Allen v. Radio Shack Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Frank Allen
Defendant: Radio Shack Corporation
Case Number: 3:2011cv03110
Filed: June 23, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER TO JURY COMMISSIONER. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 2/15/13. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2013)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/12/13. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2013)
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER RE MOTIONS IN LIMINE by Judge Alsup (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2013)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Hon. William Alsup denying 35 Motion for Summary Judgment.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
December 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER RE REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE AND ERRATA re 45 Reply to Opposition/Response filed by Frank Allen, 52 Errata filed by Frank Allen (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2012)
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER RE DEFENDANT COUNSELS LETTER OF 9/18/2012 [re 30 Letter filed by Radio Shack Corporation]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 9/19/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2012)
September 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 REMINDER NOTICE OF UPCOMING TRIAL (2/19/2013) AND FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (2/11/2013 at 2:00 PM). Signed by Judge William Alsup on 9/13/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2012)
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 15 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/6/11. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Radio Shack Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Allen
Represented By: Angela Mia Veronese
Represented By: Angela Alioto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Radio Shack Corporation
Represented By: Tracy Thompson
Represented By: Adam John Tullman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?