. Benedict, Tina L. Benedict, Luis Boyance, Chris G. Bredesen, Bonita B. Brening, Gregory R. Brening, Brening Enterprises No. 3 Inc, Brening Enterprises No. 4, Inc., Richard A. Brening, Jr., Leslie Broadland, Burger InvestCo, LLC, Burger King Corporation, Scott Brening, Brening Enterprises Inc, Brening Enterprises LP, Dean Frank Busch, Sr, Nancy Mae Busch, C&L 28 Inc, C&R Foods Inc, C&S Foods Inc, Cal Burg, Inc., Card Investment, Incorporated, Centennial Management Corporation, Centennial Restaurants LLC, Benjamin Kuo-An Chang, Chung Ching Chang, Huei L. Chang, Angela Chen, Chris Chen, Andrew J. Cherng, Hansa V. Chhaddva, Robert T. Chiu, William Sein Chow, Daniel Y. Chu, Patsy P. Chu, Chu Investment Inc, Marshall J. Chuang, Jae Chung, Cimm's Incorporated, Lawrence P. Cimmarusti, Ralph J. Cimmarusti, Charles D. Cobb, Jerry M. Comstock, Willie C. Cook, Byron Crossen, Danabo Arcadia Restaurant Ventures LLC, Danabo Group Inc, David J. Davis, Deep ValleyEnterprises Inc, Dara Dejbakhsh, Sunil G. Desai, Desert Restaurant Ventures, LLC, Devil Mt. Foods - Pleasant Hill, Balbir S. Dhillon, Dhillon ABS Investment Inc, Roland Eddy, Robert Eng, Vincent F. Eupierre, Eureka Fortune Inc, Evergreen Restaurant Group, Evergreen Restaurant Group California Inc, 952 Enterprises LLC, Donna B. Agins, Richard H. Agins, Nasser Aliabadi, George Fan, Yvette Fan, Jorge Finkelberg, Wilawan Foo, Francisco Foods, Inc., Allan B. Gantes, George J. Gantes, John D. Gantes, Gate 74 Inc, Geboy de Tijuana SA de CV, Geboy, Inc., Gary H. Geiger, Amarjeet Ghai, Charanjit Ghai, Harshraj Ghai, Gluba Holdings, LLC, Albert Gonzales, III, Granya, Inc., Simmi Gulati, Sunil Gulati, HG Foods LLC, HKR Restaurants, Inc. n/k/a WD Restaurant #1937, David L. Hairston, David Lynwood Hairston, Elham Hakimianpour, Herbert Hakimianpour, Robert Hakimianpour, Violet Hakimianpour, Hakimianpour Santa Monica Group, L.L.C., Gussie Hampton, Gussie Hampton, Hart Foods Inc, Lynn A. Hartje, Terry O. Hartshorn, Dominic Ho, Ho Yee Restaurant, J and A Food Service Inc, JimRich Restaurant Investment Corporation, Geoffrey A. Jones, Kern Desert Foods, Inc., Abdul R. Khan, David Knox, Todd Knox, Joseph C. Kruger, Vicky Kruger, Beatrice E. Kubu, Catherine A. Kubu, Stanley Kubu, Susan Kubu-Jones, Herbert Y. Li, Herman Y Li, Roger Y Li, Siu May Li, Chi Wai Low, Mary Ann Mallis, Paul L. Mallis, Mancha Development Company, Howard Mangen, Mangen Group Inc, John D. Mascali, Carol K. McManus, Lynn R. McNeely, Metro Management Systems Inc, Midas Enterprises Corporation, Syed Musavi, Roy D. Newport, OC Burger Partners, LLC, P. A. & B. Investments, Inc., Paragon Management Services, Inc., Hiten Patel, Jayant F. Patel, Naranji R. Patel, Pravin F. Patel, Rakesh n. Patel, Vimal Patel, Patel Brothers Inc, Vetit Piyas, Piyas Corporation, Jose F. Placencia, Progressive Management Services, Inc., Puja Restaurant Group Inc, Martin Quinn, RLE Investment Corporation, Larry D. Ralston, Sanjay Rangan, Ravind Ent Inc, Kyle Redding, Reddy Holly LP, Reeddy, Inc., Rituraj Investments, Inc., Donna Rubin, Joseph Rubin, SFO EQUITIES, LLC, SJ Quickbite Inc, SRAC Holdings I, Inc., Anthony P. Sacca, Cathy Z. Sacca, Joseph A. Sacca, Sacca Corp, Sacca Family Corporation, Sara Wade Corporation, Vinod Sawhney, Patricia Scarbrough, William Scarbrough, Diemar E. Schott, Shenandoah Valley Enterprises Inc, Clifton Shigaki, Ella A. Smothers, James W. Stinnett, Judy G. Stinnett, Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC, Summit Equity Group Inc, Robert K. Swift, Wai-Mau Szeto, The Rab LLC, Tri-City Foods Inc, Union Foods Corp., Jose Villaflor, Susan A. Villaflor, Asit Vyas, WDR Restaurants Inc, Lorraine D. Whitehurst, Richard G. Whitehurst, Joseph K. Wong, David C. Wurts, Peggy E. Yeager, Thomas E. Yeager, John Yee, Shakeb H. Zuberi. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 2/28/2012)
February 24, 2012 Filing 490 AMENDED Minute Entry: Further Settlement Conference held on 2/23/12 before Judge Spero. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) *Amended to correct date on minute order.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/24/2012)
February 24, 2012 Filing 489 Minute Entry: Further Settlement Conference held on 2/23/12 before Magistrate Judge Spero. Attorney conference set for 4/4/12 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom D. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/24/2012)
February 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 488 ORDER ENLARGING TIME TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Hon. William Alsup granting #487 Stipulation.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2012)
February 7, 2012 Filing 487 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #469 Order filed by Allience Inc, Jagdish R. Amin, Antelope Valley Restaurants, Inc., Arcadia Restaurant Ventures, LLC, Carolyn P. Arnold, B-Y-J Partners, Masroor A. Batla, Tallat Batla, Batla Restaurant Group, Inc., Ravi Batra, Bayshore Foods Inc, Beach City Inc, John M. Benedict, Tina L. Benedict, Luis Boyance, Chris G. Bredesen, Bonita B. Brening, Gregory R. Brening, Brening Enterprises No. 3 Inc, Brening Enterprises No. 4, Inc., Richard A. Brening, Jr., Leslie Broadland, Burger InvestCo, LLC, Burger King Corporation, Scott Brening, Brening Enterprises Inc, Brening Enterprises LP, Dean Frank Busch, Sr, Nancy Mae Busch, C&L 28 Inc, C&R Foods Inc, C&S Foods Inc, Cal Burg, Inc., Card Investment, Incorporated, Centennial Management Corporation, Centennial Restaurants LLC, Benjamin Kuo-An Chang, Chung Ching Chang, Huei L. Chang, Angela Chen, Chris Chen, Andrew J. Cherng, Hansa V. Chhaddva, Robert T. Chiu, William Sein Chow, Daniel Y. Chu, Patsy P. Chu, Chu Investment Inc, Marshall J. Chuang, Jae Chung, Cimm's Incorporated, Lawrence P. Cimmarusti, Ralph J. Cimmarusti, Charles D. Cobb, Jerry M. Comstock, Willie C. Cook, Byron Crossen, Danabo Arcadia Restaurant Ventures LLC, Danabo Group Inc, David J. Davis, Deep ValleyEnterprises Inc, Dara Dejbakhsh, Sunil G. Desai, Desert Restaurant Ventures, LLC, Devil Mt. Foods - Pleasant Hill, Balbir S. Dhillon, Dhillon ABS Investment Inc, Roland Eddy, Robert Eng, Vincent F. Eupierre, Eureka Fortune Inc, Evergreen Restaurant Group, Evergreen Restaurant Group California Inc, 952 Enterprises LLC, Donna B. Agins, Richard H. Agins, Nasser Aliabadi, George Fan, Yvette Fan, Jorge Finkelberg, Wilawan Foo, Francisco Foods, Inc., Allan B. Gantes, George J. Gantes, John D. Gantes, Gate 74 Inc, Geboy de Tijuana SA de CV, Geboy, Inc., Gary H. Geiger, Amarjeet Ghai, Charanjit Ghai, Harshraj Ghai, Gluba Holdings, LLC, Albert Gonzales, III, Granya, Inc., Simmi Gulati, Sunil Gulati, HG Foods LLC, HKR Restaurants, Inc. n/k/a WD Restaurant #1937, David L. Hairston, David Lynwood Hairston, Elham Hakimianpour, Herbert Hakimianpour, Robert Hakimianpour, Violet Hakimianpour, Hakimianpour Santa Monica Group, L.L.C., Gussie Hampton, Gussie Hampton, Hart Foods Inc, Lynn A. Hartje, Terry O. Hartshorn, Dominic Ho, Ho Yee Restaurant, J and A Food Service Inc, JimRich Restaurant Investment Corporation, Geoffrey A. Jones, Kern Desert Foods, Inc., Abdul R. Khan, David Knox, Todd Knox, Joseph C. Kruger, Vicky Kruger, Beatrice E. Kubu, Catherine A. Kubu, Stanley Kubu, Susan Kubu-Jones, Herbert Y. Li, Herman Y Li, Roger Y Li, Siu May Li, Chi Wai Low, Mary Ann Mallis, Paul L. Mallis, Mancha Development Company, Howard Mangen, Mangen Group Inc, John D. Mascali, Carol K. McManus, Lynn R. McNeely, Metro Management Systems Inc, Midas Enterprises Corporation, Syed Musavi, Roy D. Newport, OC Burger Partners, LLC, P. A. & B. Investments, Inc., Paragon Management Services, Inc., Hiten Patel, Jayant F. Patel, Naranji R. Patel, Pravin F. Patel, Rakesh n. Patel, Vimal Patel, Patel Brothers Inc, Vetit Piyas, Piyas Corporation, Jose F. Placencia, Progressive Management Services, Inc., Puja Restaurant Group Inc, Martin Quinn, RLE Investment Corporation, Larry D. Ralston, Sanjay Rangan, Ravind Ent Inc, Kyle Redding, Reddy Holly LP, Reeddy, Inc., Rituraj Investments, Inc., Donna Rubin, Joseph Rubin, SFO EQUITIES, LLC, SJ Quickbite Inc, SRAC Holdings I, Inc., Anthony P. Sacca, Cathy Z. Sacca, Joseph A. Sacca, Sacca Corp, Sacca Family Corporation, Sara Wade Corporation, Vinod Sawhney, Patricia Scarbrough, William Scarbrough, Diemar E. Schott, Shenandoah Valley Enterprises Inc, Clifton Shigaki, Ella A. Smothers, James W. Stinnett, Judy G. Stinnett, Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC, Summit Equity Group Inc, Robert K. Swift, Wai-Mau Szeto, The Rab LLC, Tri-City Foods Inc, Union Foods Corp., Jose Villaflor, Susan A. Villaflor, Asit Vyas, WDR Restaurants Inc, Lorraine D. Whitehurst, Richard G. Whitehurst, Joseph K. Wong, David C. Wurts, Peggy E. Yeager, Thomas E. Yeager, John Yee, Shakeb H. Zuberi. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 2/7/2012)
January 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 486 Notice and Order Setting Further Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Further Settlement Conference (in person) set for 2/23/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/20/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2012)
January 20, 2012 Filing 485 Minute Entry: Further telephonic Settlement Conference held on 1/20/2012 before Judge Spero. Further, in person, Settlement Conference set for 2/23/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/20/2012)
January 18, 2012 Filing 484 Minute Entry: Further Telephonic Settlement Conference held on 1/18/2012 before Magistrate Judge Spero. Further telephonic settlement conference set for 1/20/12 at 9:00 AM. (Recording #Not Reported.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/18/2012)
January 18, 2012 Set/Reset Hearings: Further Telephonic Settlement Conference set for 1/20/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2012)
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 483 ORDER ENLARGING TIME TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Hon. William Alsup granting #482 Stipulation.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2012)
January 17, 2012 Filing 482 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #469 Order Enlarging Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Jagdish R. Amin, Antelope Valley Restaurants, Inc., Carolyn P. Arnold, B-Y-J Partners, Masroor A. Batla, Tallat Batla, Batla Restaurant Group, Inc., Ravi Batra, Bayshore Foods Inc, Beach City Inc, John M. Benedict, Tina L. Benedict, Chris G. Bredesen, Bonita B. Brening, Gregory R. Brening, Brening Enterprises No. 4, Inc., Richard A. Brening, Jr., Leslie Broadland, Scott Brening, Brening Enterprises Inc, Brening Enterprises LP, Brening Enterprises No. 3 Inc, Burger King Corporation, Dean Frank Busch, Sr, Nancy Mae Busch, C&L 28 Inc, C&R Foods Inc, C&S Foods Inc, Card Investment, Incorporated, Centennial Management Corporation, Benjamin Kuo-An Chang, Chung Ching Chang, Huei L. Chang, Angela Chen, Chris Chen, Andrew J. Cherng, Hansa V. Chhaddva, Robert T. Chiu, Daniel Y. Chu, Patsy P. Chu, Chu Investment Inc, Marshall J. Chuang, Jae Chung, Cimm's Incorporated, Lawrence P. Cimmarusti, Ralph J. Cimmarusti, Charles D. Cobb, Jerry M. Comstock, Willie C. Cook, Byron Crossen, David J. Davis, Deep ValleyEnterprises Inc, Dara Dejbakhsh, Sunil G. Desai, Desert Restaurant Ventures, LLC, Devil Mt. Foods - Pleasant Hill, Balbir S. Dhillon, Dhillon ABS Investment Inc, Roland Eddy, Vincent F. Eupierre, Eureka Fortune Inc, Evergreen Restaurant Group California Inc, 952 Enterprises LLC, Donna B. Agins, Richard H. Agins, Nasser Aliabadi, George Fan, Yvette Fan, Wilawan Foo, Gate 74 Inc, Gary H. Geiger, Amarjeet Ghai, Charanjit Ghai, Harshraj Ghai, Gluba Holdings, LLC, Albert Gonzales, III, Simmi Gulati, Sunil Gulati, HG Foods LLC, HKR Restaurants, Inc. n/k/a WD Restaurant #1937, David Lynwood Hairston, Elham Hakimianpour, Herbert Hakimianpour, Robert Hakimianpour, Violet Hakimianpour, Hakimianpour Santa Monica Group, L.L.C., Gussie Hampton, Hart Foods Inc, Lynn A. Hartje, Terry O. Hartshorn, Dominic Ho, J and A Food Service Inc, JimRich Restaurant Investment Corporation, Kern Desert Foods, Inc., David Knox, Todd Knox, Joseph C. Kruger, Vicky Kruger, Herbert Y. Li, Herman Y Li, Roger Y Li, Siu May Li, Chi Wai Low, Howard Mangen, Mangen Group Inc, Metro Management Systems Inc, Midas Enterprises Corporation, Syed Musavi, Roy D. Newport, P. A. & B. Investments, Inc., Paragon Management Services, Inc., Hiten Patel, Jayant F. Patel, Naranji R. Patel, Pravin F. Patel, Rakesh n. Patel, Vimal Patel, Patel Brothers Inc, Vetit Piyas, Piyas Corporation, Jose F. Placencia, Progressive Management Services, Inc., Puja Restaurant Group Inc, RLE Investment Corporation, Larry D. Ralston, Sanjay Rangan, Ravind Ent Inc, Kyle Redding, Reddy Holly LP, Reeddy, Inc., Rituraj Investments, Inc., Donna Rubin, Joseph Rubin, SFO EQUITIES, LLC, SJ Quickbite Inc, SRAC Holdings I, Inc., Anthony P. Sacca, Cathy Z. Sacca, Joseph A. Sacca, Sacca Corp, Sacca Family Corporation, Sara Wade Corporation, Patricia Scarbrough, William Scarbrough, Diemar E. Schott, Shenandoah Valley Enterprises Inc, Ella A. Smothers, James W. Stinnett, Judy G. Stinnett, Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC, Summit Equity Group Inc, Robert K. Swift, Wai-Mau Szeto, The Rab LLC, Tri-City Foods Inc, Union Foods Corp., Jose Villaflor, Susan A. Villaflor, WDR Restaurants Inc, Lorraine D. Whitehurst, Joseph K. Wong, David C. Wurts, Peggy E. Yeager, Thomas E. Yeager, Shakeb H. Zuberi. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 1/17/2012)
January 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 481 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 1/13/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2012)
January 13, 2012 Set/Reset Hearings: Further Telephonic Settlement Conference set for 1/18/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2012)
January 13, 2012 Filing 480 Minute Entry: Further TelephonicSettlement Conference held on 1/13/12 before Mag. Judge Joseph C. Spero. Further settlement conf. set for 1/18/12 at 9:30 AM. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/13/2012)
January 12, 2012 Filing 479 CORRECTION OF DOCKET #478 . Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 1/12/2012 before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu (Date Filed: 1/12/2012). (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado.) (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/12/2012)
January 12, 2012 Filing 478 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #479 *** Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 1/12/2012 before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu (Date Filed: 1/12/2012). (Court Reporter Reynee Mercado.) (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/12/2012) Modified on 1/12/2012 (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2012 Filing 477 Minute Entry: Further Settlement Conference held on 1/10/12 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Case did not settle. (Recording #Not Reported.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/12/2012)
January 11, 2012 Filing 476 NOTICE by Burger King Corporation re #345 Letter (Declaration of Michael D. Joblove in Support of BKC's Discovery Letter Regarding Larry Wood (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 1/11/2012)
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 475 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #474 Motion to Appear by Telephone. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
January 9, 2012 Filing 474 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at the January 12, 2012 Hearing filed by Burger King Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
January 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 473 NOTICE and Order Setting Further Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Settlement Conference set for 1/10/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom D , 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/5/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2012)
January 5, 2012 Filing 472 Minute Entry: Further Settlement Conference held on 1/4/12 before Judge Joseph C. Spero. Further settlement conference set for 1/10/12 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom D. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/5/2012)
January 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 471 ORDER re #470 Letter filed by Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC, SRAC Holdings I, Inc., Jerry M. Comstock. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 1/5/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2012)
January 5, 2012 Filing 470 Letter from Matthew S. Kenefick . (Kenefick, Matthew) (Filed on 1/5/2012)
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 469 ORDER GRANTING BURGER KING CORPORATION PERMISSION TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND OTHERWISE STAYING NEWPORT ACTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 4, 2012. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2012)
January 3, 2012 Filing 468 NOTICE by Willie C. Cook (Jackmon, Amira) (Filed on 1/3/2012)
January 3, 2012 Filing 467 NOTICE by Jerry M. Comstock, SRAC Holdings I, Inc., Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC re #466 Notice (Other) of Joinder and Joinder in Plaintiffs Counter-Defendants' Evidentiary Objections to Burger King Corporation's Trial Exhibits (Orlick, Martin) (Filed on 1/3/2012)
January 3, 2012 Filing 466 NOTICE by Roy D. Newport PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO BURGER KING CORPORATION'S TRIAL EXHIBITS (Franklin, Kurt) (Filed on 1/3/2012)
January 3, 2012 Filing 465 NOTICE by Burger King Corporation of Filings Its Objections to Trial Exhibits of Willie C. Cook (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 1/3/2012)
January 3, 2012 Filing 464 NOTICE by Burger King Corporation of Filings Its Objections to Trial Exhibits of Strategic et al. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 1/3/2012)
January 3, 2012 Filing 463 NOTICE by Burger King Corporation of Filing Its Objections to Trial Exhibits of Plaintiffs/Counter-Defendants Newport et al. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 1/3/2012)
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 462 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION OF RHODES FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup granting #457 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2012)
December 29, 2011 Filing 461 NOTICE by Burger King Corporation re #460 Notice (Other) (Declaration of Michael D. Joblove in Support of BKC's Response to Willie C. Cook's Precis regarding Trial Matters) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 12/29/2011)
December 29, 2011 Filing 460 NOTICE by Burger King Corporation re #452 Statement (BKC's Response to Willie C. Cook's Precis Regarding Trial Matters) (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 12/29/2011)
December 29, 2011 Filing 459 NOTICE by Burger King Corporation re #454 Statement (BKC's Response to Plaintiffs/Counter-Defendants' Precis Regarding Suggestions for Trial) (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 12/29/2011)
December 29, 2011 Filing 458 RESPONSE to Plaintiffs/Counter-Defendants' Response to Burger King Corporation's Precis Regarding Trial Setting by Roy D. Newport. (Franklin, Kurt) (Filed on 12/29/2011)
December 28, 2011 Filing 457 AMENDED MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Eric L. Rhodes (Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 34611068432) filed by Willie C. Cook. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jackmon, Amira) (Filed on 12/28/2011) Modified on 12/29/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 456 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR PARTIES TO FILE OBJECTIONS TO TRIAL EXHIBITS re #455 Stipulation filed by Roy D. Newport (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2011)
