ABF Freight Systems, Inc. v. United States Of America et al
Plaintiff: ABF Freight Systems, Inc.
Defendant: United States Of America and West Bay Builders
Case Number: 3:2010cv05188
Filed: November 16, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER DISMISSING CASE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. However, thatif any party hereto certifies to this court, with proof of service of a copy thereon on opposing counsel,within ninety days from the date hereof, that settlement has not in fact occurred, the foregoing ordershall be vacated and this cause shall forthwith be restored to the calendar for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/18/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2013)
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 94 Stipulation For Compromise Settlement and Release as to United States Of America (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/28/2013: # 1 Appendix) (tfS, COURT STAFF).
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER GRANTING FEDERAL DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT 90 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/26/2013)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Duplicate entry - please disregard. (See Docket No. 88 for original)
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER RE ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/18/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2013)
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/16/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2013)
March 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT(66) (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/6/2013)
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting APPLICATION TO SHORTEN TIME (AMENDED). Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 2/14/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2013)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/31/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2013)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/29/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2013)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting leave to file first amended complaint. Signed by Judge Illston on 4/20/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2012)
December 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER Relating and Consolidating Case to C11-4663 JCS. Cases associated. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 12/12/2011. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/16/2011 02:30 PM. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/28/2011 02:30 PM. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/1/2011 02:30 PM. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ABF Freight Systems, Inc. v. United States Of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABF Freight Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Clark Wayneflete Patten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Bay Builders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?