International Union of Operating Engineers, Stationary Engineers Local 39 Pension Trust Fund v. The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation et al
Plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers, Stationary Engineers Local 39 Pension Trust Fund, Los Angeles Department of Water and Power Retirement Plan, Stanislaus County Employees Retirement Association, Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association and San Diego County Employees Retirement Association
Defendant: The Bank of New York, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company National Association, The Bank of New York Mellon and The Bank of New York Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv03620
Filed: July 22, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Referring Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2012 Case e-transferred to the Southern District of New York has been opened. Their case number: 1:12-cv-03067, filed 04/18/2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2012)
April 18, 2012 Filing 116 CLERKS NOTICE: Order of Case Transfer Out. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2012)
April 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to the Southern District of New York. Signed by Acting Chairman of the MDL Panel Kathryn H. Vratil. MDL No. 2335. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2012)
April 16, 2012 Filing 114 MOTION to Certify Class REDACTED filed by International Union of Operating Engineers, Stationary Engineers Local 39 Pension Trust Fund. Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 4/26/2012. Replies due by 5/3/2012. (Heimann, Richard) (Filed on 4/16/2012)
April 16, 2012 Filing 113 *** FILED IN ERROR WITH CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. DOCUMENT LOCKED. REFER TO DOCUMENT #114 . *** MOTION to Certify Class REDACTED filed by International Union of Operating Engineers, Stationary Engineers Local 39 Pension Trust Fund. Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 4/26/2012. Replies due by 5/3/2012. (Heimann, Richard) (Filed on 4/16/2012) Modified on 4/16/2012 (fff, COURT STAFF).
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATIONS by Hon. William Alsup denying #105 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2012)
April 12, 2012 Filing 111 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Class Certification by International Union of Operating Engineers, Stationary Engineers Local 39 Pension Trust Fund. (Heimann, Richard) (Filed on 4/12/2012)
April 12, 2012 Filing 110 Declaration of Richard M. Heimann in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann & Bernstein, LLP as Co-Lead Class Counsel filed byInternational Union of Operating Engineers, Stationary Engineers Local 39 Pension Trust Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Heimann, Richard) (Filed on 4/12/2012)
April 12, 2012 Filing 109 Declaration of Michael P. Lehmann In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Interim Co-Lead Counsel filed byInternational Union of Operating Engineers, Stationary Engineers Local 39 Pension Trust Fund. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Lehmann, Michael) (Filed on 4/12/2012)
April 12, 2012 Filing 108 Declaration of Daniel E. Seltz in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification filed byInternational Union of Operating Engineers, Stationary Engineers Local 39 Pension Trust Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29)(Seltz, Daniel) (Filed on 4/12/2012)
April 12, 2012 Filing 107 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by International Union of Operating Engineers, Stationary Engineers Local 39 Pension Trust Fund. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel E. Seltz, #2 Proposed Order)(Heimann, Richard) (Filed on 4/12/2012)
April 11, 2012 Filing 106 RESPONSE (re #105 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages ) and Certificate of Service filed byInternational Union of Operating Engineers, Stationary Engineers Local 39 Pension Trust Fund. (Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 4/11/2012)
April 10, 2012 Filing 105 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by The Bank of New York, The Bank of New York Company, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company National Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew J. Moses, #2 Proposed Order)(Balabanian, David) (Filed on 4/10/2012)
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY POWER PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup granting #98 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2012)
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY HONG PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup granting #97 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2012)
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY BEYNON PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup granting #96 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2012)
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY KHARDORI PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup granting #95 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2012)
March 27, 2012 Filing 100 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank H Busch of David L. Schwarz (Busch, Frank) (Filed on 3/27/2012)
March 27, 2012 Filing 99 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank H Busch of Reed M. Figel (Busch, Frank) (Filed on 3/27/2012)
March 26, 2012 Filing 98 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Edmund P. Power ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6693164.) filed by The Bank of New York, The Bank of New York Company, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company National Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Busch, Frank) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