December 22, 2011 Filing 455 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR PARTIES TO FILE OBJECTIONS TO TRIAL EXHIBITS by Roy D. Newport. (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 12/22/2011)
December 22, 2011 Filing 454 Statement PLAINTIFFS-COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' PRECIS REGARDING SUGGESTIONS FOR TRIAL by Roy D. Newport. (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 12/22/2011)
December 22, 2011 Filing 453 NOTICE by Burger King Corporation (Precis Regarding Trial Setting) (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 12/22/2011)
December 22, 2011 Filing 452 Statement re January Trial Date by Willie C. Cook. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Jackmon, Amira) (Filed on 12/22/2011)
December 22, 2011 Filing 451 CLERKS NOTICE RE: COURTROOM CHANGE FOR JAN 4, 2012 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Settlement Conference to be held in Courtroom D . (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2011)
December 22, 2011 Filing 450 Statement Precis Regarding Trial Setting by Jerry M. Comstock, SRAC Holdings I, Inc., Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC. (Orlick, Martin) (Filed on 12/22/2011)
December 21, 2011 Filing 449 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Eric L. Rhodes ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 34611068432) filed by Willie C. Cook. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/3/2012: #2 Application, #3 Proposed Order) (wsn, COURT STAFF).
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 448 ORDER. Discovery Hearing set for 1/12/2012 before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/21/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2011)
December 21, 2011 Filing 447 Letter from Burger King Corp. and Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC, SRAC I, Inc., and Jerry Comstock (Joint Letter Requesting Continuance of the December 22, 2011 Discovery Hearing). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 12/21/2011)
December 21, 2011 Filing 445 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference held on 12/20/11. Further settlement conference set for 1/4/12 at 9:30 AM. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/21/2011)
December 19, 2011 Filing 446 Minute Entry: Interim Pretrial Conference (Date Filed: 12/19/2011). (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/19/2011)
December 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 444 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #443 Motion to Appear by Telephone.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2011)
December 16, 2011 Filing 443 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at the December 22, 2011 Hearing filed by Burger King Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 12/16/2011)
December 15, 2011 Filing 442 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of all claims against Counter-Defendants Luis Boyance, Geboy, Inc., Geboy de Tijuana, SA de CV and Jorge Finkelberg by Burger King Corporation (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 12/15/2011)
December 13, 2011 Filing 441 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Burger King Corporation. Amendment to #427 Brief Burger King Corporation's Amended Memoranda of Law in Support of Its Disputed Proposed Jury Instructions. (Friedenberg, Adam) (Filed on 12/13/2011)
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 440 ORDER REGARDING UPCOMING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE re #404 Notice (Other) filed by Burger King Corporation. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 13, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2011)
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 439 ORDER DENYING WILLIE C. COOK'S REQUEST IN SUPPORT OF A MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT re #413 Letter filed by Willie C. Cook. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 13, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2011)
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 438 ORDER STRIKING SUBMISSIONS AT DOCKET NUMBERS 415, 416, AND 417 re #424 Notice (Other) filed by Burger King Corporation. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 13, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2011) Modified on 12/15/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
December 13, 2011 Filing 437 NOTICE by Jerry M. Comstock, SRAC Holdings I, Inc., Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC Pretrial Disclosures (Orlick, Martin) (Filed on 12/13/2011)
December 13, 2011 Filing 436 Proposed Jury Instructions by Roy D. Newport. (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 12/13/2011)
December 12, 2011 Filing 435 TRIAL BRIEF by Burger King Corporation. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
December 12, 2011 Filing 434 Proposed Form of Verdict by Roy D. Newport JOINT FILING OF SEPARATE VERDICT FORMS. (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
December 12, 2011 Filing 433 Proposed Voir Dire by Roy D. Newport. (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
December 12, 2011 Filing 432 Brief PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' MEMORANDA OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DISPUTED ALTERNATE INSTRUCTIONS filed byRoy D. Newport. (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
December 12, 2011 Filing 431 Pretrial Conference Statement by Roy D. Newport PARTIES' JOINT STATEMENT AND [PROPOSED] PRETRIAL ORDER. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B)(Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
December 12, 2011 Filing 430 NOTICE by Willie C. Cook Pretrial Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Jackmon, Amira) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
December 12, 2011 Filing 429 Proposed Voir Dire by Roy D. Newport. (Franklin, Kurt) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
December 12, 2011 Filing 428 NOTICE by Roy D. Newport Plaintiffs/Counter-Defendants' Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
December 12, 2011 Filing 427 Brief Burger King Corporation's Memoranda of Law In Support of Its Disputed Proposed Jury Instructions filed byBurger King Corporation. (Friedenberg, Adam) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
December 12, 2011 Filing 426 NOTICE by Burger King Corporation of Pretrial Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures (Attachments: #1 Errata A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
December 12, 2011 Filing 425 Declaration of Adam Friedenberg in Support of BKC's Motions In Limine filed byBurger King Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 2, #2 Exhibit Part 3, #3 Exhibit Part 4, #4 Exhibit Part 5, #5 Exhibit Part 6)(Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
December 12, 2011 Filing 424 NOTICE by Burger King Corporation of Striking DE Nos. 415, 416 and 417 (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
December 12, 2011 Filing 423 MOTION in Limine No. 5 filed by Jerry M. Comstock, SRAC Holdings I, Inc., Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC. Responses due by 12/27/2011. Replies due by 1/3/2012. (Orlick, Martin) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
December 12, 2011 Filing 422 MOTION in Limine No. 4 filed by Jerry M. Comstock, SRAC Holdings I, Inc., Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC. Responses due by 12/27/2011. Replies due by 1/3/2012. (Orlick, Martin) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
December 12, 2011 Filing 421 MOTION in Limine No. 2 filed by Jerry M. Comstock, SRAC Holdings I, Inc., Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC. Responses due by 12/27/2011. Replies due by 1/3/2012. (Orlick, Martin) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
December 12, 2011 Filing 420 DECLARATION of Michael D. Joblove in Opposition to #418 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs/Counter Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Testimony by Burger King Corporation's Experts on Legal Issues and Burger King Corporation's Response to Plaintiffs/Counter-Defendants' Motion filed by Roy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) #418 ) (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 12/12/2011) Modified on 12/13/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
December 12, 2011 Filing 419 Declaration of Megan Oliver Thompson in Support of #418 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs/Counter Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Testimony by Burger King Corporation's Experts on Legal Issues and Burger King Corporation's Response to Plaintiffs/Counter-Defendants' Motion filed by Roy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #418 ) (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 12/12/2011) Modified on 12/13/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
December 12, 2011 Filing 418 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs/Counter Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Testimony by Burger King Corporation's Experts on Legal Issues and Burger King Corporation's Response to Plaintiffs/Counter-Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 2 filed by Roy D. Newport. Motion Hearing set for 12/19/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 12/27/2011. Replies due by 1/3/2012. (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
December 12, 2011 Filing 417 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #424 *** Declaration of Adam Friedenberg in Support of Motions in Limine (Part 4) filed byBurger King Corporation. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 12/12/2011) Modified on 12/13/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
December 12, 2011 Filing 416 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #424 *** Declaration of Adam Friedenberg in Support of Motions in Limine (Part 3) filed byBurger King Corporation. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 12/12/2011) Modified on 12/13/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
December 12, 2011 Filing 415 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #424 *** Declaration of Adam Friedenberg in Support of Motions in Limine (Part 1) filed byBurger King Corporation. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 12/12/2011) Modified on 12/13/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
December 12, 2011 Filing 414 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs/Counter Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Insurance Evidence and Burger King Corporation's Response to Plaintiffs/Counter-Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 1 filed by Roy D. Newport. Motion Hearing set for 12/19/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 12/27/2011. Replies due by 1/3/2012. (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
December 12, 2011 Filing 413 Letter from WCook Requesting Extension of Time. (Jackmon, Amira) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
December 12, 2011 Filing 412 Declaration of Martin H. Orlick in Support of Opposition to BKC's Motions In Limine No. 1 and 2 filed byBurger King Corporation. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
December 12, 2011 Filing 411 MOTION in Limine No. 8 Relating to BKC's Inspections and Scopes of Work Regarding Restaurants Operated by Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II and Opposition to BKC's Motion in Limine No. 8 filed by Burger King Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 12/19/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 12/27/2011. Replies due by 1/3/2012. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
December 12, 2011 Filing 410 MOTION in Limine No. 4 to Exclude Evidence or Argument re Liability Insurance and Plaintiff/Counterdefendants Opposition to BKC's Motion in LImine No. 4 filed by Burger King Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 12/19/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 12/27/2011. Replies due by 1/3/2012. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
December 12, 2011 Filing 409 MOTION in Limine No. 3 re Unrelated Lawsuits and Settlement Agreements and Plaintiff/Counterdefendants Joint Opposition to BKC's Motion in Limine No. 3 filed by Burger King Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 12/19/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 12/27/2011. Replies due by 1/3/2012. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
December 12, 2011 Filing 408 MOTION in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Irrelevant and Cumulative Opinions of Franchisee Experts Bob Evans and Larry Wood and Joint Opposition to BKC's Motion in Limine No. 2 filed by Burger King Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 12/19/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 12/27/2011. Replies due by 1/3/2012. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
December 12, 2011 Filing 407 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Irrelevant, Incompetent and Cumulative Testimony of David Holmes and Keith Kanouse and Joint Opposition to BKC's Motion in Limine No. 1 filed by Burger King Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 12/19/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 12/27/2011. Replies due by 1/3/2012. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 406 Notice of Settlement Conference and Order Setting Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero Settlement Conference set for 1/4/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/9/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2011)
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 405 Notice of Settlement Conference and Order Setting Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Settlement Conference set for 12/20/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/9/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2011)
December 8, 2011 Filing 404 NOTICE by Burger King Corporation Request to Continue PreTrial Conference (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Friedenberg, Adam) (Filed on 12/8/2011)
December 7, 2011 Filing 403 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Burger King Corporation. (Blynn, Aaron) (Filed on 12/7/2011)
December 7, 2011 Filing 402 STIPULATION (Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice re Francisco Foods, Inc., Geoffrey A. Jones, Beatrice E. Kubu, Catherine A. Kubu, Stanley Kubu/Estate of Stanley Kubu, Susan Kubu-Jones and Carol K. McManus) by Burger King Corporation. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 12/7/2011)
December 6, 2011 Filing 401 NOTICE REGARDING UPCOMING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 6, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2011)
December 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 400 ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR MEDIATION/SETTLEMENT to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for Settlement. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 6, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2011)
December 5, 2011 Filing 399 RESPONSE to Court's Request for Information Regarding Settlement by Jerry M. Comstock, SRAC Holdings I, Inc., Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC. (Orlick, Martin) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
December 5, 2011 Filing 398 CLERKS NOTICE: In accordance with Civil L.R. 79-5(e), the submitting party is hereby notified to retrieve the following lodged documents: Transcript of the Deposition of John P.S. Salmen, within three days of the date of this notice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ORDER ON REQUESTS FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re #225 Request for Judicial Notice, filed by Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC, SRAC Holdings I, Inc., Jerry M. Comstock, #321 Request for Judicial Notice, filed by Roy D. Newport, #231 Request for Judicial Notice, filed by Roy D. Newport. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 5, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 396 ORDER RE SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS by Judge William Alsup [denying #223 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying #230 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying #277 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part #278 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying #279 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying #280 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying #281 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying #283 Motion for Joinder; denying #309 Motion for Joinder]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
December 5, 2011 Filing 395 RESPONSE to re #389 Order PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO COURT'S REQUEST FOR INFORMATION REGARDING SETTLEMENT by Roy D. Newport. (Franklin, Kurt) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 394 ORDER ON DEFENDANT BURGER KING'S REQUEST AT DOCKET NUMBER 373 FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION TO STRIKE EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS re #373 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed by Burger King Corporation, #361 Objection filed by Roy D. Newport, #350 Reply to Opposition/Response, filed by Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC, SRAC Holdings I, Inc., Jerry M. Comstock. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 5, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 393 ORDER ON DEFENDANT BURGER KING'S REQUEST AT DOCKET NUMBER 360 FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION TO STRIKE EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS re #311 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed by Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC, SRAC Holdings I, Inc., Jerry M. Comstock, #360 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed by Burger King Corporation, #332 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed by Roy D. Newport. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 5, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 12/7/2011.. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 5, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 391 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Hon. William Alsup denying #333 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
December 5, 2011 Filing 390 NOTICE by Burger King Corporation re #389 Order Burger King Corporation's Response to Order Requiring Response From Counsel (Greene, Nina) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
December 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE FROM COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 2, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2011)
December 2, 2011 Filing 388 RESPONSE to re #374 Order Plaintiffs Counter-Defendant Franchisees' Joint Response Regarding Tender of Defense by Roy D. Newport. (Franklin, Kurt) (Filed on 12/2/2011)
December 2, 2011 Filing 387 RESPONSE to re #374 Order Requesting Response by Burger King Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 12/2/2011)
December 1, 2011 Filing 386 RESPONSE to re #373 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Burger King Corporation's precis In Support Of Request for Leave to File Motion to Strike Evidentiary Objections by Roy D. Newport. (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 385 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/01/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 384 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #385 ***ORDER Discovery Hearing set for 12/22/2011 before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/01/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2011) Modified on 12/1/2011 (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF).
