James v. United States Of America
Plaintiff: Douglas W. James, Jr.
Defendant: United States Of America
Case Number: 3:2011cv02552
Filed: May 26, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/15/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2012)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re 14 Stipulation for Settlement Compromise and Release. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/30/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2012)
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING the last day to mediate this case is continued until March 31, 2012. re 11 Stipulation filed by United States Of America. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 11/21/11. (bjtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James v. United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas W. James, Jr.
Represented By: Rey Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?