Costco Wholesale Corp. v. Au Optronics Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Costco Wholesale Corp.
Defendant: Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corp., Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD., CMO Japan Co., Ltd., Epson Electronics America, Inc., Epson Imaging Devices Corporation, Hannstar Display Corp., Hitachi, Ltd., Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V., LG Display Co., Ltd., LG Display America, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., Philips Electronics North America Corp., Samsung Electronics Co., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Sharp Corp., Sharp Electronics Corp., Tatung Company of America, Inc., Chi Mei Optoelectronics, USA, Inc., AU Optronics Corp., AU Optronics Corporation America and Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corp.
Case Number: 3:2011cv00058
Filed: January 10, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 337 ORDER SUGGESTING REMAND TO TRANSFEROR COURTS 8154 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
June 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PARTIES' MOTIONS TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/14/2013)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER RE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRACK 1B AND TRACK 2 CASES) (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/2/2013)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING MOBILE PHONE DISPLAYS (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/4/2012)
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION AND TOSHIBA'S SEPARATE MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF STANDING UNDER ILLINOIS BRICK AND IN RE ATM FEE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/19/2012)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO NONPARTY CO-CONSPIRATORS (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND STANDING AS TO CLAIMS INVOLVING MOBILE PHONES AND DIGITAL STILL CAMERAS (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/9/2012)
September 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' OBJECTION TO SPECIAL MASTER'S ORDER STRIKING EXPERT REPORTS 264 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/26/2012)
September 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE COSTCO LOST SALES CLAIMS 6080 in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; 171 in case 3:11-cv-00058-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/22/2012)
July 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL 6139 6142 6150 6162 6171 6172 6175 6180] 6181 6188 6191 6192 6200 6201 6202 6206 6211 6214 6241 6248 6252 6253 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/30/2012) (Entered: 07/30/2012)(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2012)
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (5419) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by the undersigned DAPs, AGs, and LG Display, by and through their undersigned liaison counsel and subject to the concurrence of the Court, as follows:(1) The time for the undersigned DAPs and AGs served with LG Displays Motion to Amend to file their Oppositions to LG Displays Motion shall be extended to and including April 27, 2012. The DAPs shall file a single opposition brief to LG Displays Motion to Amend.(2) LG Displays time to file its Reply(ies) in support of its Motion shall be extended to and including May 8, 2012. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2012)
January 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER signed by Illston on 1/19/12, re: exentending deadlines to file motions to compel (#4561) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2012)
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER Re: second amended complaint (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2012)
January 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER Re: extension of time to answer (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2012)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER re: Modifying Deadline for Filing of Motions to Compel by Hannstar Display (4344) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2011)
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER Re: Answer Deadline (#4298) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2011)
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS IN PART AMENDED COMPLAINT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
October 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER to stay claims agains Samsung and Toshiba (#3911) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2011)
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION BY COSTCO (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
August 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS COSTCO COMPLAINT re 19 . An amended complaint is due 9/30/11. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2011) Modified on 8/30/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order Regarding Service and Scheduling by Costco Wholesale Corp.. (Sauro, Troy (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2011)
May 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER TO SERVE DEFENDANT CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD. THROUGH ITS U.S. COUNSEL re 12 . (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2011) Modified on 5/11/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Costco Wholesale Corp. v. Au Optronics Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Mobile Display Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD.
Represented By: Rachel S. Brass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMO Japan Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epson Electronics America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epson Imaging Devices Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hannstar Display Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi Displays, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Display Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Display America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philips Electronics North America Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharp Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharp Electronics Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tatung Company of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chi Mei Optoelectronics, USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AU Optronics Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AU Optronics Corporation America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Costco Wholesale Corp.
Represented By: Cori Gordon Moore
Represented By: David J. Burman
Represented By: Troy Philip Sauro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?