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER REGARDING SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS AND VACATING HEARING re #380 Joinder, filed by Beatrice E. Kubu, Carol K. McManus, Catherine A. Kubu, Geoffrey A. Jones, Susan Kubu-Jones, Francisco Foods, Inc., Clifton Shigaki, #278 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counter-Defendant Willie C. Cook's Amended Crossclaim for Declaratory Relief and Damage filed by Burger King Corporation, #377 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC, SRAC Holdings I, Inc., Jerry M. Comstock, #223 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC, SRAC Holdings I, Inc., Jerry M. Comstock, #280 MOTION for Summary Judgment against Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC, SRAC Holdings I, Inc. and Jerry Comstock filed by Burger King Corporation, #279 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Robert Eng, RLE Investment Corporation and the Hakimianpour's filed by Burger King Corporation, #378 Joinder filed by Willie C. Cook, #375 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Burger King Corporation, #281 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Damages filed by Burger King Corporation, #277 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Burger King Corporation, #376 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Roy D. Newport, #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM filed by Roy D. Newport. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 1, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
November 30, 2011 Filing 382 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice regarding Francisco Foods, Inc., Geoffrey Jones, Beatrice Kubu, Catherine Kubu, Estate of Stanley Kubu, Susan Kubu Jones, and Carol K. McManus by Burger King Corporation (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 11/30/2011)
November 30, 2011 Filing 381 NOTICE by Burger King Corporation re #362 Reply to Opposition/Response to Cook's Joinder and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to BKC's Motion for Summary Judgment on Cook's Amended Crossclaim for Declaratory Relief and Damages (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" Part 1, #2 Exhibit "A" Part 2, #3 Exhibit "A" Part 3, #4 Exhibit "A" Part 4, #5 Exhibit "B", #6 Exhibit "C" Part 1, #7 Exhibit "C" Part 2, #8 Exhibit "C" Part 3, #9 Exhibit "C" Part 4, #10 Exhibit "C" Part 5, #11 Exhibit "C" Part 6, #12 Exhibit "C" Part 7, #13 Exhibit "C" Part 8, #14 Exhibit "D", #15 Exhibit "E", #16 Exhibit "F", #17 Exhibit "G", #18 Exhibit "H", #19 Exhibit "I")(Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 11/30/2011)
November 30, 2011 Filing 380 Joinder re #377 Response to Order to Show Cause, #376 Response to Order to Show Cause by Francisco Foods, Inc., Geoffrey A. Jones, Beatrice E. Kubu, Catherine A. Kubu, Susan Kubu-Jones, Carol K. McManus, Clifton Shigaki. (Garabedian, Armen) (Filed on 11/30/2011)
November 30, 2011 Filing 379 RESPONSE to re #360 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO BURGER KING CORPORATION'S PRECIS IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION OT STRIKE EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS FILED BY PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS by Roy D. Newport. (Franklin, Kurt) (Filed on 11/30/2011)
November 30, 2011 Filing 378 Joinder by Willie C. Cook. (Jackmon, Amira) (Filed on 11/30/2011)
November 30, 2011 Filing 377 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Jerry M. Comstock, SRAC Holdings I, Inc., Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC. (Orlick, Martin) (Filed on 11/30/2011)
November 30, 2011 Filing 376 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Roy D. Newport. (Franklin, Kurt) (Filed on 11/30/2011)
November 30, 2011 Filing 375 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Burger King Corporation. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 11/30/2011)
November 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER REQUESTING RESPONSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 30, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2011)
November 29, 2011 Filing 373 NOTICE by Burger King Corporation re #361 Objection, #350 Reply to Opposition/Response, (Precis in Support of Its Request for Leave to File a Motion Strike Evidentiary Objections [DE 350-1 & 361], Or, in the Alternative, Request That the Court Overrule the Evidentiary Objections or Grant BKC Leave to Respond to the Same) (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 11/29/2011)
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 11/30/2011.. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 29, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/29/2011: #1 Certificate of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF).
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 371 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION PRO HAC VICE OF PETER BELLAS re #349 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 34611067396.) filed by Burger King Corporation. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 28, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2011)
November 28, 2011 Filing 370 Declaration of Willie C. Cook in Support of #369 Joinder filed byWillie C. Cook. (Related document(s) #369 ) (Jackmon, Amira) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
November 28, 2011 Filing 369 Joinder re #367 Reply to Opposition/Response, by Willie C. Cook. (Jackmon, Amira) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
November 28, 2011 Filing 368 Proposed Order re #281 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Damages by Burger King Corporation. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
November 28, 2011 Filing 367 REPLY (re #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM ) IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' REPLY OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION filed byRoy D. Newport. (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
November 28, 2011 Filing 366 Proposed Order re #280 MOTION for Summary Judgment against Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC, SRAC Holdings I, Inc. and Jerry Comstock by Burger King Corporation. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
November 28, 2011 Filing 365 Proposed Order re #279 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Robert Eng, RLE Investment Corporation and the Hakimianpour's by Burger King Corporation. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
November 28, 2011 Filing 364 Proposed Order re #277 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Burger King Corporation. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
November 28, 2011 Filing 363 Proposed Order re #278 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counter-Defendant Willie C. Cook's Amended Crossclaim for Declaratory Relief and Damage by Burger King Corporation. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
November 28, 2011 Filing 362 REPLY (re #278 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counter-Defendant Willie C. Cook's Amended Crossclaim for Declaratory Relief and Damage, #283 MOTION for Joinder ) filed byBurger King Corporation. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
November 28, 2011 Filing 361 STRICKEN BY ORDER OF COURT. SEE #394 OBJECTIONS to Evidence Submitted by Burger King Corporation in Opposition to Plaintiffs/Counter-Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Roy D. Newport. (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 11/28/2011) Modified on 12/6/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
November 28, 2011 Filing 360 NOTICE by Burger King Corporation re #311 Opposition/Response to Motion, #332 Opposition/Response to Motion, (BKC's Precis in Support of Its Request for Leave to File a Motion to Strike Evidentiary Objections in Opposition to BKCs Motions for Summary Judgment [DE 311 & 332], or in the Alternative, Request That the Court Overrule the Evidentiary Objections or Grant BKC Leave to Respond to the Same) (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
November 28, 2011 Filing 359 NOTICE by Burger King Corporation re #321 Request for Judicial Notice, (BKC's Statement of Non-Opposition to Plaintiffs/Counter-Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice in Opposition to BKC's Motion for Summary Judgment) (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
November 28, 2011 Filing 358 NOTICE by Burger King Corporation re #231 Request for Judicial Notice, BKC's Statement of Non-Opposition to Plaintiffs/Counter-Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
November 28, 2011 Filing 357 REPLY (re #281 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Damages ) filed byBurger King Corporation. (Friedenberg, Adam) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
November 28, 2011 Filing 356 NOTICE by Burger King Corporation re #280 MOTION for Summary Judgment against Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC, SRAC Holdings I, Inc. and Jerry Comstock, #279 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Robert Eng, RLE Investment Corporation and the Hakimianpour's, #339 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
November 28, 2011 Filing 355 Declaration of Nina Greene in Support of #354 Reply to Opposition/Response filed byBurger King Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Related document(s) #354 ) (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
November 28, 2011 Filing 354 REPLY (re #279 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Robert Eng, RLE Investment Corporation and the Hakimianpour's, #277 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byBurger King Corporation. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
November 28, 2011 Filing 353 REPLY (re #280 MOTION for Summary Judgment against Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC, SRAC Holdings I, Inc. and Jerry Comstock, #281 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Damages, #277 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byBurger King Corporation. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
November 28, 2011 Filing 352 Declaration of Aaron S. Blynn in Support of #351 Reply to Opposition/Response filed byBurger King Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Related document(s) #351 ) (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
November 28, 2011 Filing 351 REPLY (re #281 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Damages, #277 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) against Counter-Defendants filed byBurger King Corporation. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
November 28, 2011 Filing 350 REPLY (re #280 MOTION for Summary Judgment against Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC, SRAC Holdings I, Inc. and Jerry Comstock, #277 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byJerry M. Comstock, SRAC Holdings I, Inc., Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC. (Attachments: STRICKEN BY ORDER OF COURT. SEE #394 #1 Evidentiary Objections)(Orlick, Martin) (Filed on 11/28/2011) Modified on 12/6/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
November 28, 2011 Filing 349 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Peter W. Bellas ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 34611067396), filed by Burger King Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER re #345 Letter filed by Burger King Corporation, #346 Letter filed by Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC, SRAC Holdings I, Inc., Jerry M. Comstock. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/28/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
November 28, 2011 Filing 347 Transcript of Proceedings held on November 14, 2011, before Judge Ryu. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sarah Goekler, Telephone number (530)941-2621; sgoekler.csr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/27/2012. (slg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
November 23, 2011 Filing 346 Letter from Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC, SRAC Holdings I, Inc. and Jerry M. Comstock Response to Burger King Corporation's Ex Parte discovery dispute letter. (Orlick, Martin) (Filed on 11/23/2011)
November 21, 2011 Filing 345 Letter from Michael D. Joblove regarding discovery issues. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 11/21/2011)
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER ON COUNTER-DEFENDANT COOK'S MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DISCOVERY by Hon. William Alsup denying #286 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2011)
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER ON STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER CHANGING TIME FOR EXPERT DISCOVERY CUTOFF DATE re #282 Stipulation filed by Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC, SRAC Holdings I, Inc., Jerry M. Comstock. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 21, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2011)
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER ON SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re #227 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Summit Equity Group Inc. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 21, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2011)
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER ON MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME by Hon. William Alsup granting #285 Motion for Extension of Time to File.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2011)
November 18, 2011 Filing 340 Joinder in Plaintiffs/Counter Defendants' Opposition to Burger King Corporation's Motions for Summary Judgment by Francisco Foods, Inc., Geoffrey A. Jones, Beatrice E. Kubu, Catherine A. Kubu, Susan Kubu-Jones, Carol K. McManus, Clifton Shigaki. (Calderon, David) (Filed on 11/18/2011)
November 17, 2011 Filing 339 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #277 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM filed byBurger King Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q1, #18 Exhibit Q2, #19 Exhibit R1, #20 Exhibit R2, #21 Exhibit S)(Related document(s) #277 , #230 ) (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 17, 2011 Filing 338 RESPONSE (re #278 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counter-Defendant Willie C. Cook's Amended Crossclaim for Declaratory Relief and Damage, #281 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Damages, #277 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byWillie C. Cook. (Jackmon, Amira) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 17, 2011 Filing 337 RESPONSE (re #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM ) filed byBurger King Corporation. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 17, 2011 Filing 336 RESPONSE (re #281 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Damages ) filed byRoy D. Newport. (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 17, 2011 Filing 335 RESPONSE (re #223 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) of Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC, SRAC Holdings I, Inc., and Jerry M. Comstock filed byBurger King Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Christine Leblond, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6a, #8 Exhibit 6b, #9 Exhibit 6c, #10 Exhibit 6d, #11 Exhibit 7a, #12 Exhibit 7b, #13 Exhibit 8, #14 Exhibit 9, #15 Exhibit 10)(Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 17, 2011 Filing 334 Declaration of Megan Oliver Thompson in Support of #333 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs/Counter-Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal Pursuant to Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5 filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #333 ) (Franklin, Kurt) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 17, 2011 Filing 333 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs/Counter-Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal Pursuant to Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5 filed by Roy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Franklin, Kurt) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 17, 2011 Filing 332 STRICKEN BY ORDER OF COURT. SEE #393 RESPONSE (re #277 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) Plaintiffs/Counter-Defendant's Objections to Evidence in Support of Opposition to Burger King Corporation's Motions for Summary Judgment filed byRoy D. Newport. (Franklin, Kurt) (Filed on 11/17/2011) Modified on 12/6/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
November 17, 2011 Filing 331 Declaration of Robert Eng in Support of #319 Opposition/Response to Motion for Summary Judgment filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #319 ) (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 17, 2011 Filing 330 Declaration of Eddie Szeto in Support of #319 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #319 ) (Franklin, Kurt) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 17, 2011 Filing 329 Declaration of Roger K. Swift in Support of #319 Opposition/Response to Motion for Summary Judgment filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #319 ) (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 17, 2011 Filing 328 Declaration of Virginia Bredesen in Support of #319 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #319 ) (Franklin, Kurt) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 17, 2011 Filing 327 Declaration of Gary Geiger in Support of #319 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #319 ) (Franklin, Kurt) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 17, 2011 Filing 326 Declaration of Roland Eddy in Support of #319 Opposition/Response to Motion for Summary Judgment filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #319 ) (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 17, 2011 Filing 325 Declaration of Masroor Batla in Support of #319 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #319 ) (Franklin, Kurt) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 17, 2011 Filing 324 Declaration of Charanjit Ghai in Support of #319 Opposition/Response to Motion for Summary Judgment filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #319 ) (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 17, 2011 Filing 323 Declaration of Charles D. Cobb in Support of #319 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #319 ) (Franklin, Kurt) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 17, 2011 Filing 322 Declaration of Wilawan Foo in Support of #319 Opposition/Response to Motion for Summary Judgment filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #319 ) (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 17, 2011 Filing 321 Request for Judicial Notice re #319 Opposition/Response to Motion for Summary Judgment filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) #319 ) (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 17, 2011 Filing 320 Declaration of Kurt A. Franklin in Support of #319 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U)(Related document(s) #319 ) (Franklin, Kurt) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 17, 2011 Filing 319 RESPONSE (re #277 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) Plaintiffs/Counter-Defendants' Opposition to Burger King Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byRoy D. Newport. (Franklin, Kurt) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 17, 2011 Filing 318 Declaration of Robert Hakimianpour in Support of #316 Opposition/Response to Motion for Summary Judgment filed byRoy D. Newport. (Related document(s) #316 ) (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 17, 2011 Filing 317 Declaration of Robert Eng in Support of #316 Opposition/Response to Motion For Summary Judgment filed byRoy D. Newport. (Related document(s) #316 ) (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 17, 2011 Filing 316 RESPONSE (re #279 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Robert Eng, RLE Investment Corporation and the Hakimianpour's ) filed byRoy D. Newport. (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 17, 2011 Filing 315 RESPONSE (re #280 MOTION for Summary Judgment against Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC, SRAC Holdings I, Inc. and Jerry Comstock, #281 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Damages, #277 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byJerry M. Comstock, SRAC Holdings I, Inc., Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC. (Orlick, Martin) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 17, 2011 Filing 314 Declaration of Martin H. Orlick in Support of #310 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byJerry M. Comstock, SRAC Holdings I, Inc., Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 part 1, #4 Exhibit 3 part 2, #5 Exhibit 3 part 3, #6 Exhibit 3 part 4, #7 Exhibit 3 part 5, #8 Exhibit 3 part 6, #9 Exhibit 3 part 7, #10 Exhibit 3 part 8, #11 Exhibit 3 part 9, #12 Exhibit 3 part 10, #13 Exhibit 3 part 11, #14 Exhibit 3 part 12, #15 Exhibit 3 part 13)(Related document(s) #310 ) (Orlick, Martin) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 17, 2011 Filing 313 Declaration of David Kanel in Support of #311 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byJerry M. Comstock, SRAC Holdings I, Inc., Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Related document(s) #311 ) (Orlick, Martin) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 17, 2011 Filing 312 DECLARATION of Larry Wood in Opposition to #310 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byJerry M. Comstock, SRAC Holdings I, Inc., Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #310 ) (Orlick, Martin) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 17, 2011 Filing 311 STRICKEN BY ORDER OF COURT. SEE #393 RESPONSE (re #280 MOTION for Summary Judgment against Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC, SRAC Holdings I, Inc. and Jerry Comstock, #281 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Damages, #277 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) Evidentiary Objections in Opposition filed byJerry M. Comstock, SRAC Holdings I, Inc., Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC. (Orlick, Martin) (Filed on 11/17/2011) Modified on 12/6/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
