United States Of America v. Contreras
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Defendant: Lawrence Contreras
Case Number: 3:2011cv00788
Filed: February 22, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Recovery of Defaulted Student Loans (Excl. Veterans)
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ***FILED IN ERROR. WRONG CASE*** SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 12/21/11. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2011) Modified on 12/21/2011 (dt, COURT STAFF).
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Judge Edward M. Chen's FINAL STANDING ORDER (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER resetting CMC re 11 Case Management Statement filed by United States Of America. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/6/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING CMC Case Management Conference set for 5/4/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/29/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Of America v. Contreras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Represented By: Michael Cosentino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Contreras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?