March 26, 2012 Filing 97 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Jeanhee Hong ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6693152.) filed by The Bank of New York, The Bank of New York Company, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company National Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Busch, Frank) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
March 26, 2012 Filing 96 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Rebecca A. Beynon ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6693142.) filed by The Bank of New York, The Bank of New York Company, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company National Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Busch, Frank) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
March 26, 2012 Filing 95 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Ankush Khardori ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6693113.) filed by The Bank of New York, The Bank of New York Company, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company National Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Busch, Frank) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
March 2, 2012 Filing 94 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byThe Bank of New York, The Bank of New York Company, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company National Association. (Moses, Matthew) (Filed on 3/2/2012)
February 27, 2012 Filing 93 STIPULATION Extending Time To Answer The Amended Class Action Complaint filed by International Union of Operating Engineers, Stationary Engineers Local 39 Pension Trust Fund, Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association, Los Angeles Department of Water and Power Retirement Plan, San Diego County Employees Retirement Association, Stanislaus County Employees Retirement Association, The Bank of New York, The Bank of New York Company, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company National Association. (Balabanian, David) (Filed on 2/27/2012)
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 92 DISCOVERY ORDER GRANTING IN PART DENYING IN PART re #86 Joint Letter, filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, The Bank of New York, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company National Association, The Bank of New York Mellon, The Bank of New York Company, Inc., International Union of Operating Engineers, Stationary Engineers Local 39 Pension Trust Fund. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/27/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2012)
February 23, 2012 Filing 91 Minute Entry: TelephonicMotion Hearing re: docket no. 86 held on 2/17/2012 before Joseph C. Spero. Motion granted in part, denied in part. Court to prepare Order. (Court Reporter Debra Pas.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/23/2012)
February 21, 2012 Filing 90 Transcript of Proceedings held on 2-17-2012, before Judge Joseph C. Spero. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, Telephone number (415) 431-1477. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/21/2012. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 2/21/2012)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS AND VACATING HEARING by Judge William Alsup [denying #77 Motion to Dismiss]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2012)
February 14, 2012 Filing 88 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING TELEPHONIC HEARING. Motion Hearing on Joint Letter, docket no. 86, set for 2/17/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2012)
February 9, 2012 Filing 87 REPLY (re #77 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint ) filed byThe Bank of New York, The Bank of New York Company, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company National Association. (Balabanian, David) (Filed on 2/9/2012)
February 3, 2012 Filing 86 Letter from Plaintiff Stationary Engineers Local 39 Pension Trust Fund and Defendants Bank of New York Mellon Corp., et al, to The Honorable Joseph C. Spero re Motions to Compel . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Tarnofsky, Robyn) (Filed on 2/3/2012)
February 2, 2012 Filing 85 RESPONSE (re #77 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint ) Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed byInternational Union of Operating Engineers, Stationary Engineers Local 39 Pension Trust Fund. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard Heimann in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Heimann, Richard) (Filed on 2/2/2012)
February 2, 2012 Filing 84 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/15/11, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sahar Bartlett, CSR, RPR, Telephone number (415) 626-6060/sahar_bartlett@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/2/2012. (Bartlett, Sahar) (Filed on 2/2/2012)
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER re #82 Letter filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, The Bank of New York, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company National Association, The Bank of New York Mellon, The Bank of New York Company, Inc., International Union of Operating Engineers, Stationary Engineers Local 39 Pension Trust Fund. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the in-person meet and confer that took place on Friday, January 27, 2012, in New York will satisfy the Court's Order entered on January 26, 2012 for now. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/1/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2012)