November 17, 2011 Filing 310 RESPONSE (re #280 MOTION for Summary Judgment against Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC, SRAC Holdings I, Inc. and Jerry Comstock, #281 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Damages, #277 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byJerry M. Comstock, SRAC Holdings I, Inc., Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC. (Orlick, Martin) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 17, 2011 Filing 309 MOTION for Joinder to Plaintiffs/Counter-Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment filed by Summit Equity Group Inc. (Kevorkian, Kevin) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 17, 2011 Filing 308 Counter-Defendant's ANSWER to Counterclaim byJohn D. Mascali. (Kevorkian, Kevin) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 17, 2011 Filing 307 Declaration of Joseph N. Rubin in Support of #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #230 ) (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER re #305 Discovery Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/16/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2011)
November 15, 2011 Filing 305 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 11/14/2011 before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu (Date Filed: 11/15/2011). (Court Reporter Sarah Goekler.) (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/15/2011)
November 14, 2011 Filing 304 Clerks Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Paul L. Mallis. (Related documents(s) #297 )(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2011)
November 14, 2011 Filing 303 Clerks Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Mary Ann Mallis. (Related documents(s) #296 )(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2011)
November 14, 2011 Filing 302 Clerks DECLINATION OF DEFAULT as to Granya, Inc. (Related documents(s) #295 )(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2011)
November 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND VACATING HEARNIG by Hon. William Alsup granting #206 Motion to Continue.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2011)
November 11, 2011 Filing 300 Declaration of William L. Scarbrough in Support of #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #230 ) (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 11/11/2011)
November 11, 2011 Filing 299 Declaration of Jose R. Villaflor in Support of #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #230 ) (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 11/11/2011)
November 11, 2011 Filing 298 NOTICE by Burger King Corporation re #277 MOTION for Summary Judgment (of filing supporting Declaration of Christine Leblond) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "D", #2 Exhibit "D-1", #3 Exhibit "D-2", #4 Exhibit "D-3", #5 Exhibit "D-4", #6 Exhibit "D-5")(Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 11/11/2011)
November 9, 2011 Filing 297 MOTION for Entry of Default by the Clerk as to Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Paul L. Mallis filed by Burger King Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Greene, Nina) (Filed on 11/9/2011) Modified on 11/14/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2011 Filing 296 MOTION for Entry of Default by the Clerk as to Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Mary Ann Mallis filed by Burger King Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Greene, Nina) (Filed on 11/9/2011) Modified on 11/14/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2011 Filing 295 MOTION for Entry of Default by the Clerk as to Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Granya, Inc. filed by Burger King Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Greene, Nina) (Filed on 11/9/2011) Modified on 11/14/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 294 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #293 Motion to Appear by Telephone.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
November 9, 2011 Filing 293 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Willie C. Cook. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jackmon, Amira) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
November 8, 2011 Filing 292 RESPONSE (re #286 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery ) filed byBurger King Corporation. (Greene, Nina) (Filed on 11/8/2011)
November 8, 2011 Filing 291 RESPONSE (re #285 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion ) filed byBurger King Corporation. (Greene, Nina) (Filed on 11/8/2011)
November 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER re #288 Notice (Other) filed by Burger King Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/7/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2011)
November 7, 2011 Filing 289 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits, by Burger King Corporation re #280 MOTION for Summary Judgment against Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC, SRAC Holdings I, Inc. and Jerry Comstock (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B", #3 Exhibit "C", #4 Exhibit "D", #5 Exhibit "E")(Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 11/7/2011) Modified on 11/8/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
November 7, 2011 Filing 288 NOTICE by Burger King Corporation re #216 Order, Set Hearings, #214 Order, Set Hearings (Request to Appear Telephonically) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 11/7/2011)
November 7, 2011 Filing 287 REPLY (re #206 MOTION to Continue Trial ) in Support of Motion to Continue Trial filed byBurger King Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 11/7/2011)
November 4, 2011 Filing 286 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Willie C. Cook. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jackmon, Amira) (Filed on 11/4/2011)
November 4, 2011 Filing 285 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion filed by Willie C. Cook. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jackmon, Amira) (Filed on 11/4/2011)
November 4, 2011 Filing 284 Declaration of Willie C. Cook in Support of #283 MOTION for Joinder filed byWillie C. Cook. (Related document(s) #283 ) (Jackmon, Amira) (Filed on 11/4/2011)
November 4, 2011 Filing 283 MOTION for Joinder filed by Willie C. Cook. (Jackmon, Amira) (Filed on 11/4/2011)
November 4, 2011 Filing 282 STIPULATION Stipulated Request for Order Changing Time by Jerry M. Comstock, SRAC Holdings I, Inc., Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC. (Kenefick, Matthew) (Filed on 11/4/2011)
November 4, 2011 Filing 281 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Damages filed by Burger King Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 12/8/2011 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 11/18/2011. Replies due by 11/28/2011. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit D-1, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 11/4/2011)
November 4, 2011 Filing 280 MOTION for Summary Judgment against Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC, SRAC Holdings I, Inc. and Jerry Comstock filed by Burger King Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 12/8/2011 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 11/18/2011. Replies due by 11/28/2011. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1", #2 Exhibit "2" Part 1, #3 Exhibit "2" Part 2)(Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 11/4/2011)
November 4, 2011 Filing 279 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Robert Eng, RLE Investment Corporation and the Hakimianpour's filed by Burger King Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 12/8/2011 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 11/18/2011. Replies due by 11/28/2011. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Part 1A, #2 Exhibit A Part 1B, #3 Exhibit A Part 2, #4 Exhibit B Part 1, #5 Exhibit B Part 2)(Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 11/4/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 278 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counter-Defendant Willie C. Cook's Amended Crossclaim for Declaratory Relief and Damage filed by Burger King Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 12/8/2011 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 11/17/2011. Replies due by 11/28/2011. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7A, #9 Exhibit 7B, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21)(Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 277 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Burger King Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 12/8/2011 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 11/17/2011. Replies due by 11/28/2011. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D Part 1, #5 Exhibit D Part 2, #6 Exhibit E)(Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 276 Proposed Order re #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM by Roy D. Newport. (Franklin, Kurt) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 275 Declaration of Joseph L. Kruger in Support of #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #230 ) (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 274 Declaration of Joseph K. Wong in Support of #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #230 ) (Franklin, Kurt) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 273 Declaration of Jose Placencia in Support of #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #230 ) (Franklin, Kurt) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 272 Declaration of Larry D. Ralston in Support of #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #230 ) (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 271 Declaration of Jayant F. Patel in Support of #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #230 ) (Franklin, Kurt) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 270 Declaration of Jagdish Amin in Support of #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #230 ) (Franklin, Kurt) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 269 Declaration of Masroor Batla in Support of #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #230 ) (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 268 Declaration of Mike Whitehurst in Support of #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #230 ) (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 267 Declaration of Jae Chung in Support of #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #230 ) (Franklin, Kurt) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 266 Declaration of Howard Mangen in Support of #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #230 ) (Franklin, Kurt) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 265 Declaration of Rakesh Patel in Support of #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #230 ) (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 264 Declaration of Herman Li in Support of #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #230 ) (Franklin, Kurt) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 263 Declaration of Ralph Cimmarusti in Support of #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) #230 ) (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 262 Declaration of Hansa Chhaddva in Support of #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #230 ) (Franklin, Kurt) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 261 Declaration of Gary Geiger in Support of #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #230 ) (Franklin, Kurt) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 260 Declaration of Ravi Batra in Support of #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #230 ) (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 259 Declaration of Ella Avery Smothers in Support of #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #230 ) (Franklin, Kurt) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 258 Declaration of Richard A. Brening in Support of #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #230 ) (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 257 Declaration of Eddie Szeto in Support of #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #230 ) (Franklin, Kurt) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 256 Declaration of Dominic Ho in Support of #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #230 ) (Franklin, Kurt) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 255 Declaration of Robert Eng in Support of #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #230 ) (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 254 Declaration of David Lynwood Hairston in Support of #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #230 ) (Franklin, Kurt) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 253 Declaration of David Knox in Support of #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #230 ) (Franklin, Kurt) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 252 Declaration of Robert Hakimianpour in Support of #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #230 ) (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 251 Declaration of David J. Davis in Support of #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #230 ) (Franklin, Kurt) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 250 Declaration of Roger Swift in Support of #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #230 ) (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 249 Declaration of David C. Wurts in Support of #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #230 ) (Franklin, Kurt) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 248 Declaration of Daniel Y. Chu in Support of #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #230 ) (Franklin, Kurt) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 247 Declaration of Roland Eddy in Support of #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #230 ) (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 246 Declaration of Chris G. Bredesen in Support of #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #230 ) (Franklin, Kurt) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 245 Declaration of Sunil Gulati in Support of #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #230 ) (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 244 Declaration of Charles D. Cobb in Support of #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #230 ) (Franklin, Kurt) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 243 Declaration of Thomas E. Yeager in Support of #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #230 ) (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 242 Declaration of Charanjit Ghai in Support of #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #230 ) (Franklin, Kurt) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 241 Declaration of Vetit Piyas in Support of #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #230 ) (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 240 Declaration of Carolyn P. Arnold in Support of #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #230 ) (Franklin, Kurt) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 239 Declaration of Vincent F. Eupierre in Support of #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #230 ) (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 238 Declaration of Byron Crossen in Support of #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #230 ) (Franklin, Kurt) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 237 Declaration of Balbir Dhillon in Support of #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #230 ) (Franklin, Kurt) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 236 Joinder re #223 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM by Francisco Foods, Inc., Geoffrey A. Jones, Beatrice E. Kubu, Catherine A. Kubu, Susan Kubu-Jones, Carol K. McManus, Clifton Shigaki. (Garabedian, Armen) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 235 Declaration of Wilawan Foo in Support of #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #230 ) (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 234 Declaration of Antony P. Sacca in Support of #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #230 ) (Franklin, Kurt) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 233 Declaration of Alessandra Moore in Support of #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #230 ) (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 232 Declaration of Kurt A. Franklin in Support of #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Related document(s) #230 ) (Franklin, Kurt) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 231 Request for Judicial Notice re #230 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Related document(s) #230 ) (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 230 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM filed by Roy D. Newport. Motion Hearing set for 12/8/2011 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 11/17/2011. Replies due by 11/28/2011. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B)(Franklin, Kurt) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 229 Joinder re #223 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #224 Declaration in Support, #225 Request for Judicial Notice, by Summit Equity Group Inc. (Kevorkian, Kevin) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 228 EXHIBITS re #226 Declaration in Support,, Exibits 2 and 3 filed byJerry M. Comstock, SRAC Holdings I, Inc., Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 part 2, #2 Exhibit 2 part 3, #3 Exhibit 2 part 4, #4 Exhibit 2 part 5, #5 Exhibit 2 part 6, #6 Exhibit 2 part 7, #7 Exhibit 2 part 8, #8 Exhibit 2 part 9, #9 Exhibit 2 part 10, #10 Exhibit 2 part 11, #11 Exhibit 2 part 12, #12 Exhibit 2 part 13, #13 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) #226 ) (Orlick, Martin) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 227 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Kevin B. Kevorkian for Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant, Summit Equity Group, Inc. (Kevorkian, Kevin) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 226 Declaration of Jerry M. Comstock in Support of #223 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byJerry M. Comstock, SRAC Holdings I, Inc., Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 part 1, #2 Exhibit 1 part 2, #3 Exhibit 1 part 3, #4 Exhibit 1 part 4, #5 Exhibit 1 part 5, #6 Exhibit 1 part 6, #7 Exhibit 1 part 7, #8 Exhibit 1 part 8, #9 Exhibit 1 part 9, #10 Exhibit 1 part 10, #11 Exhibit 1 part 11, #12 Exhibit 1 part 12, #13 Exhibit 1 part 13)(Related document(s) #223 ) (Orlick, Martin) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 225 Request for Judicial Notice re #223 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byJerry M. Comstock, SRAC Holdings I, Inc., Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Related document(s) #223 ) (Orlick, Martin) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 224 Declaration of Matthew S. Kenefick in Support of #223 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byJerry M. Comstock, SRAC Holdings I, Inc., Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) #223 ) (Orlick, Martin) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 223 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jerry M. Comstock, SRAC Holdings I, Inc., Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 12/8/2011 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 11/17/2011. Replies due by 11/28/2011. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Orlick, Martin) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
