Alec L. et al v. Jackson et al
Plaintiff: Alec L., Victoria Loorz, Madeline W., Garrett S., Grant S., Valerie Serrels, Zoe J., Nina Grove, Kids vs. Global Warming, WildEarth Guardians and Janet Wallace
Defendant: Lisa P. Jackson, Kenneth L. Salazar, Thomas J. Vilsack, Gary F. Locke, Steven Chu and Leon E. Panetta
Case Number: 3:2011cv02203
Filed: May 4, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 95 Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2011)
November 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER re 74 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Buente) ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611066440.) filed by National Association of Manufacturers. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/4/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2011)
November 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER Granting 68 Defendants' Motion for Administrative Relief and Setting (1) Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, (2) Intervenor's Motion to Intervene, and (3) Intervenor's Motion to Dismiss for Same Time as Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Motions set for Hearing on 11/28/2011 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/3/2011. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
October 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION AND ORDER on Briefing Schedule for Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Responses due by 10/31/2011. Replies due by 11/14/2011. Motion Hearing set for 11/28/2011 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/13/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2011)
August 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/11/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alec L. et al v. Jackson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alec L.
Represented By: Julia Olsen
Represented By: Paul N. McCloskey, Jr.
Represented By: Philip L. Gregory
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Loorz
Represented By: Julia Olsen
Represented By: Paul N. McCloskey, Jr.
Represented By: Philip L. Gregory
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madeline W.
Represented By: Julia Olsen
Represented By: Paul N. McCloskey, Jr.
Represented By: Philip L. Gregory
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garrett S.
Represented By: Julia Olsen
Represented By: Paul N. McCloskey, Jr.
Represented By: Philip L. Gregory
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grant S.
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Represented By: Philip L. Gregory
Represented By: Paul N. McCloskey, Jr.
Represented By: Julia Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Serrels
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Represented By: Philip L. Gregory
Represented By: Paul N. McCloskey, Jr.
Represented By: Julia Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zoe J.
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Represented By: Philip L. Gregory
Represented By: Paul N. McCloskey, Jr.
Represented By: Julia Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nina Grove
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Represented By: Philip L. Gregory
Represented By: Paul N. McCloskey, Jr.
Represented By: Julia Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kids vs. Global Warming
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Represented By: Philip L. Gregory
Represented By: Paul N. McCloskey, Jr.
Represented By: Julia Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WildEarth Guardians
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Represented By: Philip L. Gregory
Represented By: Paul N. McCloskey, Jr.
Represented By: Julia Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Wallace
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Represented By: Philip L. Gregory
Represented By: Paul N. McCloskey, Jr.
Represented By: Julia Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa P. Jackson
Represented By: Martin F. McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth L. Salazar
Represented By: Martin F. McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J. Vilsack
Represented By: Martin F. McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary F. Locke
Represented By: Martin F. McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Chu
Represented By: Martin F. McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leon E. Panetta
Represented By: Martin F. McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?