January 30, 2012 Filing 82 Letter from Plaintiff Stationary Engineers Local 39 Pension Trust Fund and Defendant Bank of New York Mellon Corp to The Honorable Joseph C. Spero . (Moses, Matthew) (Filed on 1/30/2012)
January 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 NOTICE OF REFERENCE; ORDER TO MEET AND CONFER AND FILE JOINT LETTER.IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that lead trial counsel for both parties shall meet and confer in person in Courtroom G no later than seven (7) days from the date of this Order. Counsel shall contact the undersigneds Courtroom Deputy, Karen Hom, at (415) 522-2035 to arrange a date and time for the meet-and-confer session.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/26/12. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2012)
January 25, 2012 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for Discovery (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2012)
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge (to be selected) for Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/24/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2012)
January 24, 2012 Filing 79 Letter from Daniel Chiplock to Honorable William H. Alsup. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chiplock, Daniel) (Filed on 1/24/2012)
January 19, 2012 Filing 78 Declaration of Matthew J. Moses in Support of #77 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint filed byThe Bank of New York, The Bank of New York Company, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #77 ) (Balabanian, David) (Filed on 1/19/2012)
January 19, 2012 Filing 77 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint filed by The Bank of New York, The Bank of New York Company, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company National Association. Motion Hearing set for 2/23/2012 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 2/2/2012. Replies due by 2/9/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Balabanian, David) (Filed on 1/19/2012)
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY SELTZ PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup granting #75 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2012)
January 18, 2012 Filing 75 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Daniel E. Seltz ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 34611069361) filed by International Union of Operating Engineers, Stationary Engineers Local 39 Pension Trust Fund. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2012)
January 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS AS MOOT by Hon. William Alsup finding as moot #28 Motion to Dismiss.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2012)
January 5, 2012 Filing 73 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byInternational Union of Operating Engineers, Stationary Engineers Local 39 Pension Trust Fund. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 1/5/2012)
January 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER ENTERING PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 5, 2012. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Protective Order)(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2012)
December 30, 2011 Filing 71 Letter from Plaintiff Stationary Engineers Local 39 Pension Trust Fund and Defendant Bank of New York Mellon Corp . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Moses, Matthew) (Filed on 12/30/2011)
December 30, 2011 Filing 70 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT #71 . *** Letter from all parties . (Moses, Matthew) (Filed on 12/30/2011) Modified on 12/30/2011 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
December 22, 2011 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Noel Williams (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 12/22/2011)
December 22, 2011 Filing 68 Letter from Daniel P. Chiplock to Honorable William H. Alsup. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Protective Order for Standard Litigation))(Hazam, Lexi) (Filed on 12/22/2011)
December 21, 2011 Filing 67 Letter Brief re #63 Letter filed byInternational Union of Operating Engineers, Stationary Engineers Local 39 Pension Trust Fund. (Related document(s) #63 ) (Hazam, Lexi) (Filed on 12/21/2011)
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER REQUIRING MEET AND CONFER re #63 Letter filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, The Bank of New York, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company National Association, The Bank of New York Mellon, The Bank of New York Company, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 21, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2011)
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER REGARDING EXPEDITED BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT re #64 Response ( Non Motion ) filed by International Union of Operating Engineers, Stationary Engineers Local 39 Pension Trust Fund. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 21, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2011)
December 21, 2011 Filing 64 RESPONSE to re #61 Order to Elect by International Union of Operating Engineers, Stationary Engineers Local 39 Pension Trust Fund. (Heimann, Richard) (Filed on 12/21/2011)
December 20, 2011 Filing 63 Letter from Defendants' Counsel Bingham McCutchen and Paul Weiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Defs' Proposed Protective Order))(Balabanian, David) (Filed on 12/20/2011)
December 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #52 Motion to Relate Case. Case C11-05683 JCS is related and shall be reassigned to Judge Alsup. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/20/2011: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (wsn, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/6/2012: #2 Order) (wsn, COURT STAFF).