October 31, 2011 Filing 222 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Counter-Defendant Benjamin Kuo-An Chang by Burger King Corporation. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 10/31/2011)
October 27, 2011 Filing 221 DECLARATION of Richard J. Stratton in Opposition to #219 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #219 ) (Franklin, Kurt) (Filed on 10/27/2011)
October 27, 2011 Filing 220 DECLARATION of Kurt A. Franklin in Opposition to #219 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byRoy D. Newport. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #219 ) (Franklin, Kurt) (Filed on 10/27/2011)
October 27, 2011 Filing 219 RESPONSE (re #206 MOTION to Continue Trial ) PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO BURGER KING CORPORATION'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL filed byRoy D. Newport. (Franklin, Kurt) (Filed on 10/27/2011)
October 25, 2011 Filing 218 ANSWER TO CROSSCLAIM #151 Amended Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim (Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Willie C. Cook's Amended Crossclaim) byBurger King Corporation. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER DENYING BURGER KING CORPORATION'S REQUESTS FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS' ERRATA AND RESPONSE TO BURGER KING CORPORATION'S DISCOVERY LETTER re #208 Notice (Other) filed by Burger King Corporation, #209 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed by Burger King Corporation (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
October 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER re #215 Letter filed by Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC, SRAC Holdings I, Inc., Jerry M. Comstock. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/24/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2011)
October 21, 2011 Filing 215 Letter from Martin H. Orlick, Esq.. (Orlick, Martin) (Filed on 10/21/2011)
October 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER Discovery Hearing set for 11/14/2011 before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/21/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2011)
October 19, 2011 Filing 213 STIPULATION re #151 Amended Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim (Willie C. Cooks Amended Cross-Claim for Declaratory Relief and Damages) by Burger King Corporation. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 10/19/2011)
October 18, 2011 Filing 212 RESPONSE to re #209 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PRECIS OF BURGER KING CORPORATION IN SUPPORT OF ITS REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO BURGER KING CORPORATION'S DISCOVERY LETTER [DE 205] by Roy D. Newport. (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 10/18/2011)
October 18, 2011 Filing 211 RESPONSE to re #208 Notice (Other) PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PRCIS OF BURGER KING CORPORATION IN SUPPORT OF ITS REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS ERRATA TO OCTOBER 7, 2011 JOINT LETTER [DE 204] by Roy D. Newport. (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 10/18/2011)
October 14, 2011 Filing 210 NOTICE by Burger King Corporation Notice of Compliance (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
October 14, 2011 Filing 209 NOTICE by Burger King Corporation re #205 Letter Precis in Support of Its Request for Leave to File a Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Response to Burger King Corporation's Discovery Letter [DE 205] (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
October 14, 2011 Filing 208 NOTICE by Burger King Corporation re #204 Letter Precis in Support of Its Request for Leave to File a Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Errata to October 7, 2011 Joint Letter [DE 204] (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
October 13, 2011 Filing 207 NOTICE by Burger King Corporation re #206 MOTION to Continue Trial (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 10/13/2011)
October 13, 2011 Filing 206 MOTION to Continue Trial filed by Burger King Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 10/13/2011)
October 11, 2011 Filing 205 Letter from Plaintiffs Re Franchisees' Response to Burger King Corporation's Discovery Letter. (Franklin, Kurt) (Filed on 10/11/2011)
October 11, 2011 Filing 204 Letter from Plaintiffs ERRATA TO OCTOBER 7, 2011 JOINT LETTER. (Franklin, Kurt) (Filed on 10/11/2011)
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER GRANTING BURGER KING CORPORATION'S REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE ITS MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL re #195 Notice (Other) filed by Burger King Corporation, #196 Response ( Non Motion ), Response ( Non Motion ) filed by Roy D. Newport (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2011)
October 10, 2011 Filing 202 NOTICE by Burger King Corporation re #200 Letter NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBIT A IN SUPPORT OF JOINT LETTER FROM BURGER KING CORPORATION AND IDENTIFIED PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS [DE 200] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 1, #2 Exhibit Part 2, #3 Exhibit Part 3)(Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 10/10/2011)
October 7, 2011 Filing 201 Letter from Burger King Corporation and Willie C. Cook. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
October 7, 2011 Filing 200 Letter from Burger King Corporation and Identified Plaintiffs/Counter-Defendants. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
October 7, 2011 Filing 199 Letter from Burger King Corporation and Francisco Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
October 7, 2011 Filing 198 Letter from Parties (Joint Letter) in accordance with Court's Order re Discovery Procedures. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Franklin, Kurt) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
October 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTE CUTOFF DATE re #194 Stipulation filed by Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC, SRAC Holdings I, Inc., Jerry M. Comstock (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
October 6, 2011 Filing 196 RESPONSE to re #195 Notice (Other) PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PRECIS OF BURGER KING CORPORATION IN SUPPORT OF ITS REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE ITS MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL by Roy D. Newport. (Franklin, Kurt) (Filed on 10/6/2011)
October 5, 2011 Filing 195 NOTICE by Burger King Corporation re #34 Case Management Scheduling Order,, Order Referring Case to Mediation, (Precis in Support of Leave to File Motion to Continue) (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
October 5, 2011 Filing 194 STIPULATION Stipulated Request for Order Changing Time by Jerry M. Comstock, SRAC Holdings I, Inc., Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC. (Kenefick, Matthew) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART BURGER KING CORPORATION'S MOTION TO DISMISS WILLIE C. COOK'S CROSS-CLAIM AND VACATING HEARING by Judge William Alsup [granting in part and denying in part #167 Motion to Dismiss]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
September 30, 2011 Filing 192 NOTICE by Jerry M. Comstock, SRAC Holdings I, Inc., Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC Notice of Compliance (Orlick, Martin) (Filed on 9/30/2011)
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER re #188 Letter Brief filed by Burger King Corporation, #189 Letter Brief filed by Willie C. Cook. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 9/27/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #191 ***ORDER re #188 Letter Brief filed by Burger King Corporation, #189 Letter Brief filed by Willie C. Cook. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 9/27/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011) Modified on 9/27/2011 (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/28/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
September 26, 2011 Filing 189 Letter Brief filed byWillie C. Cook. (Jackmon, Amira) (Filed on 9/26/2011)
September 26, 2011 Filing 188 Letter Brief re #185 Order, #118 Order re Motion to Compel filed byBurger King Corporation. (Related document(s) #185 , #118 ) (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 9/26/2011)
September 23, 2011 Filing 187 REPLY (re #167 MOTION to Dismiss Counter-Defendant Willie C. Cook's Amended Cross-Claim for Declaratory Relief and Damages [DE 151]) filed by Burger King Corporation. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 9/23/2011) Modified on 9/26/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2011 Filing 186 AMENDED ANSWER to #41 Counterclaim, by Arcadia Restaurant Ventures, LLC, Danabo Arcadia Restaurant Ventures LLC, Dara Dejbakhsh, Desert Restaurant Ventures, LLC. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2011)
September 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER re #183 Letter Brief filed by Burger King Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 9/20/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2011)
September 20, 2011 Filing 184 Clifton Shigaki's ANSWER to Counterclaim byClifton Shigaki. (Garabedian, Armen) (Filed on 9/20/2011)
September 20, 2011 Filing 183 Letter Brief re #118 Order re Motion to Compel filed byBurger King Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #118 ) (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 9/20/2011)
September 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANT BURGER KING CORPORATION'S REQUEST TO EXTEND TIME TO SUBMIT A REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS WILLIE C. COOK'S AMENDED CROSS-CLAIM (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2011)
September 20, 2011 Filing 181 Letter Brief re #118 Order re Motion to Compel filed byBurger King Corporation. (Related document(s) #118 ) (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 9/20/2011)
September 19, 2011 Filing 180 Letter Brief Precis in Support of its Request for Extension of Time to Submit a Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Willie Cook's Amended Crossclaim filed byBurger King Corporation. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT BURGER KING CORPORATION'S PRECIS REQUEST TO FILE A MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE MOTION TO WITHDRAW (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
September 14, 2011 Filing 177 RESPONSE (re #167 MOTION to Dismiss Counter-Defendant Willie C. Cook's Amended Cross-Claim for Declaratory Relief and Damages [DE 151]) filed by Willie C. Cook. (Jackmon, Amira) (Filed on 9/14/2011) Modified on 9/15/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2011 Filing 176 NOTICE; Opposition to Precis in Support of Motion to Withdraw as Counsel, by Burger King Corporation re #173 Letter Brief (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 9/14/2011) Modified on 9/15/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER re #171 Letter filed by Roy D. Newport. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 9/12/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER re #170 Letter filed by Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC, SRAC Holdings I, Inc., Jerry M. Comstock. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 9/12/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
September 12, 2011 Filing 173 Letter Brief Precis in Support of Motion filed byWillie C. Cook. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jackmon, Amira) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
September 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 172 Order GRANTING APPLICATION PRO HAC VICE OF AARON BLYNN by Hon. William Alsup granting #169 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
September 7, 2011 Filing 171 Letter from Plaintiffs/Counter-Defendants & Burger King Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 9/7/2011)
September 6, 2011 Filing 170 Letter from Martin H. Orlick. (Orlick, Martin) (Filed on 9/6/2011)
September 1, 2011 Filing 169 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Aaron Blynn ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611064180) filed by Burger King Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2011)
September 1, 2011 Filing 168 NOTICE by Burger King Corporation re #151 Amended Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #167 MOTION to Dismiss Counter-Defendant Willie C. Cook's Amended Cross-Claim for Declaratory Relief and Damages (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 9/1/2011) Modified on 9/2/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
September 1, 2011 Filing 167 MOTION to Dismiss Counter-Defendant Willie C. Cook's Amended Cross-Claim for Declaratory Relief and Damages [DE 151] filed by Burger King Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 10/13/2011 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 9/15/2011. Replies due by 9/22/2011. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B", #3 Exhibit "C", #4 Exhibit "D")(Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 9/1/2011)
September 1, 2011 Filing 166 RESPONSE to re #164 Notice (Other) Opposition to Defendant Burger King Corporation's Request for Leave to File a Motion for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge by Roy D. Newport. (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 9/1/2011)
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR BURGER KING CORPORATION TO FILE MOTION TO DISMISS WILLIE C. COOK'S AMENDED CROSS-CLAIM by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part #161 Motion.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2011)
August 30, 2011 Filing 164 NOTICE by Burger King Corporation Precis in Support of its Request to File a Motion for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 8/30/2011)
August 26, 2011 Filing 163 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, BKC's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Second Amended Complaint and Amended Counterclaim for Damages served on Benjamin Kuo-An Chang on 07/27/2011, filed by Burger King Corporation. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 8/26/2011)
August 25, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #161 NOTICE by Burger King Corporation of Motion to Enforce Cook and BKC's Agreement to Dismiss without Prejudice Cook's Amended Crossclaim. Responses due by 9/8/2011. Replies due by 9/15/2011. Motion Hearing set for 9/29/2011 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2011)
August 25, 2011 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE. *** Set/Reset Deadlines as to #161 NOTICE by Burger King Corporation of Motion to Enforce Cook and BKC's Agreement to Dismiss without Prejudice Cook's Amended Crossclaim. Responses due by 10/13/2011. Replies due by 10/20/2011. Motion Hearing set for 9/29/2011 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2011) Modified on 8/26/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
August 25, 2011 Filing 162 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Stanley Kubu by Geoffrey A. Jones. (Garabedian, Armen) (Filed on 8/25/2011)
August 25, 2011 Filing 161 NOTICE by Burger King Corporation of Motion to Enforce Cook and BKC's Agreement to Dismiss without Prejudice Cook's Amended Crossclaim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 8/25/2011) Modified on 8/26/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER GRANTING BURGER KING CORPORATION'S REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION TO DISMISS WILLIE C. COOK'S AMENDED CROSS-CLAIM by Hon. William Alsup granting #159 Motion.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2011)
August 16, 2011 Filing 159 MOTION Request to File a Motion to Dismiss Willie C. Cooks Amended Cross-claim re #151 Amended Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim (Prcis in Support of its Request to File a Motion to Dismiss Willie C. Cooks Amended Cross-claim) filed by Burger King Corporation. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 8/16/2011) Modified on 8/16/2011 (whalc2, COURT STAFF).
August 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER re #143 Letter filed by Burger King Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/16/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2011)
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 12, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
August 11, 2011 Filing 156 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing HELD on 8/11/2011 before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Based on the parties' failure to reach an agreement, the Court ordered that the defendant may take 20 depositions in this action (10 depositions shall not exceed 7 hours and 10 depositions shall not exceed 4 hours). (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado 11:56 a.m.-12:33 p.m. and FTR 1:51-2:06 p.m.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/11/2011)
August 11, 2011 Filing 155 Proposed Order (Proposed Stipulated Protective Order) by Burger King Corporation. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 8/11/2011)
August 10, 2011 Filing 154 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice with Regard to Counter-Defendants John D. Gantes, George J. Gantes, Allan B. Gantes, Burger InvestCo., LLC, and OC Burger Partner, LLC by Burger King Corporation (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 8/10/2011)
August 10, 2011 Filing 153 ANSWER to Counterclaim of Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC, SRAC Holdings I, Inc. and Jerry M. Comstock byBurger King Corporation. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 8/10/2011)
August 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT BURGER KING CORPORATION'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTER-DEFENDANT WILLIE C. COOK'S COUNTERCLAIMS by Hon. William Alsup finding as moot #145 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot #145 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2011)
August 5, 2011 Filing 151 AMENDED ANSWER to Amended Counter Claim, Amended CROSSCLAIM against Burger King Corporation byWillie C. Cook. (Jackmon, Amira) (Filed on 8/5/2011)
July 29, 2011 Filing 150 RESPONSE (re #145 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) filed byWillie C. Cook. (Jackmon, Amira) (Filed on 7/29/2011)
July 19, 2011 Filing 149 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Amended Counterclaims and Summons served on George J. Gantes on 06/18/2011, filed by Burger King Corporation. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 7/19/2011)
July 19, 2011 Filing 148 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Amended Counterclaims and Summons served on Clifton Shigaki on 06/20/2011, filed by Burger King Corporation. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 7/19/2011)
July 19, 2011 Filing 147 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Amended Counterclaim and Summons served on Allan B. Gantes on 06/10/11, filed by Burger King Corporation. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 7/19/2011)
July 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #143 . Motion Hearing set for 8/11/2011 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/18/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2011)
July 15, 2011 Filing 145 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Burger King Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 8/25/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 7/29/2011. Replies due by 8/5/2011. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit)(Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
July 15, 2011 Filing 144 NOTICE by Burger King Corporation of Motion to Dismiss Counter-Defendant Willie C. Cook's Claim for Damages (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
July 13, 2011 Filing 143 Letter from Burger King Corporation and Plaintiffs/Counter-Defendants & Identified Counter-Defendants. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 7/13/2011)
July 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER GRANTING BURGER KING LEAVE TO FILE MOTION TO DISMISS WILLIE C. COOK'S COUNTERCLAIM by Judge Alsup granting #139 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; granting #140 Motion for Leave to File (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 141 RESPONSE (re #140 MOTION for Leave to File Precis in Support of it's Request to File a Motion to Dismiss Willie C. Cook's Counterclaim ) filed byWillie C. Cook. (Jackmon, Amira) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 140 MOTION for Leave to File Precis in Support of it's Request to File a Motion to Dismiss Willie C. Cook's Counterclaim filed by Burger King Corporation. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 139 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #113 Answer to Counterclaim, of Willie C. Cook filed by Burger King Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 5, 2011 Filing 138 ANSWER to Counterclaim PLAINTIFFS/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS AND IDENTIFIED COUNTER DEFENDANTS' AMENDED ANSWER TO AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM FOR DAMAGES byParagon Management Services, Inc., Jose F. Placencia, SFO EQUITIES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 7/5/2011)
