Target Corp. et al v. AU Optronics Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Target Corp., Sears, Roebuck and Co., Kmart Corp, Old Comp Inc., Good Guys, Inc., Radioshack Corp. and Newegg Inc.
Defendant: AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc., Chi Mei Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc., CMO Japan Co. Ltd., Nexgen Mediatech, Inc., Nexgen Mediatech USA, Inc., Chunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd., Tatung Company of America, Inc., Epson Imaging Devices Corporation, Epson Electronics America, Inc., Hannstar Display Corporation, LG Display Co. Ltd., LG Display America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd, Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba America Electronics Components, Inc., Toshiba Mobile Display Technology Co., Ltd. and Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv04945
Filed: November 1, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:15
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 573 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8397) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI. STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Dismissal with Prejudice as to HannStar filed by Good Guys, Inc., Kmart Corp, Newegg Inc., Old Comp Inc., Radioshack Corp., Sears, Roebuck and Co., Target Corp (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2013)
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 566 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8320) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2013)
July 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 553 ORDER RE LG'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 14 ON CHOICE-OF-LAW REGARDING COMPUSA'S AND RADIOSHACK'S INDIRECT PURCHASER CLAIMS 8144 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/11/2013)
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 511 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8215) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI re Dismissal with Prejudice as to the AUO Defendants filed by Good Guys, Inc., Kmart Corp, Newegg Inc., Old Comp Inc., Radioshack Corp., Sears, Roebuck and Co., Target Corp (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013)
June 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 487 ORDER granting (8156) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI to shorten time on motion for separate trial (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2013)
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 451 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8081) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Dismissal with Prejudice as to the Chi Mei Defendants filed by Good Guys, Inc., Kmart Corp, Newegg Inc., Old Comp Inc., Radioshack Corp., Sears, Roebuck and Co., Target Corp (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2013)
June 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 449 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PARTIES' MOTIONS TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/14/2013)
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 428 ORDER GRANTING IN PART TARGET PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION RE CARTWRIGHT ACT CLAIMS 7670 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/6/2013)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 413 ORDER RE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRACK 1B AND TRACK 2 CASES) (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/2/2013)
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 400 ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DOWNSTREAM PASS-ON (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/26/2012)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING MOBILE PHONE DISPLAYS (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/4/2012)
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 396 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION AND TOSHIBA'S SEPARATE MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF STANDING UNDER ILLINOIS BRICK AND IN RE ATM FEE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/19/2012)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 388 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO NONPARTY CO-CONSPIRATORS (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER FOR FURTHER DECLARATIONS RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO PURCHASES OF PANELS MADE BY SUPPOSED CONSPIRATORS NOT ALLEGED IN THE COMPLAINTS (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/2/2012)
October 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DOWNSTREAM PASS-ON (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/23/2012)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 380 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND STANDING AS TO CLAIMS INVOLVING MOBILE PHONES AND DIGITAL STILL CAMERAS (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/9/2012)
September 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' OBJECTION TO SPECIAL MASTER'S ORDER STRIKING EXPERT REPORTS 344 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/26/2012)
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 366 ORDER granting stipulation of dismissal 6735 . Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 9/18/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2012)
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DUE PROCESS GROUNDS (6111) in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; (240) in case 3:10-cv-04945-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/18/2012)
August 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON CHOICE-OF-LAW GROUNDS -- AT&T MOBILITY, RADIOSHACK and COMPUSA 236 237 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/27/2012)
August 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER signed on 8/9/12 by Judge Susan Illston granting ( 6393 ) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI. STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL filed by Good Guys, Inc., Kmart Corp, Newegg Inc., Old Comp Inc., Radioshack Corp., Sears, Roebuck and Co., Target Corp. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
July 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL 6139 6142 6150 6162 6171 6172 6175 6180] 6181 6188 6191 6192 6200 6201 6202 6206 6211 6214 6241 6248 6252 6253 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/30/2012) (Entered: 07/30/2012) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2012)
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE AND MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME 243 244 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER by Judge Illston signed on 3/12/12granting 5071 Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting 175 Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-04945-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2012)
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER GRANTING SAMSUNG SDI'S AND SANYO CONSUMER ELECTRONICS' MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT(TARGET CORP.) (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/30/2012)
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER VACATING JANUARY 27, 2012 HEARING (TARGET) (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/25/2012)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER Notice of Motion and Motion of Samsung SDI and Sanyo Consumer Electronics to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint Stipulation (4318) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2011)
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER Re: 30(b)(6) depos (#4281) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2011)
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER extending discovery deadline (#4213) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
November 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER premitting depo of Wang (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2011)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER Re Extension of Time To Respond To Second Amended Complaint, Waiver of Service, and [Proposed] Order by Good Guys, Inc., Kmart Corp, Newegg Inc., Old Comp Inc., Radioshack Corp., Sears, Roebuck and Co., Target Corp.. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 SEALING ORDER WITH SIGNATURE(3510) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2011)
September 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION (CHI MEI) re 72 Stipulation (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2011) Modified on 9/9/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER adjusting briefing schedule Re: STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER ON BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by Good Guys, Inc., Kmart Corp, Newegg Inc., Old Comp Inc., Radioshack Corp., Sears, Roebuck and Co., Target Corp(tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
March 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT (CHUNGHWA) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2011)
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER VACATING 3/25/11 HEARING RE: MOTION TO SERVE (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2011)
March 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re: STIPULATION OF EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT TATUNG COMPANY OF AMERICA TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2011)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER RE: STIPULATION OF EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT TATUNG COMPANY OF AMERICA TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Tatung Company of America, Inc (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Order Regarding Service and Scheduling by Good Guys, Inc., Kmart Corp, Newegg Inc., Old Comp Inc., Radioshack Corp., Sears, Roebuck and Co., Target Corp (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
January 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION re 11 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2011) Modified on 1/28/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Target Corp. et al v. AU Optronics Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Target Corp.
Represented By: Kenneth L. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sears, Roebuck and Co.
Represented By: Kenneth L. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kmart Corp
Represented By: Kenneth L. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Old Comp Inc.
Represented By: R. Bruce Holcomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Good Guys, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth L. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Radioshack Corp.
Represented By: Kenneth L. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Newegg Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth L. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AU Optronics Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chi Mei Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMO Japan Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nexgen Mediatech, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nexgen Mediatech USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tatung Company of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epson Imaging Devices Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epson Electronics America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hannstar Display Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Display Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Display America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharp Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharp Electronics Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Electronics Components, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Mobile Display Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?