December 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER TO ELECT. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 20, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2011)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for Mediation/Settlement. Discovery due by 12/31/2012. Jury Trial set for 3/25/2013 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Motions due by 2/7/2013. Pretrial Conference set for 3/18/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 12/19/2011. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2011)
December 19, 2011 Filing 59 Brief re #28 MOTION to Dismiss THE CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT Supplemental Submission In Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Class Action Complaint filed byThe Bank of New York, The Bank of New York Company, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company National Association. (Related document(s) #28 ) (Balabanian, David) (Filed on 12/19/2011)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF RALPH J. BUNCHE PRO HAC VICE(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2011)
December 16, 2011 Filing 57 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice CORRECTED APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF RALPH J. BUNCHE PRO HAC VICE ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 34611067985.) filed by International Union of Operating Engineers, Stationary Engineers Local 39 Pension Trust Fund. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 12/16/2011)
December 15, 2011 Filing 56 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 12/15/2011 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 12/15/2011), Motion Hearing held on 12/15/2011 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 12/15/2011), CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Corley for Mediation/Settlement Conference. Jury Selection set for 3/25/2013 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (Court Reporter Sahar Bartlett.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/15/2011)
December 14, 2011 Filing 55 NOTICE by The Bank of New York, The Bank of New York Company, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company National Association of Pendency of Action or Proceeding (Balabanian, David) (Filed on 12/14/2011)
December 14, 2011 Filing 54 NOTICE REGARDING FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 14, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2011)
December 13, 2011 Filing 53 Declaration of DAVID M. BALABANIAN in Support of #52 MOTION to Relate Case DEFENDANTS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES 3-12 AND 7-11 filed byThe Bank of New York, The Bank of New York Company, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Part 1, #2 Exhibit 1, Part 2)(Related document(s) #52 ) (Balabanian, David) (Filed on 12/13/2011)
December 13, 2011 Filing 52 MOTION to Relate Case DEFENDANTS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES 3-12 AND 7-11 filed by The Bank of New York, The Bank of New York Company, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company National Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Balabanian, David) (Filed on 12/13/2011)
December 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF WILLIAM BUTTERFIELD PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup granting #50 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
December 9, 2011 Filing 50 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - William Butterfield ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 34611067985) filed by International Union of Operating Engineers, Stationary Engineers Local 39 Pension Trust Fund. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/6/2012: #2 Application, #3 Proposed Order) (wsn, COURT STAFF).
December 9, 2011 Filing 49 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Ralph J. Bunche ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 34611067985) filed by International Union of Operating Engineers, Stationary Engineers Local 39 Pension Trust Fund. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/6/2012: #2 Application, #3 Proposed Order) (wsn, COURT STAFF).
December 8, 2011 Filing 48 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by International Union of Operating Engineers, Stationary Engineers Local 39 Pension Trust Fund, The Bank of New York, The Bank of New York Company, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company National Association. (Heimann, Richard) (Filed on 12/8/2011)
December 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY SCHIRRIPA PRO HAC VICE by Judge Alsup granting #45 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2011)
December 7, 2011 Filing 46 Certificate of Interested Entities by International Union of Operating Engineers, Stationary Engineers Local 39 Pension Trust Fund (Hazam, Lexi) (Filed on 12/7/2011)
December 7, 2011 Filing 45 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice AMENDED APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY FRANK R. SCHIRRIPA PRO HAC VICE ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 34611067732.) filed by International Union of Operating Engineers, Stationary Engineers Local 39 Pension Trust Fund. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 12/7/2011)
December 5, 2011 Filing 44 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Frank R. Schirripa ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 34611067732) filed by International Union of Operating Engineers, Stationary Engineers Local 39 Pension Trust Fund. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/6/2012: #2 Application, #3 Proposed Order) (wsn, COURT STAFF).
November 22, 2011 Filing 43 REPLY (re #28 MOTION to Dismiss THE CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT ) filed byThe Bank of New York, The Bank of New York Company, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company National Association. (Balabanian, David) (Filed on 11/22/2011)
November 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF DANIEL CHIPLOCK PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup granting #39 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2011)
November 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSIION OF MICHAEL MIARMI PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup granting #40 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2011)
November 14, 2011 Filing 40 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Michael J. Miarmi ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 34611066921) filed by International Union of Operating Engineers, Stationary Engineers Local 39 Pension Trust Fund. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2011)
November 14, 2011 Filing 39 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Daniel P. Chiplock ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 34611066921) filed by International Union of Operating Engineers, Stationary Engineers Local 39 Pension Trust Fund. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2011)