July 5, 2011 Filing 137 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Amended Counterclaim served on Granya, Inc. on 06/13/2011, filed by Burger King Corporation. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 7/5/2011)
June 28, 2011 Filing 136 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Counterclaim served on William Sein Chow on 06/08/2011, filed by Burger King Corporation. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 6/28/2011)
June 28, 2011 Filing 135 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Counterclaim served on SFO Equities, LLC on 05/31/2011, filed by Burger King Corporation. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 6/28/2011)
June 28, 2011 Filing 134 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Counterclaim served on Cal Burg, Inc. on 06/03/2011, filed by Burger King Corporation. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 6/28/2011)
June 28, 2011 Filing 133 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Counterclaim served on Jose F. Placencia on 05/31/2011, filed by Burger King Corporation. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 6/28/2011)
June 28, 2011 Filing 132 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Counterclaim served on John D. Mascali on 06/06/2011, filed by Burger King Corporation. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 6/28/2011)
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR BKC TO FILE RESPONSE TO WILLIE C. COOK'S COUNTERCLAIM. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 23, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
June 23, 2011 Filing 130 NOTICE by Burger King Corporation, Willie C. Cook re #113 Answer to Counterclaim, (Stipulation to Extend Time for BKC to File Response to Willie C. Cook's Counterclaim) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
June 16, 2011 Filing 129 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 27, 2011, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, RPR, CRR, CSR, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 7/7/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/18/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/14/2011. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 16, 2011 Filing 128 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and BKC's Amended Counterclaim (DE 90) served on Paul L. Mallis on 05/29/2011, filed by Burger King Corporation. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 16, 2011 Filing 127 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and BKC's Amended Counterclaim (DE 90) served on Paragon Management Services, Inc. on 06/14/2011, filed by Burger King Corporation. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 16, 2011 Filing 126 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and BKC's Amended Counterclaim (DE 90) served on OC Burger Partners, LLC on 05/26/2011, filed by Burger King Corporation. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 16, 2011 Filing 125 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and BKC's Amended Counterclaim (DE 90) served on Mary Ann Mallis on 05/29/2011, filed by Burger King Corporation. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 16, 2011 Filing 124 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and BKC's Amended Counterclaim (DE 90) served on Jorge Finkelberg on 05/26/11, filed by Burger King Corporation. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 16, 2011 Filing 123 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and BKC's Amended Counterclaim (DE 90) served on John D. Gantes on 05/28/2011, filed by Burger King Corporation. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 16, 2011 Filing 122 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and BKC's Amended Counterclaim (DE 90) served on Hiten Patel on 06/08/2011, filed by Burger King Corporation. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 16, 2011 Filing 121 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and BKC's Amended Counterclaim (DE 90) served on Burger Investco, LLC on 05/26/2011, filed by Burger King Corporation. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 13, 2011 Filing 120 ANSWER to Counterclaim, COUNTERCLAIM against Burger King Corporation byJerry M. Comstock, SRAC Holdings I, Inc., Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC. (Orlick, Martin) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 10, 2011 Filing 119 ANSWER to Counterclaim; Answer to Burger King Corporations's Counter-Claim by Danabo Group Inc, Dara Dejbakhsh, Desert Restaurant Ventures, LLC. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2011)
June 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER on Discovery Procedures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 6/7/11. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY RELIEF (AS TO RFPs 11, 13, 14, 15, and 17) and REFERRING ALL FURTHER DISCOVERY DISPUTES FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 6, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
June 3, 2011 Filing 116 Proposed Order on Pltfs' Request for Discovery Relief by Roy D. Newport. (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 6/3/2011)
June 1, 2011 Filing 115 Summons Issued as to William Sein Chow, Allan B. Gantes, Granya, Inc., Paragon Management Services, Inc., Clifton Shigaki. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2011)
May 31, 2011 Filing 114 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Burger King Corporation as to William Sein Chow, Allan B. Gantes, Granya, Inc., Paragon Management Services, Inc., Clifton Shigaki. (Attachments: #1 Summons Unexecuted Summonses)(Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 5/31/2011)
May 30, 2011 Filing 113 ANSWER to Counterclaim, COUNTERCLAIM against Burger King Corporation byWillie C. Cook. (Jackmon, Amira) (Filed on 5/30/2011)
May 27, 2011 Filing 112 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 5/27/2011 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 5/27/2011). (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/27/2011)
May 26, 2011 Filing 111 Beatrice Kubu's ANSWER to Counterclaim by BKC byBeatrice E. Kubu. (Garabedian, Armen) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
May 26, 2011 Filing 110 Carol McManus' ANSWER to Counterclaim by BKC byCarol K. McManus. (Garabedian, Armen) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
May 26, 2011 Filing 109 Catherine Kubu's ANSWER to Counterclaim by BKC byCatherine A. Kubu. (Garabedian, Armen) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
May 26, 2011 Filing 108 Stanley Kubu's ANSWER to Counterclaim by BKC byStanley Kubu. (Garabedian, Armen) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
May 26, 2011 Filing 107 Susan Kubu-Jones' ANSWER to Counterclaim by BKC bySusan Kubu-Jones. (Garabedian, Armen) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
May 26, 2011 Filing 106 Geoffrey Jones' ANSWER to Counterclaim by BKC byGeoffrey A. Jones. (Garabedian, Armen) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
May 26, 2011 Filing 105 Francisco Foods, Inc.'s ANSWER to Counterclaim by BKC byFrancisco Foods, Inc.. (Garabedian, Armen) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
May 25, 2011 Filing 104 Letter Brief re #91 Letter in Response to Plaintiffs' Request for Discovery Relief filed byBurger King Corporation. (Related document(s) #91 ) (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
May 23, 2011 Filing 103 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM CORRECTED byRoy D. Newport. (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 5/23/2011)
May 23, 2011 Filing 102 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT #103 . *** ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM byRoy D. Newport. (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 5/23/2011) Modified on 5/24/2011 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2011 Filing 101 NOTICE by Burger King Corporation re #90 Answer to Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Counterclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, (Alias Summonses to William Sein Chow, Allan B. Gantes, Granya, Inc., Paragon Management Services, Inc., and Clifton Shigaki) (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 5/20/2011)
May 16, 2011 Filing 100 AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiffs/Counter-Defendants and Identified Counter-Defendants' Amended Answer to Counterclaim for Damages byRoy D. Newport. (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 5/16/2011)
May 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER SETTING HEARING RE PLAINTIFFS' DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re #91 Letter filed by Roy D. Newport]. Discovery Hearing set for 5/27/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Response due by noon on 5/25/2011. Meet and confer from 9:30--2:00 pm 5/27/2011 in Court's jury room. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 5/16/2011. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2011)
May 16, 2011 Filing 98 Beatrice Kubu's ANSWER to Counterclaim by BKC byBeatrice E. Kubu. (Calderon, David) (Filed on 5/16/2011)
May 16, 2011 Filing 97 Carol McManus' ANSWER to Counterclaim by BKC byCarol K. McManus. (Calderon, David) (Filed on 5/16/2011)
May 16, 2011 Filing 96 Catherine Kubu's ANSWER to Counterclaim by BKC byCatherine A. Kubu. (Calderon, David) (Filed on 5/16/2011)
May 16, 2011 Filing 95 Stanley Kubu's ANSWER to Counterclaim by BKC byStanley Kubu. (Calderon, David) (Filed on 5/16/2011)
May 16, 2011 Filing 94 Sunsan Kubu-Jones' ANSWER to Counterclaim by BKC bySusan Kubu-Jones. (Calderon, David) (Filed on 5/16/2011)
May 16, 2011 Filing 93 Geoffrey A. Jones' ANSWER to Counterclaim by BKC byGeoffrey A. Jones. (Calderon, David) (Filed on 5/16/2011)
May 16, 2011 Filing 92 Francisco Foods, Inc.'s ANSWER to Counterclaim by BKC byFrancisco Foods, Inc.. (Calderon, David) (Filed on 5/16/2011)
May 12, 2011 Filing 91 Letter from Megan Oliver Thompson re Request for Discovery Relief Pursuant to Supplemental Order Paragraph 25. (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 5/12/2011)
May 6, 2011 Filing 90 ANSWER to Amended Complaint Defendant Burger King Corporation's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' SECOND Amended Complaint For Declaratory Relief, Amended COUNTERCLAIM For Damages against Carolyn P. Arnold, B-Y-J Partners, Masroor A. Batla, Tallat Batla, Batla Restaurant Group, Inc., Ravi Batra, Bayshore Foods Inc, Beach City Inc, John M. Benedict, Tina L. Benedict, Luis Boyance, Chris G. Bredesen, Bonita B. Brening, Gregory R. Brening, Scott Brening, Brening Enterprises Inc, Brening Enterprises LP, Brening Enterprises No. 3 Inc, Brening Enterprises No. 4, Inc., Richard A. Brening, Jr., Leslie Broadland, Burger InvestCo, LLC, Dean Frank Busch, Sr, Nancy Mae Busch, C&L 28 Inc, C&R Foods Inc, C&S Foods Inc, Cal Burg, Inc., Card Investment, Incorporated, Centennial Management Corporation, Centennial Restaurants LLC, Benjamin Kuo-An Chang, Chung Ching Chang, Huei L. Chang, Angela Chen, Chris Chen, Andrew J. Cherng, Hansa V. Chhaddva, Robert T. Chiu, William Sein Chow, Daniel Y. Chu, Patsy P. Chu, Chu Investment Inc, Marshall J. Chuang, Jae Chung, Cimm's Incorporated, Lawrence P. Cimmarusti, Ralph J. Cimmarusti, Charles D. Cobb, Jerry M. Comstock, Willie C. Cook, Byron Crossen, Danabo Arcadia Restaurant Ventures LLC, Danabo Group Inc, David J. Davis, Deep ValleyEnterprises Inc, Dara Dejbakhsh, Sunil G. Desai, Desert Restaurant Ventures, LLC, Devil Mt. Foods - Pleasant Hill, Balbir S. Dhillon, Dhillon ABS Investment Inc, Roland Eddy, Robert Eng, Vincent F. Eupierre, Eureka Fortune Inc, Evergreen Restaurant Group, Evergreen Restaurant Group California Inc, George Fan, Yvette Fan, 952 Enterprises LLC, Donna B. Agins, Richard H. Agins, Nasser Aliabadi, Allience Inc, Jagdish R. Amin, Antelope Valley Restaurants, Inc., Arcadia Restaurant Ventures, LLC, Jorge Finkelberg, Wilawan Foo, Francisco Foods, Inc., Allan B. Gantes, George J. Gantes, John D. Gantes, Gate 74 Inc, Geboy de Tijuana SA de CV, Geboy, Inc., Gary H. Geiger, Amarjeet Ghai, Charanjit Ghai, Harshraj Ghai, Gluba Holdings, LLC, Albert Gonzales, III, Granya, Inc., Simmi Gulati, Sunil Gulati, HG Foods LLC, HKR Restaurants, Inc. n/k/a WD Restaurant #1937, David Lynwood Hairston, David L. Hairston, Elham Hakimianpour, Herbert Hakimianpour, Robert Hakimianpour, Violet Hakimianpour, Hakimianpour Santa Monica Group, L.L.C., Gussie Hampton, Gussie Hampton, Hart Foods Inc, Lynn A. Hartje, Terry O. Hartshorn, Dominic Ho, Ho Yee Restaurant, J and A Food Service Inc, JimRich Restaurant Investment Corporation, Geoffrey A. Jones, Kern Desert Foods, Inc., Abdul R. Khan, David Knox, Todd Knox, Joseph C. Kruger, Vicky Kruger, Beatrice E. Kubu, Catherine A. Kubu, Stanley Kubu, Susan Kubu-Jones, Herbert Y. Li, Herman Y Li, Roger Y Li, Siu May Li, Chi Wai Low, Mary Ann Mallis, Paul L. Mallis, Mancha Development Company, Howard Mangen, Mangen Group Inc, John D. Mascali, Carol K. McManus, Lynn R. McNeely, Metro Management Systems Inc, Midas Enterprises Corporation, Syed Musavi, Roy D. Newport, OC Burger Partners, LLC, P. A. & B. Investments, Inc., Paragon Management Services, Inc., Hiten Patel, Jayant F. Patel, Naranji R. Patel, Pravin F. Patel, Rakesh n. Patel, Vimal Patel, Patel Brothers Inc, Vetit Piyas, Piyas Corporation, Jose F. Placencia, Progressive Management Services, Inc., Puja Restaurant Group Inc, Martin Quinn, RLE Investment Corporation, Larry D. Ralston, Sanjay Rangan, Ravind Ent Inc, Kyle Redding, Reddy Holly LP, Reeddy, Inc., Rituraj Investments, Inc., Donna Rubin, Joseph Rubin, SFO EQUITIES, LLC, SJ Quickbite Inc, SRAC Holdings I, Inc., Anthony P. Sacca, Cathy Z. Sacca, Joseph A. Sacca, Sacca Corp, Sacca Family Corporation, Sara Wade Corporation, Vinod Sawhney, Patricia Scarbrough, William Scarbrough, Diemar E. Schott, Shenandoah Valley Enterprises Inc, Clifton Shigaki, Ella A. Smothers, James W. Stinnett, Judy G. Stinnett, Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC, Summit Equity Group Inc, Robert K. Swift, Wai-Mau Szeto, The Rab LLC, Tri-City Foods Inc, Union Foods Corp., Jose Villaflor, Susan A. Villaflor, Asit Vyas, WDR Restaurants Inc, Lorraine D. Whitehurst, Richard G. Whitehurst, Joseph K. Wong, David C. Wurts, Peggy E. Yeager, Thomas E. Yeager, John Yee, Shakeb H. Zuberi byBurger King Corporation. (Friedenberg, Adam) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
May 5, 2011 Filing 89 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Burger King Corporation. Service waived by Desert Restaurant Ventures, LLC waiver sent on 3/29/2011, answer due 5/31/2011. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 5/5/2011)
May 5, 2011 Filing 88 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Burger King Corporation. Service waived by Dara Dejbakhsh waiver sent on 3/29/2011, answer due 5/31/2011. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 5/5/2011)
May 5, 2011 Filing 87 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Burger King Corporation. Service waived by Danabo Arcadia Restaurant Ventures LLC waiver sent on 3/29/2011, answer due 5/31/2011. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 5/5/2011)
May 5, 2011 Filing 86 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Burger King Corporation. Service waived by Arcadia Restaurant Ventures, LLC waiver sent on 3/29/2011, answer due 5/31/2011. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 5/5/2011)
May 2, 2011 Filing 85 STIPULATION Extending Counter-Defendant Willie C. Cook's Deadline to Answer Burger King Corporation's Counter-Claim for Damages, by Willie C. Cook. (Jackmon, Amira) (Filed on 5/2/2011) Modified on 5/3/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2011 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel Amira Jackmon, by Willie C. Cook (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2011)
April 26, 2011 Filing 83 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by William Scarbrough. Service waived by William Scarbrough waiver sent on 3/17/2011, answer due 5/16/2011. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 4/26/2011)
April 26, 2011 Filing 82 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Susan Kubu-Jones. Service waived by Susan Kubu-Jones waiver sent on 3/17/2011, answer due 5/16/2011. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 4/26/2011)
April 26, 2011 Filing 81 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Stanley Kubu. Service waived by Stanley Kubu waiver sent on 3/17/2011, answer due 5/16/2011. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 4/26/2011)
April 26, 2011 Filing 80 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Patricia Scarbrough. Service waived by Patricia Scarbrough waiver sent on 3/17/2011, answer due 5/16/2011. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 4/26/2011)
April 26, 2011 Filing 79 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Geoffrey A. Jones. Service waived by Geoffrey A. Jones waiver sent on 3/17/2011, answer due 5/16/2011. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 4/26/2011)
April 26, 2011 Filing 78 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Francisco Foods, Inc.. Service waived by Francisco Foods, Inc. waiver sent on 3/17/2011, answer due 5/16/2011. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 4/26/2011)
April 26, 2011 Filing 77 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Devil Mt. Foods - Pleasant Hill. Service waived by Devil Mt. Foods - Pleasant Hill waiver sent on 3/17/2011, answer due 5/16/2011. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 4/26/2011)
April 26, 2011 Filing 76 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Catherine A. Kubu. Service waived by Catherine A. Kubu waiver sent on 3/17/2011, answer due 5/16/2011. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 4/26/2011)
April 26, 2011 Filing 75 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Carol K. McManus. Service waived by Carol K. McManus waiver sent on 3/17/2011, answer due 5/16/2011. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 4/26/2011)
April 26, 2011 Filing 74 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Burger King Corporation. Service waived by Beatrice E. Kubu waiver sent on 3/17/2011, answer due 5/16/2011. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 4/26/2011)
April 26, 2011 Filing 73 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Burger King Corporation. Service waived by Willie C. Cook waiver sent on 3/17/2011, answer due 5/16/2011. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 4/26/2011)
April 22, 2011 Filing 72 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Roy D. Newport. (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 4/22/2011)
April 22, 2011 Filing 71 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Roy D. Newport. Second Amended Complaint for Declaratory Relief; Breach of Contract; Breach of the Covenant of Good Faith and Fair Dealing; and Conversion. (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 4/22/2011)
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Alsup granting #55 Motion for Leave to File (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2011)
April 15, 2011 Filing 69 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Burger King Corporation (corrected). (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 4/15/2011). CORRECTION OF DOCKET #68 . Modified on 4/18/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
April 15, 2011 Filing 68 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #69 *** RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Burger King Corporation. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 4/15/2011) Modified on 4/18/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
April 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 15, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2011)
April 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR PARTIES TO CONDUCT MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 13, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2011)
April 12, 2011 Filing 65 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Extending Time for Parties to Conduct Mediation by Burger King Corporation. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 4/12/2011)
April 11, 2011 Filing 64 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM For Damages byRoy D. Newport. (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 4/11/2011)
April 11, 2011 Filing 63 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Burger King Corporation. Service waived by Leslie Broadland waiver sent on 3/21/2011, answer due 5/20/2011. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 4/11/2011)
April 11, 2011 Filing 62 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Burger King Corporation. Service waived by Terry O. Hartshorn waiver sent on 3/22/2011, answer due 5/23/2011. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 4/11/2011)
