Mahoney v. Donahoe et al
Plaintiff: Shirley Mahoney
Defendant: U.S. Postal Service and Pat Donahoe
Case Number: 3:2011cv00177
Filed: January 12, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 61 Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2013)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 59 Stipulation and Agreement of Compromise and Settlement. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2012)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/4/2012. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2012)
October 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 52 Stipulation re Inadvertent Production of Privileged or Protected Material. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2012)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 49 Stipulation and Protective Order (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2012)
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 47 Stipulation to Enlarge Mediation Deadline. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2012)
July 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 43 Stipulation (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2012)
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 41 Stipulation to extend stay for all proceeeding by thirty days. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/5/2012: # 1 Proof of Service) (rmm2, COURT STAFF).
May 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER EXTENDING STAY 30 DAYS signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 39 Stipulation (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2012)
August 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER RE: SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/18/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2011)
July 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting in part and denying in part 8 Motion to Dismiss (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
April 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER VACATING CMC. Status Report due by 5/5/2011.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/14/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mahoney v. Donahoe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Donahoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?