November 4, 2011 Filing 38 RESPONSE (re #28 MOTION to Dismiss THE CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT ) Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss the Class Action Complaint filed byInternational Union of Operating Engineers, Stationary Engineers Local 39 Pension Trust Fund. (Heimann, Richard) (Filed on 11/4/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 37 Statement of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 Disclosure by The Bank of New York, The Bank of New York Company, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company National Association. (Balabanian, David) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
October 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (immediatley following hearing on motion to dismiss). Case Management Statement due by 12/8/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2011 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. THERE WILL BE NO FURTHER CONTINUANCES WHATSOEVER. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/27/2011. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2011)
October 26, 2011 Filing 35 STIPULATION for Relief from Case Management Schedule by The Bank of New York, The Bank of New York Company, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company National Association. (Busch, Frank) (Filed on 10/26/2011)
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINES TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS re #32 Stipulation filed by International Union of Operating Engineers, Stationary Engineers Local 39 Pension Trust Fund (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2011) Modified on 10/18/2011 (whalc2, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2011 Filing 33 Declaration of Michael P. Lehmann in Support of #32 Stipulation And [Proposed] Order Extending Deadlines to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed byInternational Union of Operating Engineers, Stationary Engineers Local 39 Pension Trust Fund. (Related document(s) #32 ) (Lehmann, Michael) (Filed on 10/17/2011)
October 17, 2011 Filing 32 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINES TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS by International Union of Operating Engineers, Stationary Engineers Local 39 Pension Trust Fund. (Lehmann, Michael) (Filed on 10/17/2011)
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF MATTHEW MOSES PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup granting #27 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2011)
October 10, 2011 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Eliott Fineman (Fineman, Steven) (Filed on 10/10/2011)
October 7, 2011 Filing 29 Declaration of MATTHEW J. MOSES in Support of #28 MOTION to Dismiss THE CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed byThe Bank of New York, The Bank of New York Company, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-2)(Related document(s) #28 ) (Balabanian, David) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
October 7, 2011 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss THE CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by The Bank of New York, The Bank of New York Company, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company National Association. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2011 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 10/21/2011. Replies due by 10/28/2011. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Balabanian, David) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
October 7, 2011 Filing 27 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Matthew J. Moses ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611065521) filed by The Bank of New York, The Bank of New York Company, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company National Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
September 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ROBYN F. TRANOFSKY PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup granting #21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2011)
September 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF JAMES J. BRENNAN PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup granting #22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2011)
September 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF MICHELE HIRSHMAN PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup granting #20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2011)
September 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF CHARLES E. DAVIDOW by Hon. William Alsup granting #17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2011)
September 22, 2011 Filing 22 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of James J. Brennan (Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611064926) filed by The Bank of New York, The Bank of New York Company, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company National Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Busch, Frank) (Filed on 9/22/2011) Modified on 9/23/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2011 Filing 21 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Robyn F. Tarnofsky (Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611064926) filed by The Bank of New York, The Bank of New York Company, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company National Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Busch, Frank) (Filed on 9/22/2011) Modified on 9/23/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2011 Filing 20 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Michele Hirshman (Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611064926) filed by The Bank of New York, The Bank of New York Company, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company National Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Busch, Frank) (Filed on 9/22/2011) Modified on 9/23/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
September 21, 2011 Filing 19 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Robyn F. Tarnofsky ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611064926) filed by The Bank of New York, The Bank of New York Company, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company National Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2011)
September 21, 2011 Filing 18 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Michele Hirshman ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611064926) filed by The Bank of New York, The Bank of New York Company, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company National Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2011)
September 21, 2011 Filing 17 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Charles E. Davidow ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611064926) filed by The Bank of New York, The Bank of New York Company, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company National Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2011)
September 21, 2011 Filing 16 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - James J. Brennan ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611064926) filed by The Bank of New York, The Bank of New York Company, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company National Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2011)