April 11, 2011 Filing 61 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Burger King Corporation. Service waived by Vetit Piyas waiver sent on 3/30/2011, answer due 5/31/2011. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 4/11/2011)
April 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER REGARDING MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 6, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2011)
April 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY REQUESTS by Judge Alsup granting #56 Motion for Extension of Time to File (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2011)
April 5, 2011 Filing 58 Declaration of Megan Oliver Thompson in Support of #57 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byRoy D. Newport. (Related document(s) #57 ) (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 4/5/2011)
April 5, 2011 Filing 57 RESPONSE (re #56 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responses to Plaintiffs' First Request for Production, Interrogatories and Request for Admissions ) Plaintiffs' Opposition filed byRoy D. Newport. (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 4/5/2011)
April 1, 2011 Filing 56 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responses to Plaintiffs' First Request for Production, Interrogatories and Request for Admissions filed by Burger King Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 4/1/2011)
March 31, 2011 Filing 55 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Roy D. Newport. Motion Hearing set for 5/5/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 3/31/2011)
March 31, 2011 Filing 54 Certificate of Interested Entities by Burger King Corporation (AMENDED) (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 3/31/2011)
March 25, 2011 Filing 53 ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Martin Quinn as Mediator. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2011)
March 24, 2011 Filing 52 STIPULATION for Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Plaintiff Danabo Group, Inc. Only by Roy D. Newport. (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 3/24/2011)
March 18, 2011 Filing 51 Summons Issued as to Yvette Fan. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2011)
March 17, 2011 Filing 50 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Extending Counter-Defendants' Deadline to Respond to Counterclaim by Roy D. Newport. (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 3/17/2011)
March 17, 2011 Filing 49 NOTICE by Burger King Corporation re #41 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim, (Summons on Yvette Fan) (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 3/17/2011) Modified on 3/18/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
March 15, 2011 Filing 48 Summons Issued as to Brening Enterprises No. 4, Inc. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2011)
March 15, 2011 Filing 47 NOTICE by Burger King Corporation Summons on Brening Enterprises No. 4, Inc. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 3/15/2011)
March 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/14/11. (bjtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2011) Modified on 3/15/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
March 8, 2011 Filing 45 Summons Issued as to Benjamin Kuo-An Chang. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2011)
March 7, 2011 Filing 44 NOTICE by Burger King Corporation re #41 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim, (Summons for Benjamin Kuo-An Chang) (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 3/7/2011) Modified on 3/8/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
March 1, 2011 Filing 43 Summons Issued as to B-Y-J Partners, Batla Restaurant Group, Inc., Ravi Batra, John M. Benedict, Tina L. Benedict, Luis Boyance, Bonita B. Brening, Gregory R. Brening, Scott Brening, Richard A. Brening, Jr., Leslie Broadland, Burger InvestCo, LLC, Dean Frank Busch, Sr, Nancy Mae Busch, Cal Burg, Inc., Card Investment, Incorporated, Chung Ching Chang, Huei L. Chang, Angela Chen, Chris Chen, Andrew J. Cherng, Hansa V. Chhaddva, William Sein Chow, Daniel Y. Chu, Patsy P. Chu, Marshall J. Chuang, Jae Chung, Cimm's Incorporated, Lawrence P. Cimmarusti, Ralph J. Cimmarusti, Jerry M. Comstock, Willie C. Cook, Byron Crossen, Danabo Arcadia Restaurant Ventures LLC, David J. Davis, Dara Dejbakhsh, Sunil G. Desai, Desert Restaurant Ventures, LLC, Devil Mt. Foods - Pleasant Hill, Balbir S. Dhillon, Roland Eddy, Vincent F. Eupierre, Evergreen Restaurant Group, George Fan, Donna B. Agins, Richard H. Agins, Nasser Aliabadi, Jagdish R. Amin, Antelope Valley Restaurants, Inc., Arcadia Restaurant Ventures, LLC, Jorge Finkelberg, Wilawan Foo, Francisco Foods, Inc., Allan B. Gantes, George J. Gantes, John D. Gantes, Geboy de Tijuana SA de CV, Geboy, Inc., Gary H. Geiger, Amarjeet Ghai, Charanjit Ghai, Harshraj Ghai, Gluba Holdings, LLC, Granya, Inc., Simmi Gulati, Sunil Gulati, HG Foods LLC, HKR Restaurants, Inc. n/k/a WD Restaurant #1937, Hakimianpour Santa Monica Group, L.L.C., Lynn A. Hartje, Terry O. Hartshorn, Dominic Ho, JimRich Restaurant Investment Corporation, Geoffrey A. Jones, Kern Desert Foods, Inc., Abdul R. Khan, David Knox, Todd Knox, Joseph C. Kruger, Vicky Kruger, Beatrice E. Kubu, Catherine A. Kubu, Stanley Kubu, Susan Kubu-Jones, Herbert Y. Li, Herman Y Li, Roger Y Li, Siu May Li, Chi Wai Low, Mary Ann Mallis, Paul L. Mallis, Howard Mangen, John D. Mascali, Carol K. McManus, Lynn R. McNeely, Syed Musavi, OC Burger Partners, LLC, P. A. & B. Investments, Inc., Paragon Management Services, Inc., Hiten Patel, Jayant F. Patel, Naranji R. Patel, Pravin F. Patel, Rakesh n. Patel, Vimal Patel, Vetit Piyas, Piyas Corporation, Jose F. Placencia, Progressive Management Services, Inc., Sanjay Rangan, Kyle Redding, Reeddy, Inc., Rituraj Investments, Inc., Donna Rubin, Joseph Rubin, SFO EQUITIES, LLC, SRAC Holdings I, Inc., Anthony P. Sacca, Cathy Z. Sacca, Joseph A. Sacca, Sacca Family Corporation, Sara Wade Corporation, Vinod Sawhney, Patricia Scarbrough, William Scarbrough, Diemar E. Schott, Clifton Shigaki, Ella A. Smothers, James W. Stinnett, Judy G. Stinnett, Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC, Robert K. Swift, Wai-Mau Szeto, Union Foods Corp., Susan A. Villaflor, Asit Vyas, Joseph K. Wong, David C. Wurts, Peggy E. Yeager, Thomas E. Yeager, John Yee, Shakeb H. Zuberi. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2011)
February 28, 2011 Filing 42 NOTICE by Burger King Corporation re #41 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim, (Summonses on Counter-Defendants) (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 2/28/2011) Modified on 3/1/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2011 Filing 41 Burger King Corporation's ANSWER to Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM for Damages against 952 Enterprises LLC, Carolyn P. Arnold, Masroor A. Batla, Tallat Batla, Bayshore Foods Inc, Beach City Inc, Chris G. Bredesen, Brening Enterprises LP, Brening Enterprises No. 3 Inc, C&L 28 Inc, C&R Foods Inc, C&S Foods Inc, Centennial Management Corporation, Robert T. Chiu, Chu Investment Inc, Charles D. Cobb, Deep ValleyEnterprises Inc, Dhillon ABS Investment Inc, Eureka Fortune Inc, Evergreen Restaurant Group California Inc, Gate 74 Inc, Albert Gonzales, III, David Lynwood Hairston, Elham Hakimianpour, Herbert Hakimianpour, Robert Hakimianpour, Violet Hakimianpour, Gussie Hampton, Hart Foods Inc, J and A Food Service Inc, Mangen Group Inc, Metro Management Systems Inc, Midas Enterprises Corporation, Roy D. Newport, Patel Brothers Inc, Puja Restaurant Group Inc, RLE Investment Corporation, Larry D. Ralston, Ravind Ent Inc, Reddy Holly LP, SJ Quickbite Inc, Sacca Corp, Shenandoah Valley Enterprises Inc, Tri-City Foods Inc, Jose Villaflor, Lorraine D. Whitehurst, Richard G. Whitehurst, Angela Chen, Chris Chen, Dara Dejbakhsh, Arcadia Restaurant Ventures, LLC, Danabo Arcadia Restaurant Ventures LLC, Howard Mangen, Clifton Shigaki, Evergreen Restaurant Group, Benjamin Kuo-An Chang, Herman Y Li, Herbert Y. Li, Daniel Y. Chu, Chi Wai Low, Siu May Li, Huei L. Chang, Roger Y Li, Andrew J. Cherng, Marshall J. Chuang, Chung Ching Chang, Patsy P. Chu, Robert K. Swift, Diemar E. Schott, Jagdish R. Amin, Wilawan Foo, Hakimianpour Santa Monica Group, L.L.C., Sara Wade Corporation, Gussie Hampton, David L. Hairston, Progressive Management Services, Inc., Paragon Management Services, Inc., Ella A. Smothers, William Sein Chow, Brening Enterprises No. 4, Inc., Richard A. Brening, Jr., Bonita B. Brening, Abdul R. Khan, HKR Restaurants, Inc. n/k/a WD Restaurant #1937, David C. Wurts, Sacca Family Corporation, Joseph A. Sacca, Anthony P. Sacca, Cathy Z. Sacca, John M. Benedict, Tina L. Benedict, Pravin F. Patel, Antelope Valley Restaurants, Inc., Lynn A. Hartje, Gregory R. Brening, Scott Brening, Leslie Broadland, John D. Mascali, Kern Desert Foods, Inc., Joseph C. Kruger, Vicky Kruger, Shakeb H. Zuberi, Syed Musavi, Granya, Inc., Mary Ann Mallis, Paul L. Mallis, Union Foods Corp., Susan A. Villaflor, Centennial Restaurants LLC, Joseph Rubin, Donna Rubin, Joseph K. Wong, Balbir S. Dhillon, Hansa V. Chhaddva, Vincent F. Eupierre, Lynn R. McNeely, Byron Crossen, Kyle Redding, David Knox, Todd Knox, Nasser Aliabadi, Wai-Mau Szeto, David J. Davis, Ravi Batra, Vinod Sawhney, Rakesh n. Patel, Sunil G. Desai, Sanjay Rangan, Naranji R. Patel, Dominic Ho, John Yee, Batla Restaurant Group, Inc., Reeddy, Inc., Roland Eddy, Piyas Corporation, Vetit Piyas, Card Investment, Incorporated, Cal Burg, Inc., Hiten Patel, Vimal Patel, Jayant F. Patel, Asit Vyas, SFO EQUITIES, LLC, Jae Chung, Jose F. Placencia, Geboy, Inc., Geboy de Tijuana SA de CV, Luis Boyance, Jorge Finkelberg, Cimm's Incorporated, Lawrence P. Cimmarusti, Ralph J. Cimmarusti, Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC, Jerry M. Comstock, SRAC Holdings I, Inc., Rituraj Investments, Inc., Harshraj Ghai, Charanjit Ghai, Amarjeet Ghai, HG Foods LLC, Gary H. Geiger, Terry O. Hartshorn, Willie C. Cook, Desert Restaurant Ventures, LLC, B-Y-J Partners, Thomas E. Yeager, Peggy E. Yeager, JimRich Restaurant Investment Corporation, P. A. & B. Investments, Inc., James W. Stinnett, Judy G. Stinnett, Richard H. Agins, Donna B. Agins, Dean Frank Busch, Sr, Nancy Mae Busch, Francisco Foods, Inc., Geoffrey A. Jones, Beatrice E. Kubu, Stanley Kubu, Catherine A. Kubu, Susan Kubu-Jones, Carol K. McManus, John D. Gantes, George J. Gantes, Allan B. Gantes, OC Burger Partners, LLC, Burger InvestCo, LLC, Gluba Holdings, LLC, Simmi Gulati, Sunil Gulati, George Fan, Yvette Fan, Devil Mt. Foods - Pleasant Hill, William Scarbrough, Patricia Scarbrough byBurger King Corporation. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 2/25/2011)
February 17, 2011 Filing 40 STIPULATION re #38 Amended Complaint (Extending Time for BKC to File Answer and Affirmative Defenses to First Amended Complaint and Counterclaim against Plaintiffs and any Third-Parties as a Matter of Course) by Burger King Corporation. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 2/17/2011)
February 3, 2011 Filing 39 Transcript of Proceedings held on 1-20-11, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Wyatt, Telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/4/2011. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2011)
January 31, 2011 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held 1/31/2011 with Howard A. Herman, ADR Program Director. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2011)
January 31, 2011 Filing 38 AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) against Burger King Corporation. Filed byRoy D. Newport. (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 1/31/2011)
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF NINA GREENE by Judge Alsup granting #36 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2011)
January 26, 2011 Filing 36 MOTION of Nina Greene for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611055529) filed by Burger King Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 24, 2011 Filing 35 ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 1/31/2011 at 10:30 a.m. Pacific Time. Please use call-in #: 661-673-8600; Access code: 956682. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2011)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: ORDER REFERRING CASE to ADR Unit for Mediation. Discovery due by 9/30/2011. Trial set for 1/9/2012 07:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Motions due by 11/3/2011. Pretrial Conference set for 12/19/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/20/2011. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2011)
January 20, 2011 Filing 33 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 1/20/2011 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 1/20/2011), Case referred to mediation. Jury Selection set for 1/9/2012 07:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Alsup. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/20/2011)
January 19, 2011 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 1/19/2011 by Daniel Bowling, ADR Program Staff Attorney. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
January 18, 2011 Filing 32 STIPULATION re #21 Answer to Complaint, #1 Complaint and proposed Order Extending Defendant's Time to Amend Answer As a Matter of Course by Burger King Corporation. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 1/18/2011) Modified on 1/19/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
January 18, 2011 Filing 31 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 1/19/11 at 3:00 p.m. Pacific time. Please take note that at the appointed time, all parties shall call 641-715-3200 and use access code 1007836 to join the call. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
January 14, 2011 Filing 30 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Franklin, Kurt) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
January 12, 2011 Filing 29 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (JOINT) and [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Roy D. Newport. (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 1/12/2011)
January 12, 2011 Filing 28 Certificate of Interested Entities by Roy D. Newport Pursuant to LR 3-16 (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 1/12/2011)
January 12, 2011 Filing 27 NOTICE by Burger King Corporation of Filing Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 1/12/2011)
January 12, 2011 Filing 26 Certificate of Interested Entities by Burger King Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Burger King Worldwide Holding, Inc. for Burger King Corporation. and Zurich American Insurance Company (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 1/12/2011)
December 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANT'S TIME TO AMEND ANSWER. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 27, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2010)
December 23, 2010 Filing 24 STIPULATION re #21 Answer to Complaint And to Amend as a Matter of Course by Burger King Corporation. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 12/23/2010)
December 20, 2010 Filing 23 STIPULATION EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR RULE 26(F) CONFERENCE by Roy D. Newport. (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 12/20/2010)
December 17, 2010 Filing 22 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Roy D. Newport. (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 12/17/2010)
December 3, 2010 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses byBurger King Corporation. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 12/3/2010)
December 1, 2010 Filing 20 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Extending Defendant's Deadline to Respond to Complaint by 952 Enterprises LLC, Allience Inc, Carolyn P. Arnold, Masroor A. Batla, Tallat Batla, Bayshore Foods Inc, Beach City Inc, Chris G. Bredesen, Brening Enterprises Inc, Brening Enterprises LP, Brening Enterprises No. 3 Inc, Burger King Corporation, C&L 28 Inc, C&R Foods Inc, C&S Foods Inc, Centennial Management Corporation, Robert T. Chiu, Chu Investment Inc, Charles D. Cobb, Danabo Group Inc, Deep ValleyEnterprises Inc, Dhillon ABS Investment Inc, Robert Eng, Eureka Fortune Inc, Evergreen Restaurant Group California Inc, Gate 74 Inc, Albert Gonzales, III, David Lynwood Hairston, Elham Hakimianpour, Herbert Hakimianpour, Robert Hakimianpour, Violet Hakimianpour, Gussie Hampton, Hart Foods Inc, Ho Yee Restaurant, J and A Food Service Inc, Mancha Development Company, Mangen Group Inc, Metro Management Systems Inc, Midas Enterprises Corporation, Roy D. Newport, Patel Brothers Inc, Puja Restaurant Group Inc, RLE Investment Corporation, Larry D. Ralston, Ravind Ent Inc, Reddy Holly LP, SJ Quickbite Inc, Sacca Corp, Shenandoah Valley Enterprises Inc, Summit Equity Group Inc, The Rab LLC, Tri-City Foods Inc, Jose Villaflor, WDR Restaurants Inc, Lorraine D. Whitehurst, Richard G. Whitehurst. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 12/1/2010) Modified on 12/2/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
November 22, 2010 Filing 19 STIPULATION EXTENDING DEFENDANT'S DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by Burger King Corporation. (Friedenberg, Adam) (Filed on 11/22/2010)
November 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re #17 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/20/08. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2010)
November 10, 2010 Filing 17 CLERKS NOTICE Scheduling Initial CMC on Reassignment. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/20/2011 11:00 AM. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2010)
November 8, 2010 Filing 16 STIPULATION Extending Defendant's Deadline to Respond to Complaint by Burger King Corporation. (Friedenberg, Adam) (Filed on 11/8/2010)
November 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RELATING CASE. Case related to 08-4262 WHA. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/01/10. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
November 1, 2010 Filing 14 Statement of Non-Opposition to Motion to Relate Case to Castaneda v. Burger King Corporation, Case No. CV-08-4262 (WHA) by Burger King Corporation. (Rodgers, Maureen) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF MICHAEL JOBLOVE by Judge Alsup granting #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
October 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. William H. Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/29/10. (mab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2010)
October 26, 2010 Filing 11 Proposed Order re #10 Errata,,,,, by 952 Enterprises LLC, Allience Inc, Carolyn P. Arnold, Masroor A. Batla, Tallat Batla, Bayshore Foods Inc, Beach City Inc, Chris G. Bredesen, Brening Enterprises Inc, Brening Enterprises LP, Brening Enterprises No. 3 Inc, C&L 28 Inc, C&R Foods Inc, C&S Foods Inc, Centennial Management Corporation, Robert T. Chiu, Chu Investment Inc, Charles D. Cobb, Danabo Group Inc, Deep ValleyEnterprises Inc, Dhillon ABS Investment Inc, Robert Eng, Eureka Fortune Inc, Evergreen Restaurant Group California Inc, Gate 74 Inc, Albert Gonzales, III, David Lynwood Hairston, Elham Hakimianpour, Herbert Hakimianpour, Robert Hakimianpour, Violet Hakimianpour, Gussie Hampton, Hart Foods Inc, Ho Yee Restaurant, J and A Food Service Inc, Mancha Development Company, Mangen Group Inc, Metro Management Systems Inc, Midas Enterprises Corporation, Roy D. Newport, Patel Brothers Inc, Puja Restaurant Group Inc, RLE Investment Corporation, Larry D. Ralston, Ravind Ent Inc, Reddy Holly LP, SJ Quickbite Inc, Sacca Corp, Shenandoah Valley Enterprises Inc, Summit Equity Group Inc, The Rab LLC, Tri-City Foods Inc, Jose Villaflor, WDR Restaurants Inc, Lorraine D. Whitehurst, Richard G. Whitehurst. (Franklin, Kurt) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
October 26, 2010 Filing 10 ERRATA re #6 MOTION to Relate Case by 952 Enterprises LLC, Allience Inc, Carolyn P. Arnold, Masroor A. Batla, Tallat Batla, Bayshore Foods Inc, Beach City Inc, Chris G. Bredesen, Brening Enterprises Inc, Brening Enterprises LP, Brening Enterprises No. 3 Inc, C&L 28 Inc, C&R Foods Inc, C&S Foods Inc, Centennial Management Corporation, Robert T. Chiu, Chu Investment Inc, Charles D. Cobb, Danabo Group Inc, Deep ValleyEnterprises Inc, Dhillon ABS Investment Inc, Robert Eng, Eureka Fortune Inc, Evergreen Restaurant Group California Inc, Gate 74 Inc, Albert Gonzales, III, David Lynwood Hairston, Elham Hakimianpour, Herbert Hakimianpour, Robert Hakimianpour, Violet Hakimianpour, Gussie Hampton, Hart Foods Inc, Ho Yee Restaurant, J and A Food Service Inc, Mancha Development Company, Mangen Group Inc, Metro Management Systems Inc, Midas Enterprises Corporation, Roy D. Newport, Patel Brothers Inc, Puja Restaurant Group Inc, RLE Investment Corporation, Larry D. Ralston, Ravind Ent Inc, Reddy Holly LP, SJ Quickbite Inc, Sacca Corp, Shenandoah Valley Enterprises Inc, Summit Equity Group Inc, The Rab LLC, Tri-City Foods Inc, Jose Villaflor, WDR Restaurants Inc, Lorraine D. Whitehurst, Richard G. Whitehurst. (Franklin, Kurt) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
