Center for Biological Diversity et al v. Environmental Protection Agency et al

Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity and Pesticide Action Network North America
Defendant: Environmental Protection Agency and Lisa Jackson
Intervenor_dft: CropLife America, Responsible Industry for a Sound Environment, Southern Crop Production Association, Western Plant Health Association, MidAmerica CropLife Association, American Farm Bureau Federation, National Agricultural Aviation Association, National Alliance of Forest Owners, National Corn Growers Association, National Cotton Council, National Council of Farmer Cooperatives, National Potato Council, Oregonians for Food and Shelter, USA Rice Federation, Washington Friends of Farms and Forests and Reckitt Benckiser LLC
Intervenor: American Chemistry Council
Case Number: 3:2011cv00293
Filed: January 20, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part 275 , 276 Motions to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2018)
August 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part 203 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 204 Motion to Dismiss (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2014)
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER GRANTING re 216 Notice (Other) filed by American Chemistry Council, et al., for telephonic appearance at 9:30 AM on 8/8/14 for hearing on the pending motions. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/31/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2014)
May 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER re Briefing Schedule (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2014)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part 168 and 169 Motions for More Definite Statement (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER GRANTING re 185 Letter filed by Reckitt Benckiser LLC for Thomas W. Stoever to appear by phone on 11/22/13. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/13/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2013)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 135 Motion to Intervene; granting 137 Motion to Dismiss; granting 139 Motion to Dismiss (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2013)
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER GRANTING re 152 Letter filed by CropLife America, MidAmerica CropLife Association, Southern Crop Production Association, Responsible Industry for a Sound Environment, Western Plant Health Association for Stacey L. VanBelleghem to appear by phone on 3/15/13 at 9:30 AM. Signed, as modified, by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/12/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2013)
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER GRANTING re 150 Letter filed by Environmental Protection Agency, Lisa Jackson for Office of General Counsel, EPA, Michele Knorr, to appear by phone on 3/15/13 at 9:30 AM. Signed, as modified, by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/6/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2013)
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER GRANTING re 129 Intervenor-Dfts' Order filed by Reckitt Benckiser LLC. Motion to Intervene and Motion to Dismiss filed no later than 11/16/12. Opposition due 12/21/12. Reply due 1/18/13. Signed, as modified, by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/1/12. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2012)
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER GRANTING re 122 Letter filed by Reckitt Benckiser LLC for Thomas W. Stoever to appear by phone on 9/14/12 for the Status Conference at 1:30 PM. Signed, as modified, by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/7/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2012)
September 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER re 119 Letter filed by American Chemistry Council for Cynthia Taub to appear by phone on 9/14/12 at 1:30 PM for the status conference. Signed, as modified, by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/6/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2012)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER GRANTING re 109 Letter filed by American Chemistry Council for Cynthia Taub to appear by phone on 5/4/12 at 1:30 PM. Signed, as modified, by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/30/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2012)
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER GRANTING re 107 Letter filed by National Potato Council, American Farm Bureau Federation, Washington Friends of Farms and Forests, National Alliance of Forest Owners, USA Rice Federation, National Corn Growers Association, Nat ional Cotton Council, National Council of Farmer Cooperatives, National Agricultural Aviation Association, Oregonians for Food and Shelter for Michael Klise to appear by phone on 5/4/12 at 1:30 PM.. Signed, as modified, by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/27/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2012)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 91 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND STAY AND CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE. Updated Case Management/Status Statement due by 4/27/2012. Status Conference reset for 5/4/2012 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/6/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2012)
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER GRANTING 88 Status Report and Stipulation to Extend Stay filed by Center for Biological Diversity, Pesticide Action Network North America Updated Case Management Statement due by 2/3/2012. Status Conference set for 2/10/2012 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/14/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2011)
November 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER RELATING CASE NO.: C-11-5108 NC and NOT RELATING Case No.: C-07-2794 JCS and Case No.: C-11-293 JCS.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/2/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2011) Modified on 11/2/2011 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND STAY AND CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE. Updated Status Report due by 11/10/2011. Status Conference set for 11/18/2011 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 09/30/2011. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2011)
August 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER TO EXTEND STAY AND CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Status Report due by 9/30/2011. Further Case Management Conference reset for 10/14/2011 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/29/11. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2011)
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero Granting in Part and Denying in Part Motions to Intervene 16 40 53 58 (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2011)
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 78 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND STAY WITH STATUS REPORT, Except for the Motions to Intervene. Signed, as modified, by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/31/2011. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2011)
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER GRANTING re 75 Letter filed by Environmental Protection Agency, Lisa Jackson for James Maysonett to appear by phone on 6/3/11 at 9:30 AM.. Signed, as modified, by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/24/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Biological Diversity et al v. Environmental Protection Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Collette Lucille Adkins Giese
Represented By: Justin Augustine
Represented By: Michael W. Graf
Represented By: Jaclyn M Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pesticide Action Network North America
Represented By: Collette Lucille Adkins Giese
Represented By: Justin Augustine
Represented By: Michael W. Graf
Represented By: Jaclyn M Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: James Anthony Maysonett
Represented By: Erik Edward Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Jackson
Represented By: Collette Lucille Adkins Giese
Represented By: James Anthony Maysonett
Represented By: Erik Edward Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: CropLife America
Represented By: Eric Andreas
Represented By: Patrick John Ferguson
Represented By: J. Michael Klise
Represented By: Claudia M. O'Brien
Represented By: William K. Rawson
Represented By: Stacey L. VanBelleghem
Represented By: David B Weinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Responsible Industry for a Sound Environment
Represented By: Eric Andreas
Represented By: Patrick John Ferguson
Represented By: J. Michael Klise
Represented By: Claudia M. O'Brien
Represented By: William K. Rawson
Represented By: Stacey L. VanBelleghem
Represented By: David B Weinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Southern Crop Production Association
Represented By: Eric Andreas
Represented By: Patrick John Ferguson
Represented By: J. Michael Klise
Represented By: Claudia M. O'Brien
Represented By: William K. Rawson
Represented By: Stacey L. VanBelleghem
Represented By: David B Weinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Western Plant Health Association
Represented By: Eric Andreas
Represented By: Patrick John Ferguson
Represented By: J. Michael Klise
Represented By: Claudia M. O'Brien
Represented By: William K. Rawson
Represented By: Stacey L. VanBelleghem
Represented By: David B Weinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: MidAmerica CropLife Association
Represented By: Eric Andreas
Represented By: Patrick John Ferguson
Represented By: J. Michael Klise
Represented By: Claudia M. O'Brien
Represented By: William K. Rawson
Represented By: Stacey L. VanBelleghem
Represented By: David B Weinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: American Farm Bureau Federation
Represented By: J. Michael Klise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: National Agricultural Aviation Association
Represented By: J. Michael Klise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: National Alliance of Forest Owners
Represented By: J. Michael Klise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: National Corn Growers Association
Represented By: J. Michael Klise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: National Cotton Council
Represented By: J. Michael Klise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: National Council of Farmer Cooperatives
Represented By: J. Michael Klise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: National Potato Council
Represented By: J. Michael Klise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Oregonians for Food and Shelter
Represented By: J. Michael Klise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: USA Rice Federation
Represented By: J. Michael Klise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Washington Friends of Farms and Forests
Represented By: J. Michael Klise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Reckitt Benckiser LLC
Represented By: Thomas William Stoever, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: American Chemistry Council
Represented By: Seth D. Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?