September 21, 2011 Filing 15 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re #14 Clerks Notice, (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2011)
September 21, 2011 Filing 14 CLERKS NOTICE Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference on Reassignment. Case Management Statement due by 11/10/2011. Case Management Conference set for 11/17/2011 11:00 AM before the Honorable Wiliam Alsup in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2011)
August 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on August 30, 2011. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2011)
August 29, 2011 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
August 29, 2011 Filing 11 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by The Bank of New York, The Bank of New York Company, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company National Association, International Union of Operating Engineers, Stationary Engineers Local 39 Pension Trust Fund. (Balabanian, David) (Filed on 8/29/2011) Modified on 8/30/2011 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
August 29, 2011 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by The Bank of New York Mellon, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company National Association, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, The Bank of New York Company, Inc., The Bank of New York. Service waived by The Bank of New York Mellon waiver sent on 7/25/2011, answer due 9/23/2011; The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company National Association waiver sent on 7/25/2011, answer due 9/23/2011; The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation waiver sent on 7/25/2011, answer due 9/23/2011; The Bank of New York Company, Inc. waiver sent on 7/25/2011, answer due 9/23/2011; The Bank of New York waiver sent on 7/25/2011, answer due 9/23/2011. (Balabanian, David) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
August 26, 2011 Filing 9 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by The Bank of New York, The Bank of New York Company, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company National Association. (Balabanian, David) (Filed on 8/26/2011)
August 26, 2011 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Balabanian (Balabanian, David) (Filed on 8/26/2011)
July 22, 2011 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 22, 2011 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company National Association. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 22, 2011 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to The Bank of New York. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 22, 2011 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to The Bank of New York Company, Inc. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 22, 2011 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to The Bank of New York Mellon. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 22, 2011 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 22, 2011 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 1/12/2012. Case Management Conference set for 1/19/2012 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 22, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, jury trial demanded, against The Bank of New York, The Bank of New York Company, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company National Association (Filing fee $350, receipt number 34611062505). Filed byInternational Union of Operating Engineers, Stationary Engineers Local 39 Pension Trust Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kc, ) (Filed on 7/22/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Union of Operating Engineers, Stationary Engineers Local 39 Pension Trust Fund v. The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers, Stationary Engineers Local 39 Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Michael Paul Lehmann
Represented By: Richard Martin Heimann
Represented By: Daniel P. Chiplock
Represented By: Michael J. Miarmi,
Represented By: Steven Eliott Fineman
Represented By: Frank Rocco Schirripa
Represented By: Daniel Seltz
Represented By: William P. Butterfield,
Represented By: Lexi Joy Hazam, Esq.
Represented By: Ralph J. Bunche
Represented By: Robert Lawrence Lieff
Represented By: Christopher L. Lebsock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Los Angeles Department of Water and Power Retirement Plan
Represented By: Steven Noel Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanislaus County Employees Retirement Association
Represented By: Steven Noel Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association
Represented By: Steven Noel Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Diego County Employees Retirement Association
Represented By: Steven Noel Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York
Represented By: Edmund P. Power
Represented By: Jeanhee Hong
Represented By: Matthew J. Moses
Represented By: Ankush Khardori
Represented By: Charles E. Davidow
Represented By: Rebecca A. Beynon
Represented By: Michele Hirshman
Represented By: James J. Brennan
Represented By: Frank H. Busch
Represented By: Reid Mason Figel
Represented By: Robyn F Tarnofsky
Represented By: David Lawrence Schwarz
Represented By: David M. Balabanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation
Represented By: Edmund P. Power
Represented By: Jeanhee Hong
Represented By: Matthew J. Moses
Represented By: Ankush Khardori
Represented By: Charles E. Davidow
Represented By: Rebecca A. Beynon
Represented By: Michele Hirshman
Represented By: James J. Brennan
Represented By: Frank H. Busch
Represented By: Reid Mason Figel
Represented By: David Lawrence Schwarz
Represented By: David M. Balabanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company National Association
Represented By: Edmund P. Power
Represented By: Jeanhee Hong
Represented By: Matthew J. Moses
Represented By: Ankush Khardori
Represented By: Charles E. Davidow
Represented By: Rebecca A. Beynon
Represented By: Michele Hirshman
Represented By: James J. Brennan
Represented By: Frank H. Busch
Represented By: Reid Mason Figel
Represented By: Robyn F Tarnofsky
Represented By: David Lawrence Schwarz
Represented By: David M. Balabanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Edmund P. Power
Represented By: Jeanhee Hong
Represented By: Matthew J. Moses
Represented By: Ankush Khardori
Represented By: Charles E. Davidow
Represented By: Rebecca A. Beynon
Represented By: Michele Hirshman
Represented By: James J. Brennan
Represented By: Frank H. Busch
Represented By: Reid Mason Figel
Represented By: Robyn F Tarnofsky
Represented By: David Lawrence Schwarz
Represented By: David M. Balabanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Company, Inc.
Represented By: Edmund P. Power
Represented By: Jeanhee Hong
Represented By: Matthew J. Moses
Represented By: Ankush Khardori
Represented By: Charles E. Davidow
Represented By: Rebecca A. Beynon
Represented By: Michele Hirshman
Represented By: James J. Brennan
Represented By: Frank H. Busch
Represented By: Reid Mason Figel
Represented By: Robyn F Tarnofsky
Represented By: David Lawrence Schwarz
Represented By: David M. Balabanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?