October 25, 2010 Filing 8 Proposed Order re #6 MOTION to Relate Case by 952 Enterprises LLC, Allience Inc, Carolyn P. Arnold, Masroor A. Batla, Tallat Batla, Bayshore Foods Inc, Beach City Inc, Chris G. Bredesen, Brening Enterprises Inc, Brening Enterprises LP, Brening Enterprises No. 3 Inc, C&L 28 Inc, C&R Foods Inc, C&S Foods Inc, Centennial Management Corporation, Robert T. Chiu, Chu Investment Inc, Charles D. Cobb, Danabo Group Inc, Deep ValleyEnterprises Inc, Dhillon ABS Investment Inc, Robert Eng, Eureka Fortune Inc, Evergreen Restaurant Group California Inc, Gate 74 Inc, Albert Gonzales, III, David Lynwood Hairston, Elham Hakimianpour, Herbert Hakimianpour, Robert Hakimianpour, Violet Hakimianpour, Gussie Hampton, Hart Foods Inc, Ho Yee Restaurant, J and A Food Service Inc, Mancha Development Company, Mangen Group Inc, Metro Management Systems Inc, Midas Enterprises Corporation, Roy D. Newport, Patel Brothers Inc, Puja Restaurant Group Inc, RLE Investment Corporation, Larry D. Ralston, Ravind Ent Inc, Reddy Holly LP, SJ Quickbite Inc, Sacca Corp, Shenandoah Valley Enterprises Inc, Summit Equity Group Inc, The Rab LLC, Tri-City Foods Inc, Jose Villaflor, WDR Restaurants Inc, Lorraine D. Whitehurst, Richard G. Whitehurst. (Franklin, Kurt) (Filed on 10/25/2010)
October 25, 2010 Filing 7 Declaration of Kurt Franklin in Support of #6 MOTION to Relate Case filed by952 Enterprises LLC, Allience Inc, Carolyn P. Arnold, Masroor A. Batla, Tallat Batla, Bayshore Foods Inc, Beach City Inc, Chris G. Bredesen, Brening Enterprises Inc, Brening Enterprises LP, Brening Enterprises No. 3 Inc, C&L 28 Inc, C&R Foods Inc, C&S Foods Inc, Centennial Management Corporation, Robert T. Chiu, Chu Investment Inc, Charles D. Cobb, Danabo Group Inc, Deep ValleyEnterprises Inc, Dhillon ABS Investment Inc, Robert Eng, Eureka Fortune Inc, Evergreen Restaurant Group California Inc, Gate 74 Inc, Albert Gonzales, III, David Lynwood Hairston, Elham Hakimianpour, Herbert Hakimianpour, Robert Hakimianpour, Violet Hakimianpour, Gussie Hampton, Hart Foods Inc, Ho Yee Restaurant, J and A Food Service Inc, Mancha Development Company, Mangen Group Inc, Metro Management Systems Inc, Midas Enterprises Corporation, Roy D. Newport, Patel Brothers Inc, Puja Restaurant Group Inc, RLE Investment Corporation, Larry D. Ralston, Ravind Ent Inc, Reddy Holly LP, SJ Quickbite Inc, Sacca Corp, Shenandoah Valley Enterprises Inc, Summit Equity Group Inc, The Rab LLC, Tri-City Foods Inc, Jose Villaflor, WDR Restaurants Inc, Lorraine D. Whitehurst, Richard G. Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Related document(s) #6 ) (Franklin, Kurt) (Filed on 10/25/2010)
October 25, 2010 Filing 6 MOTION to Relate Case filed by 952 Enterprises LLC, Allience Inc, Carolyn P. Arnold, Masroor A. Batla, Tallat Batla, Bayshore Foods Inc, Beach City Inc, Chris G. Bredesen, Brening Enterprises Inc, Brening Enterprises LP, Brening Enterprises No. 3 Inc, C&L 28 Inc, C&R Foods Inc, C&S Foods Inc, Centennial Management Corporation, Robert T. Chiu, Chu Investment Inc, Charles D. Cobb, Danabo Group Inc, Deep ValleyEnterprises Inc, Dhillon ABS Investment Inc, Robert Eng, Eureka Fortune Inc, Evergreen Restaurant Group California Inc, Gate 74 Inc, Albert Gonzales, III, David Lynwood Hairston, Elham Hakimianpour, Herbert Hakimianpour, Robert Hakimianpour, Violet Hakimianpour, Gussie Hampton, Hart Foods Inc, Ho Yee Restaurant, J and A Food Service Inc, Mancha Development Company, Mangen Group Inc, Metro Management Systems Inc, Midas Enterprises Corporation, Roy D. Newport, Patel Brothers Inc, Puja Restaurant Group Inc, RLE Investment Corporation, Larry D. Ralston, Ravind Ent Inc, Reddy Holly LP, SJ Quickbite Inc, Sacca Corp, Shenandoah Valley Enterprises Inc, Summit Equity Group Inc, The Rab LLC, Tri-City Foods Inc, Jose Villaflor, WDR Restaurants Inc, Lorraine D. Whitehurst, Richard G. Whitehurst. (Franklin, Kurt) (Filed on 10/25/2010)
October 22, 2010 Filing 9 MOTION of Michael D. Joblove for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611052009) filed by Burger King Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
October 22, 2010 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roy D. Newport. Burger King Corporation served on 10/14/2010, answer due 11/4/2010. (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 10/22/2010) Modified on 10/25/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
October 22, 2010 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
October 19, 2010 Filing 3 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Burger King Corporation. (Friedenberg, Adam) (Filed on 10/19/2010)
October 5, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2010)
October 5, 2010 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 1/12/2011. Case Management Conference set for 1/19/2011 01:30 PM. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2010)
October 5, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT; summons issued against Burger King Corporation (Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611051380). Filed by Violet Hakimianpour, Elham Hakimianpour, Dhillon ABS Investment Inc, Brening Enterprises No. 3 Inc, Evergreen Restaurant Group California Inc, Larry D. Ralston, Charles D. Cobb, Roy D. Newport, Robert T. Chiu, Herbert Hakimianpour, Shenandoah Valley Enterprises Inc, Metro Management Systems Inc, Patel Brothers Inc, C&L 28 Inc, Lorraine D. Whitehurst, Mangen Group Inc, Deep ValleyEnterprises Inc, C&R Foods Inc, Sacca Corp, Chu Investment Inc, Masroor A. Batla, Robert Hakimianpour, Ho Yee Restaurant, Tallat Batla, Summit Equity Group Inc, Reddy Holly LP, Danabo Group Inc, Robert Eng, Puja Restaurant Group Inc, RLE Investment Corporation, Eureka Fortune Inc, Gate 74 Inc, Brening Enterprises LP, Gussie Hampton, Albert Gonzales, III, Beach City Inc, J and A Food Service Inc, 952 Enterprises LLC, David Lynwood Hairston, WDR Restaurants Inc, Mancha Development Company, Bayshore Foods Inc, Ravind Ent Inc, C&S Foods Inc, The Rab LLC, SJ Quickbite Inc, Carolyn P. Arnold, Allience Inc, Chris G. Bredesen, Hart Foods Inc, Richard G. Whitehurst, Jose Villaflor, Midas Enterprises Corporation, Centennial Management Corporation, Tri-City Foods Inc, Brening Enterprises Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newport et al v. Burger King Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorraine D. Whitehurst
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Richard James Stratton
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allience Inc
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Richard James Stratton
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elham Hakimianpour
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Richard James Stratton
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Lynwood Hairston
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Richard James Stratton
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gate 74 Inc
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Richard James Stratton
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C&R Foods Inc
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Richard James Stratton
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Centennial Management Corporation
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Richard James Stratton
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mangen Group Inc
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Richard James Stratton
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evergreen Restaurant Group California Inc
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Richard James Stratton
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WDR Restaurants Inc
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Richard James Stratton
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard G. Whitehurst
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Richard James Stratton
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Violet Hakimianpour
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Richard James Stratton
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danabo Group Inc
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Richard James Stratton
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shenandoah Valley Enterprises Inc
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Richard James Stratton
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Rab LLC
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Richard James Stratton
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eureka Fortune Inc
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Richard James Stratton
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Villaflor
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Richard James Stratton
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RLE Investment Corporation
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Richard James Stratton
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert Hakimianpour
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Richard James Stratton
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chu Investment Inc
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Richard James Stratton
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summit Equity Group Inc
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Kevin B. Kevorkian
Represented By: Richard James Stratton
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sacca Corp
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Richard James Stratton
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris G. Bredesen
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Richard James Stratton
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tri-City Foods Inc
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Richard James Stratton
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Puja Restaurant Group Inc
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Richard James Stratton
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SJ Quickbite Inc
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Richard James Stratton
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tallat Batla
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Richard James Stratton
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy D. Newport
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Richard James Stratton
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Gonzales, III
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Richard James Stratton
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Masroor A. Batla
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Richard James Stratton
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ravind Ent Inc
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Richard James Stratton
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ho Yee Restaurant
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Richard James Stratton
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gussie Hampton
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Richard James Stratton
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brening Enterprises Inc
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Richard James Stratton
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C&S Foods Inc
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Richard James Stratton
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patel Brothers Inc
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Richard James Stratton
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry D. Ralston
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Richard James Stratton
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brening Enterprises No. 3 Inc
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Richard James Stratton
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Midas Enterprises Corporation
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Richard James Stratton
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 952 Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Richard James Stratton
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hart Foods Inc
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Richard James Stratton
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deep ValleyEnterprises Inc
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Richard James Stratton
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn P. Arnold
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Richard James Stratton
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brening Enterprises LP
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Richard James Stratton
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mancha Development Company
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Richard James Stratton
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert T. Chiu
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Richard James Stratton
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beach City Inc
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Richard James Stratton
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J and A Food Service Inc
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Richard James Stratton
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Eng
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Richard James Stratton
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bayshore Foods Inc
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Richard James Stratton
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reddy Holly LP
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Richard James Stratton
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metro Management Systems Inc
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Richard James Stratton
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C&L 28 Inc
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Richard James Stratton
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Hakimianpour
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Richard James Stratton
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dhillon ABS Investment Inc
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Richard James Stratton
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles D. Cobb
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Richard James Stratton
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Nasser Aliabadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Leslie Broadland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Lynn A. Hartje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Joseph C. Kruger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Kyle Redding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Kern Desert Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Reeddy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Donna Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Shakeb H. Zuberi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Herman Y Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Jose F. Placencia
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Roger Y Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Vicky Kruger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Catherine A. Kubu
Represented By: David Ray Calderon
Represented By: Armen Garabedian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Vetit Piyas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: John M. Benedict
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Bonita B. Brening
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Daniel Y. Chu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: SRAC Holdings I, Inc.
Represented By: Martin H. Orlick
Represented By: Julia Jean Rider
Represented By: Matthew Scott Kenefick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Jerry M. Comstock
Represented By: Martin H. Orlick
Represented By: Julia Jean Rider
Represented By: Matthew Scott Kenefick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Willie C. Cook
Represented By: Amira Aswada Jackmon
Represented By: Eric L. Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: William Sein Chow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Lawrence P. Cimmarusti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Granya, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Asit Vyas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Jae Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: David L. Hairston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Todd Knox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Diemar E. Schott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Donna B. Agins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Dominic Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Harshraj Ghai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Robert K. Swift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Gregory R. Brening
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Roland Eddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Rakesh n. Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: George J. Gantes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Judy G. Stinnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Strategic Restaurants Acquisition Company II, LLC
Represented By: Martin H. Orlick
Represented By: Julia Jean Rider
Represented By: Matthew Scott Kenefick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Jayant F. Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Ravi Batra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Chung Ching Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Herbert Y. Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Danabo Arcadia Restaurant Ventures LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Sanjay Rangan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Piyas Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Howard Mangen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Benjamin Kuo-An Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Susan A. Villaflor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Byron Crossen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: OC Burger Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Geboy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Richard H. Agins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Patsy P. Chu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Susan Kubu-Jones
Represented By: David Ray Calderon
Represented By: Armen Garabedian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Vinod Sawhney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Angela Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Vincent F. Eupierre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: William Scarbrough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Siu May Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Marshall J. Chuang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Balbir S. Dhillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Hiten Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Allan B. Gantes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Francisco Foods, Inc.
Represented By: David Ray Calderon
Represented By: Armen Garabedian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Vimal Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Carol K. McManus
Represented By: David Ray Calderon
Represented By: Armen Garabedian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Wai-Mau Szeto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Clifton Shigaki
Represented By: Armen Garabedian
Represented By: David Ray Calderon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Antelope Valley Restaurants, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: SFO EQUITIES, LLC
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Chris Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Card Investment, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Richard A. Brening, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Desert Restaurant Ventures, LLC
Represented By: Nima Nami
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Syed Musavi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Stanley Kubu
Represented By: David Ray Calderon
Represented By: Armen Garabedian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Progressive Management Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Jagdish R. Amin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Centennial Restaurants LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Batla Restaurant Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Huei L. Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Dean Frank Busch, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance |